Morehouse Enterprises, LLC et al v. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives et al
Plaintiff: Morehouse Enterprises, LLC doing business as Bridge City Ordnance, Eliezer Jimenez, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation, Arizona, State of, West Virginia, State of, Alaska, State of, Arkansas, State of, Idaho, State of, Indiana, State of, Kansas, State of, Kentucky, Commonwealth of, Louisiana, State of, Missouri, State of, Montana, State of, Nebraska, State of, Oklahoma, State of, South Carolina, State of, Texas, State of, Utah, State of and Wyoming, State of
Defendant: Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, United States Department of Justice, Gary M. Restaino and ATF
Petitioner: Prosecutors Against Gun Violence
Amicus Curiae: Gun Owners for Safety, Jason Perry, Jonathan Gold, Scott Spreier, District of Columbia, New Jersey, State of, Pennsylvania, State of, California, State of, Colorado, State of, Connecticut, State of, Delaware, State of, Hawaii, State of, Illinois, State of, Maine, State of, Maryland, State of, Massachusetts, State of, Michigan, State of, Minnesota, State of, New York, State of, North Carolina, State of, Oregon, State of, Rhode Island, State of, Washington, State of, Wisconsin, State of, Brady United Against Gun Violence, Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund and March for Our Lives
Case Number: 3:2022cv00116
Filed: July 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2022 USCA Case Number 22-2854 for #91 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal (sj)
August 30, 2022 Filing 93 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal Supplement to 8th Circuit Court of Appeals re #91 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (lf)
August 29, 2022 Filing 92 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Eliezer Jimenez, Morehouse Enterprises, LLC for proceedings held on 8/19/2022 before Judge Peter D. Welte (Stamboulieh, Stephen)
August 29, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #90 Notice of Appeal. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access to document and re-filed as Notice of Interlocutory Appeal at #91 . (sj)
August 26, 2022 Filing 91 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #85 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction, by Arizona, State of. (Filing fee: $505; Receipt Number: ANDDC-2494171). (sj) Modified on 8/29/2022 to correct filing date. NEF Regenerated. (sj).
August 26, 2022 Filing 90 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #85 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction, by Arizona, State of. Filing fee $505. (Napolitano, Anthony) Modified on 8/29/2022 to restrict access. (sj).
August 26, 2022 USCA Case Number 22-2812 for #87 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (pb)
August 25, 2022 Filing 89 MOTION Injunction Pending Appeal re #87 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, by Arizona, State of. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit 1 - JMT Web Store, #3 Exhibit 2 - Google Search Results)(Napolitano, Anthony)
August 25, 2022 Filing 88 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal Supplement to 8th Circuit Court of Appeals re #87 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, (jb)
August 25, 2022 Filing 87 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #85 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction, by Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Eliezer Jimenez, Morehouse Enterprises, LLC. Filing fee $ 505 Receipt # ANDDC-2492795. (jb)
August 25, 2022 Filing 86 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #85 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction, by Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Eliezer Jimenez, Morehouse Enterprises, LLC. Filing fee $505. (Stamboulieh, Stephen) Modified on 8/25/2022 to restrict access. (jb)
August 25, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #86 Notice of Appeal. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access to document and re-filed as Notice of Interlocutory Appeal at #87 . (jb)
August 24, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #84 BRIEF. Clerk's Office added a link and exhibit letters/numbers to attachment descriptions. (sj)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte finding as moot #25 Motion Oral Argument; denying #14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 19 Motion for Permanent Injunction (JS) (Main Document 85 replaced on 8/23/2022 to correct typographical errors per Chambers). NEF Regenerated. (sj).
August 23, 2022 Filing 84 BRIEF Amici Curiae by 17 Major Cities and Prosecutors Against Gun Violence in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for A Preliminary Injunction at #43 RESPONSE to Motion by Prosecutors Against Gun Violence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Declaration of John Musto in Support of Amicus Brief, #2 Exhibit A-2 Declaration of Christopher Mastroianni in Support of Amicus Brief, #3 Exhibit A-3 Declaration of Adrian Z. Diaz in Support of Amicus Brief)(Richards, Lee) Modified on 8/24/2022 to add a link and exhibit letters/numbers to attachment descriptions. (sj).
