Delorme et al v. Frank
Plaintiff: Dallas Delorme and Delorme and Frank Racing Stables, LLC
Defendant: Michael Frank
Case Number: 3:2024cv00011
Filed: January 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2024 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Michael Frank. (Olson, Richard)
March 4, 2024 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Michael Frank. (Olson, Richard)
February 29, 2024 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Frank re #13 Notice of Appearance (Klein, Jessica)
February 29, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica L Klein on behalf of Michael Frank (Klein, Jessica)
February 28, 2024 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 2/28/2024. (DR #None) (sj)
February 28, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2025 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Jury Trial set for 7/15/2025 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. (Trial Est. 3 Days). (CT)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order for Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Two business days prior to the Final Pretrial Conference, counsel must email the Exhibit List and Witness List for each party and Expert Reports to ndd_J-Senechal@ndd.uscourts.gov. Trial Memorandum due at least 7 days prior to trial. Deposition designations due at least 14 days prior to trial. Additional deposition designations by opposing parties due 7 days prior to trial. Objections to deposition designations due 4 days prior to trial. Jury Instructions due at least 7 days prior to trial. Motions in limine due 30 days prior to trial. Additional deadlines and details contained in the Order. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2025 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal.(CT) (Main Document 10 replaced on 2/28/2024 to correct case number in caption). NEF Regenerated. (sj).
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 11/1/2024. Discovery Motions due by 12/6/2024. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/2/2024. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 10/1/2024. Any Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 11/1/2024. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 12/2/2024. Join Additional Parties due by 5/1/2024. Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2024. Nondispositive Motions due by 5/1/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 1/17/2025. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 8/1/2024 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070.(CT)
February 27, 2024 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #6 Answer to Counterclaim. Attachment 1 should have been filed using separate event code. Clerk's office restricted access to Attachment 1 and re-filed as Response to Motion at #8 . Clerk's office also replaced Exhibit 3 to remove double headers, added exhibit numbers, added descriptions of exhibits, and removed exhibit reference to Attachment 11 and corrected its description; re: #7 Motion to Amend/Correct. Corrected motion relief from Motion to Amend/Correct to Motion for Leave to File. Clerk's office also corrected description of Attachment 1, replaced Exhibit 3 to remove double headers, added exhibit numbers, and added descriptions of exhibits. (jb)
February 26, 2024 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dallas Delorme, Delorme and Frank Racing Stables, LLC. (jb) Modified on 2/27/2024 to clarify docket text of linked document. Regenerated NEF. (jb)
February 26, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Dallas Delorme, Delorme and Frank Racing Stables, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Amendments to Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1 - Operating Agreement, #4 Exhibit 3 - Horse Profile for Satan's Mistress, #5 Exhibit 4 - Horse Profile for Hope in Him, #6 Exhibit 5 - Horse Profile for Esperon, #7 Exhibit 6 - Horse Profile for Saphire Sandy, #8 Exhibit 7 - Horse Profile for Speeding Spike, #9 Exhibit 8 - Horse Profile for Esporon, #10 Exhibit 9 - Affidavit of Dallas Delorme, #11 Exhibit 2 - Letter to Michael Frank)(Wang, James) (Exhibit 3 replaced on 2/27/2024 to remove double headers.) Modified on 2/27/2024 to correct motion relief, add exhibit numbers, and correct/add descriptions to attachments. (jb)
February 26, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER to Counterclaim #4 by Dallas Delorme, Delorme and Frank Racing Stables, LLC. (Attachments: # *RESTRICTED - DOCUMENT SHOULD HAVE BEEN FILED AS A SEPARATE EVENT* (1) Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Operating Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2 - Letter to Michael Frank, #4 Exhibit 3 - Horse Profile for Satan's Mistress, #5 Exhibit 4 - Horse Profile for Hope in Him, #6 Exhibit 5 - Horse Profile for Esperon, #7 Exhibit 6 - Horse Profile for Saphire Sandy, #8 Exhibit 7 - Horse Profile for Speeding Spike, #9 Exhibit 8 - Horse Profile for Esporon, #10 Exhibit 9 - Affidavit of Dallas Delorme, #11 Certificate of Service)(Wang, James) (Exhibit 3 replaced on 2/27/2024 to remove double headers.) Modified on 2/27/2024 to restrict access to attachment, to add exhibit numbers and descriptions, and remove exhibit reference. (jb)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
January 25, 2024 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), COUNTERCLAIM against Dallas Delorme, Delorme and Frank Racing Stables, LLC by Michael Frank. (Olson, Richard)
January 25, 2024 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) for Failure to State a Claim. Clerk's Office removed incorrect motion relief and added 'Partial' to docket text. (sj)
January 24, 2024 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) for Failure to State a Claim filed by Michael Frank. (Olson, Richard) Modified on 1/25/2024 to correct docket text. NEF Regenerated. (sj).
January 24, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) for Failure to State a Claim by Michael Frank. (Olson, Richard) Modified on 1/25/2024 to remove incorrect motion relief and add 'Partial' to docket text. (sj).
January 18, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michael Frank from Benson County Court, case number 03-2023-CV-00040. Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 100001793 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation of Service of Process, #2 Exhibit B - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Secretary of State Business Entity Search, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delorme et al v. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Delorme
Represented By: James P. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delorme and Frank Racing Stables, LLC
Represented By: James P. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Frank
Represented By: Richard P. Olson
Represented By: Nici S. Meyer
Represented By: Jessica L Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?