Halvorson v. Best Buy Stores, L.P.
Plaintiff: Donna Halvorson
Defendant: Best Buy Stores, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00136
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 4/19/2022 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Jury Trial set for 4/19/2022 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. (Trial est. 3-5 Days). (AKS)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/5/2022 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal.(AKS)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 7/1/2021. Discovery Motions due by 8/30/2021. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 6/15/2021. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 8/20/2021. Plaintiff(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 9/30/2021. Defendant(s) Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 9/30/2021. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 11/30/2021. Join Additional Parties due by 1/28/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 1/28/2021. Amended Pleadings to Add Punitive Damages due by 1/28/2021. Nondispositive Motions due by 7/30/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2021. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 4/30/2021 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070.(AKS)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 9/9/2020. (lc)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference RESET for 9/9/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (Previously set for 9:00 AM - Time Change Only). (AS)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Best Buy Stores, L.P.. (Wood, Brian)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned as presiding judge. (pb)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Best Buy Stores, L.P.. (pb)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Donna Halvorson. (pb)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Donna Halvorson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/14/2020. (pb)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Best Buy Stores, L.P.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/14/2020. (pb)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Best Buy Stores, L.P. from Cass County District Court, case number not assigned. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 320000384 filed by Best Buy Stores, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit of Brian A. Wood, #3 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Defendant's Answer to Complaint, #5 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halvorson v. Best Buy Stores, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Halvorson
Represented By: Mike J Miller
Represented By: Todd Michael Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Stores, L.P.
Represented By: Thomas J. Evenson
Represented By: Brian A. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?