Eli v. Nelson County Sheriff's Department et al
Plaintiff: Wayne Allen Eli
Defendant: Nelson County Sheriff's Department, Danielle Bjorlie, John A. Thelen, Keith Olson, Jayme Tenneson and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 3:2023cv00163
Filed: September 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2023 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Danielle Bjorlie, Nelson County Sheriff's Department, Keith Olson, Jayme Tenneson.(Gaustad, Daniel)
October 17, 2023 Filing 28 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by John A. Thelen. (pb)
October 17, 2023 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Failure to Properly Serve filed by John A. Thelen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Probable Cause, #2 Exhibit 2 - Search Warrant, #3 Exhibit 3 - Order Quashing Search Warrant)(Titus, Courtney)
October 17, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Failure to Properly Serve by John A. Thelen. (Titus, Courtney)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. John A. Thelen's answer due by 10/17/2023. (AS) Distributed on 9/29/2023 (pb).
September 28, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by John A. Thelen. (Titus, Courtney)
September 18, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Rebecca Titus on behalf of John A. Thelen (Titus, Courtney)
September 18, 2023 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Danielle Bjorlie, Nelson County Sheriff's Department, Keith Olson, Jayme Tenneson re #17 , #19 , #20 , and #21 Consent/Reassignment Form. (sc)
September 18, 2023 Filing 21 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Jayme Tenneson. (sc)
September 18, 2023 Filing 20 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Keith Olson. (sc)
September 18, 2023 Filing 19 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Danielle Bjorlie. (sc)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (sc) Distributed on 9/18/2023 (sc).
September 18, 2023 Filing 17 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Nelson County Sheriff's Department. (sc)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Danielle Bjorlie, Nelson County Sheriff's Department, Keith Olson, and Jayme Tenneson answer due 11/6/2023. (AS) Distributed on 9/18/2023 (sc).
September 15, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Jayme Tenneson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/29/2023. (sc)
September 15, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Keith Olson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/29/2023. (sc)
September 15, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Danielle Bjorlie. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/29/2023. (sc)
September 15, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Nelson County Sheriff's Department. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/29/2023. (sc)
September 15, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wayne Allen Eli. John A. Thelen served on 9/12/2023, answer due 10/3/2023. (sc)
September 15, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wayne Allen Eli. Nelson County Sheriff's Department, Danielle Bjorlie, Keith Olson, and Jayme Tenneson served on 9/8/2023, answer due 9/29/2023. (sc)
September 15, 2023 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Daniel L. Gaustad in Support of County Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File and Serve Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by Danielle Bjorlie, Nelson County Sheriff's Department, Keith Olson, Jayme Tenneson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gaustad, Daniel)
September 15, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Danielle Bjorlie, Nelson County Sheriff's Department, Keith Olson, Jayme Tenneson. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to File and Serve Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Gaustad, Daniel) Modified to correct motion relief on 9/15/2023 (sc).
September 15, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Clerk's Office corrected motion relief from Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (sc) Modified on 9/18/2023 to clarify docket text (lf).
September 13, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. Gaustad on behalf of Danielle Bjorlie, Nelson County Sheriff's Department, Keith Olson, Jayme Tenneson (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gaustad, Daniel)
September 8, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Danielle Bjorlie served on 9/7/2023, answer due 9/28/2023; Nelson County Sheriff's Department served on 9/7/2023, answer due 9/28/2023; Keith Olson served on 9/7/2023, answer due 9/28/2023; Jayme Tenneson served on 9/7/2023, answer due 9/28/2023; John A. Thelen served on 9/7/2023, answer due 9/28/2023 (pb)
September 8, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wayne Allen Eli re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued (pb)
September 8, 2023 Filing 4 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Wayne Allen Eli. (pb)
September 6, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Danielle Bjorlie, Does 1 through 10, Nelson County Sheriff's Department, Keith Olson, Jayme Tenneson, John A. Thelen. (pb)
September 6, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Wayne Allen Eli. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 9/20/2023. (pb)
September 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Danielle Bjorlie, Does 1 through 10, Nelson County Sheriff's Department, Keith Olson, Jayme Tenneson, John A. Thelen (Filing fee $402, receipt number 300000571) filed by Wayne Allen Eli. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(pb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eli v. Nelson County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Allen Eli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Daniel L. Gaustad
Represented By: Joseph E. Quinn
Represented By: Marcus Skonieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Bjorlie
Represented By: Daniel L. Gaustad
Represented By: Joseph E. Quinn
Represented By: Marcus Skonieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Thelen
Represented By: Courtney Rebecca Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Olson
Represented By: Daniel L. Gaustad
Represented By: Joseph E. Quinn
Represented By: Marcus Skonieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayme Tenneson
Represented By: Daniel L. Gaustad
Represented By: Joseph E. Quinn
Represented By: Marcus Skonieczny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?