Jones v. Bradshaw
Petitioner: Odraye G. Jones
Respondent: Margaret Bradshaw
Case Number: 1:2003cv01192
Filed: June 13, 2003
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Ashtabula
Presiding Judge: David A. Katz
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 242 Memorandum of Opinion and Order dismissing Petitioner Jones' pro se Motion for relief from Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(b)(4). (Related Doc # 241 ). Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 8/10/2017.(R,Sh)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Order granting Petitioner's Motion for certificate of appealability (Related Doc # 236 ) and denying as moot Respondent's Motion for a status conference (Related Doc # 239 ) for the reasons stated. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 7/17/2017.(R,Sh)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting Motion to transfer to 6th Circuit Court of Appeals for final resolution of petition for writ of habeas corpus (Related Doc # 190 ); denying 191 Motion to Extend Deadlines; ; denying Motion for order (Related Doc # 193 ); denying Motion to dismiss (Related Doc # 217 ); denying Motion to strike (Related Doc # 219 ). Judge David A. Katz on 10/13/15.(G,C)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Memorandum Opinion and Order: the Court denies Jones' pro se motion to proceed without counsel, and reminds Jones of the Court's prior admonition not to file any further pro se pleadings. The Court will hold Jones' motion to w aive his lethal injection claim in abeyance, however, until the Supreme Court rules in Glossip v. Gross. (ECF No. 193.) The Court also will hold in abeyance until Glossip is decided Respondent's motion to transfer (ECF No. 190) and Jones' ; motion, through counsel, to expand discovery on his lethal injection claim (ECF No. 191). The Court further sets the following schedule for the filing of 'supplemental or amended pleadings related to the ineffective assistance of trial counsel ... [and] Jones's contention that there is cause to excuse the procedural default of those claims under" as directed by the Sixth Circuit: Jones must file all applicable pleadings by May 29, 2015; Respondent must respond to the pleadings by June 30, 2015; and Jones may file reply briefs by July 15, 2015. re 191 190 193 . Judge David A. Katz on 3/25/2015. (S,AL)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting Petitioner's Motion to remove counsel; Motion to waive lethel injection litigation held in abeyance as stated herein (Related Doc # 157 ); Petitioner's Motion for appointment of counsel granted (Related Doc # 165 ). New counsel should enter appearance within 30 days. Judge David A. Katz on 10/12/12.(G,C)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Order denying Motion to dismiss (Related Doc # 134 ). Court adopts Respondent's and Petitioner's 4/17/2009 proposed scheduling orders 135 136 . Judge David A. Katz on 9/8/09. (G,C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Odraye G. Jones
Represented By: Spiros P. Cocoves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Margaret Bradshaw
Represented By: Seth P. Kestner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?