EOG Resources, Inc. v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: EOG Resources, Inc.
Defendant: P. Diane Johnson, Yvette Falcon, Jolene Burr, Ted Lone Fight, Georgianna Danks and Edward S. Danks
Case Number: 4:2014cv00087
Filed: July 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Mountrail
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting 26 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 31 Motion to Dismiss. (RLB)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Status Conference REset for 9/10/2015 at 11:00 AM CDT by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (Conference was set for 9/10/2015 at 10:00 AM CDT) (BG)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 18 Motion to Stay. (KT)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 12 Motion to Stay. The Scheduling Conference will be reset for 5/4/2015 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Judge Miller. (KT)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 10 Motion to Vacate; granting 10 Motion to Continue. Scheduling Conference reset for 2/3/2015 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. Previously set for 12/15/2014. (KT)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/15/2014 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert S. Thompson, IV; granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert S. Thompson, III. (BG) NEF regenerated to PHV attorneys on 8/5/2014. (rm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EOG Resources, Inc. v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EOG Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence Bender
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Lippa
Represented By: Robert Thompson, III
Represented By: Robert S. Thompson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Diane Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvette Falcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jolene Burr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Lone Fight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgianna Danks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward S. Danks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?