Hurt, et al v. Commerce Energy, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Davina Hurt and Dominic Hill
Defendant: Commerce Energy, Inc, Fulcrum Retail Energy, Hudson Energy Services, LLC, Just Energy Group, Inc., John Doe Corporations 1-20, Just Energy Marketing Corp, Just Energy Limited, Commerce Energy, Inc doing business as Just Energy doing business as Commerce Energy of Ohio, Inc. and Just Energy Limited doing business as Just Energy
Petitioner: Dworken & Bernstein's Custodian of Records and Dworken & Bernstein Co.L.P.A.
Not Classified By Court: Gregory V. Mersol
Case Number: 1:2012cv00758
Filed: March 28, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 992 Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/7/23. Given the small number of class members who have yet to receive their settlement checks and how little money remains undistributed, the Court agrees that the parties need not submit further status reports. The parties should continue to work together collaboratively to complete the settlement process. So, Defendants' request is GRANTED. re #991 Status Report (T,A)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 991 Joint Status Report on Class Members' Uncashed Judgment Checks filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 990 Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/10/22. re #989 Status Report (T,A)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 989 Joint Status Report on Class Members' Uncashed Judgment Checks and Request for Order filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 988 Marginal Entry Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 7/5/22 approving the extension regarding status report. re #987 Stipulation (T,A)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 987 Joint Proposed Stipulation Regarding Status Report filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 986 Joint Status Report on Class Members' Uncashed Judgment Checks and Joint Notice Regarding Termination of Supersedeas Bond filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 985 Joint Notice Regarding Reduction of Supersedeas Bond filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Signed Rider) Related document(s) #984 .(Patton, Shannon)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 984 Marginal Entry Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 2/1/22 approving the joint proposal on class members' uncashed judgment checks. re #983 Stipulation (T,A)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 983 Joint Proposal on Class Members' Uncashed Judgment Checks filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 1/18/22 granting #982 Joint Motion for extension of time until January 31, 2022 to submit proposal on class members' uncashed judgment checks. (T,A)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 982 Joint Motion for extension of time until January 31, 2022 to submit proposal on class members' uncashed judgment checks filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 981 Joint Notice Regarding Reduction of Supersedeas Bond filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation and Order Regarding Reduction of Supersedeas Bond, #2 Exhibit B - Decreased Bond)(Patton, Shannon)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 980 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 7/20/21 approving joint stipulation regarding satisfaction of judgment, payments to class members and award of supplemental fees and costs. re #979 .(T,A)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 979 Joint Proposed Stipulation Regarding Satisfaction of Judgment, Payments to Class Members and Award of Supplemental Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Nicole T. Fiorelli)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 978 Appeal Order from US Supreme Court: The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied re #977 (No. 20-1093) (H,SP)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 977 Appeal Remark from US Supreme Court: The petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on 2/2/21 and placed on the docket 2/11/21 as No. 20-1093 (H,SP)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 976 Notice of Filing Supplement to Supersedeas Bond filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Just Energy Increase Ride)(Patton, Shannon)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 975 Stipulated Notice to Stay Enforcement of Mandate and Judgment filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 974 True copy of mandate from the USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Affirming the District Court's judgment re #963 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 18-4058). Date issued as mandate 10/8/20; Costs: None (H,SP)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 973 Information Copy of opinion from USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Affirming the District Court's judgment re #963 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 18-4058). This is not a mandate order. Circuit Judges: Clay, Stranch, and Murphy. Date issued by USCA 8/31/20. (Attachments: #1 Judgment) (H,SP)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 972 Official Transcript of Bench Trial (Volume 4, pages 585-638) for date of 5/30/2018 before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. re #963 Notice of Appeal, #968 Appeal Transcript Request. Court Reporter: Heidi Blueskye Geizer. [54 pages] Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 1/10/2019. Redaction Request due 1/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/3/2019. Related document(s) #963 , #968 . (G,He)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 971 Official Transcript of Bench Trial (Volume 3, pages 377-584) for date of 5/23/2018 before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. re #963 Notice of Appeal, #968 Appeal Transcript Request. Court Reporter: Heidi Blueskye Geizer. [208 pages] Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 1/10/2019. Redaction Request due 1/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/3/2019. Related document(s) #963 , #968 . (G,He)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 970 Official Transcript of Bench Trial (Volume 2, pages 148-376) for date of 5/22/2018 before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. re #963 Notice of Appeal, #968 Appeal Transcript Request, Court Reporter: Heidi Blueskye Geizer. [229 pages] Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 1/10/2019. Redaction Request due 1/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/3/2019. Related document(s) #963 , #968 . (G,He)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 969 Official Transcript of Bench Trial (Volume 1, pages 1-147) for date of 5/21/2018 before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. re #963 Notice of Appeal, #968 Appeal Transcript Request,. Court Reporter: Heidi Blueskye Geizer. [147 pages] Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 1/10/2019. Redaction Request due 1/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/3/2019. Related document(s) #963 , #968 . (G,He)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Transcript Order received by court reporter Heidi Blueskye Geizer. Estimated number of pages: 550. Transcript Order received on 11/13/2018. Financial arrangements made on 11/13/2018. Estimated completion date is 12/13/2018. Related document(s) #968 . (G,He)
November 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 968 Transcript Request by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp for proceedings held on 5-21/23-18; 5-30-18 before Judge Magistrate William H. Baughman, Jr., re #963 Notice of Appeal,. Court Reporter: Heidi Geizer. Transcript required for appeal. (Patton, Shannon)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 967 Notice of Filing Supersedeas Bond filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supersedeas Bond and Rider Amending Bond)Related document(s) #966 .(Patton, Shannon)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 966 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 11/5/18. The Court, for the reasons set forth in this order, grants defendants' motion to stay, so long as they provide a supersedeas bond for $5,250,000.00. (Related Doc. #961 ) (D,MA)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Transcript Order received by court reporter Heidi Blueskye Geizer. Transcript Order received on 10/31/2018. Financial arrangements made on 10/31/2018. Transcripts previously filed on District Court docket. Transcripts delivered to ordering party (Shannon Patton, Littler Mendelson) on 11/1/2018. Related document(s) #965 . (G,He)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 965 Transcript Request by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp for proceedings held on 09/29/15 to 10/06/15 before Judge James S. Gwin, re #963 Notice of Appeal,. Court Reporter: Heidi Glazer. Transcript required for appeal. (Patton, Shannon)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 964 Reply in support of #961 Motion to stay Proceedings to Enforce a Judgment filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of #963 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 18-4058). Date filed in USCA 10/30/18. (H,SP)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 963 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals from the #960 Judgment Entry of 9/28/18, filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Filing fee $505 paid, receipt number 0647-8976783) (Patton, Shannon)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 962 Opposition to #961 Motion to stay Proceedings to Enforce a Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Nicole T. Fiorelli)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 961 Motion to stay Proceedings to Enforce a Judgment filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings to Enforce a Judgment, #2 Exhibit A - Supersedeas Bond)(Patton, Shannon)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 960 Judgment Entry Signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 9/28/2018, Entering judgment in favor of Plaintiffs in accordance with this opinion. Accordingly, this action is terminated under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. Related document #959 (L,Ja)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 959 Opinion and Order Signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 9/28/2018. For the foregoing reasons, the Court grants in part and denies in part Plaintiffs' motion for attorney's fees and costs. And for the foregoing reasons, the Court grants in part and denies in part Plaintiffs' motion for incentive awards. Accordingly, the Court orders Defendants to pay Plaintiffs $2,718,440.75 in attorneys fees and $217,120.16 in costs, as detailed in this Opinion. From those attorneys fees, the Court orders Plaintiffs attorneys to pay $62,500 in incentive awards, as detailed in this Opinion. (Related Docs #934 and #936 ).(L,Ja)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 958 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 9/20/18 granting the motions of plaintiffs' counsel to quash defendants' subpoenas for the reasons set forth in this order. (Related Docs. #951 and #952 ) (D,MA)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 957 Minutes of motion hearing before Judge James S. Gwin on 9/20/18. The Court heard arguments from the parties and took the matter under advisement. Court's order to follow. (Court Reporter: D. Cotone; Time: 47 min.) (Related Docs. #934 and #936 ) (D,MA)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 956 Reply in support of #952 Motion to quash Subpoena filed by All Plaintiffs. (DeRoche, James)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 955 Reply in support of #951 Motion to quash Subpoena filed by Dworken & Bernstein Co.L.P.A., Dworken & Bernstein's Custodian of Records. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 954 Opposition to #951 Motion to quash Subpoena , #952 Motion to quash Subpoena filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena and Duces Tecum to Dworken & Bernstein, #2 Exhibit 2 - Subpoena and Duces Tecum to Garson Johnson)(Patton, Shannon) Modified text on 9/21/2018 (M,S).
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 953 Attorney Appearance by James S. Timmerberg filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Timmerberg, James)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 952 Motion to quash Subpoena filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James A. DeRoche, #2 Subpoena)(DeRoche, James) Modified text on 9/21/2018 (M,S).
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 951 Motion to quash Subpoena filed by Dworken & Bernstein's Custodian of Records, Dworken & Bernstein Co.L.P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Subpoena and Duces Tecum to Dworken & Bernstein, #2 Affidavit of Jacqueline Aquila, #3 Affidavit of Nicole T. Fiorelli)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 950 Unopposed Motion to continue Hearing on Fee Petition filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 9/13/18 granting defendants' unopposed motion to continue the 9/19/18 hearing on plaintiffs' motion for attorney fees and costs. IMPORTANT: Said hearing reset to 9/20/18 at 1:00 p.m., Courtroom 18A. (Related Doc. #950 ) (D,MA)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] that the 9/17/18 motion hearing is reset due to a conflict on the Court's calendar. Said hearing reset to 9/19/18 at 1:00 p.m., Courtroom 18A before Judge James S. Gwin. (Related Doc. #936 ) (D,MA)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 949 Reply in support of #936 Motion for attorney fees and Costs by Nicole T. Fiorelli filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Nicole T. Fiorelli)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 9/6/18 granting defendants' unopposed motion to continue the 9/10/18 hearing on plaintiffs' motion for attorney fees and costs. IMPORTANT: Said hearing reset to 9/17/18 at 8:00 a.m., Courtroom 18A. (Related Docs. #936 and #948 ) (D,MA)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 948 Unopposed Motion to continue Hearing on Fee Petition (CORRECTED) filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. Related document(s) #947 . (Patton, Shannon)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 947 Unopposed Motion to continue Hearing on Fee Petition filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 946 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 9/4/18 denying defendants' motion for reconsideration for the reasons set forth in this order. (Related Doc. #933 ) (D,MA)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 945 Response to August 27, 2018 Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/29/18 granting plaintiffs' unopposed motion for an extension of time until 9/11/18 to file a reply in support of the motion for attorney's fees and costs. (Related Doc. #944 ) (D,MA)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 944 Unopposed Motion for extension of time to Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs until September 11, 2018 filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. Related document(s) #936 . (Fiorelli, Nicole)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] that a hearing on plaintiffs' motion for attorney fees and costs is set for hearing on 9/13/18 at 8:00 a.m., Courtroom 18A. (Related Doc. #936 ) (D,MA)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 943 Opposition to #936 Motion for attorney fees and Costs by Nicole T. Fiorelli filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unsworn Declaration of Shannon K. Patton, #2 Exhibit B - Administrative and Clerical Time Entries, #3 Exhibit C - Email from Amanda Schrank, #4 Exhibit D - Excessive Duplicative and Redundant Time Entries, #5 Exhibit E - Time Related to Unsuccessful Claim on Behalf of Regional Distributors, #6 Exhibit F - Time Related to Disallowed Plaintiff's Survey, #7 Exhibit G - Time Related to Disallowed Plaintiff's Expert, #8 Exhibit H - Outline of Reasonable Fees and Necessary Reduction)(Patton, Shannon)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/27/18. IMPORTANT: Within one week of the date of this order, plaintiffs shall file a more specific description of hours spent and expenses incurred by the plaintiffs seeking incentive awards. (Related Doc. #934 ) (D,MA)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 942 Reply in support of #933 Motion for reconsideration and Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 941 Reply in support of #934 Motion for Incentive Compensation for Certain Plaintiffs filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 940 Opposition to #933 Motion for reconsideration and Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 939 Opposition to #934 Motion for Incentive Compensation for Certain Plaintiffs filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Chart)(Patton, Shannon)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 7/24/18 granting defendants' unopposed motion for an extension of time until 8/27/18 to file a response to plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees and costs. (Related Docs. #936 and #938 ) (D,MA)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 938 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until August 27, 2018 to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. Related document(s) #936 . (Patton, Shannon)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 937 Joint Notice of Filing Corrected Proposed Judgment Entry filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Proposed Judgment Entry, #2 Exhibit A - Damages Spreadsheet, #3 Exhibit B - Dismissals) Related document(s) #935 . (Patton, Shannon)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 936 Motion for attorney fees and Costs by Nicole T. Fiorelli filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs, #2 D&B Fees Report, #3 DeRoche Fees Report, #4 Exhibit Poteat pleadings, #5 Osman pleading, #6 Harshbarger pleadings, #7 D&B Costs Report, #8 Affidavit of Nicole T. Fiorelli, #9 Affidavit of Patrick J. Perotti, #10 Affidavit of Richard N. Selby, II, #11 Declaration of Jim DeRoche, #12 Affidavit of Terrence Buehler, #13 Declaration of Andrea Gold, #14Declaration of Kristen Sagafi, #15 Declaration of Subdoh Chandra)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 935 Joint Notice of Proposed Judgment Entry filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment Entry, #2 Exhibit A- Damages Spreadsheet, #3 Exhibit B - Dismissals)(Patton, Shannon)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 934 Motion for Incentive Compensation for Certain Plaintiffs filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. (Attachments: #1Nicole T. Fiorelli Affidavit)(Fiorelli, Nicole).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 933 Motion for reconsideration and Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. Related document(s) #829 , #89 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Patton, Shannon)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 6/28/18 granting the parties' joint motion for an extension of time until 7/12/18 to file proposed judgment entries and proposed attorney fee awards. No further extensions will be granted. (Related Doc. #932 ) (D,MA)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 932 Joint Motion for extension of time to file proposed judgment entries and proposed attorney fee awards until July 12, 2018 filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. (Fiorelli, Nicole) Modified text on 6/25/2018 (M, S).
