Michael et al v. Thompson et al

Case Number: 1:2007cv03818
Filed: December 14, 2007
Court: Ohio Northern District Court
Office: Cleveland Office
Presiding Judge: David D. Dowd
Nature of Suit: Labor: Reporting/Disclosure
Cause of Action: 29:0401 Labor Management Disclosure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2008 119 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Staying Case pending the 6th Circuit's determination on jurisdiction. Judge John R. Adams on 10/20/08. (K,C)
October 15, 2008 118 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying Intervenors' Motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction (Related Doc # 104 ). Judge John R. Adams on 10/15/08.(L, J)
June 26, 2008 105 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction is granted re 16 . Defendants are enjoined from consummating the merger between the UTU and SMWIA pursuant to the 2007 Merger Agreement. Judge John R. Adams on 6/26/08 (L, J). Modified text on 7/3/2008 (H, SP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael et al v. Thompson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?