Catholic Benefits Association et al v. Becerra et al
Plaintiff: Catholic Benefits Association, Sisters of St. Francis of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, The, St. Anne's Guest Home, St. Gerard's Community of Care and Sisters of St. Francis of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, The doing business as Franciscan Sisters of Dillingen, The
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Charlotte Burrows and United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Case Number: 3:2023cv00203
Filed: October 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Clerk's Office corrected link. (cjs)
December 8, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Catholic Benefits Association, Sisters of St. Francis of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, The, St. Anne's Guest Home, St. Gerard's Community of Care. (Nussbaum, Andrew) Modified on 12/11/2023 to correct link (cjs).
December 7, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #19 Response to Motion. Clerk's Office removed 'Exhibit' reference from attachment. (mf)
December 6, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Xavier Becerra, Charlotte Burrows, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Humphreys Declaration)(Humphreys, Bradley) Modified on 12/7/2023 to remove 'Exhibit' reference from attachment (mf)
December 6, 2023 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by St. Gerard's Community of Care. (Nussbaum, Andrew)
December 6, 2023 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by St. Anne's Guest Home. (Nussbaum, Andrew)
December 6, 2023 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sisters of St. Francis of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, The. (Nussbaum, Andrew)
December 6, 2023 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Catholic Benefits Association. (Nussbaum, Andrew)
December 5, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Humphreys on behalf of All Defendants (Humphreys, Bradley)
December 5, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #10 Summons Returned Executed. Added party served name and answer due date to docket text and replaced attachment 1 to display legible header; re: #11 Summons Returned Executed. Added party served name and answer due date to docket text; re: #12 Summons Returned Executed. Added party served name and answer due date to docket text and replaced attachment 1 to display legible header; re: #13 Summons Returned Executed. Replaced attachment 1 to display legible header. (jb)
December 4, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by St. Anne's Guest Home, Catholic Benefits Association, Sisters of St. Francis of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, The, St. Gerard's Community of Care. United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 11/27/2023, answer due 1/26/2024. (Attachments: #1 Green Card)(Nussbaum, Andrew) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/5/2023 to display legible header.) (jb)
December 4, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by St. Anne's Guest Home, Catholic Benefits Association, Sisters of St. Francis of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, The, St. Gerard's Community of Care. Xavier Becerra served on 11/27/2023, answer due 1/26/2024. (Attachments: #1 Green Card)(Nussbaum, Andrew) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/5/2023 to display legible header.) Modified on 12/5/2023 to add party served name and answer due date. (jb)
December 4, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by St. Anne's Guest Home, Catholic Benefits Association, Sisters of St. Francis of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, The, St. Gerard's Community of Care. United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission served on 11/27/2023, answer due 1/26/2024. (Attachments: #1 Green Card)(Nussbaum, Andrew) Modified on 12/5/2023 to add party served name and answer due date. (jb)
December 4, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by St. Anne's Guest Home, Catholic Benefits Association, Sisters of St. Francis of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, The, St. Gerard's Community of Care. Charlotte Burrows served on 11/27/2023, answer due 1/26/2024. (Attachments: #1 Green Card)(Nussbaum, Andrew) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/5/2023 to display legible header.) Modified on 12/5/2023 to add party served name and answer due date. (jb)
December 4, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #9 Summons Returned Executed. Clerks Office removed 'Exhibit' reference and added a description to attachment. Clerk's office added individual defendants, Xavier Becerra, Charlotte Burrows, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission served and included the service date as well as the answer due date to docket text. (mf)
December 1, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by St. Anne's Guest Home, Catholic Benefits Association, Sisters of St. Francis of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, The, St. Gerard's Community of Care. Xavier Becerra, Charlotte Burrows, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission served on 11/27/2023, answer due 1/26/2024. (Attachments: #1 Green Card)(Nussbaum, Andrew) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/4/2023 to remove overlapping header). Clerks Office removed 'Exhibit' reference and added a description to attachment. Clerk's office added individual defendants, Xavier Becerra, Charlotte Burrows, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, served and included the service date as well as the answer due date to docket text. NEF Regenerated on 12/4/2023 (mf)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #5 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (AS)
November 27, 2023 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Multiple relief document filed as one relief. Clerk's Office filed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction at 7 . Re: #4 MEMORANDUM in Support. Attachment at 4-1 should have been filed as separate attachments. Clerk's Office restricted access to attachment and re-filed as AFFIDAVIT at #8 . Clerk's Office added alias to party The Sisters of St. Francis of the Immaculate Heart of Mary. (sc)
November 22, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Andrew Nussbaum re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and #4 MEMORANDUM in Support by Catholic Benefits Association, Sisters of St. Francis of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, The, St. Anne's Guest Home, St. Gerard's Community of Care. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: TransHealth Webpage)(sc)
November 22, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Catholic Benefits Association, Sisters of St. Francis of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, The, St. Anne's Guest Home, St. Gerard's Community of Care. See Document #3 . (sc)
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Catholic Benefits Association, Sisters of St. Francis of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, The, St. Anne's Guest Home, St. Gerard's Community of Care. (Nussbaum, Andrew)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Catholic Benefits Association, Sisters of St. Francis of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, The, St. Anne's Guest Home, St. Gerard's Community of Care. (Attachments: #1 *RESTRICTED- SHOULD HAVE BEEN FILED AS SEPARATE ATTACHMENTS* Declaration of Andrew Nussbaum)(Nussbaum, Andrew) Modified to restrict access to attachment on 11/27/2023 (sc).
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Catholic Benefits Association, Sisters of St. Francis of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, The, St. Anne's Guest Home, St. Gerard's Community of Care. (Nussbaum, Andrew)
October 13, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Xavier Becerra, Charlotte Burrows, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (sc)
October 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra, Charlotte Burrows, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Filing fee $402, receipt number 300000637) filed by St. Anne's Guest Home, Catholic Benefits Association, Sisters of St. Francis of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, The, St. Gerard's Community of Care. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: CBA Amended Articles of Incorporation, #2 Exhibit B: CBA Bylaws, #3 Exhibit C: CBA Church or Church Affiliate Employer Membership Application, #4 Exhibit D: CBA Private Employer Membership Application, #5 Exhibit E: 2023 05 06 Chris Baechle Declaration Executed, #6 Exhibit F: 23 05 02 Declaration of Dr. Michael Sherman - Executed, #7 Exhibit G: 2023 05 05 Declaration of Michelle Stanford Executed, #8 Exhibit H: 2023 05 05 Declaration of Anthony Ternes Executed, #9 Exhibit I: EEOC re Catholic Ministry's CBA membership status and protection w Exhibits 1-3 Redacted, #10 Exhibit J: EEOC Statement on SOGI, #11 Exhibit K: Gender Dysphoria Rider, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(sc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Catholic Benefits Association et al v. Becerra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catholic Benefits Association
Represented By: L. Martin Nussbaum
Represented By: Andrew Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sisters of St. Francis of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, The
Represented By: L. Martin Nussbaum
Represented By: Andrew Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Anne's Guest Home
Represented By: L. Martin Nussbaum
Represented By: Andrew Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Gerard's Community of Care
Represented By: Andrew Nussbaum
Represented By: L. Martin Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sisters of St. Francis of the Immaculate Heart of Mary, The doing business as Franciscan Sisters of Dillingen, The
Represented By: Andrew Nussbaum
Represented By: L. Martin Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Bradley Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Bradley Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Burrows
Represented By: Bradley Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Bradley Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?