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 931 Transcript of testimony of Richard Teixeira from Bench Trial held on 5/22/2018 & 5/23/2018 before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. To obtain a copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Heidi Blueskye Geizer at 216-357-7092. [89 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 6/20/2018. Redaction Request due 7/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2018. Related document(s) #930 . (G,He)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 930 Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on 05/22/18; 05/23/18 (testimony of Richard Texeira) before Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., Court Reporter: Heidi Geizer. Requested completion date: 6/13/2018 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order IMPORTANT: Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 6/8/18. The parties shall file proposed judgment entries and proposed attorney fee awards by 7/2/18. (Related Doc. #928 ) (D,MA)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 929 Marginal Entry Order. Parties having consented to the magistrate judge's jurisdiction to conduct a bench trial as to damages, and that hearing conducted, the referral for a bench trial as to damages is terminated. (Related docs #928 , #897 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr on 6/4/18. (H,D)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 928 Order. The bench trial as to damages has been conducted, and the Court enters its findings as to damages for each plaintiff, as attached. (Related doc #927 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr on 6/4/18. (Attachments: #1 Verdict forms)(H,D)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 927 Minute Order of final argument held on 5/30/18. Ruling on exhibits offered made, final arguments presented, and the case submitted for findings on damages. Time: 2 hours. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr on 5/30/18. (H,D)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 926 Joint List of Plaintiffs Whose Claims Remain Pending for Disposition filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 925 Joint List of Exhibits being Offered into Evidence filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 924 Order regarding procedures for bench trial final argument set for 5/30/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10A before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman Jr. Counsel must file a joint report by 5/29/18 setting out the following: list of plaintiffs' exhibits and defendants' exhibits being offered into evidence and whether each is stipulated to or objected to; all joint exhibits being offered into evidence; and a list of plaintiffs whose claims remain pending for disposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr on 5/24/18. (H,D)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 923 Order granting defendants oral motion for dismissal of plaintiffs Walter Addie and Joshua Addie, for failure to prosecute under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr on 5/24/18. (H,D)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 922 Joint Notice of Filing of Darryl Blair's Deposition Excerpts filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Excerpts)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 921 Minutes of proceedings before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. Bench Trial testimony completed on 5/23/2018. Witnesses A. Carapezza, C. Chappie, T. Byrd, and D. Blair; testimony taken. Bench Trial final argument set for 5/30/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10A before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman Jr. Separate order regarding the argument to issue. (Court Reporter: Heidi Geizer.)Time: 4.75 hours. (H,D)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 920 Minutes of proceedings before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. Bench Trial held. Witnesses R. Texeira, R. Ross, L. Jones, A. Sutton, M. Perry, B. Acord, and Dr. Saad; testimony taken. Bench Trial continued to 5/23/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17B before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman Jr. (Court Reporter: Heidi Geizer.)Time: 7 hours. (H,D)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 919 Minutes of proceedings before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. Bench Trial held on 5/21/2018. Witnesses K. Edwards, J. Martinez, M. Papillon, and J. Wolfe; testimony taken. Bench Trial continued to 5/22/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 17B before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman Jr. (Court Reporter: Heidi Geizer.)Time: 5.5 hours. (H,D)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 918 Additional Corrected Exhibit filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) #910 . (Patton, Shannon)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 917 Additional Trial Exhibit filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) #910 . (Patton, Shannon)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 916 Notice of Deposition Transcript Designations filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) #913 . (Patton, Shannon)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 915 Opening Statement filed by All Defendants. (Sherman, Bradley)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 914 Opening Statement for Damages Trial filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 913 Joint Witness List filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 912 Exhibit List filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 911 Joint Exhibit List filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 910 Exhibit List filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 909 Joint Notice of Verdict Forms and Damages Matrices filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verdict Forms)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 908 Joint Proposed Stipulation as to what Constitutes "Work Time" for Purposes of the Damages Trial Starting May 21, 2018 filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 907 Notice of District Judge's Orders for Magistrate Review filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 906 Plaintiffs' Notice of Court Orders for the Magistrate Judge to Review for Damages Trial Starting May 21, 2018 filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 905 Trial Order. (Related docs #899 , #897 ). Bench Trial set for 5/21/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17B before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman Jr. By 5/16/18, counsel must file and serve items as noted in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr on 5/11/18. (H,D)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 904 Minute Order of Final Pretrial Conference held on 5/9/18. Time: 1 hour. A final trial order will be prepared and issued. The bench trial will commence on 5/21/18 at 10:00 a.m., in courtroom 17B. Counsel should be in the courtroom by 9:00 a.m. Counsel are admonished to work closely with its IT department representatives, David Zendlo and James Jones, on technical arrangements for the trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr on 5/9/18. (H,D)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 903 Joint Notice of Filing Calendars/Matrices for Challenged Plaintiffs in Advance of Damages Hearings filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Calendars/Matrices for Challenged Plaintiffs)(Patton, Shannon)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 902 Order scheduling telephonic status conference for 5/3/18 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman Jr. Counsel has been provided the call-in information. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 05/3/2018. (S,MD)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 901 Transcript of Status Conference held on 04/16/2018 before Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. To obtain a copy of this transcript, please contact court reporter Lance A. Boardman at 216-357-7019. [35 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 4/30/2018. Redaction Request due 5/14/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/24/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2018. (B,LA)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 900 Minute Order of Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/16/18. Time: 1 hour. Preparation for bench trial to begin on Monday, 5/21/18, discussed, as well as contents of trial order. Separate trial order to issue. Joint motion for extension of time to submit the damage matrix is granted. (ECF #898 ). The matrix must be submitted by 5/3/18. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10A before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr on 4/16/18. (H,D)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Request for Court Ordered Transcript [non-document] for proceedings held on 4/16/18 before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., re #900 Telephonic Status Conference. Court Reporter: Lance Boardman. Requested completion date: 5/1/18. Requesting Judicial Officer: Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. Related document(s) #900 . (H,D)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 899 Joint Proposed Stipulations for Damages Trial filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Verdict Form, #2 Exhibit B Stipulations as to Just Energy's Records)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 898 Joint Motion for extension of time to submit Damage Matrix until April 6, 2018 filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. Related document(s) #893 . (Patton, Shannon)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 897 Joint Consent to Magistrate and Waiver of Jury Trial for Damages Determinations approved by Judge James S. Gwin on 3/20/18. (Related Doc. #896 ) (D,MA)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 896 Motion Joint Consent to Magistrate and Waiver of Jury Trial for Damages Determinations filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 895 Attorney Appearance by Daniel M. Katz filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Katz, Daniel)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 894 Order scheduling telephonic status conference for 4/16/18 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman Jr. Counsel are to contact the Court by 4/13/18 to obtain the call-in information. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 03/01/18. (S,MD)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 893 Order. The Court conducted a telephonic status conference on 2/23/18. (Related Docs. #891 , #892 ). The parties will waive a jury trial on compensatory damages, with the waiver to extend to the scope of the consent to magistrate judges jurisdiction. (Related Doc. #889 ). To effect this waiver, counsel must file a proposed, agreed form of waiver with the Court on or before 3/16/18. Counsel must file a Damages Matrix with respect to each claimant and each claim to be considered at the damages trial by 3/30/18. A telephonic status conference is scheduled for 4/16/18 at 11:00 AM. A separate order will issue. The Court will conduct a Bench Trial beginning on 5/21/18 at 09:00 AM. A separate trial order will issue after the 4/16/18 telephonic status conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 3/1/18. (S,MD)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 892 Minutes of proceedings before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. Continued telephonic status conference conducted on 2/23/18. Separate order to issue regarding trial on damages. (Court Reporter: H. Geizer.) Time: 45 minutes. Related document #891 . (S,MD)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 891 Minutes of proceedings before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. Telephonic status conference held on 2/22/18. This telephonic status conference is continued to 2/23/2018 at 02:30 PM to be held before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman Jr. Counsel will use the same conference call number to participate in tomorrow's conference. (Court Reporter: Heidi Geizer.)Time: 1 hour. (H,D)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 890 Order scheduling telephonic status conference for 2/22/18 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman Jr. Counsel are to contact the Court by 2/20/18 to obtain the call-in information. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 2/15/18. (S,MD)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 889 Notice, Consent, and Reference of Determination of Damages to a Magistrate Judge signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 2/13/18. (D,MA)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 888 Minutes of telephonic status conference before Judge James S. Gwin on 2/7/18. (Court Reporter: None; Time: 13 min.) (D,MA)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] that a status conference is set for 2/7/18 at 12:00 p.m., to be held telephonically. Counsel will be provided with the Court's teleconference information by email. (D,MA)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 887 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 1/29/18. The Court, for the reasons set forth in this order, finds that defendants must calculate overtime pay at one-half the employees' applicable rate for each hour worked in excess of the applicable maximum hours standard. The applicable rate is the greater of the employees' regular rate or the minimum wage rate. The Court also finds that regional distributors' overtime pay is a factual determination left to the Magistrate Judge. (Related Docs. #883 and #884 ) (D,MA)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 886 Response to Defendants' Brief Regarding Outstanding Legal Issues for Proposed Damage Verdict Form filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #883 . (Fiorelli, Nicole)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 885 Response Brief on Outstanding Legal Issues for Damages Trial filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. Related document(s) #884 . (Patton, Shannon)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 884 Brief on Outstanding Legal Issues for Damages Trial filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 883 Brief Regarding Outstanding Legal Issues for Proposed Damage Verdict Form filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 882 Joint Status Report filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 881 Minutes of status conference before Judge James S. Gwin on 12/15/17. IMPORTANT: Opening briefs on remaining legal issues to be filed by 1/10/18 with responses due 1/24/18. (Court Reporter: None; Time: 36 min.) (D,MA)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 880 Order referring case to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., for the purposes of damage hearings to take place in January, 2018. (D,MA)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 879 Minutes of status conference before Judge James S. Gwin on 11/13/17. IMPORTANT: Telephonic status conference set for 12/15/17 at 1:00 p.m. Counsel will be provided with the Court's teleconference information by email. (Court Reporter: None; Time: 42 min.) (D,MA)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 878 Joint Status Report filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Sherman, Bradley)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 877 Minutes of status conference before Judge James S. Gwin on 10/17/17. IMPORTANT: The parties are instructed to submit a meet and confer report by 10/27/17 as set forth in this entry. Status conference set for 11/13/17 at 12:00 p.m., Chambers 18A. (Court Reporter: None; Time: 28 min.) (D,MA)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 876 Address Change Notice by Bradley A. Sherman filed by on behalf of Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Sherman, Bradley)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 9/5/17. The Court grants the parties' joint motion for extension. IMPORTANT: Defendants shall provide plaintiffs by 9/25/17 with their position regarding plaintiffs who have responded to the survey. Plaintiff shall indicate by 10/16/17 which ones plaintiffs agree with or dispute. Telephonic status conference reset to 10/17/17 at 9:00 a.m. No further extensions will be granted for any reason. (Related Doc. #875 ) (D,MA)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 875 Joint Motion for extension of to Exchange Positions on Survey Responses filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. Related document(s) #874 . (Patton, Shannon)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 874 Minutes of status conference before Judge James S. Gwin on 8/14/17. Defendants shall provide plaintiffs with their position regarding plaintiffs who have responded to the survey by 9/4/17. Plaintiffs shall indicate which ones plaintiffs agree with or dispute by 9/25/17. IMPORTANT: Telephonic status conference set for 9/26/17 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel will be provided with the Court's teleconference information. (Court Reporter: None; Time: 14 min.) (D,MA)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 873 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/14/17. The Court, for the reasons set forth in this order, denies defendants' motion. The parties must use the greater of the employees' regular rate or the minimum wage rate to calculate every plaintiffs' overtime pay under the Ohio Wage Act. (Related Docs. #864 , #869 , and #871 ) (D,MA)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 872 Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/10/17 denying in part and granting in part defendants' motion to exclude surveys postmarked or received after 4/4/17. The Court orders that parties consider the 64 surveys postmarked or received before or on 5/4/17 for purposes of calculating individual damages. Any surveys postmarked or received after 5/4/17 are excluded from the parties' consideration of individual damages. (Related Docs. #863 , #868 , and #870 ) (D,MA)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 871 Motion for leave to Respond to Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Any Implication of the Provisions of the Ohio Minimum Fair Wage Standards Act for Rule 23 Class Members Who Failed to Opt In filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. Related document(s) #869 . (Attachments: #1 Pleading Defendants' Reply Brief to Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Any Implication of the Provisions of the Ohio Minimum Fair Wage Standards Act for Rule 23 Class Members Who Failed to Opt In)(Patton, Shannon)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 870 Motion for leave to Respond to Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Untimely Survey Results filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. Related document(s) #868 . (Attachments: #1 Pleading Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Untimely Survey Responses)(Patton, Shannon)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 869 Opposition to #864 Motion to Exclude Any Implication of the Provisions of the Ohio Minimum Fair Wage Standards Act for Rule 23 Class Members That Failed to Opt In filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. (Fiorelli, Nicole) Modified text on 7/28/2017 (M, S).
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 868 Opposition to #863 Motion to Exclude Untimely Survey Responses filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Nicole T. Fiorelli Affidavit)(Fiorelli, Nicole) Modified text on 7/27/2017 (M, S).
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 867 Opinion & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 7/24/17 granting plaintiffs' motion for liquidated damages for the reasons set forth in this order. (Related Doc. #860 ) (D,MA)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 7/18/17 granting plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a reply brief instanter in support of the motion for liquidated damages. (Related Doc. #865 ) (D,MA)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 866 Minutes of status conference before Judge James S. Gwin on 7/17/17. IMPORTANT: Status conference set for 8/14/17 at 10:00 a.m., to be held telephonically. Counsel will be provided with the Court's teleconference information by email. (Court Reporter: None; Time: 23 min.) (D,MA)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 865 Motion for leave to File Reply Brief Instanter filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. Related document(s) #860 . (Fiorelli, Nicole)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 864 Motion to Exclude Any Implication of the Provisions of the Ohio Minimum Fair Wage Standards Act for Rule 23 Class Members That Failed to Opt In filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Motion to Exclude Any Implication of the Provisions of the Ohio Minimum Fair Wage Standards Act for Rule 23 Class Members That Failed to Opt In)(Patton, Shannon)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 863 Motion to Exclude Untimely Survey Responses filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Untimely Survey Responses, #2 Unsworn Declaration of Shannon K. Patton with Supporting Exhibits)(Patton, Shannon)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 862 Opposition to #860 Motion for liquidated damages filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 861 Joint Status Report filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 860 Motion for liquidated damages filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Early Deposition Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Early Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #3 Exhibit C - New York Department of Labor initial determinations)(Fiorelli, Nicole) Modified text 6/20/2017 (C,KA).
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 859 Minutes of telephonic status conference before Judge James S. Gwin on 6/16/17. The parties shall file a joint status report by 6/30/17 identifying the additional legal issues that need to be briefed. Opening briefs on said issues due 7/14/17 with responses due 7/28/17. The parties shall file a status report by 8/14/17 detailing disputed claims and a recommended procedure for resolving them. IMPORTANT: Telephonic status conference set for 7/17/17 at 11:30 a.m., to discuss disputed claims. Counsel will be provided with the Court's teleconference information by email. (Court Reporter: None; Time: 18 min.) (D,MA)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/23/17 granting the parties' joint motion for a continuance and status conference. IMPORTANT: The parties shall notify the Court by 6/30/17 of any need to brief additional issues. Status conference set for 6/16/17 at 10:30 a.m., to be held telephonically. Counsel will be provided with the Court's teleconference information by email. (Related Doc. #858 ) (D,MA)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 858 Joint Motion for extension of Deadline to Notify Court of Issues That May Need Briefed until 6/30/2017 filed by Plaintiff Davina Hurt. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Kelly Kratz Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Email chain)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 857 Minutes of telephonic status conference before Judge James S. Gwin on 5/11/17. IMPORTANT: Opening briefs on the liquidated damages issue due 6/19/17 with responses due 7/10/17. If the parties anticipate the need to brief additional issues, they should so notify the Court by 6/1/17. A status report shall be filed by 7/16/17 detailing disputed claims and a recommended procedure to resolve those claims. (Court Reporter: None; Time: 24 min.) (D,MA)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/13/17 setting a telephonic status conference for 5/11/17 at 8:00 a.m. with counsel only. Counsel will be provided with the Court's teleconference information by email. (D,MA)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 856 Joint Status Report filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 855 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/6/17. The parties shall submit a joint memorandum setting forth the status of the case by 4/13/17. Said brief shall include a timeline for bringing the final damage determinations to conclusion. (D,MA)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 854 Appeal Order from USCA for the Sixth Circuit: Denying the petition for permission to appeal (USCA# 15-0304). Circuit Judges: Guy, Clay, and Stranch. Date issued by USCA 11/5/15 (H,SP)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 853 Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/3/15. The Court grants defendants' motion to certify an interlocutory appeal as to any issue related to the liability phase as set forth in this entry. Issues relating to damages are not covered by this certification. (Related Doc. #801 ) (M,G)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 852 Letter to Honorable Judge Gwin formally stipulating not to seek stay of damage phase of matter pending 6th Circuit Court of Appeals ruling as to merits of interlocutory appeal; requesting Order provide specific issues in 10/20/14 Motion for Interlocutory Appeal it will certify for consideration by the Court of Appeals filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Limited. (Sherman, Bradley) Modified text on 7/31/2015 (H,KR).
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 851 Minutes of telephone conference between counsel and Judge James S. Gwin on 7/27/15. (Court Reporter: none; Time: 7 min.) (M,G)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order IMPORTANT (change in time): Notice [non-document] of Telephone Conference rescheduled to 3:00 p.m. on 7/27/2015 (previously set for 3:45 p.m.). (P, S)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] that a conference call with the parties' counsel has been scheduled with Judge James S. Gwin on 7/27/15 at 3:45 p.m. Counsel will be provided with the Court's contact information via email. (M,G)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 850 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings (Volume 5) held on 10-06-2014 before Judge James S. Gwin. To obtain a copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Heidi Blueskye Geizer at 216-357-7092. [96 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 6/30/2015. Redaction Request due 7/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2015. Related document(s) #837 . (G,He)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 849 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings (Volume 4) held on 10-02-2014 before Judge James S. Gwin. To obtain a copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Heidi Blueskye Geizer at 216-357-7092. [173 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 6/30/2015. Redaction Request due 7/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2015. Related document(s) #837 . (G,He)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 848 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings (Volume 3) held on 09-01-2014 before Judge James S. Gwin. To obtain a copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Heidi Blueskye Geizer at 216-357-7092. [258 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 6/30/2015. Redaction Request due 7/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2015. Related document(s) #837 . (G,He)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 847 Transcript of Jury Trial Proceedings (Volume 2) held on 09-30-2014 before Judge James S. Gwin. To obtain a copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Heidi Blueskye Geizer at 216-357-7092. [253 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 6/30/2015. Redaction Request due 7/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2015. Related document(s) #837 . (G,He) Modified date of proceeding from 2014 to 2015 on 6/23/2015 (M,TJ). NEF regenerated 6/23/15.
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 846 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 6/2/15. The Court orders, as to the damages phase of this case, that the costs of the claims process be evenly split between the parties. Additionally class counsel shall refer any questions from class members regarding the process to the claims administrator. (Related Docs. #840 , #841 , #843 , #845 ) (M,G)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 845 Response to #843 reply to #841 statement of position regarding damages phase filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon) Modified text and added link on 5/27/2015 (S,HR).
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/22/15 granting defendants' motion for leave to file response to plaintiffs' statement of position regarding damages phase of trial. The Court will entertain no further briefing motions on this issue from the parties. (Related Doc. #844 ) (M,G)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 844 Motion for leave to file response to plaintiffs' #841 statement of position regarding damages phase of trial filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum Regarding Damages Phase)(Patton, Shannon) Modified text and added link on 5/27/2015 (S,HR).
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 843 Reply to Defendants' Statement of Position Regarding Damages Phase filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #841 .(Fiorelli, Nicole)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/19/15 granting plaintiffs' motion for leave to file response to defendants' statement of position regarding damages phase of trial. (Related Doc. #842 ) (M,G)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 842 Motion for leave to file reply to Defendants' #841 statement of position regarding damages phase filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Reply to Defendants' Statement of Position Regarding Damages Phase)(Fiorelli, Nicole) Modified text to add link on 5/19/2015 (M,TL).
