Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC et al v. Biersch, INC
Plaintiff: Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Matthew Boyington and Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC
Defendant: Biersch, INC doing business as Universal Industries, INC.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00235
Filed: November 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of North Dakota
Presiding Judge: Alice R Senechal
Referring Judge: Peter D Welte
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2025 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Matthew Boyington re #41 Reply to Response to Motion, #40 Reply to Response to Motion on Opposing Counsel (Grossman, Lee)
January 3, 2025 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Antisuit Injunction filed by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Matthew Boyington. (Grossman, Lee)
January 3, 2025 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Oral Argument filed by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Matthew Boyington. (Grossman, Lee)
January 3, 2025 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Stay or, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer, 12 MOTION to StayMOTION to Transfer In Further Support of Motion filed by Biersch, INC. (Hanson, Mark)
December 23, 2024 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Matthew Boyington re #37 Response to Motion on Opposing Counsel (Grossman, Lee)
December 23, 2024 Filing 37 RESPONSE to Motion re #25 MOTION for Hearing filed by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Matthew Boyington. (Grossman, Lee)
December 23, 2024 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #23 Response to Motion. Clerk's office added 'Exhibit 1' to docket entry for Attachment 1, removed duplicative 'Exhibit' text from docket entry for Attachment 2, and cleaned up docket text; #25 Motion for Hearing (oral argument). Clerk's office corrected document numbers in docket text as to linked documents; #26 Response to Motion. Clerk's office removed 'Exhibit' reference; #34 Affidavit Declaration of Corey A. Staas. Clerk's office added more complete descriptions of Exhibits 1 and 2; #35 Affidavit Declaration of Zachary Brashears. Clerk's office replaced Exhibits 3 and 4 to display legible headers; #36 Affidavit Declaration of Dean Bierschenk. Clerk's office replaced Exhibit 7 to display legible headers and added more complete descriptions to Exhibits 1, 2, and 5. (jb)
December 20, 2024 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Dean Bierschenk re #28 Response to Motion by Biersch, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Record of trademarks UniTube, #2 Exhibit 2 - Record of trademarks Universal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Warning, #4 Exhibit 4 - Employment Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - Noncompete/Nondisclosure Agreement, #6 Exhibit 6 - Letter dated 2-19-24, #7 Exhibit 7 - Text Messages from dealer)(Hanson, Mark) (Exhibit 7 replaced on 12/23/2024 to display legible headers.) Modified on 12/23/2024 to add more complete description to exhibits 1, 2, and 5. (jb)
December 20, 2024 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Zachary Brashears re #28 Response to Motion by Biersch, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Drawing No. 80504, #2 Exhibit 2 - Attachments to 1-25-23 email, #3 Exhibit 3 -Text Message, #4 Exhibit 4 - Text Message and Photos, #5 Exhibit 5 - Email)(Hanson, Mark) Exhibits 3 and 4 replaced on 12/23/2024 to display legible headers. (jb)
December 20, 2024 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Corey A. Staas re #28 Response to Motion by Biersch, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Spreadsheet of emails between Boyington and The Premiere Parties employees, #2 Exhibit 2 - Spreadsheet of emails between Boyington and other parties, #3 Exhibit 3 - Searches Spreadsheet)(Hanson, Mark) Modified on 12/23/2024 to add more complete descriptions to exhibits 1 and 2. (jb)
December 20, 2024 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Prashanth Ramaswamy re #28 Response to Motion by Biersch, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proprietary Information)(Hanson, Mark)
December 20, 2024 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Ed Hert re #28 Response to Motion by Biersch, INC. (Hanson, Mark)
December 20, 2024 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of George R. Wandling, Sr. re #28 Response to Motion by Biersch, INC. (Hanson, Mark)
December 20, 2024 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Riley McDaniel re #28 Response to Motion by Biersch, INC. (Hanson, Mark)
December 20, 2024 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Brian Roed re #28 Response to Motion by Biersch, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - E-mails Exchange)(Hanson, Mark)
December 20, 2024 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Oral Argument In Opposition to filed by Biersch, INC. (Hanson, Mark)
December 20, 2024 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support re #25 MOTION for Hearing filed by Biersch, INC. (Hanson, Mark) Modified on 12/23/2024 to clarify docket text. (jb)
December 20, 2024 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Antisuit Injunction in Opposition of filed by Biersch, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Morio)(Hanson, Mark) Modified on 12/23/2024 to remove exhibit reference. (jb)
December 20, 2024 Filing 25 MOTION for Hearing (oral argument) on #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and #10 MOTION to Dismiss, and #8 MOTION for Preliminary Antisuit Injunction by Biersch, INC. (Hanson, Mark) Modified on 12/20/2024 to correct motion relief (lf). Modified on 12/23/2024 to correct document numbers of linked documents. (jb)
December 20, 2024 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Matthew Boyington re #23 Response to Motion,, (Grossman, Lee)
December 20, 2024 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Stay or, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer, 12 MOTION to StayMOTION to Transfer Memorandum in Response filed by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Matthew Boyington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - First Supplemental Declaration of Matthew Boyington, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration - Letter dated 02.19.2024)(Grossman, Lee) Modified on 12/23/2024 to add 'Exhibit 1' language (Attachment 1), remove duplicate 'Exhibit' language (Attachment 2), and cleaned up docket text. (jb)