August 22, 2022 Filing 83 SUPPLEMENT to document: 19 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Eliezer Jimenez, Morehouse Enterprises, LLC. (Stamboulieh, Stephen)
August 22, 2022 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Ray Williams on behalf of West Virginia, State of (Williams, Michael)
August 22, 2022 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Sara See on behalf of West Virginia, State of (See, Lindsay)
August 22, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #78 REPLY to Response to Motion. Clerk's Office added link. (sj)
August 19, 2022 Filing 80 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte: Status Conference held on 8/19/2022. (Court Reporter KK) (td)
August 19, 2022 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin M Tomlinson on behalf of ATF, Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, United States Department of Justice (Tomlinson, Martin)
August 19, 2022 Filing 78 REPLY to Response to Motion re 19 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Eliezer Jimenez, Morehouse Enterprises, LLC. (Stamboulieh, Stephen) Modified on 8/22/2022 to add link. (sj).
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #76 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kathleen Hartnett. (mf)
August 18, 2022 Filing 76 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kathleen Hartnett (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2487886) by Brady United Against Gun Violence, Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund, March for Our Lives. (Hartnett, Kathleen) Modified on 8/18/2022 to add receipt number (mf)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #46 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Barbara Harding. (mf)
August 18, 2022 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Schelhaas on behalf of Wyoming, State of (Schelhaas, Ryan)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #70 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (KT)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #69 Motion for Leave to File by Prosecutors Against Gun Violence. Movants are directed to file the proposed brief. (KT)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #49 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jennifer Swize. (mf)
August 17, 2022 Filing 70 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed by Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Eliezer Jimenez, Morehouse Enterprises, LLC. (Stamboulieh, Stephen)
August 17, 2022 Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Prosecutors Against Gun Violence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Exhibit A-1 - Declaration of John Musto in Support of Amicus Brief, #3 Exhibit A-2 - Declaration of Christopher Mastroianni in Support of Amicus Brief, #4 Exhibit A-3 - Declaration of Adrian Z. Diaz in Support of Amicus Brief, #5 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Richards, Lee)
August 17, 2022 Filing 68 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 8/19/2022 at 09:00 AM in by video conference before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Chambers will provide all parties the video conference connection information via email. (EA)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #62 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lee S. Richards. (sj)
August 17, 2022 Filing 66 BRIEF of Amici Curiae Gun Violence Prevention Groups in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction at #43 RESPONSE to Motion by Brady United Against Gun Violence, Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund, March for Our Lives. (Katz, Adam) Modified on 8/18/2022 to add link. (sj).
August 17, 2022 Filing 65 BRIEF Amici Curiae by California, State of, Colorado, State of, Connecticut, State of, Delaware, State of, District of Columbia, Hawaii, State of, Illinois, State of, Maine, State of, Maryland, State of, Massachusetts, State of, Michigan, State of, Minnesota, State of, New Jersey, State of, New York, State of, North Carolina, State of, Oregon, State of, Pennsylvania, State of, Rhode Island, State of, Washington, State of, Wisconsin, State of. (Wilking, Leo)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #61 Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by Brady United Against Gun Violence, Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund, March for Our Lives. Movants are directed to file the proposed brief. (KT)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Rachel Alpert; granting #58 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel Grooms (mf)
August 17, 2022 Filing 62 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lee S. Richards (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2486490) by Prosecutors Against Gun Violence. (Richards, Lee) Modified on 8/17/2022 to add receipt number. (sj).