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 841 Statement of Position Regarding Damages Phase filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon) Modified text on 5/14/2015 (H,KR).
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 840 Plaintiffs' Brief Regarding Remaining Points of Disagreement Concerning The Proposal Regarding Damages Phase of Trial filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 839 Transcript of Jury Trial proceedings (Volume 1) held on 09-29-2014 before Judge James S. Gwin. To obtain a copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Heidi Blueskye Geizer at 216-357-7092. [235 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 5/4/2015. Redaction Request due 5/18/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2015. Related document(s) #837 . (G,He)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 838 Transcript of Voir Dire proceedings held on 09-29-2014 before Judge James S. Gwin. To obtain a copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Heidi Blueskye Geizer at 216-357-7092. [47 pages] Related document(s) #837 . (G,He)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 837 Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on September 29-October 6, 2015 before Judge James Gwin, Court Reporter: Heidi Geizer. Requested completion date: May 11, 2015 filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Sherman, Bradley)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 836 Minutes of status conference before Judge James S. Gwin on 4/24/15. (Court Reporter: none; Time: 5 min.) (M,G)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order IMPORTANT: Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/24/15. Pursuant to the status conference conducted on 4/24/15, the parties shall file position papers on any remaining points of disagreement concerning the Proposal Regarding Damages Phase of Trial by 5/13/15. (Related Doc. #834 ) (M,G)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 835 IMPORTANT: Notice and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/20/15. A status conference will be held on 4/24/15 (at approximately 10:30 a.m.) following the case management conference in Case No. 1:15cv00368. Counsel shall be prepared to discuss the joint proposal regarding the damages phase of this case. (Related Doc. #834 ) (M,G)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 834 Joint Joint Proposal Regarding Damages Phase filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. Related document(s) #831 .(Patton, Shannon)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/7/15 granting the parties' joint motion for extension until 4/20/15 for the filing of a joint statement regarding the damages procedure for this litigation. (Related Docs. #831 , #833 ) (M,G)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 833 Joint Notice Regarding Damages Phase of Trial and Motion to Extend Briefing Deadline Set by the Court's Order of March 23, 2015 filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. Related document(s) #831 . (Bartela, Frank) Modified text on 4/7/2015 (H,KR).
April 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 832 Marginal Entry Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/3/15 denying as moot the joint motion to extend response deadline for position statements on further proceedings; responses filed 11/3/14. (Related Doc. #813 ) (M,G)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 831 Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 3/23/15. The Court denies defendants' motion to decertify the class and orders further briefing on the structure of the damages phase of these proceedings as set forth in this entry. The parties' position papers shall be submitted by 4/6/15 with any responses to be filed by 4/13/15. (Related Doc. #811 ) (M,G)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 830 Additional Notice of Appearance by David Katz by filed on behalf of plaintiffs. (Richelson, Murray) Modified text on 3/11/2015 (H,KR). Wrong s/ signature. Signed by David A. Katz. Filer advised on 3/17/2015 (S,HR).
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 829 Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 3/10/15 denying defendants' motions for judgment as a matter of law, for new trial and to certify an interlocutory appeal. (Related Doc. #810 ) (M,G)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 828 Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 1/29/14. Defendants' motion to strike plaintiffs' brief in opposition to defendants' motion to exclude the initial report of Dr. Fox is denied. As Dr. Fox's initial report relied on the unreliable survey conducted by plaintiffs' counsel, the motion to exclude the initial report and any related opinions or testimony is granted. The motion to strike Dr. Fox's supplemental report is granted in part and denied in part. Defendants' motion for costs and fees associated with the motion to exclude the supplemental report is denied. (Related Docs. #709 , #710 , #723 ) (M,G)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 827 Response to #824 supplemental brief in support of their #710 Motion to Exclude the Report, Opinion & Testimony of Dr. Fox filed by all plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole) Modified to add link on 12/8/2014 (S,HR).
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 826 Marginal Entry Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 12/2/14 granting plaintiffs' motion for extension of time until 12/5/14 to file reply to defendants' supplemental brief. (Related Docs. #710 , #825 ) (M,G)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 825 Motion to extend deadline to file reply to supplemental brief in support of #710 Motion to exclude the report, opinion and testimony of Dr. Fox filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. (Fiorelli, Nicole) Modified text and added link on 12/3/2014 (S,HR).
November 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 824 Supplemental Brief in Support of the Motion to Exclude the Report, Opinion and Testimony of Dr. Fox filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s) #710 ) (Patton, Shannon). Modified text on 12/2/2014 and added link (H,SP).
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 823 Corrected Exhibit 4 Last Deal Date - Survey 1 filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #822 .(Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 822 Notice of Compliance with Court Order #821 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Survey Correspondence, #2 Exhibit Badge Never Used - Survey 1, #3 Exhibit Badge Never Used - Survey 2, #4 Exhibit Last Deal Date - Survey 1, #5 Exhibit Last Deal Date - Survey 2) (Fiorelli, Nicole). Modified on 11/21/2014 to add link (H,SP).
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 821 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 11/20/14. Plaintiffs shall produce, in its entirety, the survey sent to class members and any responses and/or communications with class members concerning the survey. Production shall be made by close of business on 11/20/14 and a copy shall also be filed electronically. Any supplemental briefing by defendants must be filed by 11/28/14 and any response brief by plaintiffs shall be filed by 12/2/14. (Related Docs. #679 , #694 ) (M,G)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 820 Minutes of hearing on Daubert motions before Judge James S. Gwin on 11/20/14. (Court Reporter: H. Geizer; Time: 43 min.) (Related Docs. #709 , #710 ) (M,G)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 819 Reply in support of #811 Motion to Decertify the Class and Collective Actions for Damages Purposes filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Sherman, Bradley) Modified text on 11/12/2014 (H,SP).
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 818 Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment As A Matter of Law or, In the Alternative, Motion to Certify Adjudication After Liability Phase of Trial for Interlocutory Appeal and Stay this Action Pending Appellate Review filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. Related document(s) #810 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Jury Instructions) (Patton, Shannon)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] that a hearing will be held on 11/20/14 at 8:30 a.m., Courtroom 18A (Cleveland) before Judge James S. Gwin on the pending Daubert motions as to Liesl Fox. (M,G)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 817 Defendants' Brief in Response to Plaintiffs' Brief Regarding Trial on Damages filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. Related document(s) #812 . (Sherman, Bradley)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 816 Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Statement of Position Regarding Further Proceedings filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #809 .(Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 815 Opposition to #810 Motion for judgment as a matter of law (renewed) or, in the Alternative, Motion to Certify Adjudication After Liability Phase of Trial for Interlocutory Appeal, and Motion to stay action pending appellate review filed by All Plaintiffs (Fiorelli, Nicole). Modified text on 11/4/2014 (H,SP).
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 814 Opposition to #811 Motion to Decertify the Class and Collective Actions for Damages Purposes filed by All Plaintiffs (Fiorelli, Nicole). Modified on 11/4/2014 to remove double wording (H,SP).
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 813 Joint Motion for extension of Deadline to File Responses to Position Statements on Further Proceedings until November 3, 2014 filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 812 Plaintiffs' Brief Regarding Trial on Damages filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 811 Motion to Decertify the Class and Collective Actions for Damages Purposes filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Sherman, Bradley). Modified text on 11/12/2014 (H,SP).
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 810 Motion for judgment as a matter of law (renewed) or, in the Alternative, Motion to Certify Adjudication After Liability Phase of Trial for Interlocutory Appeal, and Motion to Stay this Action Pending Appellate Review filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support) (Sherman, Bradley). Added Motion to certify, and Motion to stay on 10/22/2014 (H,SP). Modified text on 10/22/2014, NEF regenerated (H,SP). Modified typo on 11/4/2014 (H,SP).
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 809 Defendants' Statement of Position Regarding Further Proceedings filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Sherman, Bradley)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 807 Exhibit and Witness List, Counsel's Certification of Trial Exhibits for Jury Deliberations and JERS Exhibit Log from jury trial before Judge James S. Gwin on 9/29/14-10/2/14 and 10/6/14. (M,G)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 806 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 10/7/14 that the expense incurred for jurors' lunches during deliberations on 10/6/14 be paid by the Court. (M,G)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 805 Minutes of jury trial proceedings before Judge James S. Gwin on 10/6/14. Liability issue decided; damages issue remains. (Court Reporter: H. Geizer; Time: 6 hrs,. 15 min.) (M,G)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 808 Special Verdict Form (redacted version) on the issue of liability rendered 10/6/14 following jury trial before Judge James S. Gwin. (Attachments: #1 Special Verdict Form (unredacted version). (M,G)
October 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 804 Proposed Jury Instructions and Objections filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Verdict Form)(Sherman, Bradley)
October 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 803 Plaintiffs' Brief Regarding Jury Instructions & Verdict Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Changes to Jury Instructions in Red-Line, #2 Exhibit B - Jury Verdict Form)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 802 Transcript of Opening Statement of Nicole T. Fiorelli from Jury Trial held on 09-29-2014 before Judge James S. Gwin. To obtain a copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Heidi Blueskye Geizer at 216-357-7092. [21 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 10/10/2014. Redaction Request due 10/24/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/3/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/1/2015. (G,He)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 801 Transcript of Opening Statement of Bradley A. Sherman from Jury Trial held on 09-29-2014 before Judge James S. Gwin. To obtain a copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Heidi Blueskye Geizer at 216-357-7092. [19 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 10/10/2014. Redaction Request due 10/24/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/3/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/1/2015. (G,He)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 800 Minutes of jury trial proceedings before Judge James S. Gwin on 10/2/14. (Court Reporter: H. Geizer; Time: 4 hrs.) (M,G)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 799 Proposed Jury Instructions on Work Time filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 798 Minutes of jury trial proceedings before Judge James S. Gwin on 10/1/14. (Court Reporter: H. Geizer; Time: 5 hrs. 40 min.) (M,G)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 797 Plaintiiffs' Response to Defendants' Bench Brief Regarding The Regulation of Gas And Electric Retail Sales filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #795 .(Fiorelli, Nicole)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 796 Plaintiffs' Notice of Objection To Those Portions of Pete Potje's Deposition Transcript Designated By Defendants To Be Read At Trail filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #768 .(Fiorelli, Nicole)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 795 Brief - Bench Brief Regarding the Regulation of Gas and Electric Retail Sales filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Sherman, Bradley)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 794 Plaintiffs' Notice of Objection to Those Portions of Willie Stephens' Deposition Transcript Designated By Defendants To Be Read At Trial filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #791 .(Fiorelli, Nicole)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 793 Plaintiffs' Notice of Counter-Designation of Deposition Pages re Bruce Abbott (Doc 750) and William Hodge (Doc 751) Deposition Testimony filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #751 , #750 .(Fiorelli, Nicole)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 792 Minutes of jury trial proceedings before Judge James S. Gwin on 9/30/14. (Court Reporter: H. Geizer; Time: 5 hrs. 45 min.) (M,G)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 791 Motion for leave to Manually File the Videotaped Deposition of Willie Stephens filed by Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Limited, Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Manual Filing Notice) (Patton, Shannon). Modified text on 10/3/2014 (H,SP).
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 790 Minutes of jury trial proceedings before Judge James S. Gwin on 9/29/14. (Court Reporter: H. Geizer; Time: 7 hrs. 20 min.) (M,G) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2014: #1 Main Document - Corrected Version) (M,G).
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 789 Notice of Service of Subpoena to John Davis on 9/26/14 filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Service of Subpoena)(Chyun, Edward). Modified text on 9/30/2014 (H,SP).
September 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 788 Defendants' Notice of Revised Witness List filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
September 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 787 Brief (Corrected Bench Brief) in Support of Their Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon) Modified text on 9/30/2014 (H,SP).
September 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 786 Motion (Corrected) to Permit Live Video Testimony of Defendants' Expert Witness Dr. Ali Saad filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon) Modified text on 9/30/2014 (H,SP).
September 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 785 Motion to Permit Live Video Testimony of Defendants' Expert Witness, Dr. Ali Saad filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon) Modified text on 9/30/2014 (H,SP).
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 784 Plaintiff's Notice of Revised Witness List filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 783 Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Objections to Portions of the Deposition Testimony of Naddia Bazar, Richard Early & Mark Ebbers filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #776 , #764 , #772 .(Fiorelli, Nicole)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 782 Notice of Filing Deposition Transcripts For Possible Use At Trial filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Darren Pritchett Deposition Transcript, #2 Exhibit Richard Teixeira Deposition 8/30/12 Transcript, #3 Exhibit Richard Teixeira Deposition 10/3/12 Transcript, #4 Exhibit Dennis Piazza Deposition Transcript, #5 Exhibit Ariana Best Deposition Transcript, #6 Exhibit Ryan Goldman Deposition Transcript, #7 Exhibit Joshua Scarborough Deposition Transcript, #8 Exhibit Tierra Coleman Deposition Transcript, #9 Exhibit Willie Stephens Deposition Transcript, #10 Exhibit John Davis Deposition Transcript, #11 Exhibit Ronan Baptiste Deposition Transcript, #12 Exhibit Johnny Sadkauskas Deposition Transcript)(Fiorelli, Nicole) Modified on 9/29/2014 (G,CA).
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 781 Trial Brief Defendants Bench Brief In Support of Their Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Sherman, Bradley)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 780 Opposition to #775 Motion in limine Regarding Limiting Testimony of Dr. Saad filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 779 Notice of Filing Correction of Document #754 Designating Portions of Naddia Bazar Transcript for Use at Trial filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole) Modified on 9/29/2014 to add link (G,CA).
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 778 Notice of Manual Filing of Videotape filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #746 . (M, S)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 777 Notice of Filing Deposition Transcripts for Possible Use at Trial filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript of Deposition of Arnold Black, #2 Exhibit Transcript of Deposition of Wayne Dancie, #3 Exhibit Transcript of Deposition of Stayce Fitzpatrick, #4 Exhibit Transcript of Deposition of Dominic Hill, #5 Exhibit Transcript of Deposition of Jessica Huber, #6 Exhibit Transcript of Deposition of Davina Hurt, #7 Exhibit Transcript of Deposition of Robin Lewis, #8 Exhibit Transcript of Deposition of Brandy Rivas, #9 Exhibit Transcript of Deposition of Tyelynn White)(Patton, Shannon)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 776 Defendants' Notice of Objections to Those Portions of Mark Ebbers' Videotaped Deposition Designated by Plaintiffs to Be Viewed at Trial filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Sherman, Bradley)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 775 Motion in limine Regarding Limiting Testimony of Dr. Saad filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 774 Subpoena Returned Executed; served upon Bruce Abbott by Hand Delivery on September 22, 2014 filed on behalf of Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp (Attachments: #1 Proof of Notice of Service Upon Bruce Abbott)(Patton, Shannon)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 773 Marginal Entry Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 9/25/14 granting plaintiffs' motion for the live video testimony of Brandy Rivas. Said testimony shall be presented on 9/30/14 at 8:00 a.m. (Related Doc. #771 ) (M,G)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 772 Defendants' Notice of Objections to those Portions of Naddia Bazar's Deposition Transcript Designated by Plaintiffs to be Read at Trial filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. Related document(s) #754 .(Wolff, Robert)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 771 Motion to Permit Live Video Testimony of Plaintiff Witness Brandy Rivas filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 770 Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Deposition Transcript of Mark Ebbers and Designating Portions to be Read at Trial filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mark Ebbers Deposition Transcript, #2 Deposition Exhibit # 34, Consent to Participate, #3 Deposition Exhibit # 35, Independent Contractor Agreement, #4 Deposition Exhibit # 36, Script, #5 Deposition Exhibit # 37, Notice of Cancellation) (Fiorelli, Nicole). Modified text on 9/25/2014 (H,SP).
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 769 Notice of Counter-Designations of Those Portions of Naddia Bazar's Deposition Transcript To Be Played By Video At Trial filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. Related document(s) #754 .(Patton, Shannon)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 768 Notice of Portions of Video Depositions To Be Utilized At Trial filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. Related document(s) #755 , #749 , #751 , #756 .(Patton, Shannon)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 767 Opposition to #758 Motion in limine to Exclude Reference to and Evidence of Plaintiffs' Compensation or Lack There Of While Engaged with Defendants, Including Compensation-Related Testimony From Plaintiffs' Damages Expert, Liesl Fox filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Distribution of Total Payments Received by Class Members) (Fiorelli, Nicole). Modified text on 9/25/2014 (H,SP).
