Dakotas Areawide IBEW-NECA Savings & Retirement Plan and Trust v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Plaintiff: Dakotas Areawide IBEW-NECA Savings & Retirement Plan and Trust
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 3:2021cv00100
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's Answer is due by 7/8/2021. (AKS)
June 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN ADDITIONAL EXTENSION OF DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO ANSWER THE COMPLAINT by Dakotas Areawide IBEW-NECA Savings & Retirement Plan and Trust. (Boone, Nathan)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting unopposed #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer or other response due by 6/17/2021. (AS)
May 26, 2021 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Clerk's Office removed unnecessary motion reliefs (MOTION for Bill of Costs, MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery), removed link, and regenerated the NEF. (pb)
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Dakotas Areawide IBEW-NECA Savings & Retirement Plan and Trust. (Boone, Nathan) Modified to remove unnecessary motion reliefs and remove link on 5/26/2021. NEF regenerated (pb).
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint filed by Dakotas Areawide IBEW-NECA Savings & Retirement Plan and Trust. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The served on 5/6/2021, answer due 5/27/2021. (pb)
April 30, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The. (pb)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The (Filing fee $402, receipt number 321000275) filed by Dakotas Areawide IBEW-NECA Savings & Retirement Plan and Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dakotas Areawide IBEW-NECA Savings & Retirement Plan and Trust v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakotas Areawide IBEW-NECA Savings & Retirement Plan and Trust
Represented By: Amanda R. Cefalu
Represented By: Ruth S Marcott
Represented By: Nathan T Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?