BNSF Railway Company v. Strata Corporation

Plaintiff: BNSF Railway Company
Defendant: Strata Corporation
Case Number: 4:2013cv00119
Filed: October 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Grand Forks
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. denying 25 Motion for Telephonic Appearance. (KT)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 12/18/2014 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/5/2015 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG) (Main Document 10 replaced on 12/6/2013 to correct date of conference in Order. Regenerated NEF.) (rh)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/6/2013 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BNSF Railway Company v. Strata Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Rebecca S. Thiem
Represented By: James S. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strata Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?