Curtis v. City of Fargo, et al
Plaintiff: Danial Ray Curtis and Shane Michael Curtis
Defendant: City of Fargo, Fargo Police Department, Fargo Building Inspector, Fargo Inspections Department, Shawn Ouradnik, Dr. Tim Mahoney and Fargo City Commissioners
Case Number: 3:2023cv00064
Filed: March 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 43 U.S.C. ยง 945 Complaint in Condemnation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2023 Filing 36 SUPPLEMENT by Danial Ray Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (NOTE: Documents are all previously on the docket at #23 NOTICE of Appearance, #29 SUPPLEMENT, #30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File, #31 MEMORANDUM in Support, and #32 AFFIDAVIT.) Filed at direction of chambers. Documents hand delivered by Plaintiff.(sc)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned as presiding judge. (pb) Distributed on 5/11/2023 (pb).
May 11, 2023 Filing 34 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by City of Fargo, Fargo Building Inspector, Fargo City Commissioners, Tim Mahoney, Shawn Ouradnik. (pb)
May 11, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: City of Fargo; Fargo Building Inspector; Fargo City Commissioners; Tim Mahoney; and Shawn Ouradnik answer due 6/23/2023. (sc)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants' response to #6 Complaint due by 6/23/2023. (KT) Distributed on 5/11/2023 (sc).
May 9, 2023 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT of Daniel L. Gaustad in Support of re #30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Serve Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by City of Fargo, Fargo Building Inspector, Fargo City Commissioners, Tim Mahoney, Shawn Ouradnik. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gaustad, Daniel)
May 9, 2023 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Support re #30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Serve Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by City of Fargo, Fargo Building Inspector, Fargo City Commissioners, Tim Mahoney, Shawn Ouradnik. (Gaustad, Daniel)
May 9, 2023 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Serve Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by City of Fargo, Fargo Building Inspector, Fargo City Commissioners, Tim Mahoney, Shawn Ouradnik. (Gaustad, Daniel)
May 8, 2023 Filing 29 SUPPLEMENT to document: #6 Complaint,,, by Danial Ray Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Cass County Documents, #2 Timeline, #3 Email from City of Fargo Dated 11/8/2022, #4 Email from City of Fargo, #5 Exhibit 1: SMInc. Purchase Order 7/29/2022, #6 Exhibit 2: Pictures and Danial 9:11, #7 Exhibit 3: Pictures and A-1 Sewer and Drain Invoice, #8 Exhibit 4: SMInc. Purchase Order 7/29/2022, #9 Exhibit 5: SMInc. Purchase Order 7/29/2022, #10 Exhibit 6: Dakota Fence and Pictures, #11 Exhibit 7: North Dakota Court Records Search, #12 Exhibit 8: City of Fargo Statement 7/28/2022, #13 Exhibit 9: Dakota Fence and Danger Sign, #14 Exhibit 10: Email from Danial Curtis Dated 5/3/2023, #15 Exhibit 11: City of Fargo Addition Permit Dated 6/6/2022, #16 Exhibit 12: Danial 9:11, #17 Exhibit 13: Statement of Services Dated 7/28/2022 and Picture, #18 Exhibit 14: Danger Sign, #19 Exhibit 15: A-1 Sewer and Drain Invoice and North Dakota Court Records Search, #20 Exhibit 16: Order, #21 Mailing Envelope)(sc)
May 8, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Shawn Ouradnik. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/22/2023. (jb)
May 8, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Tim Mahoney. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/22/2023. (jb)
May 8, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Fargo City Commissioners. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/22/2023. (jb)
May 8, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Fargo Building Inspector. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/22/2023. (jb)
May 8, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to City of Fargo. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 5/22/2023. (jb)
May 5, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. Gaustad on behalf of City of Fargo, Fargo Building Inspector, Fargo City Commissioners, Tim Mahoney, Shawn Ouradnik (Gaustad, Daniel)
May 3, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE (Property List) by Shane Michael Curtis (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(pb)
May 2, 2023 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danial Ray Curtis. City of Fargo served on 4/27/2023, answer due 5/18/2023; Fargo Building Inspector served on 4/27/2023, answer due 5/18/2023; Fargo City Commissioners served on 4/27/2023, answer due 5/18/2023; Tim Mahoney served on 4/27/2023, answer due 5/18/2023; Shawn Ouradnik served on 4/27/2023, answer due 5/18/2023 (jb)
April 24, 2023 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to City of Fargo, Fargo Building Inspector, Fargo City Commissioners, Tim Mahoney, Shawn Ouradnik. (sj) Distributed on 4/24/2023 (sj).
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal re: #6 Complaint and directing service. (AS) Distributed on 4/21/2023 (sj).
April 11, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE OF COLLECTION OF FILING FEE sent to Cass County Jail re #17 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Distributed on 4/11/2023. (sc)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #14 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (AS) Distributed on 4/11/2023 (sc).
