Official Committee of Administrative Claimants v. Bricker et al
Plaintiff: Official Committee of Administrative Claimants
Defendant: George Henning, John D. Turner, James Baske, Does 1-100, Inclusive, Thomas L. Garrett, Eric Evans, Glen J. Moran, William Jeffrey Bricker, Clifford Brown, Dennis Babcock and William H. Bricker
Intervenor: Reed Smith LLP, as Counsel for the former Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of the LTV Steel Company, Inc. and VP Buildings, Inc. Distribution Trust
Interested Party: Cliffs Natural Resources Inc., United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local 979, Deloitte Consulting LLP and LTV Steel Co. Inc.
Case Number: 1:2005cv02158
Filed: September 13, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
Presiding Judge: Donald C Nugent
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2012 Filing 288 Stipulation, notice and Order of Case Dismissal re #287 , w/prejudice. Judge Donald C. Nugent (C,KA)
January 12, 2012 Filing 287 Proposed Stipulation and Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants, Glen J. Moran, William Bricker, George Henning, John D. Turner, Thomas L. Garrett, James Baske, Eric Evans. (Barnett, Harvey) Modified text on 1/13/2012 (B,B).
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 286 Order granting Motion to reopen case (Related Doc #285 ). Telephone status Conference set for 12/5/2011 at 09:00 a.m. Judge Donald C. Nugent(C,KA)
November 17, 2011 Filing 285 Motion to reopen case filed by Plaintiff Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Barnett, Harvey)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 284 Order amending dismissal,granting in part Motion to vacate (Related Doc #283 ). The Dismissal Order entered October 20, 2011 is hereby AMENDED to include the provision that any party may move to reinstate the action if the Bankruptcy Court should fail to approve the global settlement. Judge Donald C. Nugent(C,KA)
October 25, 2011 Filing 283 Joint Motion to vacate dismissal order entered October 20, 2011 pending court approval of global settelement filed by James Baske, William H. Bricker, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner, Plaintiff Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Amended Order of Dismissal)(Barnett, Harvey)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 282 Order of Case Dismissal. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 10/20/11. (R,JM)
October 17, 2011 Filing 281 Notice of Trial reset for 11/21/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 17B before Judge Donald C. Nugent. (C,KA)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion to exceed page limitations. Briefs NOT to exceed 30 pages. (Related Doc #266 ) Judge Donald C. Nugent on 10/04/11.(R,JM)
October 3, 2011 Filing 280 Appendix DEFENDANT THOMAS L. GARRETTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITH RESPECT TO THE PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Thomas L. Garrett. Related document(s) #279 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 25 to 31)(Lepene, Alan)
October 3, 2011 Filing 279 Reply to response to #240 Motion for summary judgment with Respect to the Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Thomas L. Garrett. (Lepene, Alan)
October 3, 2011 Filing 278 Appendix REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OMNIBUS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. Related document(s) #277 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 103-112, #2 Exhibit 113-119)(Lepene, Alan)
October 3, 2011 Filing 277 Reply to response to #242 Omnibus Motion for partial summary judgment on Counts I-IV and VI-VIII of the First Amended Complaint Based on the Business Judgment Rule filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Lepene, Alan)
October 3, 2011 Filing 276 Reply to response to #239 Omnibus Motion for summary judgment Based on the Applicable Statute of Limitations (Related Docs 197, 218, 219 (Depo. Transcripts filed 8/5/11)) filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript)(Sullivan, Martha)
October 3, 2011 Filing 275 Reply to response to #233 Omnibus Motion for partial summary judgment on counts IX through XII of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unreported Cases)(Niehaus, James)
October 3, 2011 Filing 274 Reply to response to #234 Motion for summary judgment filed by George Henning. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Scott Evans Deposition, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of George Henning, #3 Exhibit C - Henning Deposition)(Niehaus, James)
October 3, 2011 Filing 273 Reply to response to #236 Motion for summary judgment filed by James Baske. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unreported Cases, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of James Baske, #3 Exhibit C - Glenn Moran Deposition, #4 Exhibit D - James Baske Deposition, #5 Exhibit E - Thomas Garrett Deposition, #6 Exhibit F - David Heiman Deposition)(Niehaus, James)
October 3, 2011 Filing 272 Reply to response to #235 Motion for summary judgment filed by Eric Evans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Eric Evans, #2 Exhibit B - Evans Deposition, #3 Exhibit C - Garrett Deposition, #4 Exhibit D - Moran Deposition, #5 Exhibit E - Sprayregen Deposition, #6 Exhibit F - Unreported Case)(Niehaus, James)
October 3, 2011 Filing 271 Supplemental Appendix to Reply Memorandum in support of plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment against Defendant Moran filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. Related document(s) #270 . (Shmikler, Daniel)
October 3, 2011 Filing 270 Reply to response to #227 Motion for partial summary judgment against Defendant Moran filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Shmikler, Daniel)
October 3, 2011 Filing 269 Reply to response to #244 Motion for summary judgment (Related Docs 211, 214 (Depo. Transcripts filed 8/5/11) and Docs 233, 239, 242 (omnibus motions filed by all defendants on 8/8/11)) filed by Glen J. Moran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Excerpts from the Deposition of Glenn Moran)(Sullivan, Martha)
October 3, 2011 Filing 268 Reply to response to #239 Omnibus Motion for summary judgment of the Estate of William H. Bricker Based on the Applicable Statute of Limitations (Related Docs 197, 218, 219 (Depo. Transcripts filed 8/5/11)), #231 Motion for summary judgment , #233 Omnibus Motion for partial summary judgment on counts IX through XII of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #242 Omnibus Motion for partial summary judgment on Counts I-IV and VI-VIII of the First Amended Complaint Based on the Business Judgment Rule filed by William Jeffrey Bricker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Y- Pages from James J. Bonsall, Jr.'s Deposition, #2 Exhibit Z- The Lincoln Electric Company et al. v. National Standard, LLC, #3 Exhibit AA - Minutes of the Meeting of the Board of Directors, July 27, 2001, #4 Exhibit BB- Pages from Thomas Bricker's Deposition, #5 Exhibit CC - The Blackstone Group Presentation 2/2/2011, #6 Exhibit DD - Pages from John Turner's Deposition, #7 Exhibit EE - W. H. Bricker's Revised Employment Terms, #8 Exhibit FF - Minutes of the Meeting of the Board of DIrectors, 11/19/2001, #9 Exhibit GG - Pages from Thomas Garrett's Deposition, #10 Exhibit HH - Pages from Eric Evans' Deposition, #11 Exhibit II - Pages from Paul Huffard's Deposition (6/8/2011), #12 Exhibit JJ - Minutes of the Meeting of the Board of Directors, 6/21/2001, #13 Exhibit KK - Presentation to the Senior Lender Group, #14 Exhibit LL - Potential Buyer/Investor Contact List, #15 Exhibit MM - Pages from Paul Huffard's Deposition (6/7/2002))(Brennan, Kimberly) Modified text on 10/4/2011 (K,V).
October 3, 2011 Filing 267 Reply to response to #238 Supplemental Motion for summary judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment filed by John D. Turner. (Henderson, Scott)
September 30, 2011 Filing 266 Joint Motion for leave to exceed page limitations filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Clifford Brown, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner, Plaintiff Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Niehaus, Stephanie)
September 22, 2011 Filing 265 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent of Status Conference held on 9/20/11. Fact discovery is complete. The Jury Trial date set for 11/14/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 15A may need to be extended to 11/21/11 due to Multi District Ligitation requirement for the Court. Time: 15 min. (R,JM)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting #264 Joint Motion for Extension of Time until October 3, 2011 to file reply memoranda in support of dispositive motions. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 9/22/11.(R,JM)
September 19, 2011 Filing 264 Joint Motion for extension of time until October 3, 2011 to file reply memoranda in support of dispositive motions filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner, Plaintiff Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Sullivan, Martha)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to exceed page limitations (Related Doc #254 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 9/14/11.(R,JM)
September 13, 2011 Filing 263 Memorandum Opinion and Order denying Motion by VP Buildings, Inc., to intervene as a party. (Related Doc #246 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent(C,KA)
September 13, 2011 Filing 262 Notice of Manual Filing filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. Related document(s) #260 , #256 , #257 , #261 , #258 , #259 .(Shmikler, Daniel)
September 13, 2011 Filing 261 Appendix to Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Responses filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. Related document(s) #260 , #256 , #257 , #258 , #259 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 31-43, #2 Exhibit 44-53, #3 Exhibit 54-61, #4 Exhibit 62-69, #5 Exhibit 70-82, #6 Exhibit 83-90, #7 Exhibit 91-99, #8 Exhibit 100-109, #9 Exhibit 110-129, #10 Exhibit 130-148)(Shmikler, Daniel)
September 12, 2011 Filing 260 Appendix to Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Responses filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. Related document(s) #256 , #257 , #258 , #259 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5, #2 Exhibit 6-8, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 10, #5 Exhibit 11, #6 Exhibit 12, #7 Exhibit 13, #8 Exhibit 14, #9 Exhibit 15, #10 Exhibit 16, #11 Exhibit 17, #12 Exhibit 18, #13 Exhibit 19, #14 Exhibit 20, #15 Exhibit 21, #16 Exhibit 22, #17 Exhibit 23, #18 Exhibit 24, #19 Exhibit 25, #20 Exhibit 26, #21 Exhibit 27, #22 Exhibit 28, #23 Exhibit 29, #24 Exhibit 30)(Shmikler, Daniel)
September 12, 2011 Filing 259 Response to #235 Motion for summary judgment , #236 Motion for summary judgment , #234 Motion for summary judgment , #238 Supplemental Motion for summary judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment, #231 Motion for summary judgment , #240 Motion for summary judgment with Respect to the Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #244 Motion for summary judgment (Related Docs 211, 214 (Depo. Transcripts filed 8/5/11) and Docs 233, 239, 242 (omnibus motions filed by all defendants on 8/8/11)) filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Shmikler, Daniel)
September 12, 2011 Filing 258 Response to #239 Omnibus Motion for summary judgment Based on the Applicable Statute of Limitations (Related Docs 197, 218, 219 (Depo. Transcripts filed 8/5/11)) filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Shmikler, Daniel)
September 12, 2011 Filing 257 Response to #242 Omnibus Motion for partial summary judgment on Counts I-IV and VI-VIII of the First Amended Complaint Based on the Business Judgment Rule filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Shmikler, Daniel)
September 12, 2011 Filing 256 Response to #233 Omnibus Motion for partial summary judgment on counts IX through XII of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Shmikler, Daniel)
September 12, 2011 Filing 255 Opposition to #227 Motion for partial summary judgment against Defendant Moran filed by Glen J. Moran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Jonathan R. Macey, #2 Exhibit B: Declaration of Glenn J. Moran, #3 Exhibit C: cited pages of deposition of Thomas Garrett, #4 Exhibit D: cited pages of deposition of Glenn Moran, #5 Exhibit E: cited pages of deposition of John Turner, #6 Exhibit F: ACC's discovery responses, #7 Exhibit G: Moran's discovery responses, #8 Exhibit H: Unanimous Written Consent by LTV Steel)(Sullivan, Martha)
