Kaiser v. Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lillian Walters Kaiser
Defendant: Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc. and William D. Walters, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00166
Filed: October 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION RE: #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Clerk's Office docketed a separate motion for each entry. See Doc. 21 and 22 MOTION to Change Venue. RE: #17 and #20 MEMORANDUM in Support. Clerk's Office added links. RE: #18 Affidavit. Clerk's Office added a link and removed duplicative "Ex" from attachment description. Docket entries were cleaned up. (sj)
December 5, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to Change Venue by Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc. See Doc No. #19 . (sj)
December 5, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to Change Venue by William D. Walters, Jr. See Doc No. #16 . (sj)
December 5, 2022 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re 22 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc.. (Grant, Nicholas) Modified on 12/6/2022 to add link and clean up docket text. (sj).
December 5, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or in the Alternative to transfer Venue by Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc.. (Grant, Nicholas)
December 5, 2022 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Peter J. Gleekel re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint re #17 MEMORANDUM in Support, re 21 MOTION to Change Venue by William D. Walters, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trust Agreement)(Gleekel, Peter) Modified on 12/6/2022 to add link, remove duplicative "Ex" to attachment description and clean up docket text. (sj).
December 5, 2022 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint re 21 MOTION to Change Venue filed by William D. Walters, Jr. (Gleekel, Peter) Modified on 12/6/2022 to add link and clean up docket text. (sj).
December 5, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or to Transfer Venue by William D. Walters, Jr. (Gleekel, Peter)
November 15, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #14 Certificate of Service. Wrong event selected. Clerk's office restricted access to document and re-filed as Acknowledgement of Service at #15 . (jb)
November 14, 2022 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued filed by Lillian Walters Kaiser. William D. Walters, Jr served on 10/27/2022, answer due 11/17/2022. (jb)
November 14, 2022 Filing 14 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lillian Walters Kaiser re #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued (Bakke, Randall) Modified on 11/15/2022 to restrict access. (jb)
November 14, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Schultz on behalf of William D. Walters, Jr (Schultz, Samuel)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting unopposed #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc., answer due 12/5/2022. (AS)
November 11, 2022 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc.. (Grant, Nicholas)
November 11, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc.. (Grant, Nicholas)
November 9, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J Gleekel on behalf of William D. Walters, Jr (Gleekel, Peter)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal adopting the #7 Stipulation for an Extension of Time to Answer. William D. Walters Jr. answer due by 12/5/2022. (AS)
November 7, 2022 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by William D. Walters, Jr. (Zuger, Jack)
November 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack E. Zuger on behalf of William D. Walters, Jr (Zuger, Jack)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned as presiding judge to the case. by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte.(sc)
October 18, 2022 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Lillian Walters Kaiser. (sc)
October 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Lillian Walters Kaiser. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/28/2022. (sc)
October 14, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc., William D. Walters, Jr. (sc)
October 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc., William D. Walters, Jr (Filing fee $402, receipt number 300000174) filed by Lillian Walters Kaiser. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaiser v. Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Walters Kaiser
Represented By: David R. Phillips
Represented By: Randall J. Bakke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial Oil of North Dakota, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas C. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D. Walters, Jr.
Represented By: Jack E. Zuger
Represented By: Peter J Gleekel
Represented By: Samuel Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?