Olson v. Estate of Donna Mae Olson et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Lee Olson
Defendant: Marlis Peterson, Estate of Donna Mae Olson, Cory Leo Preskey, Terry Lynn Olson, Bryan Van Grinsven, Steffen Scott Olson and Eric S. Solbakken
Case Number: 3:2021cv00101
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Filing 35 RESPONSE to Motion re #31 MOTION for Reconsideration re #22 Order,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, #25 MOTION for Partial Award Claim 11, #24 MOTION to for A Federal Executor Et Al filed by Terry Lynn Olson. (Fullerton, Ryan)
June 30, 2021 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Terry Lynn Olson. (Fullerton, Ryan)
June 30, 2021 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kevin Lee Olson re #32 MEMORANDUM in Support, #31 MOTION for Reconsideration re #22 Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (sj)
June 30, 2021 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in Support re #31 MOTION for Reconsideration re #22 Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings filed by Kevin Lee Olson. (sj)
June 30, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION for Reconsideration re #22 Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, by Kevin Lee Olson. (sj)
June 24, 2021 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bryan Van Grinsven re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #20 MEMORANDUM in Support (Vendsel, Jason)
June 22, 2021 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kevin Lee Olson re #28 Response to Motion, #25 MOTION for Partial Award Claim 11, #23 Supplement, #26 Response to Motion, #27 Response to Motion, #24 MOTION to for A Federal Executor Et Al (js)
June 22, 2021 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kevin Lee Olson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Reply, #2 Supporting Document Referenced in Response, #3 Supporting Document Referenced in Response)(js)
June 22, 2021 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kevin Lee Olson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Reply, #2 Supporting Document Referenced in Response, #3 Supporting Document Referenced in Response)(js)
June 22, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Kevin Lee Olson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Reply, #2 Supporting Document Referenced in Response, #3 Supporting Document Referenced in Response)(js)
June 22, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Partial Award Claim 11 by Kevin Lee Olson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(js)
June 22, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for A Federal Executor Et Al by Kevin Lee Olson. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Application for Ex Parte Order to Appoint A Federal Executor (Memorandum of Points & Authorities), #2 Email Correspondence w/ Clerk's Office Staff)(js)
June 22, 2021 Filing 23 SUPPLEMENT to document: #1 Complaint by Kevin Lee Olson. (js)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal regarding #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #16 MOTION to Dismiss, and #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Responses due by 7/8/2021. Replies due by 7/22/2021. (AS) Modified to remove 'text only' language from docket text and main Document 22 replaced on 6/22/2021 to correct typographical error - NEF Regenerated). Distributed on 6/22/2021. (js)
June 15, 2021 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #19 Motion to Dismiss. Corrected motion relief from Motion to Dismiss to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (cjs)
June 14, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bryan Van Grinsven re #19 MOTION to Dismiss (F.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6)), #20 MEMORANDUM in Support (Vendsel, Jason)
June 14, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss (F.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6)) filed by Bryan Van Grinsven. (Vendsel, Jason)
June 14, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Bryan Van Grinsven. (Vendsel, Jason) Modified on 6/15/2021 to correct motion relief (cjs).
June 2, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marlis Peterson Service on Kevin Lee Olson (Maxson, Jacob)
June 2, 2021 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #15 Notice of Appearance. Attachments should have been filed using separate event codes. Clerk's Office restricted access to attachments and re-filed as Motion to Dismiss at #16 and Memorandum in Support at #17 . (cjs)
June 1, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Marlis Peterson. (cjs)
June 1, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Marlis Peterson. (cjs)
June 1, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Maxson on behalf of Marlis Peterson (Attachments: #1 *RESTRICTED-DOCUMENT SHOULD HAVE BEEN FILED AS SEPARATE EVENT* Exhibit Defendant Marlis Peterson's Motion to Dismiss, #2 *RESTRICTED-DOCUMENT SHOULD HAVE BEEN FILED AS SEPARATE EVENT* Exhibit Memorandum of Law in Support of Marlis Peterson's Motion to Dismiss)(Maxson, Jacob) Modified on 6/2/2021 to restrict access to attachments 1 and 2. (cjs).
May 28, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address (Corrected Address) by Kevin Lee Olson (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Certificate of Service)(pb)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned as presiding judge. (pb) Distributed on 5/28/2021 (pb).
May 28, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Kevin Lee Olson. (pb)
May 28, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Terry Lynn Olson. (Fullerton, Ryan)
May 28, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Terry Lynn Olson. (Fullerton, Ryan)
May 27, 2021 Filing 9 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Kevin Lee Olson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/3/2021. (Verified w/ Mr. Olson we have the correct PO Box on file)(js) (Main Document 9 replaced on 5/27/2021 with pro se notice and non-fillable pdf - NEF Regenerated) (js).
