Holmes v. State of Maryland Harford County Circuit Court et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Verl Holmes, Sr.
Defendant: Albert J. Peisinger and State of Maryland Harford County Circuit Court
Case Number: 3:2020cv00102
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Distributed on 7/10/2020.(js)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal dismissing the #5 Complaint filed by Jerry Verl Holmes, Sr. (AS) Distributed on 7/10/2020 (js).
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Jerry Verl Holmes, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(js)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF COLLECTION OF FILING FEE sent to James River Correctional Center and Jerry Verl Holmes, Sr. re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Distributed on 6/12/2020. (js)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Albert J. Peisinger, State of Maryland Harford County Circuit Court (Filing fee: IFP) filed by Jerry Verl Holmes, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Harford County District Court Docket, #2 Letters and Motions Sent to Harford County District Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (AS) Distributed on 6/12/2020 (js).
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jerry Verl Holmes, Sr. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/25/2020. (as)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 PLRA Packet. (Attachments: #1 Harford County District Court Docket, #2 Letters and Motions Sent to Harford County District Court, #3 Waiver of Service of Summons Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(as)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jerry Verl Holmes, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account and Assets, #2 Mailing Envelope)(as)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. State of Maryland Harford County Circuit Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Verl Holmes, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert J. Peisinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Maryland Harford County Circuit Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?