Morehouse Enterprises, LLC et al v. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives et al
Plaintiff: Morehouse Enterprises, LLC doing business as Bridge City Ordnance, Gun Owners of America, Inc. and Gun Owners Foundation
Defendant: Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, United States Department of Justice, Steven M. Dettelbach and Hans Hummel
Amicus Curiae: Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund, March for Our Lives and Giffords Law Center
Case Number: 3:2023cv00129
Filed: July 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2023 Filing 34 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, Steven M. Dettelbach, Hans Hummel, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ATF AAP, #2 Exhibit B - ATF Letter to BCO, #3 Exhibit C - ATF Declaration)(Pitz, Taylor)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Maria T. Vanikiotis. (sc)
September 8, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Maria Vanikiotis (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2743572) by Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund, Giffords Law Center, March for Our Lives. (Vanikiotis, Maria) Modified to add receipt number on 9/8/2023 (sc).
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tiana Russell. (sc)
September 8, 2023 Filing 30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Tiana Russell (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2743302) by Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund, March for Our Lives, and Giffords Law Center. (Russell, Tiana) (Main Document 30 replaced to correct clerical error listing filers on 9/8/2023) Modified to add receipt number, replace document, and to reflect correct filers on 9/8/2023 (sc). Modified on 9/8/2023 to correct the organization name: "Brady United Against Gun Violence" to "Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence" at the request of counsel. NEF Regenerated. (sj).
September 8, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Clerk's Office replaced document to correct clerical error in listing all represented parties. Clerk's Office also added additional filer Giffords Law Center. (sc)
September 8, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION RE: #26 and #28 MOTIONS to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Clerk's Office added filer: Giffords Law Center at counsel's request. RE: #26 , 27 , #28 , MOTIONS to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Clerk's Office corrected name of the organization: "Brady United Against Gun Violence" to "Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence" at counsel's request. (sj)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Margaux L. Poueymirou. (sj)
September 7, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Margaux L. Poueymirou (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2742894) by Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund, March for Our Lives. (Poueymirou, Margaux) Modified on 9/7/2023 to add receipt number. (sj). (Main Document 28 replaced on 9/7/2023 to a non-fillable PDF). NEF Regenerated. (sj). Modified on 9/8/2023 to correct the organization name: "Brady United Against Gun Violence" to "Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence". Clerk's Office also added filer: Giffords Law Center at the request of counsel. NEF Regenerated. (sj).
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott L. Winkelman. (pb)
September 6, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Scott L. Winkelman (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2742148) by Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, March for Our Lives, Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund and Giffords Law Center. (Winkelman, Scott) Modified to add receipt number on 9/6/2023 (pb). Modified to add filers (March for Our Lives, Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund) on 9/6/2023 (pb). Modified on 9/8/2023 to correct the organization name: "Brady United Against Gun Violence" to "Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence". Clerk's Office also added filer: Giffords Law Center at the request of counsel. NEF Regenerated. (sj).
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting unopposed #24 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants' response to plaintiffs' #15 MOTION for Preliminary and/or Permanent Injunction may not exceed 35 pages. (AS)
September 6, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Clerk's Office added filers (March for Our Lives, Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund) and corrected docket text. (pb)
September 5, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Consent) by Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, Steven M. Dettelbach, Hans Hummel, United States Department of Justice. (Drezner, Michael)
September 1, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE by Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, Steven M. Dettelbach, Hans Hummel, United States Department of Justice of Administrative Decision (Pitz, Taylor)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendants' Response to #15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is due by 9/8/2023. (KT)
August 11, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Clerk's Office added link. (cjs)
August 10, 2023 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Morehouse Enterprises, LLC. (Stamboulieh, Stephen)
August 10, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Motion for Permanent Injunction by Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, Steven M. Dettelbach, Hans Hummel, United States Department of Justice. (Drezner, Michael) Modified on 8/11/2023 to add link (cjs).
