Auer v. Minot, City of
Plaintiff: Colleen M. Auer
Defendant: Minot, City of
Case Number: 4:2015cv00040
Filed: April 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of North Dakota
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Ward
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr granting 93 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (ZE)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting in part and denying in part 33 Defendant's First Motion to Compel Discovery. (ST)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 9/22/2016 at 10:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER (amended) denying 17 Objection and Motion Concerning Improper Amendment of Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2015 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auer v. Minot, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen M. Auer
Represented By: Colleen M. Auer(Designation Pro Se)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minot, City of
Represented By: Randall J. Bakke
Represented By: Shawn A. Grinolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?