C.S. v. Subway Worldwide, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: C. S.
Defendant: Subway Worldwide, Inc. doing business as Subway, Doctor's Associates LLC doing business as Subway, Subway IP LLC doing business as Subway, Franchise World Headquarters, LLC doing business as Subway, GRB Investments, LLC doing business as Subway, GRB Subway Properties LLP doing business as Subway and Midwest Subway Development, LLP doing business as Subway
Case Number: 3:2024cv00031
Filed: February 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2024 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Doctor's Associates LLC, Franchise World Headquarters, LLC, Subway IP LLC, Subway Worldwide, Inc.. (Blum, Barry)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Counsel are to discuss early mediation and potential limited discovery by 4/19/2024. A Status Conference is set for 4/25/2024 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall arrange for a conference call and provide call-in information to the court and all counsel at least 24 hours before the conference. (CT)
April 11, 2024 Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Status Conference held on 4/11/2024. (DR #240411-000 (JS Chambers Recorder)) (sj)
April 5, 2024 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by C. S.. (Salyers, Brittany)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting unopposed #3 Motion for Leave to File under a Pseudonym. (CT)
April 3, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 4/11/2024 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070. (AS)
March 28, 2024 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GRB Subway Properties LLP. (Kettelkamp, Brent)
March 28, 2024 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Midwest Subway Development, LLP. (Gray, Kevin)
March 28, 2024 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GRB Investments, LLC. (Kettelkamp, Brent)
March 28, 2024 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by GRB Investments, LLC, GRB Subway Properties LLP, Midwest Subway Development, LLP.(Kettelkamp, Brent)
March 28, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Kettelkamp on behalf of GRB Investments, LLC, GRB Subway Properties LLP (Kettelkamp, Brent)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Per the #17 joint stipulation, defendants GRB Investments, LLC; GRB Subway Properties, LLP; and Midwest Subway Development, LLP answers are due by March 28, 2024.(CT)
March 22, 2024 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #17 STIPULATION. Modified entry to add filers: GRB Subway Properties LLP and GRB Investments, LLC. (sj)
March 22, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: GRB Investments, LLC answer due 3/28/2024; GRB Subway Properties LLP answer due 3/28/2024; Midwest Subway Development, LLP answer due 3/28/2024. See Order at 18 . (pb)
March 21, 2024 Filing 17 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, by Midwest Subway Development, LLP., GRB Subway Properties LLP and GRB Investments, LLC (Gray, Kevin) Modified on 3/22/2024 to add filers. (sj).
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kyle P. Hahn; granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Pamela A. Johnson. (mf)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brittany D. Salyers. (sj)
March 18, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Pamela A. Johnson (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2866124) by C. S.. (Johnson, Pamela) Modified on 3/19/2024 to add receipt number (mf)
March 18, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brittany D. Salyers (Filing fee $150, receipt number: ANDDC-2866112) by C. S.. (Salyers, Brittany) Modified on 3/18/2024 to add receipt number. (sj).
March 18, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kyle P. Hahn (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2866080) by C. S.. (Hahn, Kyle) Modified on 3/19/2024 to add receipt number (mf)
March 18, 2024 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #9 NOTICE. Wrong event selected. Clerk's Office restricted access to document and refiled as RESPONSE to Motion at #15 ; re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss. Clerk's Office corrected motion relief from MOTION to Dismiss to MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Additionally, Clerk's Office added exhibit descriptions to attachments. Pursuant to Administrative Policy Section XIII(A) each attachment must contain a "description of sufficient detail to make the attachment readily identifiable to the court." See Guide to Filing Attachments on our website for further instruction. www.ndd.uscourts.gov. (pb)
March 15, 2024 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION for leave to proceed under a pseudonym filed by Doctor's Associates LLC, Franchise World Headquarters, LLC, Subway IP LLC, Subway Worldwide, Inc. (pb)
March 15, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 and 12(b)(6) by Doctor's Associates LLC, Franchise World Headquarters, LLC, Subway IP LLC, Subway Worldwide, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jamestown Franchise Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - North Dakota DAA, #3 Exhibit C - Key Provisions of Website, #4 Exhibit D - Select Provisions of Confidential Operations Manual)(Greene, Nina) Modified to correct motion relief and add exhibit descriptions on 3/18/2024 (pb).
March 15, 2024 Filing 9 *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT SELECTED* NOTICE by Doctor's Associates LLC, Franchise World Headquarters, LLC, Subway IP LLC, Subway Worldwide, Inc. re #3 MOTION for leave to proceed under a pseudonym of Non-Objection to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym (Greene, Nina) Modified to restrict access on 3/18/2024 (pb).
March 15, 2024 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Doctor's Associates LLC, Franchise World Headquarters, LLC, Subway IP LLC, Subway Worldwide, Inc.. (Greene, Nina)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul M. Schinner. (sj)
March 15, 2024 Filing 6 *RESTRICTED - INCORRECT FILER* MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kyle P. Hahn (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2865581) by C. S. (Schinner, Paul) Modified on 3/15/2024 to restrict access (mf)
March 15, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Paul M. Schinner (Filing fee $150, receipt number:ANDDC-2865574) by C. S.. (Schinner, Paul) Modified on 3/15/2024 to add receipt number. (sj).
March 15, 2024 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Incorrect filer. Attorney advised to re-file Motion using correct attorney credentials. (mf)
February 22, 2024 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for leave to proceed under a pseudonym filed by C. S. (lf)
February 22, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for leave to proceed under a pseudonym by C. S. (lf)
February 22, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Doctor's Associates LLC, Franchise World Headquarters, LLC, GRB Investments, LLC, GRB Subway Properties LLP, Midwest Subway Development, LLP, Subway IP LLC, Subway Worldwide, Inc. (lf)
February 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Doctor's Associates LLC, Franchise World Headquarters, LLC, GRB Investments, LLC, GRB Subway Properties LLP, Midwest Subway Development, LLP, Subway IP LLC, Subway Worldwide, Inc. (Filing fee $405, receipt number 300000787) filed by C. S. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lf) Modified to add receipt number on 2/26/2024 (pb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.S. v. Subway Worldwide, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. S.
Represented By: Benjamin E. Thomas
Represented By: Mark A. Beauchene
Represented By: Brittany Deane Salyers
Represented By: Kyle Patrick Hahn
Represented By: Pamela Johnson
Represented By: Paul Schinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subway Worldwide, Inc. doing business as Subway
Represented By: Nina Greene
Represented By: Barry Blum
Represented By: Michael D Joblove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor's Associates LLC doing business as Subway
Represented By: Nina Greene
Represented By: Barry Blum
Represented By: Michael D Joblove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subway IP LLC doing business as Subway
Represented By: Nina Greene
Represented By: Barry Blum
Represented By: Michael D Joblove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franchise World Headquarters, LLC doing business as Subway
Represented By: Nina Greene
Represented By: Michael D Joblove
Represented By: Barry Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRB Investments, LLC doing business as Subway
Represented By: Brent Kettelkamp
Represented By: Christopher A. Wills
Represented By: Kevin Francis Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRB Subway Properties LLP doing business as Subway
Represented By: Brent Kettelkamp
Represented By: Christopher A. Wills
Represented By: Kevin Francis Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Subway Development, LLP doing business as Subway
Represented By: Christopher A. Wills
Represented By: Kevin Francis Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?