Loggins v. Cass County, et al.
Plaintiff: Jonathan David Loggins
Defendant: Cass County, Ronnie Albert, Lt. Timothy Briggman, Sam Okert and Chris Bunge
Case Number: 3:2021cv00160
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER of USCA as to #11 Notice of Appeal filed by Jonathan David Loggins. Appellant is directed to pay the $505 filing fee, or file a pleading in the 8th Circuit Court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee. Failure to do so by October 21, 2021, the appeal will be dismissed. (sj)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER of USCA as to #11 Notice of Appeal filed by Jonathan David Loggins. Appellant is directed to pay the $505 filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis with the Court of Appeals by October 12, 2021. (js)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte denying #12 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. (EA) Distributed on 9/13/2021 (js).
September 3, 2021 Filing 14 USCA ORDER Requesting Paper Record of Non-ECF Documents re #11 Notice of Appeal. None exist at this time. (pb)
September 3, 2021 USCA Case Number 21-2998 for #11 Notice of Appeal. (pb)
September 1, 2021 Filing 13 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal Supplement to 8th Circuit Court of Appeals re #11 Notice of Appeal (pb) (Main Document 13 replaced to correct error in document on 9/2/2021. NEF regenerated) (pb).
September 1, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Jonathan David Loggins. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(pb)
September 1, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #10 Order on Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jonathan David Loggins. Filing fee: IFP Pending. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(pb)
September 1, 2021 Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet re #11 Notice of Appeal mailed to Jonathan David Loggins. (pb)
August 26, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (sj)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte adopting #6 Report and Recommendation and denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (EA) Distributed on 8/26/2021 (sj).
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal denying 8 Motion to Redact the Report and Recommendation. (AS) Distributed on 8/20/2021 (js).
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Redact the Report and Recommendation re #7 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Jonathan David Loggins. (sj)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendations by Jonathan David Loggins (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(sj)
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal recommending the #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jonathan David Loggins be denied. Objections to R&R due by 8/25/2021. (AS) Distributed on 8/11/2021 (js).
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned as presiding judge. (sj) Distributed on 8/10/2021 (sj).
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Jonathan David Loggins. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(sj)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jonathan David Loggins. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/18/2021. (sj) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/9/2021 with pro se notice - Notice redistributed) (js).
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 PLRA Packet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet JS-44, #2 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons (Chris Bunge), #3 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons (Cass County/Sam Okert), #4 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons (Tim Briggman), #5 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons (Ronnie Albert), #6 Mailing Envelope)(sj)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jonathan David Loggins. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account and Assets, #2 Mailing Envelope)(sj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loggins v. Cass County, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan David Loggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cass County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Timothy Briggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Okert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Bunge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?