Frohlich v. USA
Petitioner: Gregory Frohlich
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2020cv00176
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (pb) Distributed on 10/20/2020 (pb).
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte dismissing #7 WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (General); finding as moot #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (MK) Distributed on 10/20/2020 (pb).
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (General) by Gregory Frohlich. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(sj)
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gregory Frohlich. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope, #2 Certificate of Inmate Account and Assets, #3 Mailing Envelope)(sj)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned as presiding judge. (pb) Distributed on 10/5/2020 (pb).
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Gregory Frohlich. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(pb)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 Remark: HABEAS PETITION received incomplete. Request to complete Habeas petition sent to inmate (need Form C). (pb)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Gregory Frohlich. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/13/2020. (sj)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 Remark: HABEAS PETITION received incomplete. Request to complete Habeas petition sent to inmate. (sj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frohlich v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory Frohlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?