Glenn W. Frericks v. A.H. Bennett Company et al
Plaintiff: Glenn W. Frericks
Defendant: CBS Corporation, Riley Power, Inc., Rockbestos-Surprenant Cable Corp., Whittier Filtration, Inc., A.H. Bennett Company, A.W. Chesterton Company, A.W. Kuettel & Sons, Inc., American Crystal Sugar Company, Asbestos Corporation, Ltd., Bell & Gossett, Building Sprinkler Company, Inc., Burnham, LLC, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Division of Aqua-Chem, Inc., Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Fargo-Moorhead Insulation Company, Foster Wheeler Corporation, General Electric Company, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps, H.H. Robertson Company, Hobart Brothers Co., Industrial Contractors, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Lincoln Electric Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Mine Safety Appliance Company, Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing, Paul W. Abbott Company, Inc., The Rockbestos Company, S.O.S. Products Company, Inc., U.S. Filter Co., Union Carbide Corporation, United Conveyor Corporation, Weil McLain Company, Western Steel & Plumbing, Inc., U.S. Filter, Whitter, Inc., Zurn Industries, Inc., Crane Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC., 3M Company, Rockbestos-Surprenant Cable Corporation, The Marley-Wylain Company, LLC, Redco Corporation, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company and Riley Stoker Corporation
Case Number: 3:2022cv00075
Filed: May 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. The Clerk is directed to amend the docket to reflect the name change of defendant Crane Company to Redco Corporation, as stated in defendant's #54 Notice of Name Change. (KT)
June 8, 2022 Filing 54 NOTICE by Crane Company of Name Change (Russell, Jon)
June 3, 2022 Filing 53 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A.W. Chesterton Company. (Brownson, Kristi)
June 2, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi K. Brownson on behalf of A.W. Chesterton Company (Brownson, Kristi)
May 27, 2022 Filing 51 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 7/11/2023 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Jury Trial set for 7/11/2023 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. (Trial Est. 10-13 Days). (AS)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2023 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 10/3/2022. Discovery Motions due by 10/17/2022. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 3/15/2023. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 5/1/2023. Any Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 5/15/2023. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 6/15/2023. Join Additional Parties due by 9/2/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 9/2/2022. Nondispositive Motions due by 1/3/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 1/3/2023. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 8/12/2022 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070. (AS)
May 27, 2022 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 5/27/2022. Attorney Joanna M. Salmen added for A.H. Bennett Company, A.W. Kuettel & Sons, Inc., Cleaver-Brooks, Division of Aqua-Chem, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Rockbestos-Surprenant Cable Corporation, and The Marley-Wylain Company, LLC. (DR #220527-001 JS Chambers Recorder) (lc)
May 27, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #44 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Clerk's Office added Corporate Parent (Crown Holdings, Inc.) for Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.; re: #46 NOTICE of Appearance. Counsel notified to send corrected document to Clerk's Office for replacement. (pb)
May 26, 2022 Filing 47 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Whittier Filtration, Inc.. (Scouton, David)
May 26, 2022 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Scouton on behalf of Whittier Filtration, Inc. (Scouton, David) (Main Document 46 replaced with signed and nonfillable .pdf on 6/1/2022. NEF regenerated) (pb).
May 26, 2022 Filing 45 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Foster Wheeler Corporation. (Scouton, David)
May 26, 2022 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Crown Holdings, Inc. for Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. (Tjon Bossart, Stacey) Modified to add Corporate Parent on 5/27/2022 (pb).
