Abdikarim v. State of North Dakota et al
Petitioner: Zakariya A. Abdikarim
Respondent: State of North Dakota, Kimberly Higvik, Derick Steiner and Jesse Jahner
Case Number: 3:2023cv00107
Filed: May 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal re #16 Letter from Zakariya Abdikarim. (AS) Distributed on 6/29/2023 (pb).
June 28, 2023 Filing 16 Letter from Zakariya Abdikarim (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (sc)
June 27, 2023 Filing 15 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (pb) Distributed on 6/27/2023 (pb).
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal dismissing #3 PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State). (AS) Distributed on 6/27/2023 (pb).
June 23, 2023 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT to document: #3 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by Zakariya A. Abdikarim. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(sj)
June 22, 2023 Filing 12 REDACTION to #11 Supplement, by Zakariya A. Abdikarim. Redacted Attachment 11-1: Cass County Drug Task Force Supplement Report TF22-01143/4. (pb)
June 22, 2023 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT to document: #3 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by Zakariya A. Abdikarim. (Attachments: #1 *SEALED* Cass County Drug Task Force Supplement Report TF22-01143/4, #2 Mailing Envelope)(pb) Modified to seal attachment on 6/22/2023 (pb).
June 20, 2023 Filing 10 Letter from Zakariya Abdikarim (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (sj)
June 16, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Zakariya A. Abdikarim. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(pb)
June 12, 2023 Filing 8 REDACTION to #7 Supplement, by Zakariya A. Abdikarim. Redacted Attachment 7-1: Cass County Drug Task Force Supplement Report TF22-01143/4. (sc)
June 12, 2023 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to document: #3 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by Zakariya A. Abdikarim. (Attachments: #1 *SEALED* Cass County Drug Task Force Supplement Report TF22-01143/4, #2 Mailing Envelope)(sc) Modified to seal access on 6/12/2023 (sc).
June 12, 2023 Filing 6 Letter from Zakariya Abdikarim (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (sc)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee is waived. (AS) Distributed on 6/12/2023 (sc).
June 9, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Zakariya A. Abdikarim. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 6/23/2023. (sj)
June 9, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (State) by Zakariya A. Abdikarim. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documentation, #2 Mailing Envelope)(sj)
June 9, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Zakariya A. Abdikarim. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account and Assets)(sj)
June 1, 2023 Filing 1 Remark: HABEAS PACKET received incomplete. Request to complete Habeas packet sent to inmate. (pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdikarim v. State of North Dakota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Zakariya A. Abdikarim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of North Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kimberly Higvik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Derick Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jesse Jahner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?