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 766 Opposition to #747 Motion in limine to Exclude Reference to and Evidence of Plaintiffs' Alleged Misclassification as Independent Contractors filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 765 Opposition to #757 Motion in limine to Exclude Evidence of Recruiting Advertisements filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 764 Notice of Counter-Designations of Those Portions of Richard Early's Deposition to be Read at Trial filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. Related document(s) #753 .(Patton, Shannon)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 763 Stipulated Final Pretrial Order with exhibit lists attached approved by Judge James S. Gwin on 9/24/14. (Related Doc. #742 ) (M,G)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 762 Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Stein Report, #2 29 USC 203(k), #3 29 CFR 541.500, #4 29 CFR 541.501, #5 Fact Sheet #17F, #6 Fact Sheet #23)(Patton, Shannon)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 761 Proposed Jury Instructions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Selby, Richard)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 760 Opposition to #746 Motion in limine to exclude videotape filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Wolff, Robert)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 759 Opposition to #745 Motion in limine to exclude witnesses' resumes filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 758 Motion in limine to Exclude Reference to and Evidence of Plaintiffs' Compensation or Lack There Of While Engaged with Defendants, Including Compensation-Related Testimony From Plaintiffs' Damages Expert, Liesl Fox filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Oct. 10, 1940 Report and Recommendation of Presiding Officer at Hearings Preliminary to Redefinition)(Patton, Shannon)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 757 Motion in limine to Exclude Evidence of Recruiting Advertisements filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Patton, Shannon)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 756 Defendants' Notice of Manual Filing of Videotaped Deposition of William Hodge filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 755 Defendants' Notice of Manual Filing of Videotaped Deposition of Pete Potje filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 754 Deposition of Naddia Bazar taken on May 29, 2014 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Deposition Transcript of Naddia Bazar, #2 Deposition Exhibits of Naddia Bazar)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 753 Deposition of Richard Early taken on October 2, 2012 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Deposition Transcript of Richard Early, #2 Deposition Exhibits of Richard Early Part 1, #3 Deposition Exhibits of Richard Early Part 2)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 752 Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report and Testimony of Liesl Fox filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Decision in Sirko, et al. v. International Business Machines Corporation)Related document(s) #710 .(Patton, Shannon)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 751 Deposition of William Hodge taken on May 30, 2014 filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Deposition Transcript of William Hodge, #2 Deposition Exhibits William Hodge)(Patton, Shannon)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 750 Deposition of Bruce Abbott taken on June 2, 2014 filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Deposition Transcript of Bruce Abbott, #2 Deposition Exhibits of Bruce Abbott)(Patton, Shannon)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 749 Deposition of Pete Potje taken on May 22, 2014 filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Deposition Transcript of Pete Potje, #2 Deposition Exhibit, Notice of Opt-Out as to Pete Potje) (Patton, Shannon). Modified text on 9/18/2014 (H,SP).
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge James S. Gwin. Final Pretrial Conference held on 9/17/14. The trial in this matter will commence on 9/29/14 at 8:00 a.m. (Court Reporter: N/A.)Time: 55 minutes. (S,HR)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 748 Proposed Voir Dire filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Wolff, Robert)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 747 Motion in limine to Exclude Reference to and Evidence of Plaintiffs' Alleged Misclassification as Independent Contractors filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Patton, Shannon)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 746 Motion in limine to exclude videotape filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt (Fiorelli, Nicole). Modified on 9/17/2014 to note, counsel notified to remove logos from document before filing (H,SP).
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 745 Motion in limine to exclude witnesses' resumes filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 744 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bartela, Frank)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 743 Notice of Additional Exhibit to Defendants' Trial Exhibit List filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. Related document(s) #742 .(Patton, Shannon)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 742 Proposed Final Joint Pretrial Order filed by Davina Hurt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Exhibit List) (Fiorelli, Nicole). Modified text on 9/15/2014 (H,SP).
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 741 Exhibit List filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 740 Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 9/10/14. The Court grants in part and denies in part defendants' motion for summary judgment. The Court clarifies that this Order covers only the FLSA claims of the affected individuals and does not affect their other claims. (Related Doc. #712 ) (M,G)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 739 Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 9/8/14 granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs' motion to exclude the testimony of Dr. Michael Ahearne. (Related Doc. #714 ) (M,G)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 738 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/29/14. The Court, for the reasons set forth in this entry, orders that plaintiffs will open and close trial. (Related Docs. #727 , #734 , #736 ) (M,G)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 737 Reply in support of #712 Motion for summary judgment filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 736 Reply in Support of Defendants' Trial Plan to Open and Close the Trial filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Related document(s) #727 ) (Patton, Shannon). Modified text on 8/27/2014 (H,SP).
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Preliminary mediation conference held on August 21, 2014. As a result of discussions, counsel agreed to submit to chambers, no later than 2:00 p.m. Eastern Time on Friday, August 29, 2014, a joint position letter in preparation for the September 3, 2014 mediation at 9:00a.m. in Courtroom 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. (S,R)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 735 Minutes of Daubert motion oral argument before Judge James S. Gwin on 8/21/14. (Court Reporter: G. Staiduhar; Time: 39 min.) (M,G)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 734 Opposition to Defendants' Request to Open and Close Trial filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9-14-14 Email from Patton re stipulations)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Upon reviewing Plaintiffs' settlement demand, Judge Polster held a teleconference on 8/18/2014 to discuss the demand and mediation scheduled for Thursday, August 21, 2014. As a result of discussions, Plaintiffs agreed to provide Defendants and the Court with a mediation statement setting forth a revised settlement demand no later than 12:00 noon on Tuesday, August 19, 2014. Defendants, in turn, agreed to provide Plaintiffs and the Court with a written offer no later than 12:00 noon on Wednesday, August 20, 2014. In addition, the Court scheduled a follow up mediation for 9:00 AM on Wednesday, September 3, 2014. Time: 20 Minutes. (S,R) Modified text on 8/19/2014 (S,R).
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Case referred to Judge Dan Aaron Polster for Mediation, signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/14/2014. (N, P)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 733 Opposition to #712 Motion for summary judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 732 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/14/14 referring this case to Judge Dan Aaron Polster for mediation on 8/21/14 at 2:30 p.m., Chambers 18B (Cleveland). (M,G)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 731 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/14/14. Plaintiffs shall respond to defendants' recommendation that defendants open and close the liability portion of the trial within seven days of the entry of this order and any reply by defendants shall be filed within three business days of the response. Plaintiffs' Daubert motion to exclude defendants' expert, Dr. Michael Ahearne, is set for oral argument on 8/2/14 at 1:30 p.m., Courtroom 18A (Cleveland). The trial set for 9/29/14 will as to liability only with the question of damages to be addressed in a separate proceeding with the date to be determined. Finally, the Daubert motion as to plaintiffs' expert, Dr. Liesl Fox, will be deferred until after the liability phase of the trial. (M,G)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 730 Minutes of status conference before Judge James S. Gwin on 8/13/14. (Court Reporter: none; Time: 1 hr.) (M,G)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 729 Opposition to #723 Motion to strike Plaintiff's Brief In Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report, Opinion and Testimony of Dr. Fox filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 728 Brief on Bifurcation filed by All Plaintiffs. (Selby, Richard)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 727 Defendants' Trial Plan filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. Related document(s) #724 . (Sherman, Bradley) Modified text 8/12/2014 (K,K).
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 726 Attorney Appearance by Robert M. Wolff filed by on behalf of Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Wolff, Robert)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 725 Notice of the Submission of Itemized Accounting of Reasonable Costs and Fees Incurred for the Depositions of the Non-Cooperating FLSA Plaintiffs filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Unsworn Declaration of Edward Chyun Outlining Costs and Fees, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration - Total Fees and Expenses, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration - Attorney Fee Summary, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration - Invoices for Expenses) (Related document(s) #715 ) (Chyun, Edward). Modified text on 8/5/2014 (H,SP).
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 724 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/1/14 setting a status conference for 8/13/14 at 12:45 p.m. in Chambers 18A (Cleveland) to discuss recommendations on how the trial should be structured. The Court especially invites the parties to discuss whether, and how, the trial of liability and damages might be bifurcated. The Court orders that the parties submit to briefs outlining their positions on how the Court should structure the trial no later than August 11, 2014 at 12:00 p.m. (S,HR)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 723 Motion to strike Plaintiff's Brief In Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Report, Opinion and Testimony of Dr. Fox filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Limited. Related document(s) #718 . (Sherman, Bradley)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 722 Reply in support of #710 Motion to Exclude the Report, Opinion and Testimony of Dr. Fox filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Limited. (Sherman, Bradley)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 721 Reply in support of #710 Motion to Exclude the Report, Opinion and Testimony of Dr. Fox and Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Limited. (Sherman, Bradley) Modified text on 7/31/2014 and to note filing error as to Motion filed as part of Reply, Motion must be filed using a motion event, counsel notified of error (H,SP).
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 720 Reply in support of #709 Motion to strike Supplemental Expert Report of Liesl Fox filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 719 Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 7/28/14 denying defendants' motion to decertify the class and collective actions. (Related Docs. #695 , #707 , #711 ) (M,G)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 718 Opposition to #709 Motion to strike Supplemental Expert Report of Liesl Fox filed by All Plaintiffs. (Perotti, Patrick)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 717 Opposition to #710 Motion to Exclude the Report, Opinion and Testimony of Dr. Fox filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Frank Bartela Affidavit)(Perotti, Patrick)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 716 Response to #714 Motion in limine to Exclude Defendant's Expert Michael Ahearne filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 715 Opinion and Order granting in part Defendant's #696 Motion to dismiss Non-Cooperating Opt-In Plaintiffs (Related documents #708 , #704 ). See Order for details. Judge James S. Gwin on 7/21/2014. (P,G)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 714 Motion in limine to Exclude Defendant's Expert Michael Ahearne filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit Michael Ahearne Deposition Transcript)(Perotti, Patrick)
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 713 Marginal Entry Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 7/15/14 granting defendants' motion to adjourn certain trial dates. The trial will commence on 9/29/14, the second week of the current standby period, and the Court will adjourn trial for the day of 10/3/14. (Related Doc. #703 ) (M,G)
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 712 Motion for summary judgment filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Fulcrum Retail Energy, Hudson Energy Services, LLC, John Doe Corporations 1-20, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Limited, Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Summary, #3 Exhibit B - Bruce Abbott Deposition, #4 Shannon Patton Declaration, #5 Richard Teixeira Declaration)(Patton, Shannon)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 711 Reply in support of #695 Motion to Decertify The Class and Collective Actions, filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Reference Guide on Survey Research, #2 Exhibit 2 - Deposition Transcript of Liesl M. Fox) (Sherman, Bradley). Modified text on 7/10/2014 (H,SP).
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 710 Motion to Exclude the Report, Opinion and Testimony of Dr. Fox filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Deposition Excerpts of Liesl Fox, Ph.D., #3 Declaration of Shannon K. Patton, #4 Third Declaration of Ali Saad, Ph.D., #5 Deposition Excerpts of Chad Chappie, #6 Deposition Excerpts of Michael Norman Pfauth, #7 Deposition Excerpts of Wayne Dancie, Jr., #8 Deposition Excerpts of Jessica Huber, #9 Deposition Excerpts of Willie Stephens, #10 Deposition Excerpts of Briana Purnell, #11 Reference Manual on Scientific Evidence)(Sherman, Bradley)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 709 Motion to strike Supplemental Expert Report of Liesl Fox filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Related document(s) #706 ). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Unsworn Declaration of Shannon K. Patton, #3 Exhibit 2 - Deposition Transcript of Liesl M. Fox) (Patton, Shannon) Modified text on 7/10/2014 (H,SP).
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 708 Reply in support of #696 Motion to dismiss party - Non-Cooperating Plaintiffs, filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Chyun, Edward) Modified text on 7/8/2014 (H,SP).
July 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin 7/5/14 granting the motion of Defendants Hill and Hurt for 5 additional pages for their memo opposing the motion for class certification. (Related Doc. #705 ) (M,G)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 707 Opposition to #695 Motion too Decertify The Class and Collective Actions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chad Chappie Deposition Excerpt, #2 Exhibit Naddia Bazar Deposition Excerpt) (Bartela, Frank). Modified text on 7/3/2014 (H,SP).
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 706 Supplemental Expert Report pursuant to Rule 26 of filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #689 . (Bartela, Frank)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 705 Motion for leave to exceed page limitations filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. Related document(s) #695 . (Bartela, Frank)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 704 Opposition to #696 Motion to dismiss party - Non-Cooperating Plaintiffs filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit June 2, 2014 Bartela & Sherman emails, #2 Exhibit Judith Gonzales Deposition Notice, #3 Exhibit Michael Pfauth Deposition Notice) (Bartela, Frank). Modified text on 7/1/2014 (H,SP).
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 703 Motion to adjourn certain trial dates, or, alternatively, to extend trial stand by date to 10/06/2014 filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Limited. (Sherman, Bradley) Modified text on 6/30/2014 (H,SP).
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 702 Marginal Entry Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 6/24/14 granting the parties' joint motion to extend the remaining decertification briefing deadlines. Response to be file by 7/2/14 and reply to be filed by 7/9/14. (Related Doc. #699 ) (M,G)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 6/24/14 denying as moot the second motion for extension of time of the remaining decertification briefing deadlines; the Court has issued a ruling on the first motion. (Related Docs. #701 , #702 ) (M,G)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 701 Joint Motion for extension of Decertification Deadlines filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. Related document(s) #699 . (Bartela, Frank)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 700 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 6/23/14. Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar the final pretrial conference is rescheduled to 9/17/14 at 10:00 a.m., Chambers 18A (Cleveland). The jury trial is reassigned for 9/22/14 at 8:00 a.m., Courtroom 18A (Cleveland) on a two-week standby basis. (M,G)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 699 Motion for extension of time until July 2, 2014 to Oppose Defendant's Motion to Decertify the Class filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. Related document(s) #695 . (Bartela, Frank)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 698 Notice of Opt-Out Paul Schilke filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bartela, Frank)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 697 Notice of Filing Defendants' Rule 26(A)(2)(B) Rebuttal Expert Disclosure (Ali Saad, Ph.D.) filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Dr. Saad's Rebuttal Report with Exhibits)Related document(s) #689 .(Sherman, Bradley)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 696 Motion to dismiss party - Non-Cooperating Plaintiffs and Memorandum in Support filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Chyun Declaration plus exhibits, #2 Exhibit 2 - Deposition Transcripts) (Chyun, Edward). Modified text on 6/17/2014 (H,SP).
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 695 Motion to Decertify The Class and Collective Actions filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. Related document(s) #88 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Candice Avery Deposition Transcript, plus exhibits, #3 Exhibit 2 - Cindy Coreus Deposition Transcript, plus exhibits, #4 Exhibit 3 - Willie Stephens Deposition Transcript, plus exhibits, #5 Exhibit 4 - Michael Pfauth Deposition Transcript, plus exhibits, #6 Exhibit 5 - Chad Chappie Deposition Transcript, plus exhibits, #7 Exhibit 6 - Bruce Abbott Deposition Transcript, plus exhibits, #8 Exhibit 7 - Rindfleisch v. Gentive Order, #9 Exhibit 8 - Tierra Coleman Deposition Transcript, plus exhibits, #10 Exhibit 9 - John Davis Deposition Transcript, plus exhibits, #11 Exhibit 10 - Naddia Bazar Deposition Transcript, plus exhibits) (Sherman, Bradley). Modified text on 6/12/2014 (H,SP).
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 694 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 6/9/14 denying defendants' motion for reconsideration. (Related Doc. #692 ) (M,G)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 693 Opposition to #692 Motion for reconsideration filed by All Plaintiffs. (Perotti, Patrick)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 692 Motion for reconsideration filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. Related document(s) #687 , #679 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Chyun, Edward)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 691 Notice of Filing Defendants' Rule 26(A)(2)(B) Expert Disclosure (Ali Saad, PhD) filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Ali Saad, #2 Appendix 1 to Dr. Saad Report - Curriculum Vitae of Dr. Saad, #3 Appendix 2 to Dr. Saad Report - Listing of Documents Relied Upon, #4 Supporting Charts to Dr. Saad Report)Related document(s) #104 .(Patton, Shannon)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 690 FILING ERROR, disregard. See doc #691 for corrected filing. Notice of Filing Defendants' Rule 26(A)(2)(B) Expert Disclosure (Ali Saad, Ph.D) filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1 - Curriculum Vitae of Dr. Saad, #2 Appendix 2 - Listing of Documents Dr. Saad Relied Upon, #3 Supporting Charts to Dr. Saad's Report)Related document(s) #104 .(Patton, Shannon) Modified text 5/30/2014 (C,KA).
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 689 Notice of Filing Plaintiffs' 26(a)(2)(B) Expert Report filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Liesl Fox Expert Report)(Bartela, Frank)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 688 Notice of Filing Defendants' Rule 26(A)(2)(B) Expert Report (Michael Ahearne, Ph.D.) filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Unsworn Declaration of Michael Ahearne, Ph.D., #2 Exhibit A - Curriculum Vitae of Michael Ahearne)Related document(s) #104 .(Patton, Shannon)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 687 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/22/14 resolving defendants' discovery dispute. The Court denies defendants' requests as set forth in this entry. (Related Docs. #677 , #680 ) (M,G)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 686 Notice of Opt-Out of Peter Potje filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bartela, Frank) Modified text on 5/22/2014 (H,SP).
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/22/14. The Court grants, in part, defendants' motion for an extension of the page limit for their brief in support of motion to decertify the class and collective action. The Court grants only an additional 5 pages. (Related Doc. #685 ) (M,G)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 685 Unopposed Motion for leave to exceed page limitations filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Frondorf, Alexander)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 684 Attorney Appearance by Alexander R. Frondorf on behalf of Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Frondorf, Alexander) Modified on 5/22/2014 to remove double wording (H,SP).