May 26, 2022 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey Elizabeth Tjon Bossart on behalf of Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc. (Tjon Bossart, Stacey)
May 25, 2022 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company identifying Other Affiliate GE Capital, Other Affiliate GE Capital Equity for General Electric Company.. (Schweigert, David)
May 25, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by David D. Schweigert on behalf of General Electric Company (Schweigert, David)
May 20, 2022 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.. (Doely, Peter)
May 20, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter K. Doely on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Doely, Peter)
May 20, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. of Telephonic Conference Information (Neubauer, Heather)
May 17, 2022 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Crane, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Smiths Group PLC for John Crane, Inc... (Jensen, Scott)
May 17, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #36 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Clerk's Office modified entry to reflect John Wood Group plc (Scotland) as a corporate parent. (js)
May 16, 2022 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler Corporation identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group plc's (Scotland) for Foster Wheeler Corporation. (Scouton, David) Modified on 5/17/2022 to add corporate parent. (js)
May 16, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Scouton on behalf of Foster Wheeler Corporation (Scouton, David)
May 11, 2022 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paul W. Abbott Company, Inc.. (Thibodeau, Matthew)
May 11, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. Thibodeau on behalf of Paul W. Abbott Company, Inc. (Thibodeau, Matthew)
May 11, 2022 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bell & Gossett. (Jensen, Thomas)
May 11, 2022 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goulds Pumps. (Jensen, Thomas)
May 11, 2022 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western Steel & Plumbing, Inc.. (Jensen, Thomas)
May 11, 2022 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Industrial Contractors, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Jamar Company, The for Industrial Contractors, Inc... (Thibodeau, Matthew)
May 11, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. Thibodeau on behalf of Industrial Contractors, Inc. (Thibodeau, Matthew)
May 10, 2022 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hobart Brothers Co. identifying Other Affiliate MEHB Holdings Limited for Hobart Brothers Co... (Hansen, Susan)
May 10, 2022 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln Electric Co. identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln Electric Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Lincoln Electric Co... (Hansen, Susan)
May 10, 2022 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Dow, Inc., Other Affiliate Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation.. (Dynes, Jane)
May 10, 2022 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cleaver-Brooks, Division of Aqua-Chem, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Cleaver Brooks Acquisition LLC for Cleaver-Brooks, Division of Aqua-Chem, Inc... (Mohr, Jason)
May 10, 2022 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Riley Power, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Babcock Power Inc. for Riley Power, Inc... (Mohr, Jason)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. The Clerk is directed to amend the docket to reflect the name change of defendant Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company to 3M Company, as stated in the defendant's #16 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (AS)
May 9, 2022 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zurn Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Zurn Water Solutions Corporation for Zurn Industries, Inc... (Salmen, Joanna)
May 9, 2022 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Conveyor Corporation. (Schach, David)
May 9, 2022 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by S.O.S. Products Company, Inc.. (Schach, David)
May 9, 2022 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company identifying Other Affiliate Vanguard Group, Inc. for Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.. (Salmen, Joanna)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. The Clerk is directed to amend the docket to reflect the name change of defendant Weil McLain Company to The Marley-Wylain Company LLC, as stated in that defendant's #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement, and to amend the docket to reflect the name change of defendant Rockbestos-Surprenant Cable Corporation, formerly known as The Rockbestos Company, a Delaware Corporation, (wholly owned subsidiary Marmon Corporation), to RSCC Wire & Cable LLC, as stated in that defendant's #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (AS)
May 6, 2022 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing. (Hull, Daniel)
May 6, 2022 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fargo-Moorhead Insulation Company. (Parrington, Jon)
May 6, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon P. Parrington on behalf of Fargo-Moorhead Insulation Company (Parrington, Jon)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 5/27/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
May 5, 2022 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety, Inc. for Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC... (Neubauer, Heather)