August 17, 2022 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to File Motion of Gun Violence Prevention Groups for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae by Brady United Against Gun Violence, Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund, March for Our Lives. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Proposed Brief, #2 Exhibit 2: Proposed Order)(Katz, Adam)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #54 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Adam M. Katz. (cjs)
August 17, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #50 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Brief. Wrong document attached. Clerk's Office restricted access. (sj)
August 17, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #52 BRIEF. Clerk's Office added a link. (sj)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #53 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jacob Boyer. (cjs)
August 16, 2022 Filing 58 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daniel Grooms (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2486195) by Brady United Against Gun Violence, Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund, March for Our Lives. (Grooms, Daniel) Modified on 8/17/2022 to add receipt number (mf)
August 16, 2022 Filing 57 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Rachel Alpert (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2486172) by Brady United Against Gun Violence, Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund, March for Our Lives. (Alpert, Rachel) Modified on 8/17/2022 to add receipt number (mf)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #45 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Megan E. Ball; granting #47 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph J. Kiessling.; granting #48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Angela A. Korge. (mf)
August 16, 2022 Filing 55 *RESTRICTED-FILED IN ERROR* MOTION for Leave to File Motion of Gun Violence Prevention Groups for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae by Brady United Against Gun Violence, Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund, March for Our Lives. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Proposed Brief, #2 Exhibit 2: Proposed Order)(Katz, Adam) Modified on 8/16/2022 to restrict access (cjs).
August 16, 2022 Filing 54 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Adam M. Katz (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2486134) by Brady United Against Gun Violence, Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund, March for Our Lives. (Katz, Adam) Modified on 8/16/2022 to add receipt number (cjs).
August 16, 2022 Filing 53 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jacob Boyer (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2486131) by Pennsylvania, State of. (Boyer, Jacob) Modified on 8/16/2022 to add receipt number (cjs).
August 16, 2022 Filing 52 BRIEF of Amici Curiae in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary and/or Permanent Injunction at #43 RESPONSE to Motion by Jonathan Gold, Gun Owners for Safety, Jason Perry, Scott Spreier. (Beane, Lisa) Modified on 8/17/2022 to add link. (sj).
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #44 Motion for Leave to File to File Amici Curiae Brief by Jonathan Gold, Gun Owners for Safety, Jason Perry, Scott Spreier. Movants are directed to file the proposed brief. (AS)
August 16, 2022 Filing 50 *RESTRICTED - WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED* MOTION for Leave to File Amici Brief by California, State of, Colorado, State of, Connecticut, State of, Delaware, State of, District of Columbia, Hawaii, State of, Illinois, State of, Maine, State of, Maryland, State of, Massachusetts, State of, Michigan, State of, Minnesota, State of, New Jersey, State of, New York, State of, North Carolina, State of, Oregon, State of, Pennsylvania, State of, Rhode Island, State of, Washington, State of, Wisconsin, State of. (Wilking, Leo) Modified on 8/17/2022 to restrict access. (sj).
August 16, 2022 Filing 49 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jennifer L. Swize (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2485975) by Jonathan Gold, Gun Owners for Safety, Jason Perry, Scott Spreier. (Swize, Jennifer) Modified on 8/18/2022 to add receipt number (mf)
August 16, 2022 Filing 48 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Angela A. Korge (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2485972) by Jonathan Gold, Gun Owners for Safety, Jason Perry, Scott Spreier. (Korge, Angela) Modified on 8/16/2022 to add receipt number (mf)
August 16, 2022 Filing 47 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joseph J. Kiessling (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2485969) by Jonathan Gold, Gun Owners for Safety, Jason Perry, Scott Spreier. (Kiessling, Joseph) Modified on 8/16/2022 to add receipt number (mf)
August 16, 2022 Filing 46 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Barbara Harding (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2485966) by Jonathan Gold, Gun Owners for Safety, Jason Perry, Scott Spreier. (Harding, Barbara) Modified on 8/16/2022 to add receipt number (mf) (Main Document 46 replaced on 8/18/2022 to correct error in document) NEF Regenerated (mf)
August 16, 2022 Filing 45 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Megan E. Ball (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2485963) by Jonathan Gold, Gun Owners for Safety, Jason Perry, Scott Spreier. (Ball, Megan) Modified on 8/16/2022 to add receipt number (mf)
August 16, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #55 Motion for Leave to File. Filed in error. Clerk's Office restricted access to document. Attorney Adam M. Katz's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice has not yet been granted. (cjs)
August 16, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #43 RESPONSE to Motion and #44 MOTION for Leave to File. Clerk's Office added Exhibit descriptions. (sj)
August 15, 2022 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by Jonathan Gold, Gun Owners for Safety, Jason Perry, Scott Spreier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amici Curiae Brief)(Beane, Lisa) Modified on 8/16/2022 to add Exhibit description. (sj).