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 683 Attorney Appearance of Jennifer Schilling by Shannon K. Patton filed by on behalf of Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/20/14 granting the motion for admission pro hac vice of Attorney Jennifer L. Schilling on behalf of Commerce Energy, Inc., Just Energy Group, Inc., and Just Energy Marketing Corp. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc. #681 ) (M,G)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 682 Notice of Opt-Out filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bartela, Frank)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 681 Motion for attorney Jennifer Schilling to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-6548351, filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jennifer Schilling in Support Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Patton, Shannon)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 680 Response to Notice of Discovery Dispute filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #677 .(Bartela, Frank)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 679 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/15/14 resolving defendants' notice of discovery dispute filed 5/5/14. The Court, as set forth in this entry, denies defendants' request to compel plaintiffs to produce the withheld and undisclosed survey questions and responses. (Related docs. #669 , #673 ) (M,G)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/15/14 that plaintiffs shall respond to defendants' notice of discovery dispute by 4:00 p.m., on Friday, 5/16/14. (Related Doc. #677 ) (M,G)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 678 Marginal Entry Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/14/14 denying defendants' motion seeking to enlarge time allotment for depositions. (Related Doc. #670 ) (M,G)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 677 Notice of Discovery Dispute filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Unsworn Declaration of Shannon K. Patton, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration (Defendants' Fourth Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs), #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration (Plaintiffs' Objections/Responses to Defendants' Fourth Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents), #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration (May 7-12 Email Exchange), #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration (5/8/14 Privilege Log), #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration (Amended Notice Video Deposition Duces Tecum Jessica Rodreques), #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration (Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Notice of Videotape Deposition Duces Tecum Jessica Rodreques), #8 Exhibit Unreported Cases)(Patton, Shannon) Modified on 5/16/2014 (H,SP).
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 676 Marginal Entry Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/14/14 granting the parties' joint motion to extend the decertification deadlines. Motion to be filed by 6/11/14, opposition due 6/25/14 and reply due 7/2/14. (Related Doc. #675 ) (M,G)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 675 Joint Motion for extension of time to Extend Decertification Deadlines filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 674 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/12/19 concerning defendants' notice of discovery dispute. The Court orders plaintiffs to produce for in camera inspection a blank copy of the survey they disseminated to class members by tomorrow, Tuesday, 5/13/14 at 4:00 p.m. The Court also requires the plaintiffs to identify what surveys or survey results it provided to any expert expected to testify at trial. (Related Docs. #669 , #673 ) (M,G)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 673 Response to Notice of Discovery Dispute filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #669 .(Fiorelli, Nicole)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 672 Opposition to #670 Motion to Amend Case Management Order to Enlarge Time Allotment for Depositions Practice filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Black Deposition Excerpt)(Fiorelli, Nicole). Modified text on 5/9/2014 (H,SP).
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 671 Supplement - Unreported Cases to be attached to #669 Notice of Discovery Dispute filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. Related document(s) #669 . (Patton, Shannon) Modified on 5/8/2014, counsel notified to include a cover sheet with future filings (H,SP).
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 670 Motion Amend Case Management Order to Enlarge Time Allotment for Depositions Practice filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Patton, Shannon)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/6/14. Plaintiffs shall respond to defendants' discovery dispute notice by 4:00 p.m., on Monday, 5/12/14. (Related Doc. #669 ) (M,G)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 669 Notice of Discovery Dispute filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Unsworn Declaration of Shannon K. Patton)(Patton, Shannon)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 668 Attorney Appearance by Richard N. Selby, II filed by on behalf of Davina Hurt. (Selby, Richard)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 667 Attorney Appearance by Kristen M. Kraus filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Kraus, Kristen)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 666 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/28/14 denying defendants' motion for reconsideration and request for a telephone conference with the Court. (Related Doc. #665 ) (M,G)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 665 Motion for reconsideration and Request for Telephonic Conference filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Chyun Unsworn Declaration)(Chyun, Edward)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 664 Marginal Entry Order granting the parties' joint #663 Motion for extension of discovery and decertification deadline. Discovery deadline now 6/4/14. Decertification motion due 6/14/14, with oppositions due 6/18/14 and reply due by 6/25/14.(S,HR)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 663 Joint Motion for extension of Discovery and Decertification Deadlines filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 662 Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/9/14 resolving defendants' notice of discovery dispute. The Court, as set forth in this order, denies defendants' request to appear for a status conference and to move to compel discovery. (Related Docs. #659 , #660 , #661 ) (M,G)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 661 Letter in reply to Notice of Discovery Dispute Responding to Plaintiffs' April 7 Letter and request for briefing schedule filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Related document(s) #649 , #660 ) (Patton, Shannon). Modified on 4/8/2014 to add link and change text (H,SP).
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 660 Letter in response to Notice of Discovery Dispute filed by All Plaintiffs (Related document(s) #659 ) (Fiorelli, Nicole). Modified text on 4/8/2014 (H,SP).
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order COUNSEL SHALL DISREGARD THIS REMARK AND AWAIT FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS FROM THE COURT REGARDING DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Remark: Counsel shall note that plaintiffs are to file their response to defendants' notice of discovery dispute by close of business on Friday, 4/11/14. (Related Doc. #659 ) (M,G) Modified text and regenerated NEF on 4/8/2014. (M,G).
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 659 Notice of Discovery Dispute filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 2/20/14 granting moving defendants' motion for leave to file opt-out forms; forms accepted as filed with motion. (Related doc. #656 ) (M,G)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 658 Notice of Correction of Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 657 Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Devon Price)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 656 Motion for leave and Notice of Filing Opt-Out Forms filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opt-Out Forms)(Patton, Shannon)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 655 Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Filing Consent of Jose Galeana, Jr.)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 654 Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Glennda Bullock)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 653 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Marecruz Escareno, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Arthur Johnson, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Larry Helber, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Eric Totton, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Nikita Brown, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Christopher Williams, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Nadia Stanley)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 652 Opinion and Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 2/6/14. The Court denies defendants' motion to strike and grants plaintiff's motions to allow the opt-in notices filed after 1/13/14. Further, the Court directs plaintiffs to complete the filing of any additional opt-in notices by 2/18/14. Notices filed after that date will not be included in the potential class. (Related Docs. #641 , #647 , #650 ) (M,G)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 651 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Eric Brown, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Robert Brown, III, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Luis Martinez)Related document(s) #650 .(Fiorelli, Nicole)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 650 Motion to Accept Filing of Late Opt-Ins filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. Related document(s) #643 . (Fiorelli, Nicole)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 649 Opposition to #647 Motion to Accept Filing of Late Opt-Ins filed by All Defendants. (Patton, Shannon)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 648 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Andre Vintero, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Anthony Redmond, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Arthur Milliron, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Darthil Mathews, Sr., #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Darthon Newman, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Delandis Burnett, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dennis McIlhenny, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Desmond Woolfolk, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dominique Whitluck, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Francis Rich, III, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Gina Phinizy, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of Hareece Moffitt, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Hui Lu, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent of James Adams, #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jessica Warren, #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of Justin Sellers, #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Niemma Aiken, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shawna Jones, #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sinh Truong, #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tempest Rowe, #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of Vanessa Dilgado, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of Vincent Vallejo, #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of Yasenna Sapp)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 647 Motion to Accept Filing of Late Opt-Ins filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. Related document(s) #643 . (Fiorelli, Nicole)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 646 Marginal Entry Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 1/30/14 granting the parties' joint motion to extend deadlines. As requested in the motion the cutoff for decertification motion is extended to 5/21/14, opposition due 6/4/14 and reply due 6/11/14; all non-expert discovery due 5/21/14; expert discovery due 6/30/14. All other deadlines remain as earlier assigned. (Related Doc. #642 ) (M,G)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 645 Minutes of status conference before Judge James S. Gwin on 1/30/14. (Court Reporter: none; Time: 9 min.) (M,G)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 644 Reply to response to #641 Motion to strike Late Opt-Ins filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Fulcrum Retail Energy, Hudson Energy Services, LLC, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Limited, Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Chyun, Edward)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 643 Opposition to #641 Motion to strike Late Opt-Ins filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Amanda M. Schrank) (Fiorelli, Nicole). Modified text on 1/30/2014 (H,SP).
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 642 Joint Motion for extension of deadlines filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt (Related document(s) #103 ) (Fiorelli, Nicole). Modified on 1/29/2014 to add link (H,SP).
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 641 Motion to strike Late Opt-Ins filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice and Consent Form, #2 Exhibit B - List of Untimely Opt-In Consent forms)(Patton, Shannon)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 640 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Betty Hearn, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Latoya Banton, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Michael Miller, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Milagros Santiago, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Wendell Sims)(Bartela, Frank)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 639 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of William Bradley, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of William Reid, Jr.)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 638 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Amanda Crawford, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ambrosia Montgomery, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dennishes Austin, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Douglas Whorley, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Gail Burch, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ieshia Brumfield, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kimberly Nettles, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lilla Perez, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Michael Davis, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Narcisco Macaraeg, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Omar Harrison, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of Stephanie Lynch, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Steven Pankowski)(Bartela, Frank)
January 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 637 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Daveyelle Spears, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dominique Wilson, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tameka Carr)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 636 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Curtis Thomas, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of David Evans, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Demetrius Baylor, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Donte McDaniel, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Doris Scott, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dymond Vaden, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of James Drouillard, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Michael McKinney, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Patrick Francis, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Steven McAnuff, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tiffany Taylor, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of William Washington)(Bartela, Frank)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 635 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Darius Jenkins, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of David Losse, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dennishes Austin, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dominique Davis, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Michael Thrope, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Monese Sharp, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Patrick Behihan, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sergio Esquivel, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shayla Thomas, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Terrell Caldwell, Jr.)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 634 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Andrew Davis, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Chante Brite, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Cliff Manning, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of David Dillon, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jessica Rutherford, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jose Lugo, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kamren Ray, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kashif Williams, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kiyona Harris, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Maria Patino, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of William Nelson)(Bartela, Frank)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 633 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Adarius Holmes, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Adela Torres, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Adonis Walker, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Adrian Amador, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Adrian Suarez, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Adrienne Wilburn, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ahjalon Greeley, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Alexis Suarez, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Alice Robinson, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Amber Burrage, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Andrew Rohrer, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of Angenette Dejarnette Tittle, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Anthony Bryant-Williams, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent of Antonio Scovil, #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of Asia Jones, #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of Bradley Hepburn, #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Brandon Bailey, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Cameron Jones, #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Carlos Gutierrez, #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of Chad Chappie, #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of Charles Irby, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of Cherry Gomez, #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of Christopher Richards, #24 Appendix Notice of Consent of Christopher Watson, #25 Appendix Notice of Consent of Corey Lucas, #26 Appendix Notice of Consent of Courtney Henderson, #27 Appendix Notice of Consent of Cristian Ortiz, #28 Appendix Notice of Consent of Daniel Emrisko, #29 Appendix Notice of Consent of Daniel Spioch, #30 Appendix Notice of Consent of Demerest Moten, #31 Appendix Notice of Consent of Derrick Stewart, #32 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dominic Brown, #33 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dorian Stinnett Jr, #34 Appendix Notice of Consent of Edward Rodriguez, #35 Appendix Notice of Consent of Elvis Layne, #36 Appendix Notice of Consent of Emmanuel Stokes, #37 Appendix Notice of Consent of George Hawkins, #38 Appendix Notice of Consent of George Rorex III, #39 Appendix Notice of Consent of Gloria Moses, #40 Appendix Notice of Consent of Gregory Hardrick, #41 Appendix Notice of Consent of Gregory Hui, #42 Appendix Notice of Consent of Gudy Calderon, #43 Appendix Notice of Consent of Hector Melendez, #44 Appendix Notice of Consent of Henry Thomas, #45 Appendix Notice of Consent of James Valerio Jr, #46 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jarvis Chandler, #47 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jasmine Rhoden, #48 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jazzmon Williams, #49 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jenelle Riley, #50 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jeremy Newell, #51 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jorge Gacharnatriuino, #52 Appendix Notice of Consent of Katrina Stone, #53 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kaylee Wilson, #54 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kenneth Matlock, #55 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kristian Williams, #56 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lamont Darty, #57 Appendix Notice of Consent of Larry Brewer Jr, #58 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lisa Spieth, #59 Appendix Notice of Consent of Manzari Gonzalez, #60 Appendix Notice of Consent of Mario Ramirez, #61 Appendix Notice of Consent of Marquea Banks, #62 Appendix Notice of Consent of Maya Corral, #63 Appendix Notice of Consent of Mercedes Dixon, #64 Appendix Notice of Consent of Michael Pfauth, #65 Appendix Notice of Consent of Michael Wozniak, #66 Appendix Notice of Consent of Nadira Cottom, #67 Appendix Notice of Consent of Najee Gregory, #68 Appendix Notice of Consent of Natalia Rubio, #69 Appendix Notice of Consent of Nicholas Whited, #70 Appendix Notice of Consent of Oscar Porter, #71 Appendix Notice of Consent of Preston Marsett III, #72 Appendix Notice of Consent of Raquel Sutton, #73 Appendix Notice of Consent of Raymond Sotelo, #74 Appendix Notice of Consent of Richetta Smith, #75 Appendix Notice of Consent of Robert Davis, #76 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shaakira Reese, #77 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shannon Driggins, #78 Appendix Notice of Consent of Stacey Willis, #79 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tanya Duffy, #80 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tarlee Smith, #81 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tony Graves, #82 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tyiesha Bowie, #83 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tyneeah Brunson, #84 Appendix Notice of Consent of Victor Young, #85 Appendix Notice of Consent of Victoria Moore, #86 Appendix Notice of Consent of Wykeeta Davis)(Bartela, Frank)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 632 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of John Dillan, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kenneth Smallwood, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Stephan Lane, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Quinton Crenshaw, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Nikita Davis, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Fatai Abiose, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Christopher Jenkins, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dianca Cole, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Johnnie Brown, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Luis Palomino, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Demarco Johnson, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of Isaiah Flanigan, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Damaso Rosas, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jonathan Deleon, #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of Da'Shod Lewis, #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of Constance Gentry, #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kristy Turner, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Pablo Perez, #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Khadijah Elakram, #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tyreek Johnson, #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of Samir Sutton, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jeffrey Miller, #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of Semirah Sledge, #24 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sherry Bowman, #25 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shanita Jones, #26 Appendix Notice of Consent of James Ziegan, #27 Appendix Notice of Consent of Myeisha Williams, #28 Appendix Notice of Consent of Anthony Coleman, #29 Appendix Notice of Consent of Delores Landers, #30 Appendix Notice of Consent of Crystal Santiful, #31 Appendix Notice of Consent of Joseph Cheek, #32 Appendix Notice of Consent of Grace Brooks, #33 Appendix Notice of Consent of Gretchen Stewart)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 631 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Alvin Ray, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Amanda Franklin, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Angel Aguilar, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Anjelica Clark, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Anthony Carter, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ashley Ladd, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Bianca Ball, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Brian Jones, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Brittney Foster, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Calvin Brown, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Caresse Stuckey, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of Carissa Fox, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Cassius Odei, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent of Christopher Gibson, #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of Christopher Quillian, #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of Clara Moorer, #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Corey Allen, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Curtis Standley, #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Daniel Brown Jr, #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of Daniel Torres, #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of Darel Ward, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of David Long, #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of Debbie Howden, #24 Appendix Notice of Consent of Delores Dubose, #25 Appendix Notice of Consent of Delores Lawrence, #26 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ebonique Collins, #27 Appendix Notice of Consent of Fernando Rodriguez, #28 Appendix Notice of Consent of Fjorentina Kllogjeri, #29 Appendix Notice of Consent of Gail Hawkins, #30 Appendix Notice of Consent of Greta Lang, #31 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jacob Colton, #32 Appendix Notice of Consent of James Childs, #33 Appendix Notice of Consent of James Jackson, #34 Appendix Notice of Consent of James McDonald, #35 Appendix Notice of Consent of John Harringsma, #36 Appendix Notice of Consent of John Williams Jr, #37 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jose Farias, #38 Appendix Notice of Consent of Joseph Blake, #39 Appendix Notice of Consent of Juan Moctezuma, #40 Appendix Notice of Consent of Juan Ruiz, #41 Appendix Notice of Consent of Julian Flores, #42 Appendix Notice of Consent of Justyna Gonzalez, #43 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kenneth Smallwood, #44 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kiara Rouse, #45 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kierra Oneal, #46 Appendix Notice of Consent of Laticia Dixon, #47 Appendix Notice of Consent of Leah Chanthapanya, #48 Appendix Notice of Consent of Leonard Skinner, #49 Appendix Notice of Consent of Linda Tonkinson, #50 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lucas Irwin, #51 Appendix Notice of Consent of Melodee Crudup, #52 Appendix Notice of Consent of Mommuel Togbah, #53 Appendix Notice of Consent of Orlando Caballero, #54 Appendix Notice of Consent of Orphrus Ugbesia, #55 Appendix Notice of Consent of Quintin Mayfield, #56 Appendix Notice of Consent of Randy Cathey Jr, #57 Appendix Notice of Consent of Raymond Wells, #58 Appendix Notice of Consent of Robert Dobbs Jr, #59 Appendix Notice of Consent of Robert Spear III, #60 Appendix Notice of Consent of Romaine Henry, #61 Appendix Notice of Consent of Roosevelt Townsend, #62 Appendix Notice of Consent of Saleem Tanks, #63 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sharon Fisher, #64 Appendix Notice of Consent of Stephon Crawford, #65 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sylvester Forte, #66 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tara Millsap, #67 Appendix Notice of Consent of Teresa Gaines, #68 Appendix Notice of Consent of Teresa Hudson, #69 Appendix Notice of Consent of Thongchan Panyasy, #70 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tina Stevens, #71 Appendix Notice of Consent of Toriano Williams, #72 Appendix Notice of Consent of Troy Mayhew, #73 Appendix Notice of Consent of Vandaze Buchanan, #74 Appendix Notice of Consent of Wanetta Belk, #75 Appendix Notice of Consent of Wesley Jones, #76 Appendix Notice of Consent of Willie Robinson, #77 Appendix Notice of Consent of Zachary Frankenfield, #78 Appendix Notice of Consent of ZaiTanna Williams)(Bartela, Frank)
December 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 630 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Aaron Anderson, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Adelfo Uriostigue, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Amanda Rusk, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ambyre Gray, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Anthony Daquiro, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of April Kuykendall, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Arthur Jackson, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Avery Terry, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Camisha Chocolate, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Casey Ogletree, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Charles King, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of Christine Jackson, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Cornelius Keys, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent of Darnell Robinson, #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of Destiny Burt, #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dontae Hopkins, #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Donte Taylor, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Earl Owens, #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Elizabeth Palmison, #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of Gary Grasty, #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ginger Bond, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of Guillermo Madrigal, #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jacquella Tucker, #24 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jaime Gonzalez, #25 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jennifer Podgorski, #26 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jerome Lanagan, #27 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jessica Moore, #28 Appendix Notice of Consent of John Cataland, #29 Appendix Notice of Consent of John Savage, #30 Appendix Notice of Consent of John Washington, #31 Appendix Notice of Consent of Julius Dixon, #32 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kerriann Smith, #33 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lee Duckworth, #34 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lolita Thomas, #35 Appendix Notice of Consent of Markia Carter, #36 Appendix Notice of Consent of Marvin Johnson, #37 Appendix Notice of Consent of Michael Perkins, #38 Appendix Notice of Consent of Miles Castro, #39 Appendix Notice of Consent of Nadia Roupe, #40 Appendix Notice of Consent of Naomi Gregory, #41 Appendix Notice of Consent of Narcisa Patio, #42 Appendix Notice of Consent of Nina Rauf, #43 Appendix Notice of Consent of Quanneice Johnson, #44 Appendix Notice of Consent of Quentin Bon, #45 Appendix Notice of Consent of Randall Slaton Jr, #46 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ray Mathis, #47 Appendix Notice of Consent of Richard Wagner, #48 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ronnel Spencer, #49 Appendix Notice of Consent of Samantha Wilson, #50 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shaqelah Carter, #51 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sharicka Clark, #52 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sharon Ellis, #53 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shemika Tillis, #54 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tanya Bouyer, #55 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ted Pacura, #56 Appendix Notice of Consent of Terah Ferguson, #57 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tokunboh Tabiti, #58 Appendix Notice of Consent of Travis Underwood, #59 Appendix Notice of Consent of Zandra Ingguls) (Bartela, Frank). Modified on 1/3/2014 to correct name as to attachment #17 (H,SP).
