Borsheim Builders Supply, Inc. v. Harstad-Cook et al

Plaintiff: Borsheim Builders Supply, Inc.
Defendant: Daphney Harstad-Cook and Vicki Harstad
Case Number: 4:2014cv00083
Filed: July 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Williams
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 2/27/2015 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER adopting 64 Stipulated Protective Order for Standard Litigation. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2016 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2014 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Larina A. Alton. (KT)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher A. Seidl; granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Aaron R. Thom. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borsheim Builders Supply, Inc. v. Harstad-Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Borsheim Builders Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Larina A. Alton
Represented By: Christopher A. Seidl
Represented By: Aaron R. Thom
Represented By: Christopher J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daphney Harstad-Cook
Represented By: Brad A. Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Harstad
Represented By: Jon R. Brakke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?