Dakota Metal Fabrication et al v. Parisien et al
Plaintiff: Dakota Metal Fabrication and Jason Hanson
Defendant: James Parisien, TERO Office, The, Turtle Mountain Band of Chippewa Indians, Turtle Mountain Tribal Court and Tribal Appellate Court
Case Number: 3:2022cv00174
Filed: October 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2022 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION for Default Judgment Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment A Hearing is Requested Plaintiffs' Memorandum to Support a Motion for Default Judgment filed by Dakota Metal Fabrication, Jason Hanson. (Bruce, Donald)
December 7, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Judgment Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment A Hearing is Requested by Dakota Metal Fabrication, Jason Hanson. (Bruce, Donald)
December 7, 2022 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Dakota Metal Fabrication, Jason Hanson. (Bruce, Donald)
November 22, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #3 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. Multiple relief document filed as one relief. Clerk's Office filed Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim at 4 and Motion for Hearing at 5 . (cjs) Modified on 11/22/2022 to include Motion for Hearing. Regenerated docket correction (cjs).
November 21, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Hearing re 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by James Parisien, TERO Office, The, Tribal Appellate Court, Turtle Mountain Band of Chippewa Indians, Turtle Mountain Tribal Court. See document #3 . (cjs)
November 21, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by James Parisien, TERO Office, The, Tribal Appellate Court, Turtle Mountain Band of Chippewa Indians, Turtle Mountain Tribal Court. See document #3 . (cjs)
November 21, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by James Parisien, TERO Office, The, Tribal Appellate Court, Turtle Mountain Band of Chippewa Indians, Turtle Mountain Tribal Court. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Tomaselli, Paige)
October 17, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to James Parisien, TERO Office, The, Tribal Appellate Court, Turtle Mountain Band of Chippewa Indians, Turtle Mountain Tribal Court. (sc)
October 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Parisien, TERO Office, The, Tribal Appellate Court, Turtle Mountain Band of Chippewa Indians, Turtle Mountain Tribal Court (Filing fee $402, receipt number 300000176) filed by Dakota Metal Fabrication, Jason Hanson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2022: #2 Mailing Envelope) (sc). Modified to add attachment 2 on 10/17/2022. Regenerated NEF (sc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dakota Metal Fabrication et al v. Parisien et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakota Metal Fabrication
Represented By: Donald G. Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Hanson
Represented By: Donald G. Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Parisien
Represented By: Alysia E. LaCounte
Represented By: Paige M Tomaselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERO Office, The
Represented By: Alysia E. LaCounte
Represented By: Paige M Tomaselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turtle Mountain Band of Chippewa Indians
Represented By: Alysia E. LaCounte
Represented By: Paige M Tomaselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turtle Mountain Tribal Court
Represented By: Paige M Tomaselli
Represented By: Alysia E. LaCounte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tribal Appellate Court
Represented By: Alysia E. LaCounte
Represented By: Paige M Tomaselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?