Roers Management, Inc. v. Roers Companies, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Roers Management, Inc.
Defendant: Roers Group, LLC, Roers Companies, LLC and Roers Investments, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00228
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Taylor Y. Moore-Willis. (js)
February 3, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Taylor Y. Moore-Willis (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2112219) by Roers Companies, LLC, Roers Group, LLC, Roers Investments, LLC. (Moore-Willis, Taylor) Modified on 2/3/2021 to add receipt #. (js)
January 11, 2021 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Roers Companies, LLC, Roers Group, LLC, Roers Investments, LLC. (Ashenmacher, George)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ronald J. Schutz. (sj)
January 5, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ronald J. Schutz (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2092548) by Roers Companies, LLC, Roers Group, LLC, Roers Investments, LLC. (Schutz, Ronald) Modified on 1/5/2021 to add receipt number.(sj).
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William E. Manske; granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney George B. Ashenmacher.(sj)
December 31, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney George B. Ashenmacher (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2090869) by Roers Companies, LLC, Roers Group, LLC, Roers Investments, LLC. (Ashenmacher, George) Modified on 12/31/2020 to add receipt number.(sj).
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal adopting the parties' #11 Stipulation. Defendants' Answer or Other Response due by 2/9/2021. (AKS)
December 31, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney William E. Manske (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2090855) by Roers Companies, LLC, Roers Group, LLC, Roers Investments, LLC. (Manske, William) Modified on 12/31/2020 to add receipt number.(sj).
December 30, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND by Roers Companies, LLC, Roers Group, LLC, Roers Investments, LLC. (Purdon, Timothy)
December 17, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roers Management, Inc.. Roers Investments, LLC served on 12/17/2020, answer due 1/7/2021 (Ewald, Ashley) (Main Document 10 replaced on 12/18/2020 to remove double header). NEF regenerated. (sj)
December 15, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roers Management, Inc.. Roers Group, LLC served on 12/11/2020, answer due 1/4/2021 (Ewald, Ashley)
December 15, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roers Management, Inc.. Roers Companies, LLC served on 12/11/2020, answer due 1/4/2021 (Ewald, Ashley)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #5 #6 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys Ashley Bennett Ewald and Molly R. Littman. (ajs)
December 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Molly R. Littman (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2083575) by Roers Management, Inc. (Littman, Molly) Modified to add receipt number on 12/15/2020 (ajs).
December 15, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ashley Bennett Ewald (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2083559) by Roers Management, Inc. (Ewald, Ashley) Modified to add receipt number on 12/15/2020 (ajs).
December 8, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Roers Management, Inc. (pb)
December 8, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark. Form emailed to register. (pb)
December 8, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Roers Companies, LLC, Roers Group, LLC, Roers Investments, LLC. (pb)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Roers Companies, LLC, Roers Group, LLC, Roers Investments, LLC (Filing fee $402, receipt number 321000082) filed by Roers Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roers Management, Inc. v. Roers Companies, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roers Group, LLC
Represented By: George Benson Ashenmacher
Represented By: Taylor Moore-Willis
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: Ronald J. Schutz
Represented By: William E. Manske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roers Companies, LLC
Represented By: Ronald J. Schutz
Represented By: Taylor Moore-Willis
Represented By: William E. Manske
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: George Benson Ashenmacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roers Investments, LLC
Represented By: Taylor Moore-Willis
Represented By: William E. Manske
Represented By: Timothy Q. Purdon
Represented By: George Benson Ashenmacher
Represented By: Ronald J. Schutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roers Management, Inc.
Represented By: Loren L. Hansen
Represented By: Ashley Ewald
Represented By: Molly R. Littman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?