May 5, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Burnham, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Burnham Holdings, Inc. for Burnham, LLC.. (Neubauer, Heather)
May 5, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Asbestos Corporation, Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Mazarin Inc. for Asbestos Corporation, Ltd... (Nekola, Kathryn)
May 5, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Crystal Sugar Company. (Griffin, Abigale)
May 5, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rockbestos-Surprenant Cable Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Marmon Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Rockbestos-Surprenant Cable Corp... (Brotten, Elizabeth)
May 5, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weil McLain Company identifying Corporate Parent SPX Corporation, Other Affiliate The Marley-Wylain Company for Weil McLain Company.. (Brotten, Elizabeth)
May 5, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by H.H. Robertson Company identifying Other Affiliate RCH Newco II, LLC, Other Affiliate Robertson Ceco Corporation for H.H. Robertson Company.. (Brotten, Elizabeth)
May 5, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A.W. Kuettel & Sons, Inc.. (Brotten, Elizabeth)
May 5, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A.H. Bennett Company. (Brotten, Elizabeth)
May 4, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. (sj)
May 4, 2022 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal by Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Answer of Asbestos Corporation, Ltd., #3 Exhibit 3 - Answer of United Conveyor Corporation, #4 Exhibit 4 - General Electric Companys Answer and Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand, #5 Exhibit 5 - Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Union Carbide Corporation to Plaintiffs Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6 - SOS Products Answer, #7 Exhibit 7 - Answer of Fargo-Moorhead Insulation Company, #8 Exhibit 8 - John Crane, Incs (fka Crane Packing Company) Separate Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint and Answer to Cross-Claims, #9 Exhibit 9 - Answer of A.W. Kuettel & Sons, #10 Exhibit 10 - Answer of Zurn Industries, LLC., fka Zurn Industries, Inc., #11 Exhibit 11 - Answer of Western Steel & Plumbing, #12 Exhibit 12 - Metropolitan Life Insurance Cos Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint, #13 Exhibit 13 - 3M Companys Separate Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint, Answer to Cross-Claims and Demand for Jury Trial, #14 Exhibit 14 - Answer of Riley Power Inc., #15 Exhibit 15 - Answer of Defendant The Lincoln Electric Company to Plaintiffs Complaint, #16 Exhibit 16 - Answer of Defendant Hobart Brothers LLC to Plaintiffs Complaint, #17 Exhibit 17 - Answer of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, #18 Exhibit 18 - Building Sprinklers Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint, #19 Exhibit 19 - Answer of RSCC Wire & Cable LLC, #20 Exhibit 20 - Answer of The Marley-Wylain Company, #21 Exhibit 21 - Answer of Goulds Pumps, #22 Exhibit 22 - Answer of AH. Bennett company, #23 Exhibit 23 - Separate Answer of Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., #24 Exhibit 24 - Crane Cos Answer, #25 Exhibit 25 - Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.s Answer, #26 Exhibit 26 - Answer of RCH Newco II LLC, #27 Exhibit 27 - ITT LLCs Answer, #28 Exhibit 28 - Notice of Hearing Scheduling Conference, #29 Exhibit 29 - Answer of American Crystal Sugar Company, #30 Exhibit 30 - Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLCs Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs Complaint, #31 Exhibit 31 - Industrial Contractors, Inc.s Answer, #32 Exhibit 32 - Answer of Paul W. Abbott Company, #33 Exhibit 33 - Answer of Whittier Filtration, #34 Exhibit 34 - Proposed October 2021 Stipulated Scheduling Order, #35 Exhibit 35 - October 2021 Stipulated Scheduling Order, #36 Exhibit 36 - Notice of Trial with Pretrial Order, #37 Exhibit 37 - Foster Wheeler, LLCs Answer to Complaint, Answer to Cross-Claims, #38 Exhibit 38 - Stipulation to Substitute Parties, #39 Exhibit 39 - Order to Substitute Parties, #40 Exhibit 40 - Burnham Answer)(sj)
May 4, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Joint) by A.H. Bennett Company, Building Sprinkler Company, Inc. from Cass County Court, Case Number 09-2021-cv-02414. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 322000249 filed by A.H. Bennett Company, Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cass County Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Answer of Plaintiff to Defendants (Set I) Interrogatories to Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit 3 - Glenn W. Frericks Work History, #4 Exhibit 4 - Grand Forks Air Force Base, North Dakota, Website Screen Clippings, #5 Exhibit 5 - Article on 319 Reconnaissance Wing (ACC), #6 Exhibit 6 - Article on Strategic Air Command, #7 Exhibit 7 - Public Law 161 84th Congress, Chapter 368 1st Session H.R. 6892, #8 Exhibit 8 - Public Law 85-685 August 20, 1958, #9 Exhibit 9 - Public Law 87-554 July 27, 1962, #10 Exhibit 10 - Lincoln Journal Star (Lincoln Nebraska) Newspaper Article, #11 Exhibit 11 - State of Minnesota, County of Hennepin, Deposition of Wiliam C. Sornsin, #12 Exhibit 12 - United States District Court for the District of North Dakota, Southeastern Division, Deposition of William C. Sornsin, Sr., #13 Exhibit 13 - United States District Court for the District of North Dakota, Southeastern Division, Deposition of Andrew I. (Nick) Olerud, Jr., #14 Exhibit 14 - Asbestos Deposition Transcripts M-Z; Olerud, Andrew Jr. 12-5-1991, #15 Exhibit 15 - United States District Court for the District of North Dakota, Southeastern Division, Deposition of James Nodsle, #16 Exhibit 