May 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Douglas Fullerton on behalf of Terry Lynn Olson (Fullerton, Ryan)
May 18, 2021 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Notice of Direct Assignment, #2 Summons Issued. Main not resent - address unknown. NOTE: Summons not resent; Summons Returned Executed filed at #4 . (pb)
May 14, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (to Marlis Peterson) by Kevin Lee Olson (sj)
May 14, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kevin Lee Olson re #4 Summons Returned Executed (sj)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Lee Olson. Steffen Scott Olson served on 5/7/2021, answer due 5/28/2021; Terry Lynn Olson served on 5/6/2021, answer due 5/27/2021; Cory Leo Preskey served on 5/8/2021, answer due 6/1/2021; Eric S. Solbakken served on 5/8/2021, answer due 6/1/2021; Bryan Van Grinsven served on 5/7/2021, answer due 5/28/2021. (sj)
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Kevin Lee Olson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/20/2021. (pb)
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Estate of Donna Mae Olson, Steffen Scott Olson, Terry Lynn Olson, Marlis Peterson, Cory Leo Preskey, Eric S. Solbakken, Bryan Van Grinsven. (pb)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Estate of Donna Mae Olson, Steffen Scott Olson, Terry Lynn Olson, Marlis Peterson, Cory Leo Preskey, Eric S. Solbakken, Bryan Van Grinsven (Filing fee $402, receipt number 321000280) filed by Kevin Lee Olson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1.1 - Land Ownership Deed and Family Agreement, #2 Exhibit 1.2 - Oliver Carmen Olson Death Certificate, #3 Exhibit 1.3 - Donna Mae Olson Death Certifiate and Will, #4 Exhibit 1.4 - Donna Mae Olson Lease Agreement and Checking Deposit, #5 Exhibit 1.5 - 2019 Farm 4946 Property Taxes, #6 Exhibit 1.6 - Town & Country Letter with Affidavit for Collection, #7 Exhibit 1.7 - Filing and Recording of Donna Mae Olson Death Certificate, #8 Exhibit 1.8 - Donna Mae Olson Email String, #9 Exhibit 1.9 - NDCC 30.1-18, #10 Exhibit 1.10 - Olson Property Land Rent Lease Communications, #11 Exhibit 1.11 - History Prior to Donna Mae Olson Passing, #12 Exhibit 1.12 - Terry L. Olson Hate & Falsehoods about Kevin Lee Olson, #13 Exhibit 1.13 - Rent and 2019 Property Tax Payment Proof of Theft, #14 Exhibit 1.14 - Return of Cash Rent Check to Cory Preskey, #15 Exhibit 1.15 - Terry L. Olson's Hate & Threat-Filled Response to 1.14, #16 Exhibit 1.16 - Donna Mae Olson's 2019 Federal and State Tax Documents & Bill, #17 Exhibit 1.17 - Terry L. Olson Email with Threat, #18 Exhibit 1.18 - 2019 Pasture Rent with Donna Mae Olson Income Tax Withheld, #19 Exhibit 1.19 - USDA Grant Buck Letters 11May2020, #20 Exhibit 1.20 - USCA Grant Buck Kevin Lee Olson Phone Call Summary Letter and Documents, #21 Exhibit 1.21 - USDA Brandon Weber, Kevin Lee Olson Email Exchanges, #22 Exhibit 1.22 - USDA Cropland vs Rented by Preskeys, #23 Exhibit 1.23 - Return of 2nd 2020 Cropland Rent Check from Cory Preskey, #24 Exhibit 1.24 - USDA Subsidy Info for Cory Preskey and Mitchell Preskey, #25 Exhibit 1.25 - Filing and Recording of Oliver Carmen Olson's Death Certificate, #26 Exhibit 1.26 - Return of 2021 Cropland Rent Check to Cory Preskey, #27 Exhibit 1.27 - Return of Pasture Rent Check to Terry L. Olson maybe for 2020, #28 Exhibit 1.28 - Olson Property Farm 4946 Lease Bid Form, #29 Exhibit 1.29 - Tractor Attachments ETAL, #30 Exhibit 1.30 - Bill and Check from Terry L. Olson re Donna Mae Olson Vehicle ETAL, #31 Exhibit 1.31 - O.Carmen Olson and Donna Mae Olson Durable Power of Attorneys, #32 Exhibit 1.32 - A Cry from the Land, #33 Exhibit 1.33 - Relief Value Calculations Max and Value for each Claim, #34 Exhibit 1.34 - Cash Rent and Farm Property Value Calculations with Support Docs, #35 Exhibit 1.35 - Maximum Mental Distress and Anguish Value Calculations, #36 Exhibit 1.36 - Future Calculation Multiplier for Claim 16, #37 Certificate of Service, #38 Civil Cover Sheet)(pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olson v. Estate of Donna Mae Olson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Lee Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlis Peterson
Represented By: Jacob Maxson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Donna Mae Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Leo Preskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Lynn Olson
Represented By: Ryan Douglas Fullerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Van Grinsven
Represented By: Jason R. Vendsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steffen Scott Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric S. Solbakken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?