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 629 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Notice of Consent of Andrea Davis, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Arlene Hopkins, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Aws AbdelAziz, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Cynthia Shellman, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dana Royal, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Derrick Shaw Jr., #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Douglas Stevenson, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jacob Borja, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Joel Martz, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Johntai Rogers, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Khara Sims, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kira Govan, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Nitaire McCoy, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ronnella Jackson, #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ruwa Hampton, #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shaqueta Herron, #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sienna Roseboro, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Stefanie Hendrix, #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Steven George Jr., #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tyneshia Neal, #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of Wayne Burnett, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of William Dillard, #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of Williona Henry, #24 Appendix Notice of Consent of Zahirah Harris)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 628 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Abbad Ashraf, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Akiya Johnson, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Albert Trock III, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Alejandro Diaz, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Amanda Proe, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Anthony Mikolajczak, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Carolyn Durant, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Christian Santana, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Christopher Reilly, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Daryl Lemelle, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Don Nettles, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of Gabriel McMillan, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Gerald Isom, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jan Lane, #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jerry Chisom, #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of Johnathan Mitchell, #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Joshuwa Washington, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kajaun Jenkins, #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kevin Forbes, #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kimberly Okeefe, #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kyle Edwards, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lamont Leslie, #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of Latroya Wright, #24 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lebon Watts, #25 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lisa Williams, #26 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lynn Bland, #27 Appendix Notice of Consent of Martika Murphy, #28 Appendix Notice of Consent of Matthew Phipps, #29 Appendix Notice of Consent of Michael Butt, #30 Appendix Notice of Consent of Mohamed Omar, #31 Appendix Notice of Consent of Noreen Ashton, #32 Appendix Notice of Consent of Peter Vonderau, #33 Appendix Notice of Consent of Princeton Anderson, #34 Appendix Notice of Consent of Quan Lin, #35 Appendix Notice of Consent of Robert Richards, #36 Appendix Notice of Consent of Rosemary New, #37 Appendix Notice of Consent of Soronia Taylor, #38 Appendix Notice of Consent of Suhen Aziz, #39 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tamar Smith, #40 Appendix Notice of Consent of Troy Little, #41 Appendix Notice of Consent of Vanessa Diaz, #42 Appendix Notice of Consent of Willie Hill III)(Bartela, Frank)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 627 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Adrian Jones Jr, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Albertia Ross, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Amber Adelakun, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Andrew Kralovec, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of April Lee, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ashley Harvey, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ashly Robinson, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Bonita Anderson, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Chante Nevel, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Chic White, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ciara Ward, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of Clotine Watson, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Diablo McCoats, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent of Domonique Morris, #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of Donise Langston, #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of Edward Leshin, #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Gregory Delgadillo, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Howard Hobson, #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Joanne Stanley, #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of John Smith, #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jonathan Valentin, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of Joshua Addie, #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kevin Ramdhan, #24 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kyle Leppert, #25 Appendix Notice of Consent of Laila Thomas, #26 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lesheka Horton, #27 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lisa Prestler, #28 Appendix Notice of Consent of Malcolm Choice, #29 Appendix Notice of Consent of Maria Herrera, #30 Appendix Notice of Consent of Nicholas Tulo, #31 Appendix Notice of Consent of Perry Ellis IV, #32 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ryan Majersky, #33 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shaneka Dyer, #34 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shervon Vaulx, #35 Appendix Notice of Consent of Susan Johnson, #36 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tanisha Jefferson, #37 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tieshica Hodge, #38 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tiffany Braden, #39 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tiffany Shackleford, #40 Appendix Notice of Consent of Troy Butler Jr, #41 Appendix Notice of Consent of Walter Addie II, #42 Appendix Notice of Consent of Yarnell Brown)(Bartela, Frank)
December 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 626 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Arneqka Lester, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Becky Miailovich, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Bria Butler, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Clifford Johnson IV, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dominick Garcea, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Edwin Rivera, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Erica Anderson, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Erica Perdue, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Gabrielle Robinson, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Glen Gaston, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ileatha Anderson, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of Janet Cleary, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jazmin Cofield, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kenyatta Mukes, #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lee Van Leer, #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of Michael Starks, #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Nicole Backus-Menard, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Nicole Pearson, #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Oswaldo Gomez, #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of Raymond Leake Jr., #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of Rodney Harris, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of Samuel Johnson, #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of Steven Dawkins, #24 Appendix Notice of Consent of Vincent Pollock)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Commerce Energy Inc, Just Energy Group Inc, and Just Energy Marketing Corp.'s #625 Motion for extension of time until January 20, 2014 to identify expert witnesses. Judge James S. Gwin on 12/23/13.(S,HR)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 625 Motion for extension of time until January 20, 2014 to Identify Expert Witnesses filed by Commerce Energy, Inc, Just Energy Group, Inc., Just Energy Marketing Corp. (Patton, Shannon)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 624 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Allen Martin, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ashley Haynes, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Belinda Lay, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Brenda Clay-Reynolds, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Briana Purnell, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Camille Scott, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Carlos Moore Jr, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Caroline Fultz, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Carrissa Burden, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Christina Mims, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Christopher Thomas, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dalton Young, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Darryl Walters II, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dawn Finnimore, #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of Douglas Panozzo, #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ebony Gray, #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Eric Davis, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Erron Corke, #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Felecia Anderson, #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of Florene Newby, #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of George Ntim, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jameel Kearney, #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of James Jackson IV, #24 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jennifer Chavis, #25 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jesse Wolgemuth, #26 Appendix Notice of Consent of Joseph Fobbs, #27 Appendix Notice of Consent of Joshua Zamora, #28 Appendix Notice of Consent of Joyce Freeman, #29 Appendix Notice of Consent of Juandez Evans, #30 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kelly Thompson, #31 Appendix Notice of Consent of Laniese Frazier, #32 Appendix Notice of Consent of Laurence Vranken, #33 Appendix Notice of Consent of Malik Godwin, #34 Appendix Notice of Consent of Marcio Rodriguez, #35 Appendix Notice of Consent of Marie Cobern, #36 Appendix Notice of Consent of Mariela Celedon, #37 Appendix Notice of Consent of Mark Harris, #38 Appendix Notice of Consent of Mark Ratfelders, #39 Appendix Notice of Consent of Marvin Smith Jr, #40 Appendix Notice of Consent of Mary Kiser, #41 Appendix Notice of Consent of Maurice Daniells, #42 Appendix Notice of Consent of Monae Freeman, #43 Appendix Notice of Consent of Murad Stevens, #44 Appendix Notice of Consent of Parrish Pickett, #45 Appendix Notice of Consent of Reginald Hammond II, #46 Appendix Notice of Consent of Richard Arocha, #47 Appendix Notice of Consent of Richard Boyd, #48 Appendix Notice of Consent of Robert Forgette, #49 Appendix Notice of Consent of Robin Lewis, #50 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sandra Hunter, #51 Appendix Notice of Consent of Savon Smith, #52 Appendix Notice of Consent of Seron Rose, #53 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shannon Holsinger, #54 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sharooq Saleem, #55 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shaun Maldonado, #56 Appendix Notice of Consent of Solomon Hill, #57 Appendix Notice of Consent of Toni Chavis)(Bartela, Frank)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 623 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Alesa Green, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Alfred Jackson, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Annika Hodge, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Anthony Lewis, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Artrice Campbell, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Asarah Jones, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Atiqullah Ahmadi, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Benny Allen, II, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Brian Tinker, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Christian Elenes-Bojorquez, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Christopher Anderson, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of Clifford Oliver, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Clifton Jordan, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent foCourtney McFarland, #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of Damien Johnson, #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of Desiree Gay, #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dezirae Pettis, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Eric Battle, #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Erica Knott, #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of Evangelina Castro, #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of Gerald Harrigan, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of Gerald Perry, #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jessica Garrett, #24 Appendix Notice of Consent of Joanna Lineman, #25 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jonquala Longstreet, #26 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jordan Llamas, #27 Appendix Notice of Consent of Joseph Fobbs, #28 Appendix Notice of Consent of Joseph McChrystol, #29 Appendix Notice of Consent of Juilius Jones, #30 Appendix Notice of Consent of Karina Quirarte, #31 Appendix Notice of Consent of Keith Miller-Stone, #32 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kenneth Foster, #33 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kudzai Tsoka, #34 Appendix Notice of Consent of LaShun Venson, #35 Appendix Notice of Consent of Latonya Conner, #36 Appendix Notice of Consent of Latreace Peterson, #37 Appendix Notice of Consent of Louis Diaz-Fiandaca, #38 Appendix Notice of Consent of Love Crosby, #39 Appendix Notice of Consent of Maricela Castillo, #40 Appendix Notice of Consent of Mauvolyene Adams, #41 Appendix Notice of Consent of Michael Baughn, #42 Appendix Notice of Consent of Michael Moody-Crutcher, #43 Appendix Notice of Consent of Myron Lamar, Jr., #44 Appendix Notice of Consent of Nakisha Jefferson, #45 Appendix Notice of Consent of Nelson Ruque, #46 Appendix Notice of Consent of Patricia Foxx, #47 Appendix Notice of Consent of Raeshia James, #48 Appendix Notice of Consent Reginald Frazier, #49 Appendix Notice of Consent of Robert Smith, #50 Appendix Notice of Consent of Rodney Maglio, #51 Appendix Notice of Consent Ronica Dessauer, #52 Appendix Notice of Consent of Rosalua Lopez, #53 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shantamekia Brooks, #54 Appendix Notice of Consent of Stacie Gaskins, #55 Appendix Notice of Consent of Teesha Tate, #56 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tiffany Shanklin, #57 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tonnette Andu, #58 Appendix Notice of Consent of Troy Sadlen, #59 Appendix Notice of Consent of Victor Thankgod, #60 Appendix Notice of Consent of Willard Hall, #61 Appendix Notice of Consent of Yartza Avalo)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 622 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Alex Sotelo, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ardelia Perry, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Beatriz Quiroz, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Belsin Younan, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Charles Proffitt III, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Charles Redeker, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dan Granger, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Delilah Smith, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dennis Haralson, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dominique Mickens, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dudley Grace, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of Erica Johnson, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Gloria Henderson, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jamal Mohammed, #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jesse Forester, #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jessi Chapman, #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Johquese Walker, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jose Sepulveda, #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Keith Williams Sr, #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kenneth Johnson, #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kenon Walker, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lakia Beckwith, #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of LaShanda Breedlove, #24 Appendix Notice of Consent of Leroy Dunlap Jr, #25 Appendix Notice of Consent of Leslie Dubinsky, #26 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lontrell Solomon, #27 Appendix Notice of Consent of Majari Martin, #28 Appendix Notice of Consent of Michael Morgan, #29 Appendix Notice of Consent of Peony Villarreal, #30 Appendix Notice of Consent of Rachel Rinear, #31 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ricardo Elias, #32 Appendix Notice of Consent of Richard Deniken III, #33 Appendix Notice of Consent of Rinise Warrick, #34 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shanice Stewart, #35 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tanisha Austin, #36 Appendix Notice of Consent of Teresa Visperas, #37 Appendix Notice of Consent of Timothy Powers, #38 Appendix Notice of Consent of Toni Cavalli, #39 Appendix Notice of Consent of Veronica Lee, #40 Appendix Notice of Consent of Wendy Gordon, #41 Appendix Notice of Consent of William Hodge, #42 Appendix Notice of Consent of William Sibley)(Bartela, Frank)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 621 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ahmed Janneh, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Alysia Ramadani, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Amanda Hoyes, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Anita Perry, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Anthony Burke, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Anthony Rouse, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Antoinette Henry, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Antonio Lowder, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Brandon Herroz, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Caleb Fisher-Boone, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Calvin Johnson, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of Carleton Reed, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Chanel Morris, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent of Christan Butler, #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of Cordale Waites, #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of D'Ronn Holloway, #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Deanna Files, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Devonte Turner, #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dwayne Combs Jr, #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of Floyd Ellis, #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of James Mclean, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jessica Shamblin, #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kenneth Brown, #24 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kenyatta Rattler, #25 Appendix Notice of Consent of Latysha Godwin, #26 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lynda Evans, #27 Appendix Notice of Consent of Malik Thomas, #28 Appendix Notice of Consent of Margie Watkins, #29 Appendix Notice of Consent of Michael Phillips, #30 Appendix Notice of Consent of Michelle Olivo, #31 Appendix Notice of Consent of Myron Barnes, #32 Appendix Notice of Consent of Oliver Bynum Jr, #33 Appendix Notice of Consent of Randell Campbell, #34 Appendix Notice of Consent of Roshanna Newt, #35 Appendix Notice of Consent of Samantha Buffington, #36 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sinai Jones, #37 Appendix Notice of Consent of Stephen Banko IV, #38 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tamika Jefferson, #39 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tawana James, #40 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tiffany Banks, #41 Appendix Notice of Consent of Wilmarie Diana, #42 Appendix Notice of Consent of Zachary Cantrell)(Bartela, Frank)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 620 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Adrien Williams, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Aja Simon, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Alexea Lopez, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Anthony Sparks, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Armando Cole, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Audra Dorsey, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Aundrea King Jr, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Brandi Hill, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Carlando Myers, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Cayla Burnside, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Charisma Williams, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of Christopther Solomon, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Crystal Britt, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent of Cynthia Summerall, #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of Danyel Barwick, #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of David Houseman, #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Deborah Summerall, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dorian Yates, #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Edward Scheirer III, #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of Erica Jackson, #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of Frank Hertz, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of Greg Morris, #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jennifer Mason, #24 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jermaine Jefferson, #25 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kenny Nixon, #26 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lakesha Hawes, #27 Appendix Notice of Consent of Larr Stepp, #28 Appendix Notice of Consent of Latoya Hicks, #29 Appendix Notice of Consent of Marvin Weese Jr, #30 Appendix Notice of Consent of Myeisha Thompson, #31 Appendix Notice of Consent of Nicholas Sellers, #32 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ollie Babb, #33 Appendix Notice of Consent of Patrice Free, #34 Appendix Notice of Consent of Rahmatu Annoh, #35 Appendix Notice of Consent of Rasheen Townsend, #36 Appendix Notice of Consent of Raymond Sawyer, #37 Appendix Notice of Consent of Robert Buck, #38 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shakeena Tate, #39 Appendix Notice of Consent of Steven Taylor, #40 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tyler Bateman, #41 Appendix Notice of Consent of Vincent Tillman, #42 Appendix Notice of Consent of Wesley Fields)(Bartela, Frank)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 619 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Albert Boyd II, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Alex Mayorga, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Alisha Porter, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Andre Burdine Jr, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Andreanna Warren, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Candice King, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Carla Porter, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Cedric Bridges, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Christopher Jones, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Danya Dickenson, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Darryl Dumas, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of Deborah