September 9, 2011 Filing 254 Unopposed Motion for leave to exceed page limitations by Local Rule 7.1(f) filed by Plaintiff Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Barnett, Harvey)
September 8, 2011 Filing 253 Reply to response to #246 Motion to intervene as a party /Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion of VP Buildings, Inc. Distribution Trust to Intervene as Plaintiff filed by VP Buildings, Inc. Distribution Trust. (Ciaccio, Franklin)
September 6, 2011 Filing 252 Attorney Appearance by Philip M. Oliss filed by on behalf of Glen J. Moran. (Oliss, Philip)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting #251 Motion for Extension of Time until September 12, 2011 to Respond to Motions for Summary Judgment and time for reply briefs to be filed by September 26, 2011. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 9/6/11.(R,JM)
September 2, 2011 Filing 251 Joint Motion for extension of time until September 12, 2011 to Respond to Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Barnett, Harvey)
September 1, 2011 Filing 250 Response to #246 Motion to intervene as a party filed by LTV Steel Co. Inc.. (Gates, Lisa)
September 1, 2011 Filing 249 Attorney Appearance of Heather Lennox and Ryan Routh by Lisa B. Gates filed by on behalf of LTV Steel Co. Inc.. (Gates, Lisa)
August 29, 2011 Filing 248 Opposition to #246 Motion to intervene as a party by VP Buildings, Inc. Distribution Trust filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Sullivan, Martha)
August 29, 2011 Filing 247 Opposition to #246 Motion to intervene as a party by VP Buildings, Inc. Distribution Trust filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unreported and Other Selected Decisions)(VanNiel, Michael)
August 12, 2011 Filing 246 Motion to intervene as a party filed by Intervenor VP Buildings, Inc. Distribution Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proposed Intervening Complaint, #2 Brief in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion of VP Buildings, Inc. Distribution Trust to Intervene as Plaintiff, #3 Affidavit Affirmation of Franklin Ciaccio in Support of Motion To Intervene, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A - VP Plan, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B -Trust Agreement, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C - Disclosure Statement, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D - Notice of Disbandment, #8 Proposed Order)(Ciaccio, Franklin)
August 8, 2011 Filing 245 Motion for joinder joining in Individual Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Bricker, Moran, Garrett, Henning, Baske, and Evans filed by Defendant John D. Turner. Related document(s) #235 , #236 , #234 , #232 , #231 , #240 , #244 , #241 . (Henderson, Scott)
August 8, 2011 Filing 244 Motion for summary judgment (Related Docs 211, 214 (Depo. Transcripts filed 8/5/11) and Docs 233, 239, 242 (omnibus motions filed by all defendants on 8/8/11)) filed by Defendant Glen J. Moran. Related document(s) #239 , #214 , #211 , #233 , #242 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Glenn J. Moran, #3 Exhibit B - March 2001 K.E.R.P. Motion, #4 Exhibit C - March 2001 K.E.R.P. Order, #5 Exhibit D - February 2002 K.E.R.P. Order, #6 Exhibit E - Bylaws, #7 Exhibit F - Glenn Moran Deposition excerpts, #8 Exhibit G - Thomas Garrett Deposition excerpts, #9 Exhibit H - ACC's Answers to Interrogatories, #10 Exhibit I - Glenn Moran's Answers to Interrogatories, #11 Exhibit J - Stanziale v. Sun National Bank (D.N.J. 2010))(Sullivan, Martha)
August 8, 2011 Filing 243 Appendix to Omnibus Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts I-IV and VI-VIII of the First Amended Complaint Based on the Business Judgment Rule filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) #242 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3, #2 Exhibit 4-5 Part 1, #3 Exhibit 5 part 2, #4 Exhibit 6-8, #5 Exhibit 9-13, #6 Exhibit 14-21, #7 Exhibit 22-27, #8 Exhibit 28-38, #9 Exhibit 39-40, #10 Exhibit 41-45, #11 Exhibit 46 part 1, #12 Exhibit 46 part 2, #13 Exhibit 47-50, #14 Exhibit 51-52, #15 Exhibit 53-56, #16 Exhibit 57-60, #17 Exhibit 61-65, #18 Exhibit 66-69, #19 Exhibit 70-73, #20 Exhibit 74-75, #21 Exhibit 76-78, #22 Exhibit 79 part 1, #23 Exhibit 79 part 2, #24 Exhibit 80-83, #25 Exhibit 84-86 part 1, #26 Exhibit 86 part 2, #27 Exhibit 87-90, #28 Exhibit 91-94, #29 Exhibit 95-102)(Lepene, Alan)
August 8, 2011 Filing 242 Omnibus Motion for partial summary judgment on Counts I-IV and VI-VIII of the First Amended Complaint Based on the Business Judgment Rule filed by James Baske, William H. Bricker, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. Related document(s) #223 , #215 , #209 , #225 , #201 , #200 , #198 , #199 , #213 , #220 , #210 , #197 , #208 , #219 , #206 , #218 , #214 , #226 , #205 , #217 , #221 , #204 , #211 , #202 , #207 , #212 , #216 , #203 , #222 , #224 . (Lepene, Alan) Modified text on 8/11/2011 (B,B).
August 8, 2011 Filing 241 Appendix to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas L. Garrett. Related document(s) #240 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8, #2 Exhibit 9-12, #3 Exhibit 13, #4 Exhibit 14-16, #5 Exhibit 17-24)(Lepene, Alan)
August 8, 2011 Filing 240 Motion for summary judgment with Respect to the Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Thomas L. Garrett. Related document(s) #223 , #215 , #209 , #225 , #201 , #200 , #198 , #199 , #213 , #220 , #210 , #197 , #208 , #219 , #206 , #218 , #214 , #226 , #205 , #217 , #221 , #204 , #211 , #202 , #207 , #212 , #216 , #203 , #222 , #224 . (Lepene, Alan)
August 8, 2011 Filing 239 Omnibus Motion for summary judgment Based on the Applicable Statute of Limitations (Related Docs 197, 218, 219 (Depo. Transcripts filed 8/5/11)) filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit LTV Corp. Board Minutes dated Jan. 25, 2001, #3 Exhibit APP Draft dated June 28, 2001, #4 Exhibit Singer Dep. June 3, 2011, #5 Exhibit Meeting of UCC Presentation Powerpoint Sept. 6, 2001, #6 Exhibit LTV Corp. Board Minutes dated Nov. 19, 2001, #7 Exhibit APP Motion, #8 Exhibit APP Order, #9 Exhibit Notice of Appointment of ACC, #10 Exhibit May 18, 2004 Letter, #11 Exhibit June 16, 2004 Letter, #12 Exhibit Sprayregen Dep. Mar. 23, 2011, #13 Exhibit Sprayregen Dep. June 24, 2011, #14 Exhibit Pl.'s Resp. to Moran's Interrog. 3, #15 Exhibit Pl.'s Resp. to Turner's Interrog 10)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 8, 2011 Filing 238 Supplemental Motion for summary judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant John D. Turner. Related document(s) #221 , #220 , #237 , #197 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Appendix Table of Contents of Appendix, #3 Appendix Containing Exhibits A-K)(Henderson, Scott)
August 8, 2011 Filing 237 Affidavit/Declaration of John D. Turner filed by John D. Turner. (Henderson, Scott)
August 8, 2011 Filing 236 Motion for summary judgment filed by Defendant James Baske. Related document(s) #223 , #215 , #209 , #225 , #201 , #200 , #198 , #199 , #213 , #220 , #210 , #197 , #208 , #219 , #206 , #218 , #214 , #226 , #205 , #217 , #221 , #204 , #211 , #202 , #207 , #212 , #216 , #203 , #222 , #224 . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of James Baske, #3 Exhibit B - Baske Depo pages, #4 Exhibit C - Singer Depo pages, #5 Exhibit D - S. Evans Depo pages, #6 Exhibit E - Unreported Cases)(Niehaus, James)
August 8, 2011 Filing 235 Motion for summary judgment filed by Defendant Eric Evans. Related document(s) #223 , #215 , #209 , #225 , #201 , #200 , #198 , #199 , #213 , #220 , #210 , #197 , #208 , #219 , #206 , #218 , #214 , #226 , #205 , #217 , #221 , #204 , #211 , #202 , #207 , #212 , #216 , #203 , #222 , #224 . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Eric Evans, #3 Exhibit B - Evans Depo Pages, #4 Exhibit C - Unreported Cases, #5 Exhibit D - Sprayregen Depo Pages)(Niehaus, James)
August 8, 2011 Filing 234 Motion for summary judgment filed by Defendant George Henning. Related document(s) #223 , #215 , #209 , #225 , #201 , #200 , #198 , #199 , #213 , #220 , #210 , #197 , #208 , #219 , #206 , #218 , #214 , #226 , #205 , #217 , #221 , #204 , #211 , #202 , #207 , #212 , #216 , #203 , #222 , #224 . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of George Henning, #3 Exhibit B - Henning Depo pages, #4 Exhibit C - Unreported Cases)(Niehaus, James)
August 8, 2011 Filing 233 Omnibus Motion for partial summary judgment on counts IX through XII of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. Related document(s) #223 , #215 , #209 , #225 , #201 , #200 , #198 , #199 , #213 , #220 , #210 , #197 , #208 , #219 , #206 , #218 , #214 , #226 , #205 , #217 , #221 , #204 , #211 , #202 , #207 , #212 , #216 , #203 , #222 , #224 . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Babcock Affidavit, #3 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Supp. Responses to Evans' 2nd Set of Discovery, #4 Exhibit C - Pangere Depo Pages, #5 Exhibit D - Faroh Depo Pages, #6 Exhibit E - Calfee Depo Pages, #7 Exhibit F - Sloat Depo Pages, #8 Exhibit G - Varney Depo Pages, #9 Exhibit H - Affidavit of James Baske, #10 Exhibit I - Affidavit of Eric Evans, #11 Exhibit J - Affidavit of George Henning, #12 Exhibit K - Declaration of Glenn Moran, #13 Exhibit L - Declaration of John Turner, #14 Exhibit M - Affidavit of Tom Garrett, #15 Exhibit N - Sprayregen Depo Pages, #16 Exhibit O - Bottjen Depo Pages, #17 Exhibit P - Baske Depo Pages, #18 Exhibit Q - Evans Depo Pages, #19 Exhibit R - Unreported Cases)(Niehaus, James)
August 8, 2011 Filing 232 Brief /Memorandum In Support of the Motion for Summary Judgment filed by William Jeffrey Bricker. Related document(s) #223 , #215 , #201 , #200 , #198 , #199 , #197 , #206 , #226 , #217 , #221 , #204 , #202 , #231 , #207 , #212 , #203 , #209 , #225 , #213 , #220 , #210 , #208 , #219 , #218 , #214 , #205 , #211 , #216 , #222 , #224 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Errata I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X) (Glickman, Robert)
August 8, 2011 Filing 231 Motion for summary judgment filed by Defendant William Jeffrey Bricker. (Glickman, Robert)
August 5, 2011 Filing 230 Appendix to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendant Moran filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. Related document(s) #229 , #228 , #227 . (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exs. A-G, #2 Appendix Ex. H-L)(Shmikler, Daniel)
August 5, 2011 Filing 229 Affidavit/Declaration of Harvey J. Barnett in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendant Moran filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. Related document(s) #228 , #227 . (Shmikler, Daniel)
August 5, 2011 Filing 228 Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendant Moran filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. Related document(s) #227 . (Shmikler, Daniel)
August 5, 2011 Filing 227 Motion for partial summary judgment against Defendant Moran filed by Plaintiff Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Shmikler, Daniel)