August 15, 2022 Filing 43 RESPONSE to Motion re 19 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ATF, Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Split "Frame or Receiver" Examples, #2 Exhibit 2 - "Multi-Piece Frame or Receiver" Examples)(Riess, Daniel) Modified on 8/16/2022 to add Exhibit descriptions. (sj).
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James Emory Smith, Jr. (mf)
August 12, 2022 Filing 41 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney J Emory Smith (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2483943) by South Carolina, State of. (Smith, James) Modified on 8/12/2022 to add receipt number (mf)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Aaron C. Peterson, granting #37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Aaron Reitz. (sj)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Charles Eldred. (cjs)
August 11, 2022 Filing 38 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Charles Eldred (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2482964) by Texas, State of. (Eldred, Charles) Modified on 8/11/2022 to add receipt number(cjs).
August 11, 2022 Filing 37 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Aaron Reitz (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2482606) by Texas, State of. (Reitz, Aaron) Modified on 8/11/2022 to add receipt number. (sj).
August 11, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE by Alaska, State of, Arizona, State of, Idaho, State of, Kentucky, Commonwealth of, Missouri, State of, Oklahoma, State of, South Carolina, State of, and Texas, State of re 19 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Notice of Joinder in Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Permanent Injunction (Peterson, Aaron) Modified on 8/16/2022 to add additional filers from the signature line because the attorneys for the added additional filers have now been admitted to practice in North Dakota. NEF regenerated. (lf)
August 11, 2022 Filing 35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Aaron C. Peterson (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2482906) by Alaska, State of. (Peterson, Aaron) (Main Document 35 replaced on 8/11/2022 to non-fillable PDF). (sj). Modified on 8/11/2022 to add receipt number. NEF Regenerated. (sj).
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dayton P. Reed. (cjs)
August 5, 2022 Filing 33 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Dayton P. Reed (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2478576) by Idaho, State of. (Reed, Dayton) Modified on 8/8/2022 to add receipt number (cjs).
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Aaron Silletto. (mf)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bryan Cleveland. (cjs)
August 3, 2022 Filing 30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Aaron J. Silletto (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2475632) by Kentucky, Commonwealth of. (Silletto, Aaron) Modified on 8/3/2022 to add receipt number (mf)
August 3, 2022 Filing 29 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Bryan Cleveland (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2475613) by Oklahoma, State of. (Cleveland, Bryan) Modified on 8/3/2022 to add receipt number (cjs).
