Whetsel v. Pringle
Petitioner: Byron Whetsel
Respondent: Chad Pringle
Case Number: 3:2020cv00041
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal finding as moot #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing service. (AS) Distributed on 3/27/2020 (js).
March 26, 2020 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 320000230 (as)
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Byron Whetsel. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(pb)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Byron Whetsel. (AS) Distributed on 3/18/2020 (pb).
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Byron Whetsel. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/31/2020. (pb) Distributed on 3/17/2020 (pb).
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by Byron Whetsel. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(pb)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Byron Whetsel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account and Assets)(pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whetsel v. Pringle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Byron Whetsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Pringle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?