Laducer et al v. Essentia Health et al
Plaintiff: Luke M. Laducer, Diana Decoteau, Brooklyn Laducer, Betty Laducer, Melvin Laducer, R. A. L., L. G. L., P. A. L. and Paulette Scheller
Defendant: Essentia Health, Cass, County of, Jesse Jahner, Kurt A. Kaczander, Nathaniel G. Swanson, Andrew Frobig, Conrad Binsfield, John Doe, 10 Unknown Named Defendants, Kurt A. Kaczander, D.O., Nathaniel G. Swanson, R.N. and Conrad Binsfield, R.N.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00208
Filed: December 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2023 Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Kurt A. Kaczander, DO.(Zuger, Peter)
January 25, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan L. Croaker on behalf of Kurt A. Kaczander, DO (Zuger, Peter) Modified to correct docket text on 1/25/2023 (pb).
January 25, 2023 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Conrad Binsfield, RN, Cass, County of, Andrew Frobig, Jesse Jahner.(Wiederholt, Bradley)
January 25, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #31 NOTICE of Appearance. Wrong attorney log-in used. Clerk's Office corrected docket text and added attorney Morgan L. Croaker to the case. (pb)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2023 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
January 17, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Elsperger Lord on behalf of Nathaniel G. Swanson, RN (Lord, Angela)
January 17, 2023 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Nathaniel G. Swanson, RN.(Rummel, Briana)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal Adopting #25 Stipulation. Defendant Kurt A. Kaczander's Answer due by 1/27/2023. (KT)
January 6, 2023 Filing 25 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, by Kurt A. Kaczander, DO. (Zuger, Peter)
January 4, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter W. Zuger on behalf of Kurt A. Kaczander, DO (Zuger, Peter)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (Text Only) ORDER Adopting #22 Stipulation by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Cass County Defendants' Answer due by 1/27/2023. (KT) Modified to clarify docket text on 1/3/2023. NEF regenerated (pb).
January 3, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Conrad Binsfield, RN answer due 1/27/2023; Cass, County of answer due 1/27/2023; Andrew Frobig answer due 1/27/2023; Jesse Jahner answer due 1/27/2023. See Order at 23 . (pb)
December 30, 2022 Filing 22 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, for Extension of Deadline to Answer/Respond to Complaint by Conrad Binsfield, RN, Cass, County of, Andrew Frobig, Jesse Jahner. (Wiederholt, Bradley)
December 29, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Elsperger Lord on behalf of Essentia Health (Lord, Angela)
December 29, 2022 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Essentia Health. (Rummel, Briana)
December 29, 2022 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Essentia Health.(Rummel, Briana)
December 12, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Neuman Wiederholt on behalf of Conrad Binsfield, RN, Cass, County of, Andrew Frobig, Jesse Jahner (Wiederholt, Bradley)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned as presiding judge.(sc)
December 6, 2022 Filing 16 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Diana Decoteau, L. G. L., P. A. L., R. A. L., Betty Laducer, Brooklyn Laducer, Luke M. Laducer, Melvin Laducer, and Paulette Scheller. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form - Diana DeCoteau, Executor, #2 Consent/Reassignment Form - Brooklyn Laducer, #3 Consent/Reassignment Form - Betty Laducer, #4 Consent/Reassignment Form - Melvin Laducer, #5 Consent/Reassignment Form - R.A.L., #6 Consent/Reassignment Form - L.G.L., #7 Consent/Reassignment Form - P.A.L., #8 Consent/Reassignment Form - Paulette Scheller, proposed guardian ad litem)(sc)
December 6, 2022 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #13 , #14 , and #15 REDACTION. Clerk's Office corrected links. (sj)
December 5, 2022 Filing 15 REDACTION Exhibit 2 (Doc. 1-4) to #1 COMPLAINT by Diana Decoteau, L. G. L., P. A. L., R. A. L., Betty Laducer, Brooklyn Laducer, Luke M. Laducer, Melvin Laducer, Paulette Scheller. (Price, Jeff) Modified on 12/6/2022 to correct link. (sj).