Ezell, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Diana Dwyer, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dominque Seaward, #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of Donnie Evans, #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of Edward Borden, #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Gary Lee, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Iyad Abdullah, #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jerog Fowler, #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jessica Latham, #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of John Potts, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of Khalilah Dordevic, #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of Leticia Gutierrez, #24 Appendix Notice of Consent of Mack Shell Jr, #25 Appendix Notice of Consent of Makeba Dower, #26 Appendix Notice of Consent of Monay Harris, #27 Appendix Notice of Consent of Monique Festherson, #28 Appendix Notice of Consent of Necco Sharpe, #29 Appendix Notice of Consent of Nicholas Novak, #30 Appendix Notice of Consent of Paula Hickman, #31 Appendix Notice of Consent of Phillip Komada Jr, #32 Appendix Notice of Consent of Priscilla Godoy, #33 Appendix Notice of Consent of Quintin Davis, #34 Appendix Notice of Consent of Reina DeShields, #35 Appendix Notice of Consent of Rochelle Palmore, #36 Appendix Notice of Consent of Santino Torres, #37 Appendix Notice of Consent of Santos Torres, #38 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shantana Jones, #39 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shawn Springfield, #40 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sheriece Washington, #41 Appendix Notice of Consent of Stephanie Aaroe, #42 Appendix Notice of Consent of Timothy Robinson)(Bartela, Frank)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 618 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Alonzo Dilworth, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Angela Taylor, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Aquetta Gardner, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Brandon Pressley, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Carol Daniels, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Cassondra Conk, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Charles Cyr, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Cheryl Ramos, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Christopher Cazzato, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Clifford Robertson, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Cody Grimes-King, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of David Contreras, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Deborah Carter, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dennis Nelms Jr., #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of Diedre Johnson, #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of Isaac Ramos, #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jaclyn Mcneil, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jacqueline Mason, #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jeremy Grayson, #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jessica Harney, #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of Joshua Lewis, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of Joy Lee, #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of Long Hong, #24 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lonnie Wiley Jr., #25 Appendix Notice of Consent of Maricela Romo, #26 Appendix Notice of Consent of Mark Hamm, #27 Appendix Notice of Consent of Martina Thatch, #28 Appendix Notice of Consent of Michael Rayfield, #29 Appendix Notice of Consent of Richard Watters, #30 Appendix Notice of Consent of Robert Jakubec, #31 Appendix Notice of Consent of Robert Ross, #32 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ruth Watson, #33 Appendix Notice of Consent of Safiya Patterson, #34 Appendix Notice of Consent of Santos Ramos, #35 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sean Schemelia, #36 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shauntel Caldwell, #37 Appendix Notice of Consent of Simon Marshall, #38 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sophaphone Daniels, #39 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tano Menan, #40 Appendix Notice of Consent of Terrell Mitchell, #41 Appendix Notice of Consent of Thomas Conroy Jr., #42 Appendix Notice of Consent of Unique Jimerson)(Bartela, Frank)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 617 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Abiola Ajibola, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Anthony Fortune, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Britney Couch, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Brittany Davis, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Broadus Dean, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Candice Avery, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Cedric Thomas, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Chawanda Wilson, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Christopher Ruiz-Martinez, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Christopher Schurman, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Corey Coston, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of D'onna Gaskins, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Darlene Gibbs, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dayunie Living, #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dominique Jones, #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dublandu Alema, #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Eileen Lee, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Erica Shields, #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Erica Smith, #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of James Gainous, #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jarrell Grissom, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jeramy Gay, #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jessica Huber, #24 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jessica Rodreques, #25 Appendix Notice of Consent of Keith Fulgham, #26 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kenneth McCoy, #27 Appendix Notice of Consent of Khalilah Courtney-White, #28 Appendix Notice of Consent of Marcus Lawrence, #29 Appendix Notice of Consent of Mikyale Hunley, #30 Appendix Notice of Consent of Nicole Moore, #31 Appendix Notice of Consent of Paige Williams, #32 Appendix Notice of Consent of Perry Jooss, #33 Appendix Notice of Consent of Qinton Woods, #34 Appendix Notice of Consent of Raynard Shelton, #35 Appendix Notice of Consent of Robert Alexander, #36 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sania Mclean, #37 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shaunquia Williams, #38 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sheree Cox, #39 Appendix Notice of Consent of Stephon Harrell, #40 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tanveer Shahzad, #41 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tyra Williams, #42 Appendix Notice of Consent of Xaviere Ballard-Mason)(Bartela, Frank)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 616 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Adolfo Moreno, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Alexis Sanford, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Alfredo Farfan, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Angelica Alvaro, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Brian Rankins, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Briana Phillips, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Christopher Hummel, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of D'Andrae Duke, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Daniel Harrington, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Gregory McDowell, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jason Pittman, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jazmin Soto, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jheremy Gathright, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent of Juan Jimenez, #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kenneth Bass Jr., #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kimberly Sheridan, #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lance King, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Larry Lopez Jr., #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Latonia McClain, #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of Mallory Edmondson, #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of Mark Dixon, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of Mya Davis, #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of Nicole Johnson, #24 Appendix Notice of Consent of Oliver Hawkins, #25 Appendix Notice of Consent of Raeshon Silver, #26 Appendix Notice of Consent of Rashaad Harris, #27 Appendix Notice of Consent of Richard Ellis Jr., #28 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ronnie Wilson, #29 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sanita Johns, #30 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sarah Collins, #31 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sharon Owens, #32 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shenae Longstreet, #33 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shendola Starks, #34 Appendix Notice of Consent of Solomon Edwards, #35 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sonia Gayle, #36 Appendix Notice of Consent of Taylor Currie-Bishop, #37 Appendix Notice of Consent of Te'Shaun Morris, #38 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tiffany Starks, #39 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tracey Harrington, #40 Appendix Notice of Consent of Unique Logan, #41 Appendix Notice of Consent of Vincent Guzman, #42 Appendix Notice of Consent of Walter Gearhart)(Bartela, Frank)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 615 Attorney Appearance by James A. DeRoche filed by on behalf of Davina Hurt. (DeRoche, James)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 614 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Amanda Williams, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Amber Harris, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Andrea Harden, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Angela Guillen, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Antoine Torrence, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Brian Freeney, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Chaquita Walton, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Crystal Sykes, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of DeMarus Prince, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Douglas Hollis, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dwayne Crout, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of Eric Hussey, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Giorgio Caples, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent of Gustavo Barbosa, #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jeff Jones, #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jesse Tinsley, #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Joseph Samuels, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kaliefe Scott, #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Keith Eatmon, #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kelicia Corley, #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kevin Simmons, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kyle Snerley, #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lamae Baenes, #24 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lazaro Jones, #25 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lenell Perkins, #26 Appendix Notice of Consent of Manuel Ramirez-Vicario, #27 Appendix Notice of Consent of Markita Scott, #28 Appendix Notice of Consent of Olanda Allen, #29 Appendix Notice of Consent of Paris Robinson, #30 Appendix Notice of Consent of Porsche Murphy, #31 Appendix Notice of Consent of Reginald Bradley, #32 Appendix Notice of Consent of Samantha Moore, #33 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shaquera Arteberry, #34 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shavon Jackson, #35 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sheltiqua Hagans, #36 Appendix Notice of Consent of Steven Harris, #37 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tyreana Austin, #38 Appendix Notice of Consent of Victor Davis, #39 Appendix Notice of Consent of William Moorehead)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 613 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Erica Panski, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tonnysha O'Bannon, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dalon Sharp, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Anthony Edwards, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Raevin Odukaya, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Paul Tate, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ernest Gates, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Winnie Gilbert, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Erika Dawson, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Vincent Daughrity, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Albert Ian, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of Christopher Evans, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Erik Renteria, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lashon Upton, #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dwight Starks, #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of Clifford Brannick, #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Adebimpe Famugiuwa, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lindsay Rucker, #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Gregory Stewart, Jr., #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of Paul Hardwick., #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of Anthony Mizelle, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of Thomas Saviano, #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of Charles Fenner, #24 Appendix Notice of Consent of Christopher Bowers, #25 Appendix Notice of Consent of Anthony Botto, #26 Appendix Notice of Consent of Olivia Mullen, #27 Appendix Notice of Consent of Danielle Whitfield, #28 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shaniya Phillips, #29 Appendix Notice of Consent of Eric Stames, #30 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shahzan Rahim, #31 Appendix Notice of Consent of Michael Miranda, #32 Appendix Notice of Consent of David Reid, #33 Appendix Notice of Consent of Andre Dunmars, #34 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tiffany Jones, #35 Appendix Notice of Consent of Andraliss Holman, #36 Appendix Notice of Consent of Julius McDonald, #37 Appendix Notice of Consent of Seychelle Wilson, #38 Appendix Notice of Consent of Darla Bishop, #39 Appendix Notice of Consent of Nicholas Devine, #40 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jimmie Tucker, Jr., #41 Appendix Notice of Consent of Carl Smith, #42 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dana Bratton, Jr., #43 Appendix Notice of Consent of Adrienne White, #44 Appendix Notice of Consent of David Thomas, #45 Appendix Notice of Consent of Apollo Freeman)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 612 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Alisia Smith, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Andrelia Floyd, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Anthony Gross, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Aquila Green, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Brian Freeney, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Brittany Puckett, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Brittany Redmond, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Carmen Moore, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Chantara Rodgers, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Daniel Meza, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Darius Crump, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of Eduardo Bonilla, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Erica Panski, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ernest Douglas, #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of Faykeita Wearing, #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ilene Thomas, #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jakeem Johnson, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Janet Cisneros, #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jessica Connor, #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jonathan Simon Jr., #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jose Avalos, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of Juan Jimenez, #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of Justin Courtney, #24 Appendix Notice of Consent of Katrina Robinson, #25 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kenyotto Pearson, #26 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kevin Raymer, #27 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lawrence Calloway, #28 Appendix Notice of Consent of Mark Ebbers, #29 Appendix Notice of Consent of Rashad Johnson, #30 Appendix Notice of Consent of Samr Musa, #31 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sapphire Ruff, #32 Appendix Notice of Consent of Seveta Griffin, #33 Appendix Notice of Consent of Stanley Thomas, #34 Appendix Notice of Consent of Stephen Katalinas, #35 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tamika Vinson, #36 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ted Butler, #37 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tonnysha O'Bannon, #38 Appendix Notice of Consent of Travis Norman, #39 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tyhiera Foster, #40 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tyrone Smith, #41 Appendix Notice of Consent of Vahji Lahori, #42 Appendix Notice of Consent of Victoria Rampola-Long)(Bartela, Frank)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 611 Minutes of status conference before Judge James S. Gwin on 12/10/13. (Court Reporter: none; Time: 14 min.) (M,G)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] that a status conference has been scheduled for 1/30/14 at 12:00 noon before Judge James S. Gwin in Chambers 18A (Cleveland). As previously required all counsel, parties and individuals with full and final settlement authority are required to attend in person. (M,G)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 610 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Gilna Mendoza, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Judith Gonzales, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Michael Lee, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Antonio Espanol, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Rasheen Tolliver, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Clarissa Thomas, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Iris DeJesus, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Danielle Parks, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jacqueline Wilson, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Amber Jackson, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Meghaan Jones, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of Elizabeth Smith, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Mashaud Mcclarin, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent of Reginald Platts, Jr., #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of Alicia Allison, #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ebony Cook, #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tarina Matthews, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Darnell Barefield, #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tamela Caudill, #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of DaMeco Williams, #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lacey Thomas, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of Russel Hawkins, Jr., #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of Asia Crockett, #24 Appendix Notice of Consent of Joseph Jones, #25 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lamar Fogle, #26 Appendix Notice of Consent of Antonio Deena, #27 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ashley Messer, #28 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jeno Bailey, #29 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ke'Airah booker, #30 Appendix Notice of Consent of Billy Lambert, #31 Appendix Notice of Consent of Thomas Graziano, #32 Appendix Notice of Consent of Stephanie Galvez, #33 Appendix Notice of Consent of Simeon Uddin, #34 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lisa Rogers, #35 Appendix Notice of Consent of Michelle McGuinness, #36 Appendix Notice of Consent of Victor Ferguson, Jr., #37 Appendix Notice of Consent of Terry McMinn)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 609 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Allen Outlar, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Andre Coles, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Angelica Robinson, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Brian Cameron, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Cyrtis Jones, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of DeShawteya Butler, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dishan Lowe, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dominique Perkins, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ellious Colbert Jr., #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ferrel Munn, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Frederick Reisker, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of Gabrielle Lyons, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Helen Ronan, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jacqueline Murray, #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of James Clark, #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of James Griffin Jr., #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Janelle Hearon, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jessica Smith, #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jesus Ayala, #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of Julie Kiselev, #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of Justin Bryaut, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kadeem Holmon, #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kalisa Lester, #24 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kevin Johnson, #25 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kristopher Shalvay-Cawthon, #26 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lashawna Austin, #27 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lataya Boyd, #28 Appendix Notice of Consent of LC Bodley Jr., #29 Appendix Notice of Consent of Marcus Gilliland, #30 Appendix Notice of Consent of Michael Stewart, #31 Appendix Notice of Consent of Monique Brown, #32 Appendix Notice of Consent of Raynithia Hearon, #33 Appendix Notice of Consent of Renee Perry, #34 Appendix Notice of Consent of Rodney Duncan, #35 Appendix Notice of Consent of Rodney Webster, #36 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ronda Doss, #37 Appendix Notice of Consent of Royce Weldon Sr., #38 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sajdah Nelson, #39 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sharon Lewis, #40 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shateria Gaines, #41 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shaun Ronan, #42 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shaunice Turner, #43 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shawn William, #44 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shenay Shane, #45 Appendix Notice of Consent of Syreeta Johnson, #46 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tammie Stanley, #47 Appendix Notice of Consent of Terry Blackwell, #48 Appendix Notice of Consent of Vincent Coates Jr., #49 Appendix Notice of Consent of Walter Webster, #50 Appendix Notice of Consent of William Fuller, #51 Appendix Notice of Consent of Willie Stephens Jr.)(Bartela, Frank)