December 20, 2024 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #25 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Dismiss. Wrong motion relief selected. Clerk's office corrected motion relief at the request of filer. (lf)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. As discussed at the 12/13/2024 Status Conference, a Scheduling Conference Order will not be filed until after the three pending motions are decided. (CT)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. As discussed at the 12/13/2024 Status Conference, a brief on the motion for a hearing on the pending motions is due by 12/20/2024 and a responsive brief is due by 12/24/2024. Neither brief shall exceed five pages. (CT)
December 13, 2024 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Status Conference held on 12/13/2024. (DR #241213-000 JS Chambers Recorder) (le)
December 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Status Conference is set for 12/13/2024 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7000. (CT)
December 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. The #17 stipulation is adopted. Responses due by 12/20/2024. Replies due by 1/3/2025. (CT) Modified on 12/10/2024 to correct date responses are due by. NEF regenerated (bl).
December 9, 2024 Filing 17 STIPULATION (Joint) Regarding Deadlines and Briefing Schedule by Biersch, INC. (Hanson, Mark)
December 5, 2024 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Matthew Boyington. Biersch, INC served on 12/4/2024, answer due 12/26/2024 (Grossman, Lee)
December 4, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Mino on behalf of Biersch, INC (Mino, Nicholas)
December 3, 2024 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Biersch, INC. (Hanson, Mark)
December 3, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R. Hanson on behalf of Biersch, INC (Hanson, Mark)
December 2, 2024 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Multiple relief document filed. Clerk's Office filed Motion to Stay and MOTION (Miscellaneous) to Transfer at 12 . Re: #11 MEMORANDUM in Support. Clerk's Office added link to additional motion relief filed and added more complete attachment descriptions. (sl)
November 29, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay or MOTION to Transfer in the Alternative by Biersch, INC. See Document #10 . (sl)
November 29, 2024 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and 12 MOTION to Stay or, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer filed by Biersch, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - T. Morio Declaration, #2 Exhibit A: Letter Dated 11/8/2024, #3 Exhibit B: Letter Dated 11/14/2024)(Hedican, Christopher) Modified to add link to additional relief filed and to add more complete attachment descriptions on 12/2/2024 (sl).
November 29, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Stay or, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer by Biersch, INC. (Hedican, Christopher)
November 27, 2024 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Matthew Boyington re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Antisuit Injunction on Opposing Counsel (Grossman, Lee)
November 27, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Antisuit Injunction by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Matthew Boyington. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Preliminary Antisuit Injunction Motion, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit 1: Premiere Ag Register of Actions Richland County)(Grossman, Lee)
November 27, 2024 DOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Clerk's Office removed duplicative exhibit language and clarified attachment descriptions. Multiple relief document filed. Clerk's Office filed Motion for Hearing at 7 . (sl)
November 26, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Hearing by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, and Matthew Boyington. See Document at #5 . (sl)
November 26, 2024 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Matthew Boyington re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Oral Argument on Opposing Counsel (Grossman, Lee)
November 26, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Oral Argument by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Matthew Boyington. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit 2: Order Granting Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and Notice of Entry of Order) (Grossman, Lee) Modified to clarify docket text on 11/27/2024 (sl).
November 26, 2024 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Matthew Boyington re #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Notice of Appearance on Opposing Counsel (Grossman, Lee)
November 26, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Matthew Boyington. (Grossman, Lee)
November 26, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee M. Grossman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Grossman, Lee)
November 25, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Biersch, INC from District Court Southeast Judicial District, County of Richland, case number 39-2024-CV-00341. Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 300001042 filed by Biersch, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and complaint from district court, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of filing of removal from district court)(bl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC et al v. Biersch, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premiere Shortline USA, LLC
Represented By: Lee M. Grossman
Represented By: Adam D. Wogsland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Boyington
Represented By: Lee M. Grossman
Represented By: Adam D. Wogsland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC
Represented By: Lee M. Grossman
Represented By: Adam D. Wogsland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biersch, INC doing business as Universal Industries, INC.
Represented By: Christopher R. Hedican
Represented By: Nicholas Mino
Represented By: Mark R. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?