16 - United States District Court for the District of North Dakota, Southeastern Division, Deposition of James Alex Matthews Volume I, #17 Exhibit 17 - United States District Court for the District of North Dakota, Southeastern Division, Deposition of James Alex Matthews Volume II, #18 Exhibit 18 - Asbestos Deposition Transcripts M-Z; Opp, Rudolph 10-15-1991, #19 Exhibit 19 - State of North Dakota, County of Grand Forks, Northeast Central Judicial District, Deposition of Rudolph F. Opp, #20 Exhibit 20 - State of North Dakota, County of Grand Forks, Northeast Central Judicial District, Deposition of Bruce Bergson, #21 Exhibit 21 - United States District Court District of North Dakota, Declaration of yle Dotson in Support of Notice of Removal, #22 Exhibit 22 - Military Specification, #23 Exhibit 23 - Military Standard Marking for Shipment and Storage, #24 Exhibit 24 - Military Standard Marking for Shipment and Storage Pt II, #25 Exhibit 25 - Military Standard Marking for Shipment and Storage Pt III, #26 Exhibit 26 - United States District Court for the District of North Dakota, Southeastern Division, Deposition of Andrew I. Nick Olerud, #27 Exhibit 27 - United States District Court for the District of North Dakota, Southeastern Division, Keene Corporations Response to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, #28 Exhibit 28 State of Minnesota, Minnesota Personal Injury Asbestos Cases, Keene Corporations Response to Plaintiffs Interrogatories and Request for production of Documents Set I, #29 Letter to Clerk, #30 Civil Cover Sheet)(sj) (Attachment 22 replaced on 5/6/2022 to remove double header.) (lf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glenn W. Frericks v. A.H. Bennett Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockbestos-Surprenant Cable Corp.
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittier Filtration, Inc.
Represented By: David E. Scouton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.H. Bennett Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Represented By: Kristi K. Brownson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Kuettel & Sons, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Crystal Sugar Company
Represented By: Abigale Raye Griffin
Represented By: Todd E. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asbestos Corporation, Ltd.
Represented By: Joel A. Flom
Represented By: Kathryn Nekola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell & Gossett
Represented By: Thomas D. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Building Sprinkler Company, Inc.
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnham, LLC
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Division of Aqua-Chem, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
Represented By: Stacey Elizabeth Tjon Bossart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fargo-Moorhead Insulation Company
Represented By: Jon P. Parrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Corporation
Represented By: David E. Scouton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: David D. Schweigert
Represented By: Tyler Johnson Siewert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Ye Xu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps
Represented By: Thomas D. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.H. Robertson Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobart Brothers Co.
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Susan M. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew R. Thibodeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Scott D. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Electric Co.
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Susan M. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael C. McCarthy
Represented By: Peter K. Doely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Safety Appliance Company
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing
Represented By: Daniel L. Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul W. Abbott Company, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew R. Thibodeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rockbestos Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.O.S. Products Company, Inc.
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Filter Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Jane L. Dynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Conveyor Corporation
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weil McLain Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Steel & Plumbing, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas D. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Filter
Represented By: David E. Scouton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitter, Inc.
Represented By: David E. Scouton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Ye Xu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC.
Represented By: Heather H. Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Daniel L. Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockbestos-Surprenant Cable Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Marley-Wylain Company, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redco Corporation
Represented By: David T. Schach
Represented By: John C. Hughes
Represented By: Jon R Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Daniel L. Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Stoker Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth Sorenson Brotten
Represented By: Jason Mohr
Represented By: Kyle B. Mansfield
Represented By: Joanna M. Salmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn W. Frericks
Represented By: David C. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?