August 5, 2011 Filing 226 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of James Miles, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of James Miles)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 225 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of Paul Huffard, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of Paul Huffard)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 224 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of David Heiman, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of David Heiman)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 223 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of James Faroh, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of James Faroh)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 222 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of William Calfee (Individually) filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of William Calfee)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 221 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of John Turner, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of John Turner)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 220 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of Amy Tonti, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of Amy Tonti)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 219 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of Joel Sprayregen, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of Joel Sprayregen)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 218 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of Paul Singer, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of Paul Singer)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 217 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of Scott Evans, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of Scott Evans)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 216 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of Raffiq Nathoo, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of Raffiq Nathoo)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 215 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of Bennett Murphy, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of Bennett Murphy)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 214 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of Glenn Moran, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of Glenn Moran)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 213 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of George Henning, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of George Henning)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 212 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of Leo Gerard, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of Leo Gerard)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 211 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of Thomas Garrett, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of Thomas Garrett)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 210 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of Eric Evans, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of Eric Evans)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 209 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of Donald de Camera, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of Donald de Camera)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 208 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of Thomas Bricker, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of Thomas Bricker)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 207 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of Darrell Bottjen, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of Darrell Bottjen)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 206 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of James Bonsall, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of James Bonsall)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 205 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of Bruce Bennett, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of Bruce Bennett)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 204 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of James Baske, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of James Baske)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 203 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of Steven Pangere, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of Steve Pangere)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 202 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of Marlene Sloat, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of Marlene Sloat)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 201 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of John Delmore, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of John Delmore)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 200 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of Richard McLaughlin, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of Richard McLaughlin)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 199 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of Douglas Varney, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of Douglas Varney)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 198 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of William Calfee, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of William Calfee)(Sullivan, Martha)
August 5, 2011 Filing 197 Notice of Filing of Deposition Transcript of Joel Sprayregen filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Deposition of Joel Sprayregen)(Sullivan, Martha)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Defendants' Motion for leave To File Omnibus and Individual Motions for Summary Judgment (Related Doc #196 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 7/29/11.(R,JM)
July 29, 2011 Filing 196 Motion for leave to File Omnibus and Individual Motions for Summary Judgment filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Sullivan, Martha)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Karen E. Meara for VP Buildings, Inc. Distribution Trust (Related Doc #195 )Judge Donald C. Nugent on 7/26/11.(R,JM)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Franklin R. Ciaccio for VP Buildings, Inc. Distribution Trust(Related Doc #194 ) Judge Donald C. Nugent on 7/26/11.(R,JM)
July 25, 2011 Filing 195 Motion for attorney Karen E. Meara to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4827479, filed by Intervenor VP Buildings, Inc. Distribution Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Karen E. Meara)(Ehrman, James)
July 25, 2011 Filing 194 Motion for attorney Franklin R. Ciaccio to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4827403, filed by Intervenor VP Buildings, Inc. Distribution Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Franklin Ciaccio)(Ehrman, James)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Elizabeth F. Collura for John D. Turner(Related Doc #187 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 7/21/11.(R,JM)
July 22, 2011 Filing 193 Stipulation & Order re #192 granting withdraw of Defendant Thomas L. Garrett's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Submit Interrogatory Answers and Plaintiff's Response Thereto. Judge Donald C. Nugent (R,JM)
July 14, 2011 Filing 192 Stipulated Notice of Withdrawal of Defendant Thomas L. Garrett Jr.'s Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Submit Interrogatory Answers and Plaintiff's Response Thereto filed by Thomas L. Garrett. Related document(s) #185 , #189 .(Campana, Jeremy)
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #190 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Their Respective Expert Reports and to Submit Reply Memoranda in Support of Dispositive Motions. Judge Donald C. Nugent (R,JM)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Order regarding #186 and #188 discovery dispute. Signed by Judge Donald C. Nugent on 7/8/11. (K,K)
July 8, 2011 Filing 190 Joint Motion for extension of time to Submit Their Respective Expert Reports and to Submit Reply Memoranda in Support of Dispositive Motions filed by Plaintiff Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (VanNiel, Michael)
July 7, 2011 Filing 189 Response to #185 Motion to compel plaintiff's discovery Plaintiff to Submit Interrogatory Answers filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Shmikler, Daniel) Modified on 7/8/2011 (W,G).
July 1, 2011 Filing 188 Letter Responding to Defendants' June 24, 2011 Letter filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. Related document(s) #186 . (Shmikler, Daniel)
June 29, 2011 Filing 187 Motion for attorney Elizabeth F. Collura to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4784743, filed by Defendant John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carothers, Patrick)
June 24, 2011 Filing 186 Letter filed by James Baske, Eric Evans, George Henning. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Videotaped 30(b)(6) Deposition of Joel Sprayregen, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Deposition (ACC), #3 Exhibit C - Email re: LTV - Deposition Notices)(Niehaus, James)
June 22, 2011 Filing 185 Motion to compel discovery Plaintiff to Submit Interrogatory Answers filed by Defendant Thomas L. Garrett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Garrett Interrogs. to Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit 2: Plaintiff Resp. to Garrett Interrogs., #3 Exhibit 3: Local R. 37.1 Correspondence, #4 Exhibit 4: Plaintiff Supp. Resp. to Garrett Interrogs., #5 Exhibit 5: Plaintiff Add'l Supp. Resp. to Garrett Interrogs.)(Williger, Stephen)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Order upon Plaintiff's request for additional responses to the Subpoena issued to third party Deloitte Consulting (ECF #172)(see order for details). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 6/6/11. (E,P) Modified text on 6/6/2011 (E,P).
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Order upon Plaintiff's request for the Court's intervention on the discovery dispute between Plaintiffs and third party Jones Day. (see order for details). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 6/6/11. (E,P)
May 31, 2011 Filing 182 Letter filed by Deloitte Consulting LLP. Related document(s) #172 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Turner, Peter)
May 31, 2011 Filing 181 Response filed by Reed Smith LLP, as Counsel for the former Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of the LTV Steel Company, Inc.. Related document(s) #172 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Taddonio, Gregory)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Lewis F. Murphy for Defendant Glenn J. Moran (Related Doc #178 ) Judge Donald C. Nugent on 5/31/11.(R,JM)
May 27, 2011 Filing 180 Transcript of Hearing held on May 24, 2011 before Judge Donald C. Nugent. To obtain a bound copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Shirle Perkins at 216-357-7106. [51 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 6/3/2011. Redaction Request due 6/17/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/25/2011. Related document(s) #179 . (P,Sh)
May 26, 2011 Filing 179 Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 5-24-11 before Judge Nugent, Requested completion date: 5-31-11 filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Barnett, Harvey)
May 26, 2011 Filing 178 Motion for attorney Lewis F. Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4728018, filed by Defendant Glen J. Moran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Lewis F. Murphy)(Sullivan, Martha)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 177 Order Marginal Order re #165 Motion for to Compel the ACC to Produce a Knowledgeable Rule 30(B)(6) Witness for a Full Day of Examination filed by George Henning, Eric Evans, James Baske. Motion Denied. The 30(b)(6) is overly broad and the requests contained in such 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition appear to seek information not contemplated by the Rule and which call for information of such proposed witness that go well beyond the scope of C.R. 30(b)(6) and the 7 hour request is excessive. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 5/24/11. (R,JM)
May 24, 2011 Filing 176 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent of Status Conference held on 5/24/11. Fact discovery to be completed by 6/27/11. Plaintiff to submit any expert reports by 8/01/11; any defense expert report to be submitted by 9/15/11. Any dispositive motion to be filed by 8/8/11; response due by 9/6/11; reply, if any, due 9/13/11. Status Conference set for 9/20/2011 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Jury Trial set for 11/14/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Time: 30 min. (R,JM)
May 23, 2011 Filing 175 Motion for protective order to terminate or limit Rule 30(b)(6) deposition filed by Plaintiff Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. Related document(s) #174 . (Shmikler, Daniel)
May 23, 2011 Filing 174 Response to #165 Motion for to Compel the ACC to Produce a Knowledgeable Rule 30(B)(6) Witness for a Full Day of Examination filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Shmikler, Daniel)
May 23, 2011 Filing 173 Letter Regarding Agenda Items for the May 24, 2011 Case Management Conference, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Sullivan, Martha)
May 23, 2011 Filing 172 Letter in re: Court's May 9, 2011 Order filed by James Baske, Eric Evans, George Henning. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deloitte 2nd Quarterly Fee Application, #2 Exhibit B - Deloitte 3rd Quarterly Fee Application, #3 Exhibit C - Chart of Deloitte reports submitted for in camera inspection)(Niehaus, James) Modified text on 5/24/2011 (K,V).
