BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Jennen Trucking, LLC et al
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Defendant: Jeremy Jennen and Jennen Trucking, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00062
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jeremy Jennen, Jennen Trucking, LLC (pb) (Main Document 6 replaced to correct typographical error on 6/1/2020. NEF regenerated.) (pb).
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Entry of Default by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certification for Entry of Default, #2 Proposed Order)(Haney, James)
May 14, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. Jeremy Jennen served on 4/30/2020, answer due 5/21/2020 (Haney, James)
May 14, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. Jennen Trucking, LLC served on 4/30/2020, answer due 5/21/2020 (Haney, James)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jeremy Jennen and Jennen Trucking, LLC. (js)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeremy Jennen, Jennen Trucking, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number: 320000252) filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Master Vehicle Lease Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Continuing Guaranty, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(js) Modified on 5/1/2020 to add receipt number. (as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Jennen Trucking, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Jennen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennen Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Represented By: James K. Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?