December 5, 2022 Filing 14 REDACTION Exhibit 1 (Doc. 1-3) to #1 COMPLAINT by Diana Decoteau, L. G. L., P. A. L., R. A. L., Betty Laducer, Brooklyn Laducer, Luke M. Laducer, Melvin Laducer, Paulette Scheller. (Price, Jeff) Modified on 12/6/2022 to correct link. (sj).
December 5, 2022 Filing 13 REDACTION Exhibit 0 (Doc. 1-2) to #1 COMPLAINT by Diana Decoteau, L. G. L., P. A. L., R. A. L., Betty Laducer, Brooklyn Laducer, Luke M. Laducer, Melvin Laducer, Paulette Scheller. (Price, Jeff) Modified on 12/6/2022 to correct link. (sj).
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. The Clerk is directed to seal Docs. 1-2, 1-3, and 1-4 because they include personally identifying information. Counsel is directed to file redacted copies within three business days. (AS)
December 5, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Paulette Scheller. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/19/2022. (sc)
December 5, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to P. A. L. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/19/2022. (sc)
December 5, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to L. G. L. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/19/2022. (sc)
December 5, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to R. A. L. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/19/2022. (sc)
December 5, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Melvin Laducer. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/19/2022. (sc)
December 5, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Betty Laducer. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/19/2022. (sc)
December 5, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Brooklyn Laducer. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/19/2022. (sc)
December 5, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Diana Decoteau. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/19/2022. (sc)
December 5, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Luke M. Laducer. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/19/2022. (sc)
December 2, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to 10 Unknown Named Defendants, Conrad Binsfield, Cass, County of, John Doe, Essentia Health, Andrew Frobig, Jesse Jahner, Kurt A. Kaczander, Nathaniel G. Swanson. (sc)
December 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 10 Unknown Named Defendants, Conrad Binsfield, Cass, County of, John Doe, Essentia Health, Andrew Frobig, Jesse Jahner, Kurt A. Kaczander, Nathaniel G. Swanson (Filing fee $402, receipt number 100000568) filed by Melvin Laducer, Brooklyn Laducer, P. A. L., Luke M. Laducer, R. A. L., Betty Laducer, L. G. L., Diana Decoteau, Paulette Scheller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 SEALED Exhibit 0 - Order to Appoint Executor of Estate, #3 SEALED Exhibit 1 - Medical Records 12/18/2020, #4 SEALED Exhibit 2 - Death Certificate)(sc) Modified to seal attachments per order at 12 on 12/5/2022 (sc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laducer et al v. Essentia Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke M. Laducer
Represented By: Jeff Dominic Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Decoteau
Represented By: Jeff Dominic Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooklyn Laducer
Represented By: Jeff Dominic Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Laducer
Represented By: Jeff Dominic Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Laducer
Represented By: Jeff Dominic Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. A. L.
Represented By: Jeff Dominic Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. G. L.
Represented By: Jeff Dominic Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P. A. L.
Represented By: Jeff Dominic Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulette Scheller
Represented By: Jeff Dominic Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essentia Health
Represented By: Briana L. Rummel
Represented By: Angela Elsperger Lord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cass, County of
Represented By: Grant Bakke
Represented By: Bradley Neuman Wiederholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Jahner
Represented By: Bradley Neuman Wiederholt
Represented By: Grant Bakke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt A. Kaczander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaniel G. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Frobig
Represented By: Bradley Neuman Wiederholt
Represented By: Grant Bakke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conrad Binsfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10 Unknown Named Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt A. Kaczander, D.O.
Represented By: Peter W. Zuger
Represented By: Morgan Lyn Croaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaniel G. Swanson, R.N.
Represented By: Angela Elsperger Lord
Represented By: Briana L. Rummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conrad Binsfield, R.N.
Represented By: Bradley Neuman Wiederholt
Represented By: Grant Bakke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?