May 23, 2011 Filing 171 Motion for leave to file response regarding discovery dispute filed by Interested Party LTV Steel Co. Inc.. Related document(s) #168 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gates, Lisa)
May 19, 2011 Filing 170 Letter to the Honorable Donald C. Nugent filed by Reed Smith LLP, as Counsel for the former Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of the LTV Steel Company, Inc.. (Taddonio, Gregory)
May 19, 2011 Filing 169 Attorney Appearance by Lisa B. Gates filed by on behalf of LTV Steel Co. Inc.. (Gates, Lisa)
May 12, 2011 Notice (non-document)of Status Conference set for 5/24/2011 at 9:30 AM in Chambers 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. (R,JM)
May 10, 2011 Filing 168 Letter request to resolve a discovery dispute filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Barnett, Harvey)
May 9, 2011 Filing 167 Memorandum Opinion and Order Granting re #144 Motion for protective order filed by Reed Smith LLP, as Counsel for the former Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of the LTV Steel Company, Inc., Denying #140 Joint Motion to compel discovery (Production of Documents from 21 Non-Parties) filed by John D. Turner, George Henning, Eric Evans, Glen J. Moran, James Baske, Thomas L. Garrett, William H. Bricker. In addition, the February 28 Non-Doc Order granting Defendants' Motion to Compel against USWA is Vacated to the extent, it remains pending. Denying #126 Motion to compel discovery filed by George Henning, Eric Evans, James Baske.. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 5/9/11. (E,P)
May 9, 2011 Filing 166 Notice of Filing the Stenographic Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Transcript of Joel Sprayregen filed by James Baske, Eric Evans, George Henning. (Attachments: #1 Videotaped 30(b)(6) Deposition of Joel Sprayregen, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33)(Niehaus, James)
May 6, 2011 Filing 165 Motion for to Compel the ACC to Produce a Knowledgeable Rule 30(B)(6) Witness for a Full Day of Examination filed by James Baske, Eric Evans, George Henning. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Notice of Deposition (ACC), #3 Exhibit B - Letter to James Niehaus, #4 Exhibit C - Videotaped Deposition of Joel Sprayregen, #5 Exhibit D - Letter to Bruce Sperling, #6 Exhibit E - Email from Harvey Barnett, #7 Exhibit F - Case Law, #8 Exhibit G - Responses to Second Set of Discovery Requests)(Niehaus, James)
May 6, 2011 Filing 164 Attorney Appearance of Joseph P. Rodgers, and the Withdrawal of Thomas S. Kilbane, by Amy Cadle Hocevar filed by on behalf of Glen J. Moran. (Hocevar, Amy)
April 26, 2011 Filing 163 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent.Oral Hearing held on 3/31/11 on non party's objections to motion to compel and to defendant's joint motion to compel production of documents from 21 non-parties (Court Reporter: Shirle Perkins.) (E,P)
April 20, 2011 Filing 162 Notice of Withdrawal, Without Prejudice, of Defendant Glenn Moran's Motion to Compel Cleveland Cliffs, Inc. nka Cliffs Natural Resources, Inc. to Comply with Rule 45 Subpoena for the Production of Documents filed by Glen J. Moran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: 3/30/11 E-mail)Related document(s) #148 .(Niehaus, Stephanie)
April 18, 2011 Filing 161 Proposed Order Stipulated Non-Waiver and Clawback Agreement and Order filed by Reed Smith LLP, as Counsel for the former Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of the LTV Steel Company, Inc.. (Doerfler, James)
April 15, 2011 Filing 160 Stipulated non-waiver and clawback order re #142 . Judge Donald C. Nugent (C,KA)
April 13, 2011 Filing 159 Opposition to #148 Motion to compel discovery Defendant Glenn Moran's Motion To Compel Cleveland Cliffs, Inc. nka Cliffs Natural Resources, Inc. To Comply With Rule 45 Subpoena For The Production Of Documents filed by Cliffs Natural Resources Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit March 29, 2011 letter)(Fogarty, Robert)
April 12, 2011 Filing 158 Protective Order Judge Donald C. Nugent(C,KA)
April 12, 2011 Filing 157 Stipulated non-waiver and clawback order re #156 . Judge Donald C. Nugent (C,KA)
April 11, 2011 Filing 156 Proposed Order Stipulated Non-Waiver and Clawback Order filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, Official Committee of Administrative Claimants, John D. Turner. (Campana, Jeremy)
April 8, 2011 Filing 155 Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 03/31/11 before Judge Nugent, Court Reporter: Heide Geizer. Requested completion date: 04/15/11 filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (VanNiel, Michael)
April 5, 2011 Filing 154 Proposed Order re: Fact Discovery Cut-Off filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, Official Committee of Administrative Claimants, John D. Turner. (Kilbane, Thomas)
March 30, 2011 Filing 153 Proposed Stipulation / Stipulated Protective Order filed by James Baske, William H. Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, Official Committee of Administrative Claimants, John D. Turner, United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local 979. (Niehaus, James)
March 30, 2011 Filing 152 Attorney Appearance by Gregory L. Taddonio filed by on behalf of Reed Smith LLP, as Counsel for the former Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of the LTV Steel Company, Inc.. (Taddonio, Gregory)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney David A. Gordon for Deloitte Consulting LLP (Related Doc #147 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 3/30/11.(R,JM)
March 29, 2011 Filing 151 Opposition to #144 Motion by Reed Smith for protective order filed by All Defendants. (Williger, Stephen) Modified text on 3/30/2011 (K,V).
March 29, 2011 Filing 150 Response to #140 Joint Motion to compel discovery (Production of Documents from 21 Non-Parties) filed by Reed Smith LLP, as Counsel for the former Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of the LTV Steel Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Doerfler, James)
March 29, 2011 Filing 149 Attorney Appearance by Colleen C. Murnane and by Julie R. Fenstermaker filed by on behalf of James Baske, Eric Evans, George Henning. (Fenstermaker, Julie)
March 28, 2011 Filing 148 Motion to compel discovery Defendant Glenn Moran's Motion To Compel Cleveland Cliffs, Inc. nka Cliffs Natural Resources, Inc. To Comply With Rule 45 Subpoena For The Production Of Documents filed by Defendant Glen J. Moran. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Niehaus, Stephanie)
March 28, 2011 Filing 147 Motion for attorney David A. Gordon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4622607, filed by Interested Party Deloitte Consulting LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Turner, Peter)
March 28, 2011 Filing 146 Attorney Appearance as Local Counsel by Peter Turner filed by on behalf of Deloitte Consulting LLP. (Turner, Peter)
March 25, 2011 Filing 145 Brief in Support of Motion for Protective Order filed by Reed Smith LLP, as Counsel for the former Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of the LTV Steel Company, Inc.. Related document(s) #144 . (Doerfler, James)
March 25, 2011 Filing 144 Motion for protective order filed by Intervenor Reed Smith LLP, as Counsel for the former Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of the LTV Steel Company, Inc.. Related document(s) #139 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Doerfler, James)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Order re #129 Granting Motion to intervene as a party, Reed Smith LLP is permitted to make a limited apppearance in this matter by Reed Smith LLP in its Capacity as Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to LTV Steel Company, Inc. to Ensure Preservation of Privilege and Protections and for a Stay of Non-Party Committee- filed by Reed Smith LLP, as Counsel for the former Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of the LTV Steel Company, Inc. Status Conference currently set for 3/29/11 at 9:00 a.m. is hereby cancelled. Discovery Hearing set for 3/31/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 3/23/11. (E,P)
March 18, 2011 Filing 142 Proposed Stipulation For Stipulated Non-Waiver Clawback Order filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (VanNiel, Michael)
March 17, 2011 Filing 141 Notice of filing Amended Exhibit to Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Production of Documents From 21 Non-Parties filed by James Baske, William H. Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoenaed Entity Chart)(Williger, Stephen)
March 15, 2011 Filing 140 Joint Motion to compel discovery (Production of Documents from 21 Non-Parties) filed by James Baske, William H. Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Subpoenaed Entities Chart, #2 Exhibit 2: E-Mail March 11, 2011, #3 Exhibit 3: Draft UCC Bylaws, #4 Exhibit 4: APP Hearing Transcript Excerpt, #5 Exhibit 5: Koppers, Inc. Subpoena, #6 Exhibit 6:Reed Smith, LLP Subpoena, #7 Exhibit 7: Koppers, Inc. Subpoena Response, #8 Exhibit 8: Reed Smith, LLP Subpoena Response, #9 Exhibit 9: Reed Smith Privilege Log Excerpt, #10 Defendant's Joint Motion for Leave to File Motion and Supporting Memorandum in Excess of Page Limit, Instanter)(Williger, Stephen)
March 14, 2011 Filing 139 Reply Motion to intervene as a party to Defendants' Joint Opposition to Motion filed by Intervenor Reed Smith LLP, as Counsel for the former Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of the LTV Steel Company, Inc.. Related document(s) #136 . (Attachments: #1 Pleading Ex. A Proposed Motion for Protective Order)(Doerfler, James) Modified text on 3/15/2011 (K,V).
