Bromley v. Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Karen Bromley
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00095
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Daniel M Traynor
2 Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Shelley R. Hebert. (rh)
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Shelley R. Hebert (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-1991313) by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Hebert, Shelley) Modified on 7/20/2020 to add receipt number. (rh)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (LF)
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Other Affiliate Prudential Financial, Inc. for Prudential Insurance Company of America.. (Stock, Robert)
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Answer and Affirmative and Additional Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Stock, Robert)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting unopposed #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Defendant's answer or other response due by 7/15/2020. (AS)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel M. Traynor for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. (pb)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Chief Judge Peter D. Welte recused. (EA)
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Stock, Robert)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Prudential Insurance Company of America. (js)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Prudential Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $400, receipt number 320000301) filed by Karen Bromley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bromley v. Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Robert B. Stock
Represented By: Shelley Renee Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Bromley
Represented By: McLain J. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?