Rucks v. Western Equipment Finance, Inc.
Plaintiff: Matthew Rucks doing business as Rucks Tree Service
Defendant: Western Equipment Finance, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Matthew Rucks
Case Number: 3:2021cv00054
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2022 at 02:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AKS)
May 6, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: Bench Trial set for 7/12/2022 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. (Trial Est. 3 Days). (AKS)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Early Settlement Conference set for 5/26/2021 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AKS)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 9/30/2021. Discovery Motions due by 10/15/2021. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 10/30/2021. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 11/28/2021. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 12/31/2021. Join Additional Parties due by 7/15/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2021 or within 60 days of resolution of the pending motion to dismiss counterclaims. Dispositive Motions due by 1/15/2022. Responses to dispositive motions due by 2/15/2022 and Replies due by 3/1/2022. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 8/3/2021 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070. (AKS)
May 4, 2021 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 5/4/2021. (DR #210504-000 (JS Chambers Recorder)) (js)
April 29, 2021 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #11 STIPULATION. Filed in error. Clerk's Office restricted access to document. (sj)
April 28, 2021 Filing 11 *RESTRICTED - FILED IN ERROR* STIPULATION JOINT PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN by Matthew Rucks. (Loftus, Alexander) Modified on 4/29/2021 to restrict access. (sj).
April 16, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Rory Mattson on behalf of Western Equipment Finance, Inc. (Mattson, Rory)
April 15, 2021 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Wrong event selected. Clerks office restricted access to document and re-filed as MEMORANDUM in Support at #9 ; #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Clerks office added descriptions to attachments when re-filing memorandum in support. (js)
April 13, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Matthew Rucks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rock County Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Rory Mattson, #4 Exhibit D - Response to Fee Petition, #5 Exhibit E - Order of Fees)(js)
April 13, 2021 Filing 8 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Memorandum in Support by Matthew Rucks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Loftus, Alexander) Modified on 4/14/2021 to restrict access. (js)
April 13, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Matthew Rucks. (Loftus, Alexander)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 5/4/2021 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
March 30, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Matthew Rucks by Western Equipment Finance, Inc..(Hasko, Joshua)
March 11, 2021 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #3 Summons Returned Executed. Exhibits should have been filed as separate attachments to main document. Clerk's Office restricted access to document and re-filed at #4 . (mf)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Rucks. Western Equipment Finance, Inc. served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Photographs)(mf)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 *RESTRICTED - EXHIBIT SHOULD HAVE BEEN FILED AS SEPARATE ATTACHMENT TO MAIN DOCUMENT* SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Rucks. Western Equipment Finance, Inc. served on 3/9/2021, answer due 3/30/2021 (Loftus, Alexander) Modified on 3/11/2021 to restrict access (mf).
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Western Equipment Finance, Inc. (sj)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Western Equipment Finance, Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 321000188) filed by Matthew Rucks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Equipment Financing Agreement with Collateral Schedule "A", #3 Exhibit B - Bill of Sale, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Intent to Sell)(sj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rucks v. Western Equipment Finance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Rucks doing business as Rucks Tree Service
Represented By: Alexander Loftus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Equipment Finance, Inc.
Represented By: Rory Mattson
Represented By: Joshua A. Hasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Matthew Rucks
Represented By: Alexander Loftus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?