Poitra v. Quentin N. Burdick Memorial Healthcare Facility et al
Plaintiff: Crystal Poitra
Defendant: Quentin N. Burdick Memorial Healthcare Facility, Patricia Henry, Pamela Kidd and Richard Larson
Case Number: 4:2009cv00048
Filed: August 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Rolette
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland denying 30 Motion for Summary Judgment (RAB)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER to seal exhibits to Government's Motion for Summary Judgment. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 26 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice (Attorney Marshall P. Whalley). (BG)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/30/2010. Plaintiff expert witnesses and complete reports are due by 10/29/2010. Defendant's expert witnesses and complete reports due by 11/30/2010. Parties have until 12/30/2010 to complete expert discovery. Dispositive Motions and Threshold Motions are due by 1/31/2011. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Modified on 6/21/2010 to correct date in text and regenerate NEF. (rm)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2011 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) Modified on 12/16/2009 to correct year. (ks).
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/15/2009 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 4 Motion to Set Deadline to Respond to Complaint; granting 5 Motion to Substitute Party. United States of America added. Richard Larson, Quentin N. Burdick Memorial Healthcare Facility, Patricia Henry and Pamela Kidd terminated. (BG) Regenerated NEF to Shon Hastings on 9/21/2009 (ks).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poitra v. Quentin N. Burdick Memorial Healthcare Facility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Poitra
Represented By: Robert G. Ackre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quentin N. Burdick Memorial Healthcare Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?