Regenxbio Inc. et al v. Aldevron, LLC
Plaintiff: Regenxbio Inc. and Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania, The
Defendant: Aldevron, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00171
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #20 Affidavit. Exhibit should have been filed as separate attachment to main document. Clerk's Office restricted access to document and re-filed at #21 . (sj)
November 9, 2020 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT re #19 MEMORANDUM in Support, by Aldevron, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - October 28, 2020 Press Release "Aldevron Receives Premier Technology Business Award")(sj)
November 9, 2020 Filing 20 *RESTRICTED - EXHIBIT SHOULD HAVE BEEN FILED AS SEPARATE ATTACHMENT TO MAIN DOCUMENT* AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Victoria L. Reines in Support of Aldevron LLC's Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and/or for a More Definite Statement Under 12(e) re #19 MEMORANDUM in Support, by Aldevron, LLC. (Manly, Robert) Modified on 11/10/2020 to restrict access.(sj).
November 9, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Aldeveron LLC's Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and/or for a More Definite Statement Under 12(e) Brief in Support of Aldevron LLC's Motion to Dismiss and/or for a More Definite Statement filed by Aldevron, LLC. (Manly, Robert)
November 9, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Aldeveron LLC's Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) and/or for a More Definite Statement Under 12(e) by Aldevron, LLC. (Manly, Robert)
November 9, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Hearing Aldeveron LLC's Motion for Oral Argument by Aldevron, LLC. (Manly, Robert)
October 14, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aldevron, LLC. (Manly, Robert)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. adopting the #14 Stipulation filed by Aldevron, LLC. Defendant's answer due by 11/9/2020. (AS)
October 2, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, to Extend Time to Answer by Aldevron, LLC. (Manly, Robert)
October 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert G. Manly on behalf of Aldevron, LLC (Manly, Robert)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Anthony M. Insogna. (ajs)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elizabeth Cary Miller. (lf)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney S. Christian Platt. (lf)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania, The, Regenxbio Inc.. Aldevron, LLC served on 9/17/2020, answer due 10/8/2020 (McLean, Ronald)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Anthony M. Insogna (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2029255) by Regenxbio Inc., Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania, The. (Insogna, Anthony) Modified to add receipt number on 9/18/2020 (ajs).
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Elizabeth Cary Miller (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2029150) by Regenxbio Inc., Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania, The. (Miller, Elizabeth) Modified on 9/18/2020 to add receipt number to the docket entry (lf).
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney S. Christian Platt (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2029138) by Regenxbio Inc., Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania, The. (Platt, Sean) Modified on 9/18/2020 to add receipt number to the docket entry (lf).
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Aldevron, LLC. (sj)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania, The (sj)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Regenxbio Inc. identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Regenxbio Inc. (sj)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent. Form emailed to register. (sj)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aldevron, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 320000446) filed by Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania, The, Regenxbio Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - US Patent Number, #3 Exhibit 2 - Supporting AAV and Lentiviral Vector Development Article, #4 Exhibit 3 - Freeline Therapeutics Form F-1, #5 Exhibit 4 - Aldevron Service Agreement, #6 Exhibit 5 - University of Tbingen Summary Notification, #7 Exhibit 6 - Safety and Toxicology of Ocular Gene Therapy Article, #8 7 - Long-Term Safety and Efficacy Article)(sj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regenxbio Inc. et al v. Aldevron, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regenxbio Inc.
Represented By: Ronald H. McLean
Represented By: Anthony Insogna
Represented By: Elizabeth Miller
Represented By: Sean Christian Platt
Represented By: Ian Ronald McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania, The
Represented By: Ronald H. McLean
Represented By: Anthony Insogna
Represented By: Elizabeth Miller
Represented By: Sean Christian Platt
Represented By: Ian Ronald McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldevron, LLC
Represented By: Robert G. Manly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?