March 10, 2011 Filing 138 Reply to response to #126 Motion to compel discovery filed by James Baske, Eric Evans, George Henning. (Niehaus, James)
March 7, 2011 Filing 137 Response to #126 Motion to compel discovery filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local 979. (Fusco, David)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Spenser Q. Friel for LTV Steel Co. Inc. Related Doc #134 ) Judge Donald C. Nugent (R,JM)
March 3, 2011 Filing 136 Opposition to #129 Motion to intervene as a party by Reed Smith LLP in its Capacity as Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to LTV Steel Company, Inc. to Ensure Preservation of Privilege and Protections and for a Stay of Non-Party Committee- filed by James Baske, William H. Bricker, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Williger, Stephen)
March 3, 2011 Filing 135 Attorney Appearance filed by Stephen D. Williger , and Karen E. Rubin on behalf of Thomas L. Garrett. (Williger, Stephen) Modified text on 3/4/2011 (B,B).
March 2, 2011 Filing 134 Motion for attorney Spenser Q. Friel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4578685, filed by Plaintiff Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (VanNiel, Michael)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting #132 Motion for Extension of Time re #132 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until March 7, 2011 to Respond to Defendants Eric Evans,George Henning and James Baske's Motion to Compel Discovery. Judge Donald C. Nugent (R,JM)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Defendants Eric Evans, George Henning and AJames Baske's Motion to compel discovery (Related Doc #126 ) Judge Donald C. Nugent (R,JM)
February 28, 2011 Filing 133 Marginal Entry Order denying Motion at this time. However non parties United Steel Workers and United Steelworkers, Local 979 may submit an expense request and the Court will review such request at conclusion of trial and the Court may order such expenses as costs. Related Doc #127 ) Judge Donald C. Nugent (R,JM)
February 25, 2011 Filing 132 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until March 7, 2011 to Respond to Defendants Eric Evans, George Henning and James Baske's Motion to Compel Discovery filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local 979. Related document(s) #126 . (Fusco, David)
February 23, 2011 Filing 131 Opposition to #127 Joint Motion for Reimbursement of Certain Expenses in Complying with Subpoenas filed by James Baske, Eric Evans, George Henning. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James B. Niehaus)(Niehaus, James)
February 21, 2011 Filing 130 Memorandum In Support of #129 Motion to intervene as a party by Reed Smith LLP in its Capacity as Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to LTV Steel Company, Inc. to Ensure Preservation of Privilege and Protections and for a Stay of Non-Party Committee- Related Discovery filed by Reed Smith LLP, as Counsel for the former Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of the LTV Steel Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration)(Doerfler, James)
February 21, 2011 Filing 129 Motion to intervene as a party by Reed Smith LLP in its Capacity as Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to LTV Steel Company, Inc. to Ensure Preservation of Privilege and Protections and for a Stay of Non-Party Committee-Related Discovery filed by Intervenor Reed Smith LLP, as Counsel for the former Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of the LTV Steel Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Doerfler, James)
February 12, 2011 Filing 128 Affidavit/Declaration Certificate of Sevice filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local 979. Related document(s) #127 . (Fusco, David)
February 12, 2011 Filing 127 Joint Motion for Reimbursement of Certain Expenses in Complying with Subpoenas filed by United Steelworkers, United Steelworkers, Local 979. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Affidavit Declaration of David R. Jury, #3 Exhibit A- USW Subpoena, #4 Exhibit B- USW Local 979 Subpoena, #5 Exhibit C- 1/15/11 Letter, #6 Exhibit D- 12/7/10 Letter, #7 Exhibit E- 12/9/10 Letter, #8 Exhibit F- 12/14/10 Letter, #9 Exhibit G- 12/16/10 Letter, #10 Exhibit H- 12/21/10 Letter, #11 Exhibit I- 1/11/11 Letter, #12 Exhibit J- 1/14/11 Letter, #13 Exhibit K- DERS Proposal, #14 Exhibit L- 2/8/11 Letter, #15 Exhibit OD&M Trust Agreement)(Fusco, David) (Attachment 15 replaced on 2/14/2011) (K,V).
February 11, 2011 Filing 126 Motion to compel discovery filed by James Baske, Eric Evans, George Henning. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Niehaus, James) (Attachment 9 replaced on 2/14/2011) (K,V).
February 10, 2011 Filing 125 Protective Order. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 2/10/11. (E,P)
February 10, 2011 Filing 124 Non-Waiver and Clawback Order. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 2/10/11. (E,P)
February 9, 2011 Filing 123 Proposed Order Stipulated Non-Waiver Clawback Order filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (VanNiel, Michael)
February 7, 2011 Filing 122 Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Daniel A. Shmikler for plaintiff, Official Committee of Administrative Claimants (Related Doc #120 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 2/7/11.(E,P)
February 4, 2011 Filing 121 Proposed Stipulation : Stipulated Protective Order filed by James Baske, William H. Bricker, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, Official Committee of Administrative Claimants, John D. Turner. (Sullivan, Martha)
February 4, 2011 Filing 120 Motion for attorney Daniel A. Shmikler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4535348, filed by Plaintiff Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (VanNiel, Michael)
January 20, 2011 Filing 119 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent.Status Conference held on 1/20/2011. Status Conference reset for 3/29/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. (Court Reporter: None.)Time: 30 minutes. (K,K)
January 6, 2011 Filing 118 Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Approval of Discovery Plan and Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. Related document(s) #117 , #116 . (Sullivan, Martha)
December 23, 2010 Filing 117 Motion to compel discovery Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants to Appear for Their Depositions and Response to Defendants' Motion for a Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. Related document(s) #116 . (VanNiel, Michael)
December 21, 2010 Filing 116 Motion for Approval of Discovery Plan filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. Related document(s) #115 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter dated 12/9/10, #2 Exhibit B - Letter dated 12/10/10, #3 Exhibit C - Letter dated 12/14/10, #4 Exhibit D (part 1) - Letter dated 12/16/10, #5 Exhibit D (part 2) - Letter dated 12/16/10, #6 Exhibit E - Email dated 12/20/10, #7 Exhibit F - Letter dated 12/14/10)(Sullivan, Martha)
December 17, 2010 Filing 115 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent.Telephone Conference held on 12/17/10. Parties attempting to resolve several discovery disputes (Court Reporter: None.)Time: 20 minutes. (E,P) Modified text on 12/20/2010 (B,B).
December 16, 2010 Filing 114 Letter to the Honorable Judge Donald C. Nugent filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sullivan, Martha)
December 15, 2010 Filing 113 Notice of Telephonic discovery Conference set for 12/17/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. (C,KA)
December 14, 2010 Filing 112 Letter response to Martha Sullivan's letter dated December 9, 2010 regarding a discovery dispute filed by All Plaintiffs. (Barnett, Harvey)
December 10, 2010 Filing 111 Letter In Response to Request to Resolve Discovery Dispute (Ecf Doc 110 ) filed on behalf of all Co-Defendants and filed by Glen J. Moran. Related document(s) #110 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter Regarding Deposition Scheduling, #2 Exhibit B - Document Data Bank Index)(Sullivan, Martha)
December 9, 2010 Filing 110 Letter Request to Resolve Discovery Dispute filed by All Plaintiffs. (Barnett, Harvey)
November 9, 2010 Filing 109 Errata Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by John D. Turner. Related document(s) #31 , #107 . (Henderson, Scott) Modified to create additional link on 11/10/2010 (B,B).
November 8, 2010 Filing 108 Answer with jury demand to #31 First Amended complaint, filed by Thomas L. Garrett. (Campana, Jeremy) Modified text on 11/9/2010 (B,B).
November 8, 2010 Filing 107 Answer with jury demand to #31 First Amended complaint, filed by John D. Turner. (Henderson, Scott) Modified text on 11/9/2010 (B,B).
November 8, 2010 Filing 106 Answer with jury demand to #31 First Amended complaint, filed by Glen J. Moran. (Kilbane, Thomas) Modified text on 11/9/2010 (B,B).
November 8, 2010 Filing 105 Answer with jury demand to #31 First Amended complaint, filed by Eric Evans. (Niehaus, James) Modified text on 11/9/2010 (B,B).
November 8, 2010 Filing 104 Answer with jury demand to #31 First Amended complaint, filed by James Baske. (Niehaus, James) Modified text on 11/9/2010 (B,B).
November 8, 2010 Filing 103 Answer with jury demand to #31 First Amended complaint, filed by George Henning. (Niehaus, James) Modified text on 11/9/2010 (B,B).
November 8, 2010 Filing 102 Answer with jury demand to #31 First Amended complaint, filed by William H. Bricker, William Jeffrey Bricker. (Glickman, Robert) Modified text on 11/9/2010 (B,B).
November 3, 2010 Filing 101 Proposed Stipulation Extending time to file Answers to First Amended Complaint, until to and including November 8, 2010. filed by James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. Related document(s) #31 .(Kilbane, Thomas)
November 2, 2010 Filing 100 Proposed Stipulation Extending Time to File Answer to First Amended Complaint until 11/8/2010 filed by John D. Turner. (Henderson, Scott) Modified text on 11/3/2010 (B,B).
October 29, 2010 Set Deadlines and Hearings Discovery due by 4/27/2011. (B,B)
October 29, 2010 Filing 99 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent of Status Conference held on 10/27/10. Counsel for all parties present. Fact discovery cutoff is April 27, 2011. Next Status Conference is set for 1/19/2011 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Time: 15 min. (R,JM)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting #98 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for which Defendants are to File Answers to the First Amended Complaint and to continue status conference. Status conference re-scheduled to be held on 10/27/2010 at 09:30 AM in Chambers 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent.(R,JM)
September 28, 2010 Filing 98 Joint Motion for extension of status conference until October 26 or October 27, 2010 and enlargement of time to answer amended complaint to 7 days after status conference filed by Dennis Babcock, James Baske, William H. Bricker, William Jeffrey Bricker, Clifford Brown, Does 1-100, Inclusive, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner, Interested Party LTV Steel Co. Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Barnett, Harvey) Modified text on 9/28/2010 (B,B).
