Olson v. Cass County Sheriff et al
Plaintiff: Ricky A. Olson
Defendant: Cass County Sheriff, Three Deputy Sheriffs, Cass County Medical Staff and Nursing Staff of Cass County
Case Number: 3:2023cv00179
Filed: September 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2023 Filing 36 Letter from Ricky Olson (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (pb)
November 15, 2023 Filing 35 Letter from Ricky Olson (Attachments: #1 Restrictive Housing Order, #2 Mailing Envelope) (pb)
November 15, 2023 Filing 34 Letter from Ricky Olson (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (pb)
November 15, 2023 Filing 33 Letter from Ricky Olson (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (pb)
November 13, 2023 Filing 32 SUPPLEMENT (Letter) to document: #16 Complaint, by Ricky A. Olson. (Attachments: #1 Health Service Request Forms, #2 Mailing Envelope)(sj)
November 13, 2023 Filing 31 SUPPLEMENT (Letter) to document: #16 Complaint, by Ricky A. Olson. (Attachments: #1 Cass County District Court Letter to Defendant RE: 09-2023-CR-03799, #2 Health Service Request Forms, #3 Mailing Envelope)(sj)
November 13, 2023 Filing 30 SUPPLEMENT (Letter from Captain Frobig Dated: October 11, 2023) to document: #16 Complaint, by Ricky A. Olson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Inmate Account and Assets, #2 Copy of Order at Doc. No. 7, #3 Health Service Request Forms, #4 Cass County District Court Order Allowing Withdrawal as Counsel of Record Dated: 11/1/2023 Case Number: 09-2023-CR-03799, #5 Commission on Legal Counsel for Indigents Complaint Procedure, #6 Cass County District Court Letters to Defendant RE: 09-2023-CR-03799, #7 Letters from Ricky Olson, #8 Mailing Envelope)(sj)
November 13, 2023 Filing 29 Letter from Ricky Olson (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (sj)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal denying #5 Motion to Preserve Evidence and denying #23 Motion for USM to Transport for Medical Treatment. (AS) Distributed on 11/9/2023 (sj).
November 8, 2023 Filing 27 SUPPLEMENT to document: #16 COMPLAINT, #23 MOTION for USM to Transport for Medical Treatment by Ricky A. Olson. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (sj) Modified on 11/9/2023 to correct link. NEF regenerated (lf).
November 2, 2023 Filing 26 Letter from Ricky Olson (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (pb)
November 2, 2023 Filing 25 Letter from Ricky Olson (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (pb)
November 1, 2023 Filing 24 SUPPLEMENT (Inmate Grievance Form) to document: #16 Complaint, by Ricky A. Olson. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk of Court, #2 Health Service Request Form Dated: 10/27/2023, #3 Restrictive Housing Order (Administrative Review), #4 Cass County Jail Secondary Property Inventory Receipt, #5 Mailing Envelope)(sj)
October 26, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION for USM to Transport for Medical Treatment by Ricky A. Olson. (Attachments: #1 Health Service Request Forms, #2 Mailing Envelope)(sc)
October 23, 2023 Filing 22 SUPPLEMENT to document: #16 Complaint, by Ricky A. Olson. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Grievance Responses and Restrictive Housing Orders, #2 Mailing Envelope)(pb)
October 20, 2023 Filing 21 Letter from Ricky Olson (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (td)
October 20, 2023 Filing 20 Letter from Ricky Olson (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (td)
October 20, 2023 Filing 19 Letter from Ricky Olson (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (td)
October 20, 2023 Filing 18 Letter from Ricky Olson (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (td)
October 20, 2023 Filing 17 Letter from Ricky Olson (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (td)
October 17, 2023 Filing 16 COMPLAINT against Cass County Medical Staff, Cass County Sheriff, Nursing Staff of Cass County, Three Deputy Sheriffs filed by Ricky A. Olson. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Ricky Olson Postmarked 9/19/2023, #2 Letter from Ricky Olson Dated 9/30/2023, #3 Letter from Ricky Olson Postmarked 10/2/2023, #4 Restrictive Housing Order, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Mailing Envelope)(sc)
October 17, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF COLLECTION OF FILING FEE sent to Cass County Jail re #14 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Distributed on 10/17/2023. (sc)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (AS) Distributed on 10/17/2023 (sc).
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned as presiding judge. (pb) Distributed on 10/16/2023 (pb).
October 16, 2023 Filing 12 CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Ricky A. Olson. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(pb)
October 16, 2023 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT (Certificate of Inmate Account and Assets - Signed) to document: #4 PLRA Packet, by Ricky A. Olson. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope - Cass County Sheriff, #2 Mailing Envelope - Ricky Olson)(pb)
October 16, 2023 Filing 10 Letter from Ricky Olson (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (pb)
October 16, 2023 Filing 9 Letter from Ricky Olson (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (pb)
October 12, 2023 Filing 8 Letter from Ricky Olson (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (sc)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ricky A. Olson. (AS) Distributed on 10/6/2023 (sj).
October 5, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Ricky A. Olson. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 10/19/2023. (sc)
October 4, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Preserve Evidence by Ricky A. Olson. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(sc)
October 4, 2023 Filing 4 PLRA Packet. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Ricky Olson Postmarked 9/19/2023, #2 Letter from Ricky Olson Dated 9/30/2023, #3 Letter from Ricky Olson Postmarked 10/2/2023, #4 Restrictive Housing Order, #5 Notices of Lawsuit and Requests to Waive Service of a Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Mailing Envelope)(sc)
October 4, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ricky A. Olson. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Inmate Account, #2 Mailing Envelope)(sc)
September 25, 2023 Filing 2 Remark: PRISONER LITIGATION PACKET received incomplete. Request to complete PLRA packet sent to inmate. (sc)
September 18, 2023 Filing 1 Remark: PRISONER LITIGATION PACKET received incomplete. Request to complete PLRA packet sent to inmate. (sc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olson v. Cass County Sheriff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky A. Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cass County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three Deputy Sheriffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cass County Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nursing Staff of Cass County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?