Ree v. Belcourt School District et al
Plaintiff: Emerson Joe Ree
Defendant: Belcourt School District, Michelle Thomas, Melvin Laducer and Ryan Keplin
Case Number: 3:2023cv00126
Filed: July 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned as presiding judge. (sj) Distributed on 8/31/2023 (sc).
August 24, 2023 Filing 17 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Belcourt School District, Ryan Keplin, Melvin Laducer, Michelle Thomas. (sj)
August 23, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Ryan Keplin. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/6/2023. (sc)
August 23, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Melvin Laducer. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/6/2023. (sc)
August 23, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Michelle Thomas. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/6/2023. (sc)
August 23, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Belcourt School District. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/6/2023. (sc)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 9/28/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS) Distributed on 8/31/2023 (sc).
August 23, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #10 ANSWER. Clerk's Office replaced attachment 3 for obstructed headers and added more complete descriptions to attachments. (sc)
August 22, 2023 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Belcourt School District, Ryan Keplin, Melvin Laducer, Michelle Thomas (Tuntland, Kirsten)
August 22, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Belcourt School District, Ryan Keplin, Melvin Laducer, Michelle Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Letter to Ree Dated 6/20/2023, #2 Exhibit 2: Investigation Report Dated 6/9/2023, #3 Exhibit 3: Separation of Classified Employees Policy)(Tuntland, Kirsten) (Attachment 3 replaced to correct obstructed header on 8/23/2023) (sc). Modified to replace attachment and add more complete descriptions to attachments on 8/23/2023 (sc).
August 15, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Belcourt School District, Ryan Keplin, Melvin Laducer, Michelle Thomas re #8 Notice of Appearance (Tuntland, Kirsten)
August 15, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirsten H. Tuntland on behalf of All Defendants (Tuntland, Kirsten)
August 4, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emerson Joe Ree. Ryan Keplin served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023 (sc)
August 4, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emerson Joe Ree. Belcourt School District, Melvin Laducer, and Michelle Thomas served on 8/1/2023, answer due 8/22/2023. (sc)
July 31, 2023 Filing 5 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Emerson Joe Ree. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(sc)
July 24, 2023 Filing 4 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Emerson Joe Ree. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/31/2023. (pb) (Main Document 4 replaced with correct document on 7/24/2023. NEF regenerated) (pb). Distributed on 7/24/2023 (pb).
July 7, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Belcourt School District, Ryan Keplin, Melvin Laducer, Michelle Thomas. (mf)
July 7, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Emerson Joe Ree. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/21/2023. (mf)
July 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Belcourt School District, Ryan Keplin, Melvin Laducer, Michelle Thomas (Filing fee $402, receipt number 100001256) filed by Emerson Joe Ree. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ree v. Belcourt School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emerson Joe Ree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belcourt School District
Represented By: Kirsten H. Tuntland
Represented By: Meredith L. Vukelic
Represented By: Rachel A. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Thomas
Represented By: Meredith L. Vukelic
Represented By: Kirsten H. Tuntland
Represented By: Rachel A. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Laducer
Represented By: Kirsten H. Tuntland
Represented By: Meredith L. Vukelic
Represented By: Rachel A. Bruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Keplin
Represented By: Kirsten H. Tuntland
Represented By: Rachel A. Bruner
Represented By: Meredith L. Vukelic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?