Bankhead v. Village of Newburgh Heights et al
Plaintiff: |
Kim Bankhead |
Defendant: |
Village of Newburgh Heights, Bob Hoover, Joseph Szelenyi and Chris Minek |
Case Number: |
1:2008cv02484 |
Filed: |
October 20, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio |
Office: |
Civil Rights: Other Office |
County: |
Cuyahoga |
Presiding Judge: |
James S. Gwin |
Presiding Judge: |
|
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 27, 2010 |
Filing
154
Memorandum Opinion and Order - The motion for summary judgment of the individual defendants is hereby granted as to the plaintiff's claims of civil conspiracy, malicious prosecution, false arrest and false imprisonment, and denied as to t he balance of the claims against the individual defendants. The motion for summary judgment of the Village of Newburgh Heights is granted only on the state law claims, and denied as to the balance of the claims against it. Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman on 8/27/10. (Related Document # 94 , 95 (G,S) Modified on 8/27/2010 (G,S). Modified text on 8/30/2010 (E,P).
|
February 22, 2010 |
Filing
65
Memorandum Opinion and Order. This Court has been informed by defendants counsel that the page initially redacted from Bobby Hoovers personnel records by Wakeman Police Department has been provided to Plaintiff.This being so, there are no lon ger any outstanding issues under defendants motion to quash (Doc. # 48 ). This Court dealt with the subpoena issued to the Cleveland Clinic and that institutions motion to quash (Doc. # 40 ) in a ruling entered January 22, 2010(Doc. # 58 ), and the Northeast Ohio Regional Sewer District has responded to the subpoena issued to it.The motion will be dismissed as moot as it pertains to the subpoenas issued to the Wakeman Police Department and the Northeast Ohio Regional Sewer District, and granted as regards the subpoena issued to the Cleveland Clinic. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman on 2/22/10. (W,Jo)
|
January 22, 2010 |
Filing
58
Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Perelman on 1/22/10. (W,Jo)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?