Ceynar et al v. Oasis Petroleum North America LLC
Plaintiff: Dustin Ceynar and Sara Ceynar
Defendant: Oasis Petroleum North America LLC
Case Number: 4:2014cv00078
Filed: July 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Northwestern Office
County: McKenzie
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER adopting 55 Stipulation of Dismissal. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying without prejudice 21 Motion for an Order to Compel Discovery and 22 MOTION for Hearing. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/1/2015 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/5/2014 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ceynar et al v. Oasis Petroleum North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Ceynar
Represented By: Tami Norgard
Represented By: Robert James Pathroff
Represented By: Joshua A. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Ceynar
Represented By: Tami Norgard
Represented By: Robert James Pathroff
Represented By: Joshua A. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oasis Petroleum North America LLC
Represented By: John W. Morrison, Jr.
Represented By: Amy M. Oster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?