American Train Dispatchers Association v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Cross Defendant: American Train Dispatchers Association
Case Number: 1:2004cv01433
Filed: July 27, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 151 Railway Labor Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2005. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Judgment Entry and Order of Case Dismissal, having granted Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Related doc #17 ), the court affirms the decision of the Public Law Board and enters judgment for the Defendant and against the Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. on 7/27/2005. (D, M)
July 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order granting Defendant's Motion for summary judgment (Related Doc #17 ), denying Plaintiff's Motion for summary judgment (Related Doc #20 ), denying CSXT's Motion to strike (Related Doc #26 ). Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. on 7/27/2005.(D, M)
June 7, 2005 Filing 30 Notice of reassigning case to Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr pursuant to the protocol adopted by this Court for reassignment of the docket of Judge Paul R. Matia. (H, D)
March 9, 2005 Filing 29 Reply to response to Motion to strike Petitioner ATDA's Statement of Material Facts as to Which There is No Genuine Issue filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. Related document(s) #26 . (Lewis, John)
March 8, 2005 Filing 28 Opposition to Motion to strike Petitioner ATDA's Statement of Material Facts as to Which There is No Genuine Issue filed by American Train Dispatchers Association. Related document(s) #26 . (Wolly, Michael)
February 23, 2005 Filing 27 Opposition to petitioner's Motion for summary judgment and Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. Related document(s) #17 , #20 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3)(Lewis, John) Modified text of docket entry on 2/24/2005 (B, B).
February 23, 2005 Filing 26 Motion to strike Petitioner ATDA's Statement of Material Facts as to Which There is No Genuine Issue filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. Related document(s) #21 . (Lewis, John) Modified text of docket entry on 2/24/2005 (B, B).
February 23, 2005 Filing 25 Opposition to Motion for summary judgment filed by American Train Dispatchers Association. Related document(s) #17 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wolly, Michael) Modified text of docket entry on 2/24/2005 (B, B).
January 28, 2005 Filing 24 Joint Exhibit 1 filed by all parties. (Related doc #20 , #23 ) (C, K A) Modified to create links on 1/31/2005 (B, B).
January 26, 2005 Filing 23 Notice of Manual Filing of Joint Exhibit 1 filed by American Train Dispatchers Association. Related document #20 . (Ross, Harold) Modified text/links/termed motion (wrong event used) 1/28/2005 (C, K A).
January 25, 2005 Filing 22 Exhibit 1 to motion for summary judgment filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. Related document(s) #17 , #19 . (C, K A)
January 25, 2005 Filing 21 Statement of Material Facts filed by American Train Dispatchers Association. Related document(s) #20 . (Ross, Harold) Modified text/termed motion, wrong event used 1/26/2005 (C, K A).
January 25, 2005 Filing 20 Motion for summary judgment filed by American Train Dispatchers Association. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support #2 Exhibit)(Ross, Harold) Modified text 1/26/2005 (C, K A).
January 25, 2005 Filing 19 Notice of Manual Filing centralized train dispatching center agreement filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Dawson, Todd) Modified text 1/26/2005 (C, K A).
January 25, 2005 Filing 18 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by CSX Transportation, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc.. Related document(s) #17 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2#2 Exhibit 3#3 Exhibit 4#4 Exhibit 5#5 Exhibit 6#6 Exhibit 7#7 Exhibit 8#8 Exhibit 9) (Dawson, Todd) Modified text of docket entry on 1/26/2005 (B, B). (E-mail sent to attorneys on 1/26/2005 re: signature and more appropriate choice of event)
January 25, 2005 Filing 17 Motion for summary judgment filed by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Dawson, Todd) Modified text of docket entry on 1/26/2005 (B, B). (E-mail sent to attorneys on 1/26/2005 re: signature)
January 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order extending the deadline to file Joint Exhibit that sets forth the record of proceedings before the Board, and extending the deadline to file dispositive motion until January 25, 2005. Signed by Judge Paul R. Matia on 1/18/2005. Modified on 1/18/2005 because of typographical error on date. (S, B)
November 17, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order To Enter Action Into Electronic Filing System. Signed by Chief Judge Paul R. Matia on 11/17/2004. (S, B)
November 17, 2004 Filing 14 Case Management Conference Plan with case management conference held on 11/16/2004 at 01:30 PM in Chambers 19A before Hon. Paul R. Matia. Pleadings shall be amended on or before 12/15/2004. The parties shall serve and file their respective motions for summry judgment and memoranda in support on or before 1/19/2005. Discovery is stayed until the Court has ruled on the cross-motions for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Paul R. Matia on 11/17/2004. (S, B)
October 4, 2004 Filing 13 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Lewis, John)
October 4, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Marginal Order denying defendant's motion for leave to appear telephonically for Case Management Conference (Related Doc #9 ). Case Management Conference scheduled 10/13/04 is rescheduled to 11/16/04 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Paul R. Matia on 10/4/04.(R, J)
October 4, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Marginal Order denying plaintiff's motion for leave to permit participation by telephone at the Case Management Conference (Related Doc #8 ). Case Management Conference scheduled 10/13/04 is rescheduled to 11/16/04 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Paul R. Matia on 10/4/04.(R, J)
September 28, 2004 Filing 10 Answer to Crossclaim filed by American Train Dispatchers Association. (Related doc #7 ) (Ross, Harold) Modified text of docket entry on 9/30/2004 (B, B).
September 24, 2004 Filing 9 Motion for leave To Appear Telephonically For Case Management Conference filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Lewis, John) Modified text of docket entry on 9/27/2004 (B, B). (E-mail sent to attorney on 9/27/2004 re: more appropriate choice of event)
September 21, 2004 Filing 8 Motion for leave to permit participation at case management conference by telephone filed by American Train Dispatchers Association. Related document(s) #3 . (Ross, Harold) Modified text of docket entry on 9/22/2004 (B, B). (E-mail sent to attorney on 9/22/2004 re: more appropriate choice of event)
September 17, 2004 Filing 7 Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1 ), Crossclaim for Review against American Train Dispatchers Association filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Article 13 "Claims and Grievances" provision of Collective Bargaining Agreement)(Lewis, John) Modified text of docket entry on 9/20/2004 (B, B).
August 18, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Marginal Entry Order pursuant to the stipulation granting the defendant an enlargement of time to 9/17/04 to respond or otherwise plead. Signed by Judge Paul R. Matia on 8/18/04. (Related doc [5) (R, J) Modified text of docket entry on 8/23/2004 (B, B).
August 17, 2004 Filing 5 Proposed Stipulation enlarging time until 9/17/04 to respond or otherwise plead filed by all parties. (C, K A)
August 16, 2004 Filing 4 Notice of Magistrate Consent form issued 8/16/04. (R, J)
August 16, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order. Case management conference to be held on 10/13/2004 at 4:00 p.m. in Chambers 19A before Hon. Paul R. Matia. Signed by Judge Paul R. Matia on 8/16/04. (R, J)
July 27, 2004 Filing 2 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Hemann. (B, R)
July 27, 2004 Filing 1 Petition for Review of an Award of a Special Board of Adjustment Pursuant to the Railway Labor Act against American Train Dispatchers Association (1 summons and Magistrate Consent Forms issued). Filed by American Train Dispatchers Association. Filing fee paid; receipt number 662491. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Civil Cover Sheet)(B, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Train Dispatchers Association v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: American Train Dispatchers Association
Represented By: Michael S. Wolly
Represented By: Harold A. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Todd A. Dawson
Represented By: John B. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?