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #27 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (KT)
August 1, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by ATF, Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, United States Department of Justice. (Riess, Daniel)
August 1, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Roman Napolitano on behalf of Arizona, State of (Napolitano, Anthony)
August 1, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION Oral Argument re 19 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Eliezer Jimenez, Morehouse Enterprises, LLC. (Stamboulieh, Stephen)
August 1, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #24 Notice. Clerk's Office removed incorrect filers Alaska, State of, Arizona, State of, Arkansas, State of, Idaho, State of, Indiana, State of, Kansas, State of, Kentucky, Commonwealth of, Louisiana, State of, Missouri, State of, Nebraska, State of, Oklahoma, State of, South Carolina, State of, Texas, State of, Utah, State of, West Virginia, State of, Wyoming, State of. (mf)
July 29, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE by Montana, State of, re 19 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff States Notice of Joinder (Dewhirst, David) Modified on 8/1/2022 to remove incorrect filers (mf)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting in part and denying in part #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and 19 MOTION for Permanent Injunction. Response due by 8/15/2022. Reply due by 8/19/2022. (AS)
July 27, 2022 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, Steven M. Dettelbach, United States Department of Justice filed by Oklahoma, State of, Nebraska, State of, Texas, State of, Alaska, State of, Utah, State of, Kansas, State of, Missouri, State of, West Virginia, State of, Morehouse Enterprises, LLC, Idaho, State of, Wyoming, State of, Eliezer Jimenez, Montana, State of, Arizona, State of, Arkansas, State of, Kentucky, Commonwealth of, Louisiana, State of, South Carolina, State of, Gun Owners Foundation, Indiana, State of, Gun Owners of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-GOA FOIA Request Frame or Receiver 1968, #2 Exhibit 2-No Records NARA, #3 Exhibit 3-2022-TTBF-00018 Olson Signed FOIA Response Letter, #4 Exhibit 4-Colt Classification, #5 Exhibit 5-Roh Tentative Minute Order, #6 Exhibit 6-546004092-M16 Receiver 3-1-1971, #7 Exhibit 7-1977 FN FAL Upper Receiver, #8 Exhibit 8-Motion in Limine ATF Opinion Letters, #9 Exhibit 9-0453 0008 Case by Case Basis, #10 Exhibit 10-Firearm 1968 Amendment, #11 Exhibit 11-0049 ATF Classification 80 Percent, #12 Exhibit 12-0050 ATF Classification 80 Percent, #13 Exhibit 13-0051 ATF Classification 80 Percent, #14 Exhibit 14-053 to 066 Classifications, #15 Exhibit 15-ATF 69-70, #16 Exhibit 16- 73-76 Classifications, #17 Exhibit 17- 83-84 Classifications, #18 Exhibit 18-Non Firearm Machining Instructions, #19 Exhibit 19-ATF 137 Nonfirearm, #20 Exhibit 20-ATF Unfinished 80 Percent Receivers, #21 Exhibit 21-ATF 229 Davis Letter, #22 Exhibit 22-ATF 253 Davis Letter, #23 Exhibit 23-Sept 2012 ATF Letter, #24 Exhibit 24-ATF Tech Bulletin 17-02 Solvent Traps, #25 Exhibit 25-ATF 1986 Letter to Sylvia Daniel, #26 Exhibit 26-2006 Letter Magnum Kit, #27 Exhibit 27-Bridge City Ordnance Affidavit, #28 Exhibit 28-US v Salas Exhibit, #29 Exhibit 29-2021-0245 Acknowledgement Letter, #30 Exhibit 30-00168 Comments from 1985 Study, #31 Exhibit 31-2016 4473, #32 Exhibit 32-2020-4473, #33 Exhibit 33-GOA Comments on Frame or Receiver, #34 Exhibit 34-Letter Response Rep. Michael Cloud, #35 Exhibit 35-ATF Tech Bulletin 20-01 Inline Filters, #36 Exhibit 36-April 24 2017 Solvent Trap, #37 Exhibit 37-August 2017 Solvent Traps, #38 Exhibit 38-Form 1 Disapproval, #39 Exhibit 39-Additional Steps Form 1, #40 Exhibit 40-ATF PowerPoint Marking Halves, #41 Exhibit 41-p265-271 for p267 Firearm on a Case by Case Basis, #42 Exhibit 42-ATF Water Bottle Letter, #43 Exhibit 43-P80 Warrant Excerpt, #44 Exhibit 44-ATF Letter on SHF Uppers, #45 Exhibit 45-2014 ATF Exhibit, #46 Exhibit 46-2011 Letter Parts Kit with 80 Percent nto a GCA or NFA Firearm, #47 Exhibit 47-June 2014 Examination, #48 Exhibit 48-ATF PowerPoint, #49 Exhibit 49-ATF Intelligence Assessment, #50 Exhibit 50-Slide 14 AR15 20 Percent Receiver, #51 Exhibit 51-AB286 District Court Rules in Favor of Polymer 80, #52 Exhibit 52-Aug 4 2014 3311 302080, #53 Exhibit 53-Gast Mfg ATF Letter, #54 Exhibit 54-FOIA Filing Letters, #55 Exhibit 55-ATF to Congressman, #56 Exhibit 56-ATF Processing Goals, #57 Exhibit 57-Not regulated Under GCA NFA, #58 Exhibit 58-2011 Submission Sample, #59 Exhibit 59-2011 to 2014 Submission Requests, #60 Exhibit 60-Affidavit of Eliezer Jimenez, #61 Exhibit 61-Affidavit of Kailey Patterson)(pb) Modified to correct exhibit description to Attachment 60 on 7/29/2022. NEF regenerated (pb).
