Lee v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Karen Lee
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2022cv00010
Filed: January 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #11 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Clerk's Office added location of Attorney General and removed "Exhibit" language in docket text. re: #12 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Clerk's Office added "Social Security Administration" and Service/Answer date as well as location of Regional Counsel. Removed "Exhibit" language in docket text. (sj)
February 18, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Social Security Administration served on 2/10/2022, answer due 4/1//2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Regional Counsel, Dallas, Texas)(Farrell, Clifford) Modified on 2/22/2022 to add "Social Security Administration" and Service/Answer date as well as location of Regional Counsel. Removed "Exhibit" language in docket text. (sj).
February 18, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Social Security Administration served on 2/4/2022, answer due 4/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Attorney General, Washington, DC)(Farrell, Clifford) Modified on 2/22/2022 to add location of Attorney General. Removed "Exhibit" language in docket text.(sj).
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer as presiding judge. (pb)
February 16, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Karen Lee. (pb)
February 15, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #7 NOTICE of Direct Assignment. Wrong event selected. Clerks office restricted access to document and re-filed as SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment at #8 . (js)
February 14, 2022 Filing 8 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Karen Lee. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 2/22/2022. (js)
February 14, 2022 Filing 7 *WRONG EVENT SELECTED* NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Karen Lee. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 2/28/2022. (js) Modified on 2/15/2022to restrict access. (js)
January 26, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Karen Lee. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 2/9/2022. (js)
January 26, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (js)
January 26, 2022 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (Filing fee: IFP) filed by Karen Lee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(js)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal finding as moot #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and granting amended #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee is waived. (AS)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Amended by Karen Lee. (Farrell, Clifford)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Karen Lee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Proposed Cover Sheet)(sj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Lee
Represented By: Clifford Michael Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?