September 22, 2010 Filing 97 Notice of Status Conference set for 9/30/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. (C,KA)
September 22, 2010 Filing 96 Judgment terminating defendants Clifford Brown and Dennis Babcock (related docs #93 and #94 ), and their pending motions to dismiss are moot and terminated (docs #50 and #59 ). Furthermore, for the reasons set forth in this Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Omnibus Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint #53 , and the individual Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendants William Jeffrey Bricker #46 , John D. Turner #47 , George Henning #49 ,Eric Evans #51 , James Baske #52 , Glen J. Moran #58 , and Thomas L.Garrett #61 are denied. Judge Donald C. Nugent(C,KA)
September 22, 2010 Filing 95 Memorandum Opinion and Order terminating defendants Clifford Brown and Dennis Babcock (related docs #93 and #94 ), and their pending motions to dismiss are moot and terminated (docs #50 and #59 . Furthermore, for the reasons set forth in this Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Omnibus Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint #53 , and the individual Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendants William Jeffrey Bricker #46 , John D. Turner #47 , George Henning #49 ,Eric Evans #51 , James Baske #52 , Glen J. Moran #58 , and Thomas L.Garrett #61 are denied. Judge Donald C. Nugent(C,KA)
July 16, 2010 Filing 94 Proposed Stipulation to Dismiss - Clifford R. Brown filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants, Clifford Brown. (VanNiel, Michael) Modified text on 7/16/2010 (B,B).
July 16, 2010 Filing 93 Proposed Stipulation to Dismiss - Dennis Babcock filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants, Dennis Babcock. (VanNiel, Michael) Modified text on 7/16/2010 (B,B).
April 30, 2010 Filing 92 Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Unreported Cases - Part 1, #12 Unreported Cases - Part 2) (Related doc #46 , #47 , #49 , #50 , #51 , #52 , #53 , #59 , #61 ) (VanNiel, Michael) Modified to create links on 5/3/2010 (B,B).
April 30, 2010 Filing 91 Post-Hearing Supplemental Brief in Support of Their Omnibus and Individual Motions to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Dennis Babcock, James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Clifford Brown, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. Related document(s) #53 . (Kilbane, Thomas) Modified text on 5/3/2010 (B,B).
April 23, 2010 Filing 90 Transcript of Oral Argument on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss held on 04-16-2010 before Judge Donald C. Nugent. To obtain a bound copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Heidi Blueskye Geizer at 216 357 7092. [81 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the court reporter. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 4/30/2010. Redaction Request due 5/14/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/24/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2010. Related document(s) #88 . (G,He)
April 21, 2010 Filing 89 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-TO BE RE-FILED. Transcript of Oral Argument on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss held on 04-16-2010 before Judge Donald C. Nugent. To obtain a bound copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Heidi Blueskye Geizer at 216 357 7092. [80 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the court reporter. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 4/28/2010. Redaction Request due 5/12/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/24/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2010. Related document(s) #88 . (G,He) Modified on 4/23/2010 (R,N).
April 19, 2010 Filing 88 Expedited Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on April 16, 2010 before Judge Nugent, Court Reporter: Heidi Geizer. Requested completion date: April 19, 2010 filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (VanNiel, Michael)
April 16, 2010 Filing 87 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent of Oral Hearing held on all Defendants Motions to Dismiss. Defendants Dennis Babcock and Clifford Brown have reached a resolution subject to Bankruptcy Court approval. Arguments of counsel made - Court to rule. Judge Donald C. Nugent (Court Reporter: Heidi Geizer.)Time: 2 hrs. (R,JM)
April 15, 2010 Filing 86 Letter to Judge Nugent dated April 15, 2010 to advise the Court of a recent decision by the First Circuit Court of Appeals in Riley v. Decoulos filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (VanNiel, Michael)
March 3, 2010 Notice to Attorney Louis F. Solimine. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, please apply for admission or file a motion to be admitted pro hac vice within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, file a motion to withdraw as attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 within 10 business days. Notice sent to attorney on 3/3/10 by U.S. Mail. (P,G)
February 26, 2010 Filing 85 Reply to response to #59 Motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Clifford Brown. (Campana, Jeremy)
February 26, 2010 Filing 84 Reply to response to #61 Motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Thomas L. Garrett. (Campana, Jeremy)
February 26, 2010 Filing 83 Reply to response to #47 Motion to dismiss filed by John D. Turner. (Henderson, Scott)
February 26, 2010 Filing 82 Reply to response to #58 Motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Glen J. Moran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 9-6-01 Liquidity Presentation, Appendix I)(Kilbane, Thomas) Modified text on 3/3/2010 (B,B).
February 26, 2010 Filing 81 Reply to response to #53 Motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Dennis Babcock, James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Clifford Brown, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Brief in Support of Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss (pages 39-43), Appendix HH, #2 Exhibit B - 9-27-01 board meeting meetings, Appendix II, #3 Exhibit C - 9-6-01 Liquidity Presentation, Appendix JJ, #4 Exhibit D - 6-21-01 board meeting minutes, Appendix KK)(Kilbane, Thomas) Modified text on 3/3/2010 (B,B).
February 26, 2010 Filing 80 Reply to response to #46 Motion to dismiss filed by William Jeffrey Bricker. (Glickman, Robert) Modified text on 2/26/2010 (B,B).
February 26, 2010 Filing 79 Reply to response to #49 Motion to dismiss filed by George Henning. (Attachments: #1 Unreported Cases)(Niehaus, James)
February 26, 2010 Filing 78 Reply to response to #52 Motion to dismiss filed by James Baske. (Attachments: #1 Unreported Cases)(Niehaus, James)
February 26, 2010 Filing 77 Reply to response to #50 Motion to dismiss filed by Dennis Babcock. (Attachments: #1 Unreported Cases)(Niehaus, James)
February 26, 2010 Filing 76 Reply to response to #51 Motion to dismiss filed by Eric Evans. (Attachments: #1 Unreported Cases - Part 1, #2 Unreported Cases - Part 2, #3 Unreported Cases - Part 3, #4 Unreported Cases - Part 4, #5 Unreported Cases - Part 5)(Niehaus, James)
February 22, 2010 Filing 75 Marginal Order granting Stipulation regarding One - Week Extension To Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule. Judge Donald C. Nugent (Related doc #74 ) (R,JM) Modified to create link on 2/26/2010 (B,B).
February 14, 2010 Filing 74 Proposed Stipulation Regarding One-Week Extension To Motion To Dismiss Briefing Schedule filed by Glen J. Moran. (Sullivan, Martha)
February 5, 2010 Set Deadlines and Hearings. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Related document(s) #73 . (B,IE)
February 2, 2010 Filing 73 Marginal Entry Order granting Joint Motion to Re-scheduled Hearing to April 16, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. (Related Doc #72 ) Judge Donald C. Nugent(R,JM)
January 14, 2010 Filing 72 Joint Motion for rescheduling hearing filed by Plaintiff Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Braganca, Celiza)
January 5, 2010 Notice (non-document)of Hearing set for 2/26/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. (R,JM)
December 11, 2009 Filing 71 Notice of Filing of Plaintiff's Appendix in Support of Briefs in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. Related document(s) #68 , #70 , #69 .(VanNiel, Michael)
December 11, 2009 Filing 70 Opposition to #50 Motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Motion of Dennis Babcock to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Babcock Unpub. Decisions, #2 Exhibit Babcock Unpub. Decisions)(VanNiel, Michael)
December 11, 2009 Filing 69 Opposition to #61 Motion to dismiss, #46 Motion to dismiss, #52 Motion to dismiss, #51 Motion to dismiss, #49 Motion to dismiss, #58 Motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint, #47 Motion to dismiss, #59 Motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Consolidated Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Individual Motions to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unpublished Case Law, #2 Exhibit Unpublished Case Law, #3 Exhibit Unpublished Case Law, #4 Exhibit Unpublished Case Law, #5 Exhibit Unpublished Case Law, #6 Exhibit Unpublished Case Law, #7 Exhibit Unpublished Case Law, #8 Exhibit Unpublished Case Law, #9 Exhibit Unpublished Case Law)(VanNiel, Michael)
December 11, 2009 Filing 68 Opposition to #53 Motion to dismiss : Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unpublished Authorities, #2 Exhibit Unpublished Authorities, #3 Exhibit Unpublished Authorities, #4 Exhibit Unpublished Authorities, #5 Exhibit Unpublished Authorities, #6 Exhibit Unpublished Authorities, #7 Exhibit Unpublished Authorities, #8 Exhibit Unpublished Authorities, #9 Exhibit Unpublished Authorities, #10 Exhibit Unpublished Authorities, #11 Exhibit Unpublished Authorities)(VanNiel, Michael)
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting #67 Unopposed Motions to dismiss briefing schedule until December 11, 2009. Judge Donald C. Nugent (R,JM)
December 3, 2009 Filing 67 Unopposed Motion for extension of response to motions to dismiss until December 11, 2009 filed by Plaintiff Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Sperling, Bruce)
November 20, 2009 Filing 66 Proposed Stipulation Regarding Motions to Dismiss Briefing Schedule filed by Dennis Babcock, James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Clifford Brown, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, Official Committee of Administrative Claimants, John D. Turner. Related document(s) #61 , #55 , #46 , #57 , #52 , #51 , #62 , #53 , #49 , #58 , #56 , #47 , #54 , #48 , #59 , #60 , #50 .(VanNiel, Michael)
November 20, 2009 Notice (non-document) of Status Conference set for 1/8/2010 at 9:00 AM in Chambers 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. (R,JM)
November 4, 2009 Filing 65 Stipulation Regarding Motions to Dismiss Briefing Schedule filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Goldman, Matthew) Modified text on 11/5/2009 (B,IE).