July 27, 2022 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, Gary M. Restaino, United States Department of Justice. (Riess, Daniel)
July 27, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Riess on behalf of All Defendants (Riess, Daniel)
July 26, 2022 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Eliezer Jimenez, Morehouse Enterprises, LLC. (Stamboulieh, Stephen)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiffs' response to defendants' #15 MOTION for Extension of Time is due by close of business on 7/27/2022. (AS)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting unopposed #13 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (AS)
July 26, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 7/27/2022. See text only order at 17 . (lf)
July 26, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #12 Summons Returned Executed. Clerk's office replaced document to remove doubleheaders and removed 'Exhibit' reference; re: #14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Multiple relief document filed as one relief. Clerk's office filed Motion for Permanent Injunction at 19 . (jb)
July 25, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Eliezer Jimenez, Morehouse Enterprises, LLC. See document #14 . (jb)
July 25, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, Gary M. Restaino, United States Department of Justice. (Burkland, Melissa)
July 25, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Eliezer Jimenez, Morehouse Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Stamboulieh, Stephen)
July 25, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Eliezer Jimenez, Morehouse Enterprises, LLC. (Stamboulieh, Stephen)
July 25, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives served on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022; Gary M. Restaino served on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022; United States Department of Justice served on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eliezer Jimenez; Morehouse Enterprises, LLC; Gun Owners of America, Inc.; Gun Owners Foundation. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives served on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022; Gary M. Restaino served on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022; United States Department of Justice served on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Delivery on ATF, #2 Proof of Delivery on DC Civil Process Clerk, #3 Proof of Delivery on Dept of Justice, #4 Proof of Delivery on North Dakota Civil Process Clerk, #5 Proof of Delivery on Gary Restaino, #6 Proof of Delivery on US Atty General)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Main Document 12 replaced on 7/26/2022 to remove doubleheaders). Modified on 7/26/2022 to remove exhibit reference. (jb)
July 15, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Morehouse Enterprises, LLC. (Stamboulieh, Stephen)
July 15, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gun Owners of America, Inc.. (Stamboulieh, Stephen)
July 15, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gun Owners Foundation. (Stamboulieh, Stephen)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned as presiding judge. (sj)
July 8, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Eliezer Jimenez, Morehouse Enterprises, LLC. (sj)
July 5, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, Gary M. Restaino, United States Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (pb)
July 5, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Morehouse Enterprises, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/19/2022. (pb)
July 5, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Eliezer Jimenez. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/19/2022. (pb)
July 5, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Gun Owners of America, Inc.. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/19/2022. (pb)
July 5, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Gun Owners Foundation. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/19/2022. (pb)
