Native American Guardian's Association v. Washington Commanders et al
Plaintiff: Native American Guardian's Association
Defendant: Washington Commanders, Josh Harris, Matthew Laux and National Congress of American Indians, The
Case Number: 3:2023cv00186
Filed: September 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 48 U.S.C. ยง 1985 Conspiracy/Deprivation Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Native American Guardian's Association. Washington Commanders served on 10/26/2023, answer due 12/28/2023 (LaVeglia, Chad)
November 9, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: National Congress of American Indians, The answer due 12/1/2023. See Order at 17 . (sj)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting in part #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The National Congress of American Indians' answer due by 12/1/2023. (AS)
November 7, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by National Congress of American Indians, The. (Campbell, Matthew)
November 3, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Lee Campbell on behalf of National Congress of American Indians, The (Campbell, Matthew)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal adopting the #13 Stipulation for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Josh Harris, Matthew Laux, and Washington Commanders' answer or other response due by 12/28/2023. (AS)
November 1, 2023 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Josh Harris, Matthew Laux, Washington Commanders. (Sullivan, Henry)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elizabeth A. Carbone. (mf)
November 1, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Elizabeth A. Carbone, Esq. (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2776080) by Matthew Laux. (Carbone, Elizabeth) Modified on 11/1/2023 to add receipt number (mf)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Cameron A. Welch. (mf)
November 1, 2023 Filing 9 *RESTRICTED - INCORRECT ATTORNEY LOGIN USED* MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Elizabeth A. Carbone, Esq. (Filing fee $150, receipt number) by Matthew Laux. (Welch, Cameron) Modified on 11/1/2023 to restrict access (mf)
November 1, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Cameron A. Welch, Esq. (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2775851) by Matthew Laux. (Welch, Cameron) Modified on 11/1/2023 to add receipt number (mf)
November 1, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Attorney Elizabeth A. Carbone. Clerk's Office restricted access to document. Attorney Carbone has not completed the registration requirements for our courts. Attorney Carbone is directed to follow the requirements in our courts to become registered and to file her Pro Hac Vice Motion under her individual login credentials. (mf)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Henry A. Sullivan granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alain P. Mathieu granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Laura E. Martin. (sj)
October 25, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Laura E. Martin (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2771889) by Josh Harris, Washington Commanders. (Martin, Laura) Modified on 10/25/2023 to add receipt number. (sj).
October 25, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Alain P. Mathieu (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2771879) by Josh Harris, Washington Commanders. (Mathieu, Alain) Modified on 10/25/2023 to add receipt number. (sj).
October 25, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Henry A. Sullivan (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2771873) by Josh Harris, Washington Commanders. (Sullivan, Henry) Modified on 10/25/2023 to add receipt number. (sj).
October 23, 2023 Deadlines and Hearings Terminated. Answer due date as to Defendant Washington Commanders set in error. Defendant not yet served. (pb)
October 23, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #3 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Clerk's Office modified docket text to remove incorrect party served (Washington Commanders) and terminated its answer due deadline. (pb)
October 19, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Native American Guardian's Association. Josh Harris served on 10/12/2023, answer due 11/2/2023; Matthew Laux served on 10/13/2023, answer due 11/3/2023; National Congress of American Indians, The served on 10/19/2023, answer due 11/9/2023; (Attachments: #1 Executed Summons- Matthew Laux, #2 Executed Summons-National Congress of American Indians)(LaVeglia, Chad) Modified to remove incorrect party served (Washington Commanders) on 10/23/2023 (pb).
September 25, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Josh Harris, Matthew Laux, National Congress of American Indians, The, and Washington Commanders. (sc)
September 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Josh Harris, Matthew Laux, National Congress of American Indians, The, and Washington Commanders (Filing fee $402, receipt number 300000600) filed by Native American Guardian's Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Native American Guardian's Association v. Washington Commanders et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Native American Guardian's Association
Represented By: Chad Jackson LaVeglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Commanders
Represented By: Laura E. Martin
Represented By: Henry A. Sullivan
Represented By: Alain Mathieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Harris
Represented By: Laura E. Martin
Represented By: Alain Mathieu
Represented By: Henry A. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Laux
Represented By: Cameron Welch
Represented By: Elizabeth Carbone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Congress of American Indians, The
Represented By: Matthew Lee Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?