October 28, 2009 Filing 64 Proposed Order Proposed Stipulation regarding Motions to Dismiss Briefing Schedule filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Goldman, Matthew)
October 6, 2009 Filing 63 Attorney Appearance by Kimberly A. Brennan filed by on behalf of William Jeffrey Bricker. (Brennan, Kimberly)
September 18, 2009 Filing 62 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Thomas L. Garrett. Related document(s) #61 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Campana, Jeremy)
September 18, 2009 Filing 61 Motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Thomas L. Garrett. (Campana, Jeremy)
September 18, 2009 Filing 60 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Clifford Brown. Related document(s) #59 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Campana, Jeremy)
September 18, 2009 Filing 59 Motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Clifford Brown. (Campana, Jeremy)
September 18, 2009 Filing 58 Motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Glen J. Moran. Related document(s) #31 . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Glenn Moran filed 5/25/05 (Bk Ecf No 8817-1), #3 Exhibit B - Second KERP Order filed 2/14/02 (Bk Ecf No 2452))(Kilbane, Thomas)
September 18, 2009 Filing 57 Exhibit N - LTV Corp 10-Q filed on 10/31/01 in support of Defendants Omnibus Motion to Dismiss filed by Dennis Babcock, James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Clifford Brown, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. Related document(s) #53 . (Kilbane, Thomas) Modified text on 9/28/2009 (B,IE).
September 18, 2009 Filing 56 Exhibit K (LTV Steel Co. Factual Analysis, Ex B (Ecf No. 25) and Exhibits L, M and O in support of Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss filed by Dennis Babcock, James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Clifford Brown, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. Related document(s) #53 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L - Judge Baxter Hearing Transcript 8/9/05, #2 Exhibit M - Polster Opinion in Black v Official Comm. (Case No. 02CV1668, 1812), #3 Exhibit O - Press Releases (9/27/01 and 11/8/01))(Kilbane, Thomas) Modified text on 9/28/2009 (B,IE).
September 18, 2009 Filing 55 Exhibit F (LTV Corp Board Minutes - 11/19/01) and Exhibits G, H, I & J in support of Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss filed by Dennis Babcock, James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Clifford Brown, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. Related document(s) #53 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G - LTV Steel Bylaws, #2 Exhibit H - Judge Bodoh Hearing Transcript - 12/5/01, #3 Exhibit I - Motion of the LTV Debtors, Copperweld Debtors, and VP Debtors for Order (BK Ecf no. 6127), #4 Exhibit J - LTV Steel Limited Objection to motion for order (BK Ecf No. 8811))(Kilbane, Thomas) Modified text on 9/28/2009 (B,IE).
September 18, 2009 Filing 54 Exhibit A (Motion of Debtors for Order BK Ecf No 648) and Exhibits B, C, D & E in support of Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss filed by Dennis Babcock, James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Clifford Brown, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. Related document(s) #53 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - LTV Corp Board Minutes - 2/23/01, #2 Exhibit C - Debtors Motion for Order (Bk Ecf No 594), #3 Exhibit D - LTV Corp Board Minutes - 1/25/01, #4 Exhibit E - LTV Corp Board Minutes - 4/9/01)(Kilbane, Thomas) Modified text on 9/28/2009 (B,IE).
September 18, 2009 Filing 53 Motion to dismiss : Defendants' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Dennis Babcock, James Baske, William Jeffrey Bricker, Clifford Brown, Eric Evans, Thomas L. Garrett, George Henning, Glen J. Moran, John D. Turner. Related document(s) #31 . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defts' Omnibus Motion to Dismiss)(Kilbane, Thomas)
September 18, 2009 Filing 52 Motion to dismiss filed by Defendant James Baske. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Niehaus, James)
September 18, 2009 Filing 51 Motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Eric Evans. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Niehaus, James)
September 18, 2009 Filing 50 Motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Dennis Babcock. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Niehaus, James)
September 18, 2009 Filing 49 Motion to dismiss filed by Defendant George Henning. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)Document contains s/ signature of Attorney James B. Niehaus (Carr, Lindsey) Modified text on 9/28/2009 (B,IE).
September 18, 2009 Filing 48 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by John D. Turner. Related document(s) #47 . (Henderson, Scott)
September 18, 2009 Filing 47 Motion to dismiss filed by Defendant John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henderson, Scott)
September 18, 2009 Filing 46 Motion to dismiss filed by Defendant William Jeffrey Bricker. Related document(s) #31 . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss of Defendant, William Jeffrey Bricker, as Executor of the Estate of William H. Bricker, #2 Exhibit A to Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit B to Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit C to Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit D to Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit E to Motion to Dismiss, #7 Exhibit F to Motion to Dismiss, #8 Exhibit G to Motion to Dismiss, #9 Exhibit H to Motion to Dismiss, #10 Exhibit I to Motion to Dismiss)(Glickman, Robert)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion to withdraw as attorney, attorney Brian McCormack removed from case. (Related Doc #45 )Judge Donald C. Nugent(R,JM)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Bruce Sperling for Official Committee of Administrative Claimants (Related Doc #44 )Judge Donald C. Nugent(R,JM)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Celiza P. Braganca for Official Committee of Administrative Claimants (Related Doc #43 )Judge Donald C. Nugent(R,JM)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Harvey J. Barnett, Jr for Official Committee of Administrative Claimants (Related Doc #42 )Judge Donald C. Nugent(R,JM) Modified to remove docket number on 9/15/2009 (B,IE).
August 31, 2009 Filing 45 Motion by Brian McCormack and Daniel J. Callahan of Callahan & Blaine to withdraw as attorney filed by Plaintiff Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Hutchinson, Jr., Joseph)
August 28, 2009 Filing 44 Motion for attorney Bruce S. Sperling to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 14660031682, filed by Plaintiff Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bruce S. Sperling)(E,P)
August 28, 2009 Filing 43 Motion for attorney Celiza P. Braganca to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 1460031683, filed by Plaintiff Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Celiza P, Braganca)(E,P)
August 28, 2009 Filing 42 Motion for attorney Harvey J. Barnett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 14660031684, filed by Plaintiff Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Harvey J. Barnett)(E,P)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion to substitute attorney, attorney Kathleen B. Burke removed from case and attorney David F. Adler added as counsel for Interested Party LTV Steel Company, Inc. (Related Doc #41 ) Judge Donald C. Nugent(R,JM)
August 26, 2009 Filing 41 Motion to substitute attorney David F. Adler in place of attorney Kathleen B. Burke filed by Interested Party LTV Steel Co. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Adler, David)
August 19, 2009 Filing 40 Proposed Order Stipulated Adjustment to Motion Briefing Schedule filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Goldman, Matthew)
July 27, 2009 Filing 39 Marginal Entry Order granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Jerri Ryan for John D. Turner (Related Doc #37 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 7/27/09.(B,R)
July 23, 2009 Filing 38 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Status Conference held on 7/23/2009. Combined motion to dismiss is due by 9/18/2009, responses are due by 10/20/2009 and replies are due by 11/6/2009. (Court Reporter: None)Time: 60 min. (B,B)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion to substitute attorney. Attorney C. James Zeszutek removed from case and attorney Patrick W. Carothers for John D. Turner added to case. (Related Doc #36 )Judge Donald C. Nugent(R,JM)
July 23, 2009 Filing 37 Motion for attorney Jerri A. Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 06470000000003659019, filed by Defendant John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carothers, Patrick)
July 17, 2009 Filing 36 Motion to substitute attorney Patrick W. Carothers in place of attorney C. James Zeszutek filed by Defendant John D. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carothers, Patrick)
July 16, 2009 Filing 35 Notice of Status Conference set for 7/23/2009 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. (B,IE)
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order Lifting Stay. The defendants shall have until thirty(30) days from the date of this Order to answer, plead or otherewise respond to the Amended Complaint filed on April 2, 2009. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 7/15/09. (E,P)
April 6, 2009 Filing 33 Notice of Continuation of Stay Pending Consideration by the Sixth Circuit of The Petition for Rehearing and Suggestion for Rehearing En Banc filed by Glen J. Moran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Petition for Rehearing filed in USCA Sixth Circuit)(Kilbane, Thomas) Modified text on 4/8/2009 (B,B).
April 2, 2009 Filing 32 Notice of Service of First Amended Complaint on 4/2/2009 filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. Related document(s) #31 .(VanNiel, Michael) Modified text on 4/6/2009 (B,B).
April 2, 2009 Filing 31 First Amended complaint with jury demand adding new party defendant William Jeffrey Bricker and against Thomas L. Garrett, Glen J. Moran, James Baske, Dennis Babcock, Eric Evans, Clifford Brown, Does 1-100, Inclusive, William H. Bricker, George Henning, John D. Turner, filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (VanNiel, Michael) Modified text on 4/6/2009 (B,B).
April 2, 2009 Filing 30 Notice of Service of (A) Sixth Circuit Judgment Disposing of Mr. Moran's Appeal of September 2, 2005 Bankruptcy Court Order Authorizing the Plaintiff's Prosecution of This Action and (B) Lifting of the Stipulated State of Proceedings on 4/2/2009 filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. Related document(s) #29 .(VanNiel, Michael) Modified text on 4/6/2009 (B,B).
April 2, 2009 Filing 29 Notice of (A) Sixth Circuit Judgment Disposing of Mr. Moran's Appeal of September 2, 2005 Bankruptcy Court Order Authorizing the Plaintiff's Prosecution of This Action and (B) Lifting of the Stipulated Stay of Proceedings filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(VanNiel, Michael)
September 16, 2008 Notice of CANCELLATION OF Notice of Status Conference scheduled and WILL NOT be held on 9/17/08. (R,JM)
September 11, 2008 Notice (non-document)of Status Conference set for 9/17/2008 09:30 AM in Chambers 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. (R,JM)
November 28, 2006 Filing 28 Notice of November 8, 2006 Judgment, Opinion and Order, Appeal Therefrom to the United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit, and Continuation of Stay of this Action Pending Appeal filed by Glen J. Moran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2) (Kilbane, Thomas)
September 7, 2006 Filing 27 Marginal Order granting Motion for order to Substitute William Jeffrey Bricker as a party(Related Doc #21 )Judge Donald C. Nugent(R, J)
August 17, 2006 Filing 26 Supplement to Motion of the Official Committee of Administrative Claimants to Substitute William Jeffrey Bricker, as the Independent Executor of the Estate of William H. Bricker, as a Party filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. Related document(s) #22 , #21 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - D)(VanNiel, Michael)
August 17, 2006 Filing 25 Supplemental Certificate of Service filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants Related document(s) #22 , #23 , #21 . (VanNiel, Michael) Modified on 8/23/2006 (M, P).