July 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, Gary M. Restaino, United States Department of Justice (Filing fee $402, receipt number 300000056) filed by Eliezer Jimenez, Morehouse Enterprises, LLC, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-GOA FOIA Request Frame or Receiver 1968, #2 Exhibit 2-No Records NARA, #3 Exhibit 3-2022-TTBF-00018 Olson Signed FOIA Response Letter, #4 Exhibit 4-Colt Classification, #5 Exhibit 5-Roh Tentative Minute Order, #6 Exhibit 6-546004092-M16 Receiver 3-1-1971, #7 Exhibit 7-1977 FN FAL Upper Receiver, #8 Exhibit 8-Motion in Limine ATF Opinion Letters, #9 Exhibit 9-0453 0008 Case by Case Basis, #10 Exhibit 10-Firearm 1968 Amendment, #11 Exhibit 11-0049 ATF Classification 80 Percent, #12 Exhibit 12-0050 ATF Classification 80 Percent, #13 Exhibit 13-0051 ATF Classification 80 Percent, #14 Exhibit 14-053 to 066 Classifications, #15 Exhibit 15-ATF 69-70, #16 Exhibit 16- 73-76 Classifications, #17 Exhibit 17- 83-84 Classifications, #18 Exhibit 18-Non Firearm Machining Instructions, #19 Exhibit 19-ATF 137 Nonfirearm, #20 Exhibit 20-ATF Unfinished 80 Percent Receivers, #21 Exhibit 21-ATF 229 Davis Letter, #22 Exhibit 22-ATF 253 Davis Letter, #23 Exhibit 23-Sept 2012 ATF Letter, #24 Exhibit 24-ATF Tech Bulletin 17-02 Solvent Traps, #25 Exhibit 25-ATF 1986 Letter to Sylvia Daniel, #26 Exhibit 26-2006 Letter Magnum Kit, #27 Exhibit 27-Bridge City Ordnance Affidavit, #28 Exhibit 28-US v Salas Exhibit, #29 Exhibit 29-2021-0245 Acknowledgement Letter, #30 Exhibit 30-00168 Comments from 1985 Study, #31 Exhibit 31-2016 4473, #32 Exhibit 32-2020-4473, #33 Exhibit 33-GOA Comments on Frame or Receiver, #34 Exhibit 34-Letter Response Rep. Michael Cloud, #35 Exhibit 35-ATF Tech Bulletin 20-01 Inline Filters, #36 Exhibit 36-April 24 2017 Solvent Trap, #37 Exhibit 37-August 2017 Solvent Traps, #38 Exhibit 38-Form 1 Disapproval, #39 Exhibit 39-Additional Steps Form 1, #40 Exhibit 40-ATF PowerPoint Marking Halves, #41 Exhibit 41-p265-271 for p267 Firearm on a Case by Case Basis, #42 Exhibit 42-ATF Water Bottle Letter, #43 Exhibit 43-P80 Warrant Excerpt, #44 Exhibit 44-ATF Letter on SHF Uppers, #45 Exhibit 45-2014 ATF Exhibit, #46 Exhibit 46-2011 Letter Parts Kit with 80 Percent nto a GCA or NFA Firearm, #47 Exhibit 47-June 2014 Examination, #48 Exhibit 48-ATF PowerPoint, #49 Exhibit 49-ATF Intelligence Assessment, #50 Exhibit 50-Slide 14 AR15 20 Percent Receiver, #51 Exhibit 51-AB286 District Court Rules in Favor of Polymer 80, #52 Exhibit 52-Aug 4 2014 3311 302080, #53 Exhibit 53-Gast Mfg ATF Letter, #54 Exhibit 54-FOIA Filing Letters, #55 Exhibit 55-ATF to Congressman, #56 Exhibit 56-ATF Processing Goals, #57 Exhibit 57-Not regulated Under GCA NFA, #58 Exhibit 58-2011 Submission Sample, #59 Exhibit 59-2011 to 2014 Submission Requests, #60 Exhibit 60-Affidavit of Eliezer Jimenez, #61 Exhibit 61-Affidavit of Kailey Patterson, #62 Civil Cover Sheet)(pb) (Main Document 1 replaced to correct clerical error on 7/6/2022. NEF regenerated) (pb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morehouse Enterprises, LLC et al v. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morehouse Enterprises, LLC doing business as Bridge City Ordnance
Represented By: Robert J Olson
Represented By: Robert B. Stock
Represented By: Stephen Stamboulieh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliezer Jimenez
Represented By: Robert J Olson
Represented By: Robert B. Stock
Represented By: Stephen Stamboulieh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gun Owners of America, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J Olson
Represented By: Robert B. Stock
Represented By: Stephen Stamboulieh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gun Owners Foundation
Represented By: Robert J Olson
Represented By: Robert B. Stock
Represented By: Stephen Stamboulieh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona, State of
Represented By: Anthony Roman Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Virginia, State of
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Michael Ray Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska, State of
Represented By: Aaron Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idaho, State of
Represented By: Dayton P. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kentucky, Commonwealth of
Represented By: Aaron J. Silletto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missouri, State of
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana, State of
Represented By: Kathleen Smithgall
Represented By: David M.S. Dewhirst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nebraska, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oklahoma, State of
Represented By: Bryan Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina, State of
Represented By: James Emory Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas, State of
Represented By: Aaron Francis Reitz
