Daniels v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Cortney Daniels
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2011cv00806
Filed: April 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: James S. Gwin
Presiding Judge: Kenneth S. McHargh
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:425
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 1/4/17. The Court orders payment of attorneys' fees at a rate of $350 per hour for 19 hours totaling $6,650.00. The plaintiff's attorneys must also refund the plaintiff the $3,359.42 in attorneys' fees this Court previously awarded. (Related Docs. 42 and 44 ) (D,MA)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/4/13. The Court denies the government's motion to alter or amend the earlier judgment granting plaintiff attorneys' fees. (Related Doc. 32 , 35 ) (M,G)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 1/4/13 granting plaintiff's motion for attorney fees. The Court awards attorney fees of $3,359.42 to the plaintiff and orders payment consistent with this order. (Related Doc. 27 ) (M,G)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/13/12 adopting the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. This case is remanded for proceedings consistent with this entry. (Related Docs. 1 , 23 ) (M,G)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cortney Daniels
Represented By: Paulette F. Balin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Kathleen L. Midian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?