DL Farms LLC v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Plaintiff: DL Farms LLC
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture, Federal Crop Insurance Corporation and Risk Management Agency
Case Number: 3:2021cv00144
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Department of Justice (Attorney General) and U.S. Attorney (Fargo). Answer due for all defendants on 9/24/2021. (pb)
July 20, 2021 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #3 Summons Returned Executed. Wrong event selected. Clerk's Office restricted access to document and re-filed as Summons Returned Executed as to USA at #4 . (cjs)
July 20, 2021 Deadlines and Hearings Terminated. (cjs)
July 19, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Federal Crop Insurance Corporation served on 7/12/2021, answer due 9/10/2021; Risk Management Agency served on 7/12/2021, answer due 9/10/2021; United States Department of Agriculture served on 7/12/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (cjs)
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 *RESTRICTED-WRONG EVENT SELECTED* SUMMONS Returned Executed by DL Farms LLC. All Defendants (Donarski, Michelle) Modified on 7/20/2021 to restrict access (cjs).
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Federal Crop Insurance Corporation, Risk Management Agency, United States Department of Agriculture, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (js)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Crop Insurance Corporation, Risk Management Agency, and United States Department of Agriculture (Filing fee $402, receipt number: 321000363) filed by DL Farms LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Reconsideration Determination of the Deputy Administrator for Insurance Services, Risk Management Agency dated 3/29/21 re Good Farming Practices, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DL Farms LLC v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DL Farms LLC
Represented By: Michelle M. Donarski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Crop Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Risk Management Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?