United States of America v. Yerba Buena Engineering & Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Yerba Buena Engineering & Construction, Inc. and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2014cv00130
Filed: October 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Ward
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re 22 MOTION for Hearing. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference REset for 9/7/2016 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (Previously set for 5/24/2016). Jury Trial REset for 9/20/2016 at 9:30 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Judge Daniel L. Hovland (4 days, #2 on civil calendar) (Previously set for 6/07/2016). By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/24/2016 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/26/2015 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Yerba Buena Engineering & Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Steven A. Lautt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yerba Buena Engineering & Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?