Baker v. Autos Inc et al

Defendant: Randy Westby, James Hendershot, Autos Inc, RW Enterprises Inc and Robert Opperude
Plaintiff: Darilyn Baker
Case Number: 4:2012cv00007
Filed: January 17, 2012
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Ward
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The deadline for filing motions for class certification is 2/1/2013. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
June 11, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2013 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
May 14, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2012 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
April 19, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland denying 6 Motion to Remand; denying 9 Motion for Summary Judgment (CP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Autos Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Westby
Represented By: Bryan L. Van Grinsven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hendershot
Represented By: Kraig A. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autos Inc
Represented By: Kraig A. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RW Enterprises Inc
Represented By: Bryan L. Van Grinsven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Opperude
Represented By: Kraig A. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darilyn Baker
Represented By: Larry M. Baer
Represented By: Robert G. Ackre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?