Loggins v. Metro Mobile
Plaintiff: Jonathan Loggins
Defendant: Metro Mobile
Case Number: 3:2020cv00146
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Mail NOT resent to Jonathan Loggins. (js)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #2 Notice of Direct Assignment. Mail NOT resent to Jonathan Loggins. (js)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT against Jonathan Loggins. (pb) Distributed on 9/18/2020 (pb).
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte adopting #6 Report and Recommendations. (MK) Distributed on 9/17/2020 (pb).
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceeding by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned as presiding judge. (pb) Distributed on 9/2/2020 (pb).
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal recommending the #4 Complaint filed by Jonathan Loggins be dismissed. (Objections to R&R due by 9/16/2020). (AS) Distributed on 9/2/2020 (pb).
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jonathan Loggins. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/8/2020. (pb) Distributed on 8/31/2020 (pb).
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Metro Mobile (Filing fee: IFP) filed by Jonathan Loggins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pb)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee is waived. (AS) Distributed on 8/13/2020 (pb).
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jonathan Loggins. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/26/2020. (js)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jonathan Loggins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint & js 44)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loggins v. Metro Mobile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Loggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Mobile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?