August 7, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Pitz on behalf of All Defendants (Pitz, Taylor)
August 7, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Drezner on behalf of All Defendants (Drezner, Michael) (Main Document 17 replaced on 8/8/2023 in a non-fillable pdf format) (cjs). Regenerated on 8/8/2023 (cjs).
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #14 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (KT)
August 7, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion for Permanent Injunction. Multiple relief document filed as one relief. Clerk's office filed Motion for Hearing at 18 . (jb)
August 4, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Hearing re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Morehouse Enterprises, LLC. See document #15 . (jb)
August 4, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Morehouse Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Stamboulieh, Stephen)
August 4, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Morehouse Enterprises, LLC. (Stamboulieh, Stephen)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned as presiding judge.(sc)
July 31, 2023 Filing 12 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., and Morehouse Enterprises, LLC. (sc)
July 31, 2023 Filing 11 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Gun Owners Foundation. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/7/2023. (sc)
July 31, 2023 Filing 10 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Gun Owners of America, Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/7/2023. (sc)
July 31, 2023 Filing 9 SECOND NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Morehouse Enterprises, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 8/7/2023. (sc)
July 11, 2023 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gun Owners Foundation. (sc)
July 11, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gun Owners of America, Inc. (sc)
July 11, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Morehouse Enterprises, LLC. (sc)
July 11, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, Steven M. Dettelbach, Hans Hummel, United States Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (sc)
July 11, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Gun Owners Foundation. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/25/2023. (sc)
July 11, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Gun Owners of America, Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/25/2023. (sc)
July 11, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Morehouse Enterprises, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/25/2023. (sc)
July 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, Steven M. Dettelbach, Hans Hummel, and United States Department of Justice (Filing fee $402, receipt number 300000501) filed by Gun Owners of America, Inc., Morehouse Enterprises, LLC, and Gun Owners Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Notice to Revoke, #2 Exhibit 2: Declaration of Erich Pratt, #3 Exhibit 3: ATF O 5370.1E, #4 Exhibit 4: ATF O 5370.1D, #5 Exhibit 5: Goodlettsville Transcript Selections, #6 Exhibit 6: Enhanced Regulatory Enforcement Policy, #7 Exhibit 7: Senate Testimony 1980 Pages 1-20-opt, #8 Exhibit 8: 1982 Senate Report, #9 Exhibit 9: FOPA Senate Report, #10 Exhibit 10: Notice of Revocation to Max LLC, #11 Exhibit 11: OIG NFRTR Report, #12 Exhibit 12: Declaration of Tanner Morehouse, #13 Exhibit 13: Firearms Compliance Inspection FCI-38752 - Report of Violations, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(sc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morehouse Enterprises, LLC et al v. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morehouse Enterprises, LLC doing business as Bridge City Ordnance
Represented By: Stephen Stamboulieh
Represented By: John I. Harris, III
Represented By: Robert J Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gun Owners of America, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Stamboulieh
Represented By: John I. Harris, III
Represented By: Robert J Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gun Owners Foundation
Represented By: Stephen Stamboulieh
Represented By: John I. Harris, III
Represented By: Robert J Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Represented By: Taylor Pitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Represented By: Taylor Pitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven M. Dettelbach
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Represented By: Taylor Pitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hans Hummel
Represented By: Michael Drezner
Represented By: Taylor Pitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence
Represented By: Scott L. Winkelman
Represented By: Margaux Poueymirou
Represented By: Tiana Leia Russell
Represented By: Maria Vanikiotis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund
Represented By: Tiana Leia Russell
Represented By: Scott L. Winkelman
Represented By: Margaux Poueymirou
Represented By: Maria Vanikiotis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: March for Our Lives
Represented By: Maria Vanikiotis
Represented By: Scott L. Winkelman
Represented By: Margaux Poueymirou
Represented By: Tiana Leia Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Giffords Law Center
Represented By: Tiana Leia Russell
Represented By: Maria Vanikiotis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?