Hulbert v. Ernie's Repair, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kody Hulbert
Defendant: Ernie's Repair, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00040
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 5/5/2020. (lc)
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2021 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Jury Trial set for 9/14/2021 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. (Trial est. 4 days). (LF)
May 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 12/1/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070. (LF)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2021 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (LF) (Main Document 9 replaced on 5/5/2020 to remove blank page at end of document - NEF Regenerated) (js).
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 1/1/2021. Discovery Motions due by 1/15/2021. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 1/1/2021. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 2/1/2021. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 3/1/2021. Defendant(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 3/1/2021. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 3/1/2021. Join Additional Parties due by 8/1/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2020. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 3/1/2021. Nondispositive Motions due by 8/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/1/2021. (LF)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 5/5/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (LF)
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ernie's Repair, Inc..(Beehler, Bradley)
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued filed by Kody Hulbert. Ernie's Repair, Inc. served on 3/16/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dickson, Thomas)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley J. Beehler on behalf of Ernie's Repair, Inc. (Beehler, Bradley)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Kody Hulbert. (am)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ernie's Repair, Inc.. (am)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ernie's Repair, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120000498) filed by Kody Hulbert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(am)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hulbert v. Ernie's Repair, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kody Hulbert
Represented By: Thomas A. Dickson
Represented By: Dennis E. Johnson
Represented By: Ariston Edward Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernie's Repair, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley J. Beehler
Represented By: Katherine Elizabeth Antonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?