Slivicki v. Fargo VAMC et al
Plaintiff: Susan Kay Slivicki
Defendant: US Department of Labor Office of Admin Law Judge, US Department of Veterans Affairs & Regional Office Center, Robert Wilkie and Fargo VAMC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00070
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Susan Kay Slivicki. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(pb)
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Susan Kay Slivicki. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/27/2020. (as)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Susan Kay Slivicki. See document filed at #4 . (js)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to document: #1 Complaint by Susan Kay Slivicki. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(js)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Susan Kay Slivicki. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/14/2020. (as)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Fargo VAMC, US Department of Labor Office of Admin Law Judge, US Department of Veterans Affairs & Regional Office Center, Robert Wilkie, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (as) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/1/2020 to correct typo.) (as)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fargo VAMC, US Department of Labor Office of Admin Law Judge, US Department of Veterans Affairs & Regional Office Center, Robert Wilkie (Filing fee $400, receipt number 320000263) filed by Susan Kay Slivicki. (Attachments: #1 Application for Review, #2 Memorandum Opinion in case 3:04-cv-147, #3 Westlaw Opinion in case 3:04-cv-147, #4 DOJ Letter dated 1/10/20, #5 USA Jobs Apps, #6 Breach of Settlement Agreement Allegation, #7 EEOC Decision, #8 Essentia Health Account Information, #9 Letter to Department of Labor dated 1/26/20, #10 Letter from Department of Labor dated 2/14/2020, #11 Podiatry Records, #12 Health and Medical Records, #13 EOB's, #14 IFP Application, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slivicki v. Fargo VAMC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Kay Slivicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Labor Office of Admin Law Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Veterans Affairs & Regional Office Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fargo VAMC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?