April 10, 2023 Filing 16 SUPPLEMENT (Notice) to document: #6 Complaint, by Danial Ray Curtis. (pb)
April 10, 2023 Filing 15 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Shane Michael Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(pb)
April 10, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis re #3 Order by Shane Michael Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(pb)
April 3, 2023 Filing 12 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Danial Ray Curtis. (sc)
April 3, 2023 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and IFP Application. Return to Sender; Insufficient Address; Unable to Forward. Mail NOT resent to Shane Michael Curtis. (sc)
April 3, 2023 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #5 Notice of Direct Assignment. Return to Sender; Insufficient Address; Unable to Forward. Mail NOT resent to Shane Michael Curtis. (sc)
March 30, 2023 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT (Cass County Case No. 09-2019-CV-00813 Affidavit/Complaint) to document: #6 Complaint, by Danial Ray Curtis. (pb)
March 29, 2023 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT (Century 21 - FM Realty Letter and Cass County Case No. 09-2019-CV-00813 Affidavit) to document: #6 Complaint by Danial Ray Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(sj)
March 29, 2023 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT (Documents re: payable info from City of Fargo) to document: #6 Complaint by Danial Ray Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(sj)
March 29, 2023 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT (Documents that appear to be nearly identical to several exhibits attached to the Complaint) at #6 Complaint by Danial Ray Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(sj)
March 27, 2023 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against City of Fargo, Fargo Building Inspector, Fargo Police Department (Filing fee: IFP) filed by Danial Ray Curtis. (Attachments: #1 East Central District Civil, Family & Probate Case Records Search Results, #2 Cass County 09-2019-CV-00813 Register of Actions, #3 Cass County 09-2019-CV-00183 Affidavit of Danial R Curtis, #4 Supreme Court of North Dakota; Supreme Court Number: 20220302 Declaration of Service, #5 Email Dated: 11/8/2022 RE: Permit Status Changed, #6 Email from North Dakota Supreme Court RE: Message Received, #7 Email from Danial Ray Curtis to Serkland Law Office RE: House, #8 Email Dated: 12/9/2022 from Megan Powell, RE: Amended Order of Dismissal, #9 Document Dated 7/28/2022 Before the Board of Appeals of the City of Fargo, #10 Letter Dated: 3/20/2023 from Danial Curtis, #11 Certificate of Service, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(sj)
March 27, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Shane Michael Curtis. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 4/10/2023. (sj)
March 27, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Danial Ray Curtis. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 4/10/2023. (sj)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee is waived as to plaintiff Danial Ray Curtis. (AS) Distributed Order to both parties, and IFP Application to Shane Curtis on 3/27/2023. (sj). Modified on 3/27/2023 to remove 'text only' language. (sj).
March 27, 2023 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED - FILED AS TO BOTH PLAINTIFFS* NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Danial Ray Curtis, Shane Michael Curtis. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 4/10/2023. (sj) Modified on 3/27/2023 to restrict access. (sj).
March 27, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment. Document filed as to both plaintiffs. Clerk's Office restricted access to document. Notice of Direct Assignment refiled at #4 and #5 as to each plaintiff. Clerk's Office also removed 'text only' language in the Order at #3 . (sj)
March 24, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Danial Ray Curtis, Shane Michael Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 East Central District Civil, Family & Probate Case Records Search Results, #3 Cass County 09-2019-CV-00813 Register of Actions, #4 Cass County 09-2019-CV-00183 Affidavit of Danial R Curtis, #5 Supreme Court of North Dakota; Supreme Court Number: 20220302 Declaration of Service, #6 Email Dated: 11/8/2022 RE: Permit Status Changed, #7 Email from North Dakota Supreme Court RE: Message Received, #8 Email from Danial Ray Curtis to Serkland Law Office RE: House, #9 Email Dated: 12/9/2022 from Megan Powell, RE: Amended Order of Dismissal, #10 Document Dated 7/28/2022 Before the Board of Appeals of the City of Fargo, #11 Letter Dated: 3/20/2023 from Danial Curtis, #12 Certificate of Service, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(sj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis v. City of Fargo, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danial Ray Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Michael Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fargo
Represented By: Daniel L. Gaustad
Represented By: Joseph E. Quinn
Represented By: Marcus Skonieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fargo Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fargo Building Inspector
Represented By: Daniel L. Gaustad
Represented By: Joseph E. Quinn
Represented By: Marcus Skonieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fargo Inspections Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Ouradnik
Represented By: Joseph E. Quinn
Represented By: Marcus Skonieczny
Represented By: Daniel L. Gaustad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Tim Mahoney
Represented By: Marcus Skonieczny
Represented By: Daniel L. Gaustad
Represented By: Joseph E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fargo City Commissioners
Represented By: Daniel L. Gaustad
Represented By: Joseph E. Quinn
Represented By: Marcus Skonieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?