June 29, 2006 Filing 24 Marginal Order granting Motion for extension of time to file Motion to Substitute Party (Related Doc #17 )Judge Donald C. Nugent(R, J M)
June 13, 2006 Filing 23 Notice re: hearing on Motion for Order Substituting William Jeffrey Bricker, the Independent Executor of the Estate of William H. Bricker, as a Party filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (VanNiel, Michael) Modified wording of text on 6/19/2006 (C, B).
June 13, 2006 Filing 22 Memorandum In Support of Motion for Order Substituting William Jeffrey Bricker, the Independent Executor of the Estate of William H. Bricker, as a Party filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. Related document(s) #21 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1#2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2#3 Exhibit 2#4 Exhibit 3#5 Exhibit 4#6 Exhibit 5)(VanNiel, Michael)
June 13, 2006 Filing 21 Motion for Order Substituting William Jeffrey Bricker, the Independent Executor of the Estate of William H. Bricker, as a Party filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (VanNiel, Michael)
June 9, 2006 Filing 20 Supplemental Notice of Service filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. Related document(s) #18 , #19 , #17 . (VanNiel, Michael)
June 8, 2006 Filing 19 Notice of Motion for an Extension of Time to File Motion to Substitute Party filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. Related document(s) #18 , #17 . (VanNiel, Michael)
June 8, 2006 Filing 18 Memorandum In Support of Motion for an Extension of Time to File Motion to Substitute Party filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. Related document(s) #17 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Exhibits A & B#2 Exhibit 1 - Exhibit C - Part 1#3 Exhibit 1 - Exhibit C - Part 2#4 Exhibit 2)(VanNiel, Michael)
June 8, 2006 Filing 17 Motion for an Extension of Time to File Motion to Substitute Party filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. (VanNiel, Michael)
March 15, 2006 Filing 16 Notice of Suggestion of Death filed by William H. Bricker. (Kracht, Robert)
February 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order granting Stipulated Stay of Proceedings. Parties to Notify the Court when 1:05 cv 2285 is completed. Judge Donald C. Nugent (R, J M)
February 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) granting upon specific condition of fee first paid, Motion for appearance pro hac vice Scott E. Henderson filed by attorney C. James Zeszutek on behalf of John D. Turner (Related Doc #13 ). Approved by Judge Donald C. Nugent on 2/15/06.(C, K A)
February 6, 2006 Financial Transaction in the amount of $190.00 received for motion to appear pro hac vice by attorney Scott E. Henderson, Receipt # 676166 Related document(s) #13 . (M, P)
January 31, 2006 Filing 14 Minutes of proceedings. Case Management Conference held on 1/31/06 before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Case stayed pending Judge Boyko's decison. Status Conference set for 5/8/2006 11:00 AM before Hon. Donald C. Nugent. Discovery due by 12/1/2006. (Court Reporter None.) (E, P)
January 31, 2006 Filing 13 Motion for appearance pro hac vice of Scott E. Henderson filed by John D. Turner. (Zeszutek, C.)
January 27, 2006 Filing 12 Attorney Appearance /I> by Robert R. Kracht filed on behalf of William H. Bricker. (Kracht, Robert) Modified text 2/17/2006 (C, K A).
January 10, 2006 Filing 11 Attorney Appearance by Kathleen B. Burke filed by on behalf of LTV Steel Co. Inc.. (Burke, Kathleen)
January 9, 2006 Filing 10 Attorney Appearance by Nicholas M. Miller filed by on behalf of LTV Steel Co. Inc.. (Miller, Nicholas)
December 16, 2005 Filing 9 Marginal Order granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Judge Donald C. Nugent (R, J M)
December 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 1/31/2006 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 15A before Hon. Donald C. Nugent. Signed by Judge Donald C. Nugent on 12/13/05. (S, DJ)
October 17, 2005 Filing 7 Reply to response to Motion for extension of time until twenty (20) days from the final disposition of Glenn J. Moran's appeal from the September 2, 2005 Order of Chief Judge Baxter of the United States Bankruptcy Court of the Northern District of Ohio authorizing the ACC to proceed against all proposed defendants except Mr. Bonsall, filed by Glen J. Moran. Related document(s) #4 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1#2 Exhibit A-2) (Kilbane, Thomas) Modified on 10/28/2005 to edit text (B, T).
September 30, 2005 Filing 6 Opposition to Motion for extension of time until twenty (20) days from the final disposition of Glenn J. Moran's appeal from the September 2, 2005 Order of Chief Judge Baxter of the United States Bankruptcy Court of the Northern District of Ohio authorizing the Pursuit of Action filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. Related document(s) #4 . (VanNiel, Michael)
September 29, 2005 Filing 5 Notice of Stay, filed by Defendants John D. Turner, Thomas L. Garrett, Glen J. Moran, James Baske, Dennis Babcock, William H. Bricker, Eric Evans, George Henning, and Clifford Brown filed by Glen J. Moran. (Attachments: #1 Order# Dated 9/20/05 from USBC (2) Judgment Dated 9/20/05 from USBC) (Kilbane, Thomas) Modified on 10/11/2005 (L, V).
September 29, 2005 Filing 4 Motion for extension of time until twenty (20) days from final disposition of Glenn J. Moran's appeal from 9/2/05 Order of Chief Judge Baxter to answer Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendants John D. Turner, Thomas L. Garrett, James Baske, Dennis Babcock, William H. Bricker, Eric Evans, George Henning, and Clifford Brown, and filed by Glen J. Moran. Related document(s) #1 . (Kilbane, Thomas) Modified on 10/11/2005 (L, V).
September 26, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order of Recusal. This case is reassigned to Judge Donald C. Nugent for all further proceedings. (Signed by Judge Lesley Wells on 9/26/05) (C, L)
September 13, 2005 Filing 2 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Vecchiarelli (M, P)
September 13, 2005 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Thomas L. Garrett, Glen J. Moran, James Baske, Dennis Babcock, Eric Evans, Clifford Brown, Does 1-100, Inclusive, William H. Bricker, George Henning, & John D. Turner (9 summons and Magistrate Consent Forms issued). Filed by Official Committee of Administrative Claimants. Filing fee paid; receipt number 672822. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(M, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Official Committee of Administrative Claimants v. Bricker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Reed Smith LLP, as Counsel for the former Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of the LTV Steel Company, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Doerfler
Represented By: Gregory L. Taddonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: VP Buildings, Inc. Distribution Trust
Represented By: Karen E. Meara
Represented By: Franklin R. Ciaccio
Represented By: James W. Ehrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Henning
Represented By: Stephen D. Williger
Represented By: Julie R. Fenstermaker
Represented By: Gregory R. Farkas
Represented By: James B. Niehaus
Represented By: Martha S. Sullivan
Represented By: Alan R. Lepene
Represented By: Lindsey Carr Siegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Turner
Represented By: Jerri A. Ryan
Represented By: Stephen D. Williger
Represented By: Patrick W. Carothers
Represented By: Martha S. Sullivan
Represented By: Alan R. Lepene
Represented By: Scott E. Henderson
Represented By: C. James Zeszutek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Baske
Represented By: Stephen D. Williger
Represented By: Julie R. Fenstermaker
Represented By: Gregory R. Farkas
Represented By: James B. Niehaus
Represented By: Martha S. Sullivan
Represented By: Alan R. Lepene
Represented By: Lindsey Carr Siegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100, Inclusive
Represented By: Stephen D. Williger
Represented By: Elizabeth F. Collura
Represented By: Lewis F. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas L. Garrett
Represented By: Jeremy M. Campana
Represented By: Stephen D. Williger
Represented By: Mark A. Weintraub
Represented By: Martha S. Sullivan
Represented By: Alan R. Lepene
Represented By: Louis F. Solimine
Represented By: Karen E. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Evans
Represented By: Stephen D. Williger
Represented By: Julie R. Fenstermaker
Represented By: Gregory R. Farkas
Represented By: James B. Niehaus
Represented By: Martha S. Sullivan
Represented By: Alan R. Lepene
Represented By: Lindsey Carr Siegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen J. Moran
Represented By: Philip M. Oliss
Represented By: Amy Cadle Hocevar
Represented By: Stephen D. Williger
Represented By: Stephanie E. Niehaus
Represented By: Martha S. Sullivan
Represented By: Thomas S. Kilbane
Represented By: Alan R. Lepene
Represented By: Joseph P. Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Jeffrey Bricker
Represented By: Stephen D. Williger
Represented By: Kimberly A. Brennan
Represented By: Robert R. Kracht
Represented By: David A. Schaefer
Represented By: Martha S. Sullivan
Represented By: Robert T. Glickman
Represented By: Alan R. Lepene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Brown
Represented By: Jeremy M. Campana
Represented By: Stephen D. Williger
Represented By: Mark A. Weintraub
Represented By: Alan R. Lepene
Represented By: Louis F. Solimine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Babcock
Represented By: Stephen D. Williger
Represented By: Gregory R. Farkas
Represented By: James B. Niehaus
Represented By: Alan R. Lepene
Represented By: Lindsey Carr Siegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H. Bricker
Represented By: Stephen D. Williger
Represented By: Robert R. Kracht
Represented By: David A. Schaefer
Represented By: Robert T. Glickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Cliffs Natural Resources Inc.
Represented By: Robert J. Fogarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United Steelworkers
Represented By: David M. Fusco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United Steelworkers, Local 979
Represented By: David M. Fusco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Deloitte Consulting LLP
Represented By: David A. Gordon
Represented By: Peter Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: LTV Steel Co. Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas M. Miller
Represented By: Ryan T. Routh
Represented By: Lisa B. Gates
Represented By: Harvey J. Barnett, Jr.
Represented By: Spenser Q. Friel
Represented By: Heather Lennox
Represented By: David F. Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Official Committee of Administrative Claimants
Represented By: Brian McCormack
Represented By: Harvey J. Barnett, Jr.
Represented By: Celiza P. Braganca
Represented By: Spenser Q. Friel
Represented By: Bruce S. Sperling
Represented By: Daniel A. Shmikler
Represented By: Joseph F. Hutchinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel J. Callahan
Represented By: Michael A. VanNiel
Represented By: Matthew R. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?