Carlson v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Lorrie Ann Carlson
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2020cv00122
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:427
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jebby Rasputnis)(Wall, Sarah)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Lorrie Ann Carlson. (pb)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Social Security Administration. (js)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Social Security Administration. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/3/2020. (js)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Wall on behalf of Social Security Administration (Wall, Sarah)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (js)
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee $400, receipt number: IFP) filed by Lorrie Ann Carlson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee is waived. (LF)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Lorrie Ann Carlson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/27/2020. (pb)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lorrie Ann Carlson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Proposed Cover Sheet)(pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlson v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Sarah E. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorrie Ann Carlson
Represented By: Scott A. Haider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?