Allied Machine & Engineering Corporation v. Competitive Carbide, Inc.

Plaintiff: Allied Machine & Engineering Corporation
Defendant: Competitive Carbide, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv02712
Filed: December 14, 2011
Court: Ohio Northern District Court
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Tuscarawas
Presiding Judge: Christopher A. Boyko
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 15, 2018 90 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order. Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice (Related doc # 81 ) is granted. Defendant's Motion to Vacate Stay Pending Reexamination of the '616 Patent and for Leave to Proceed with Counterclaim (Related doc #'s 82 , 84 ) is denied. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 2/15/2018. (H,CM)
October 8, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order. Plaintiff's Motion to Stay the Litigation Pending Reexamination of the '616 Patent (Related doc # 65 ) is granted. The matter is stayed, closed and removed from the active docket, subject to re-opening upon written notice of either party that the PTO's reexamination process is concluded. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 10/8/2013. (H,CM)
March 22, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order. Third party Defendants Joseph Nuzzi and Rolf Kraemer's Motion to Dismiss (Related doc # 49 ) is granted. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 3/22/2013. (H,CM)
July 30, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order. Plaintiff Allied Machine's Motion to Dismiss Defendant Competitive Carbide's Counterclaim for invalidity of the '094 Patent (Related doc # 42 ) is granted for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 7/30/2012. (H,CM)
April 25, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order denying Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions (Related Doc # 18 ); denying Third Party Defendants, Joseph P. Nuzzi and Rolf H. Kraemers' Motion for Sanctions...(more)(Related Doc # 22 ). Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 4/25/2012.(M,M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allied Machine & Engineering Corporation v. Competitive Carbide, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied Machine & Engineering Corporation
Represented By: Richard E. Gaum
Represented By: William S. Nabors
Represented By: Scott M. Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Competitive Carbide, Inc.
Represented By: Robert W. McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?