Represented By: Charles Eldred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utah, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyoming, State of
Represented By: Ryan Schelhaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
Represented By: Daniel Riess
Represented By: Martin M Tomlinson
Represented By: Melissa H. Burkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Daniel Riess
Represented By: Martin M Tomlinson
Represented By: Melissa H. Burkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary M. Restaino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATF
Represented By: Daniel Riess
Represented By: Martin M Tomlinson
Represented By: Melissa H. Burkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Prosecutors Against Gun Violence
Represented By: Lee S. Richards, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gun Owners for Safety
Represented By: Lisa Louise Beane
Represented By: Angela Korge
Represented By: Barbara Harding
Represented By: Jennifer L. Swize
Represented By: Joseph Kiessling
Represented By: Megan Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jason Perry
Represented By: Lisa Louise Beane
Represented By: Angela Korge
Represented By: Barbara Harding
Represented By: Jennifer L. Swize
Represented By: Joseph Kiessling
Represented By: Megan Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jonathan Gold
Represented By: Barbara Harding
Represented By: Lisa Louise Beane
Represented By: Angela Korge
Represented By: Jennifer L. Swize
Represented By: Joseph Kiessling
Represented By: Megan Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Scott Spreier
Represented By: Lisa Louise Beane
Represented By: Angela Korge
Represented By: Barbara Harding
Represented By: Jennifer L. Swize
Represented By: Joseph Kiessling
Represented By: Megan Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: District of Columbia
Represented By: Leo F. J. Wilking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New Jersey, State of
Represented By: Leo F. J. Wilking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Pennsylvania, State of
Represented By: Jacob Boyer
Represented By: Leo F. J. Wilking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California, State of
Represented By: Leo F. J. Wilking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Colorado, State of
Represented By: Leo F. J. Wilking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Connecticut, State of
Represented By: Leo F. J. Wilking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Delaware, State of
Represented By: Leo F. J. Wilking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Hawaii, State of
Represented By: Leo F. J. Wilking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Illinois, State of
Represented By: Leo F. J. Wilking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Maine, State of
Represented By: Leo F. J. Wilking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Maryland, State of
Represented By: Leo F. J. Wilking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Massachusetts, State of
Represented By: Leo F. J. Wilking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Michigan, State of
Represented By: Leo F. J. Wilking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Minnesota, State of
Represented By: Leo F. J. Wilking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New York, State of
Represented By: Leo F. J. Wilking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: North Carolina, State of
Represented By: Leo F. J. Wilking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Oregon, State of
Represented By: Leo F. J. Wilking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rhode Island, State of
Represented By: Leo F. J. Wilking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Washington, State of
Represented By: Leo F. J. Wilking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Wisconsin, State of
Represented By: Leo F. J. Wilking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Brady United Against Gun Violence
Represented By: Adam M. Katz
Represented By: Daniel Grooms
Represented By: Kathleen R Hartnett
Represented By: Rachel Alpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund
Represented By: Adam M. Katz
Represented By: Daniel Grooms
Represented By: Kathleen R Hartnett
Represented By: Rachel Alpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: March for Our Lives
Represented By: Adam M. Katz
Represented By: Daniel Grooms
Represented By: Kathleen R Hartnett
Represented By: Rachel Alpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?