December 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 608 Notice of Filing Consents filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Alexis Matos, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Annie Jackson, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Brandon Berry, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Centurian Griffin, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Crystal Williams, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Daniel Phillips, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of David Magnus, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Gordon Chase, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of James Martinez, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jordon Bell, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Justina Changey, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kristi Swopes, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Leon Thomas, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lowell Sanders, #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of Marco Burton Jr., #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of Marina Garcia, #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Naddia Kayed-Bazar, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Paul Scott, #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Russell Leake Jr., #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sharesse Mohr, #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shema Ball, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shuntia Leach, #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tina Hart, #24 Appendix Notice of Consent of Wayne Hyatt)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 607 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Abubakarv Sesay, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Andrew Stewart, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Angel Calo-Rivera, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Angelica Fregoso, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Antonio Harris, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Arnold Reid, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Brian Njogu, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Calvin Williams, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Chantara Rodgers, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Charles Small, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Christopher Burton, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dana Slowik, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Deana Coleman, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent of De'Breana Fleming, #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of Donnitta Carter, #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ericka Robinson-Cotton, #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Felicia Caudle, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Hassan Travis, #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Imani Hart, #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of Irwin Rosenson, #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jared Josephs, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jason Gibbons, #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of Joseph Nevill, #24 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kevin Brown, #25 Appendix Notice of Consent of Krishauna Hill, #26 Appendix Notice of Consent of Krystal Jackson, #27 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lafeyette Brown, #28 Appendix Notice of Consent of Mark Fields, #29 Appendix Notice of Consent of Matthew Narcisse Jr., #30 Appendix Notice of Consent of Maurice Howard, #31 Appendix Notice of Consent of Michael Lewis, #32 Appendix Notice of Consent of Nadira Huger, #33 Appendix Notice of Consent of Nicole Ashley, #34 Appendix Notice of Consent of Norvell Emery, #35 Appendix Notice of Consent of Pamela Carr, #36 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ray'mond Patton, #37 Appendix Notice of Consent of Richard Holloway, #38 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sharif Mobley, #39 Appendix Notice of Consent of Stephen Liberty, #40 Appendix Notice of Consent of Steven Davis, #41 Appendix Notice of Consent of Steven Rocha, #42 Appendix Notice of Consent of Terry Walker, #43 Appendix Notice of Consent of Thomas Johnson, #44 Appendix Notice of Consent of Vilma Santiago, #45 Appendix Notice of Consent of Wahida Mohammed, #46 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kevin Drummond Jr., #47 Appendix Notice of Consent of Chelece Dixon, #48 Appendix Notice of Consent of Christopher McGowan, #49 Appendix Notice of Consent of Chelene Campbell, #50 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jimmie Galvin, #51 Appendix Notice of Consent of Anthony Mills, #52 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dante Johnson, #53 Appendix Notice of Consent of Corey Hunter, #54 Appendix Notice of Consent of Pierre McClinton)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 606 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Aaron Austin, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Abdu Said, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Aeisha Bush, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Airiyana Buster, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Amanda D'Andrea, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Amber Briscoe, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Andrea Leemalie, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Anita Brown, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Anquanette Wright, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Antonio Riley, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Arianna Dodson, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of Artisha Adams, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ashley Cooper, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ashley Early, #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of Betzalee Ortiz, #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of Beverly Clay, #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Bianca Johnson, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Bobbi Howard, #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Brian watson, #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of Brittany Smith, #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of Carolyn Hawkins, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of Casanae Guinn, #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of Catina Urbina, #24 Appendix Notice of Consent of Chanelle Wright, #25 Appendix Notice of Consent of Chelsey Edwords, #26 Appendix Notice of Consent of Christopher Alleyne, #27 Appendix Notice of Consent of Christopher Deemer, #28 Appendix Notice of Consent of Christopher Morast, #29 Appendix Notice of Consent of Clareane Frye, #30 Appendix Notice of Consent of Corey Brown, #31 Appendix Notice of Concent of Courtney Hamilton, #32 Appendix Notice of Consent of Cynthia Ramirez, #33 Appendix Notice of Consent of Daniel Harshaw, #34 Appendix Notice of Consent of Darrin Roper, #35 Appendix Notice of Consent of Darryl Carpenter, #36 Appendix Notice of Consent of Daved Garza, #37 Appendix Notice of Consent of David Douglas Jr, #38 Appendix Notice of Consent of Denzell Lee, #39 Appendix Notice of Consent of DeQuea Arnold, #40 Appendix Notice of Consent of DeShawn Harris, #41 Appendix Notice of Consent of DeShonne Garrett, #42 Appendix Notice of Consent of Devin Boyles, #43 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dion Gray, #44 Appendix Notice of Consent of Douglas Hampton, #45 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dustin Lacey, #46 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ebony Swims, #47 Appendix Notice of Consent of Farhan Khan, #48 Appendix Notice of Consent of Francisco Johnson, #49 Appendix Notice of Consent of Frank Viverette, #50 Appendix Notice of Consent of Gavin Taylor, #51 Appendix Notice of Consent of Geron Sears, #52 Appendix Notice of Consent of Gloria Brown, #53 Appendix Notice of Consent of Herbert Taylor Jr, #54 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ian Vines Jr, #55 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jaclyn Yohanan, #56 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jacob Fookes, #57 Appendix Notice of Consent of James Robertson, #58 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jasmine Hawkins, #59 Appendix Notice of Consent of Javarr Pack, #60 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jaymes Sanford Sr, #61 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jodie Donato, #62 Appendix Notice of Consent of John West, #63 Appendix Notice of Consent of Justin Erwin, #64 Appendix Notice of Consent of Justin McCoy, #65 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kendall Lockard, #66 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kenylata Johnson, #67 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kenyoa Dulaney, #68 Appendix Notice of Consent of Keturah Redd, #69 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kevin Qualls, #70 Appendix Notice of Consent of LaNisha Williams, #71 Appendix Notice of Consent of Larry Pernell Jr, #72 Appendix Notice of Consent of Laurance Ruzzo, #73 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lavonda Blair, #74 Appendix Notice of Consent of Louis Davis, #75 Appendix Notice of Consent of Marchestea Solomon, #76 Appendix Notice of Consent of Mark Papillon, #77 Appendix Notice of Consent of Matthew Ward, #78 Appendix Notice of Consent of Maurice Rehford Jr, #79 Appendix Notice of Consent of Maximillian Perry, #80 Appendix Notice of Consent of Melinda Kelley, #81 Appendix Notice of Consent of Melissa Allen, #82 Appendix Notice of Consent of Melvin Wilson, #83 Appendix Notice of Consent of Mikael Givens, #84 Appendix Notice of Consent of Mikia Price, #85 Appendix Notice of Consent of Milton Sanders, #86 Appendix Notice of Consent of Morris Rogers, #87 Appendix Notice of Consent of Napolean Boone, #88 Appendix Notice of Consent of Orlando Foster, #89 Appendix Notice of Consent of Patrick Carter, #90 Appendix Notice of Consent of Peter Potje, #91 Appendix Notice of Consent of Phyllis Aaron, #92 Appendix Notice of Consent of Pierre Brown, #93 Appendix Notice of Consent of Pierrie Belle, #94 Appendix Notice of Consent of Randell Lewis, #95 Appendix Notice of Consent of Raymond Mitchell, #96 Appendix Notice of Consent of Reaver Ray, #97 Appendix Notice of Consent of Robin Loftis, #98 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ronald Benton Jr, #99 Appendix Notice of Consent of Roosevelt Trotter III, #100 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sandra Bays, #101 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sasha Williams, #102 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shalimar Benedict, #103 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shamonte Allen, #104 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sharlene Marzo, #105 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shawana Goolsby, #106 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shawn Mockabee, #107 Appendix Notice of Consent of Simone Brown, #108 Appendix Notice of Consent of Stella Wingard, #109 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tashia Dent, #110 Appendix Notice of Consent of TeAirra McIntosh, #111 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tenika Jackson, #112 Appendix Notice of Consent of Terrance Wheeler, #113 Appendix Notice of Consent of Terry Arnold, #114 Appendix Notice of Consent of Theresa Aubin, #115 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tiffany Cowans, #116 Appendix Notice of Consent of Timothy Daniels, #117 Appendix Notice of Consent of Timothy Vance Jr, #118 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tony Miller, #119 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tysean Jackson, #120 Appendix Notice of Consent of Valerie Taylor, #121 Appendix Notice of Consent of Vanessa Madden, #122 Appendix Notice of Consent of Viedrea Moore, #123 Appendix Notice of Consent of Willie Roberts, #124 Appendix Notice of Consent of Willie Warner-Sims, #125 Appendix Notice of Consent of Winfrid Jones)(Bartela, Frank)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 605 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of consent of Asiana Walter, #2 Appendix Notice of consent of Sade Johnson, #3 Appendix Notice of consent of Craig Brown Jr., #4 Appendix Notice of consent of Austin Allen, #5 Appendix Notice of consent of Shamella Welch, #6 Appendix Notice of consent of John Bell, #7 Appendix Notice of consent of Demetrius Hill, #8 Appendix Notice of consent of Tashauna Henry, #9 Appendix Notice of consent of Mark Holman, #10 Appendix Notice of consent of Janee Timms, #11 Appendix Notice of consent of Sharon Hardy, #12 Appendix NOtice of consent of Adam Sutton, #13 Appendix Notice of consent of Misti Suarez, #14 Appendix Notice of consent of Patti Leflore, #15 Appendix Notice of consent of Brittany Padgitt, #16 Appendix Notice of consent of Kevin Jones, #17 Appendix Notice of consent of MIke Browder, #18 Appendix Notice of consent of Nathaniel Updike, #19 Appendix Notice of consent of Pablo Mirando Jr., #20 Appendix Notice of consent of Katrina Monroe, #21 Appendix Notice of consent of Shaunquise Allen, #22 Appendix Notice of consent of Emmitt Parker Jr., #23 Appendix Notice of consent of Anthony Taylor, #24 Appendix Notice of consent of Daniel Johnson, #25 Appendix Notice of consent of Kanecia Freeman, #26 Appendix Notice of consent of Cynthia Smith, #27 Appendix Notice of consent of Jarvis Pirtle, #28 Appendix Notice of consent of Emanuel Aponte, #29 Appendix Notice of consent of Emanuel Fitzpatrick, #30 Appendix Notice of consent of Franklin Loconsloe Jr., #31 Appendix Notice of consent of Dontonio Wells II, #32 Appendix Notice of consent of Daniel O'Brian, #33 Appendix Notice of consent of Verdell Chester, #34 Appendix Notice of consent of Jerrold Johnson, #35 Appendix Notice of consent of Fonzy Mitchell, #36 Appendix Notice of consent of Luis Carrasco III, #37 Appendix Notice of consent of Kendrick Harrington, #38 Appendix Notice of consent of Kelly Scrver, #39 Appendix Notice of consent of Brian Warmka, #40 Appendix Notice of consent of Rosie Norman, #41 Appendix Notice of consent of Peketra Ewing, #42 Appendix Notice of consent of Daniel Alexander, #43 Appendix Notice of consent of Sparkle Howard, #44 Appendix Notice of consent of Ashley Bloxson, #45 Appendix Notice of consent of Erik Williams, #46 Appendix Notice of consent of William Coleman, #47 Appendix Notice of consent of Marquella Davis, #48 Appendix Notice of consent of Amy Hisle, #49 Appendix Notice of consent of Alyssa Engle, #50 Appendix Notice of consent of Jarrett Williams, #51 Appendix Notice of consent of Shanika Hutchinson, #52 Appendix Notice of consent of Amanda Miller, #53 Appendix Notice of consent of Charity Shannon, #54 Appendix Notice of consent of Darnell Williams, #55 Appendix Notice of consent of Nicole Evans, #56 Appendix Notice of consent of William Music Jr., #57 Appendix Notice of consent of Melissa Abott, #58 Appendix Notice of consent of Danyele Scott, #59 Appendix Notice of consent of James Rogers Jr., #60 Appendix Notice of consent of Jacqualine Robinson, #61 Appendix Notice of consent of Richard Johnson, #62 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jennifer Koehne, #63 Appendix Notice of consent of Andre Mondie, #64 Appendix Notice of consent of Deonte Fletcher, #65 Appendix Notice of consent of Shaterra Adams, #66 Appendix Notice of consent of Jessica Stell, #67 Appendix Notice of consent of Jasmine Flagg, #68 Appendix Notice of consent of Cassandra Caldwell, #69 Appendix Notice of consent of Richard Morgan, #70 Appendix Notice of consent of Cheyenne Lambert II, #71 Appendix Notice of consent of Christina Toney, #72 Appendix Notice of consent of Anthony Nesbitt, #73 Appendix Notice of consent of Loretta Burhns, #74 Appendix Notice of consent Tiarra Smith, #75 Appendix Notice of consent of Tamika Cornwell, #76 Appendix Notice of consent of Oscar Reynolds, #77 Appendix Notice of consent of Shaneca Myles, #78 Appendix Notice of consent of Ziairah Barnes, #79 Appendix Notice of consent of Laddus Buford, #80 Appendix Notice of consent of Mercedies Robinson, #81 Appendix Notice of consent Santwan Jones, #82 Appendix Notice of consent of Thomas Dorsey III, #83 Appendix Notice of consent of Andrew Gilmore, #84 Appendix Notice of consent of Laverne Lamberson, #85 Appendix Notice of consent of Randy Thomas)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 604 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Mackenzie Sarris, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of David Gary, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of Stephan Havas, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of LaTasha Amison, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kansas Thorpe Jr., #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Clinton Parris, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Joshua McAlpine, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Alexander Spehar, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Michael Hazlett, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Leshan Harris, #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Charlese McKissick, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of Joanne Boyd, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Symone Gaddy, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent of Cheryl Sable, #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of Wayne Dancie Jr., #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of Melanie Klus, #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sean McClain, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ronald Kment, #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Dorothy Triplett, #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of Michael King, #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kevin Blanchard, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of Stephanie Watson, #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of Joseph Morales, #24 Appendix Notice of Consent of Maria Saldana, #25 Appendix Notice of Consent of Eric White, #26 Appendix Notice of Consent of Briana Thompson, #27 Appendix Notice of Consent of Joseph Tate, #28 Appendix Notice of Consent of Brandy Andrade Rivas, #29 Appendix Notice of Consent of Samantha Foster, #30 Appendix Notice of Consent of Michael Kwiat, #31 Appendix Notice of Consent of Audrey Forrest, #32 Appendix Notice of Consent of Andriana Young, #33 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lakeisha Starnes, #34 Appendix Notice of Consent of Maxsonn Smith, #35 Appendix Notice of Consent of Toroney Lewis, #36 Appendix Notice of Consent of Andrew McKinney, #37 Appendix Notice of Consent of Janessa Andrews, #38 Appendix Notice of Consent of Arian Bradley, #39 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ebony Wilson, #40 Appendix Notice of Consent of Armando Horta, #41 Appendix Notice of Consent of Daniel Thompson, #42 Appendix Notice of Consent of Martin Reyes, #43 Appendix Notice of Consent of Frank Sanders Jr., #44 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ronald Franklin, #45 Appendix Notice of Consent of Franklin Barnes, #46 Appendix Notice of Consent of Trayshawn Gray, #47 Appendix Notice of Consent of Samuel Teate, #48 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tracey Jones, #49 Appendix Notice of Consent of Rhonda Govens, #50 Appendix Notice of Consent of David White, #51 Appendix Notice of Consent of Santana Green, #52 Appendix Notice of Consent of Krysten Fontroy, #53 Appendix Notice of Consent of Breyana Hunter, #54 Appendix Notice of Consent of Thomas Brown, #55 Appendix Notice of Consent of Brooke Kohler, #56 Appendix Notice of Consent of Franklin Andrews, #57 Appendix Notice of Consent of Donte Mashore, #58 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shelia Donald, #59 Appendix Notice of Consent of Ana Carranza, #60 Appendix Notice of Consent of Rick Carvalho)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 603 Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Consent of Laniqueca Hampton, #2 Appendix Notice of Consent of Hee Sohn, #3 Appendix Notice of Consent of John Moore, #4 Appendix Notice of Consent of Priest Ramsey, #5 Appendix Notice of Consent of Challee Allen, #6 Appendix Notice of Consent of Luis Camara, #7 Appendix Notice of Consent of Brandon Tyson, #8 Appendix Notice of Consent of Logan Pape, #9 Appendix Notice of Consent of Edwina Mallett, #10 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tommy Frankiln, Sr., #11 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tameka Randolph, #12 Appendix Notice of Consent of Joyce Etheridge, #13 Appendix Notice of Consent of Kenneth Townsell, #14 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jovante Hector, #15 Appendix Notice of Consent of Jalessa Johnson, #16 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tequila Thompson, #17 Appendix Notice of Consent of Michael Alverson, #18 Appendix Notice of Consent of Duane Diggs, #19 Appendix Notice of Consent of Takara Kinnebrew, #20 Appendix Notice of Consent of Vernon Laffartha, #21 Appendix Notice of Consent of Troy Ramey, #22 Appendix Notice of Consent of Miguel Spiuey, #23 Appendix Notice of Consent of Danisha Dillard, #24 Appendix Notice of Consent of Maria Harris, #25 Appendix Notice of Consent of Delarse Montgomery, #26 Appendix Notice of Consent of Katelyn Popov, #27 Appendix Notice of Consent of DeAsia Lipkins, #28 Appendix Notice of Consent of David Winkel, Jr., #29 Appendix Notice of Consent of Lynette Harris, #30 Appendix Notice of Consent of Alfred Williams, Jr., #31 Appendix Notice of Consent of Deangelo Johnson, #32 Appendix Notice of Consent of Terry Prosser, #33 Appendix Notice of Consent of Deron Williams, #34 Appendix Notice of Consent of Roderick Payne, II, #35 Appendix Notice of Consent of Derrick Martin, #36 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tanisha Steele, #37 Appendix Notice of Consent of Samuel Lopez, #38 Appendix Notice of Consent of Faye Conner, #39 Appendix Notice of Consent of Whitney Reynolds, #40 Appendix Notice of Consent of Allison Hinds, #41 Appendix Notice of Consent of Robert Lott, Jr., #42 Appendix Notice of Consent of Sylvester Whitfield, #43 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tawn Ciarrochi, #44 Appendix Notice of Consent of James White, II, #45 Appendix Notice of Consent of Shanese Gaston, #46 Appendix Notice of Consent of Tracey Webb, #47 Appendix Notice of Consent of Miresha Reid, #48 Appendix Notice of Consent of Brian Hopkins, #49 Appendix Notice of Consent of Amanda Barney, #50 Appendix Notice of Consent of Terence Faulkner, #51 Appendix Notice of Consent of Timmie Prioleau)(Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 602 Notice of Consent of Sabeyia Terry filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 601 Notice of Consent of Kasha Nieves filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 600 Notice of Consent of Justin Dossou filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 599 Notice of Consent of Janet McDonald filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 598 Notice of Consent of Ashley Gallman filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 597 Notice of consent of Jill Dabney filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 596 Notice of consent of Azriella Mangum filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 595 Notice of consent of Vanessa Jones filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 594 Notice of consent of D'Anika Wilson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 593 Notice of consent of Lamont Regsdale filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 592 Notice of consent of John McCabe filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 591 Notice of consent of Raymond Williams filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 590 Notice of consent of Jahliel Washington filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 589 Notice of consent of Tyiesha Dunson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 588 Notice of content of Herbert Rohrbach filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 587 Notice of consent of Gregory Feehley filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 586 Notice of consent of Robert Davis filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 585 Notice of consent of Francis Gaeng filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 584 Notice of consent of Quaina Reid filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 583 Notice of consent of Marshall Mays filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 582 Notice of consent of Ebony Adams filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 581 Notice of consent of Dominic Smith filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 580 Notice of consent of Sada Sellers filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 579 Notice of consent of D'Angela Coats filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 578 Notice of consent of Dion Walker filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 577 Notice of consent of Marion Harris filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 576 Notice of consent of Keith Dawson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 575 Notice of consent of Zekeiah Petty filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 574 Notice of consent of Eddie Beal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 573 Notice of consent of Yvonne Banks filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 572 Notice of consent of Christopher Williams filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 571 Notice f consent of Shean Evans filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 570 Notice of consent of Ayesha Jones filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 569 Notice of consent of James Alston II filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 568 Notice of consent of Isidro Talavera filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 567 Notice of consent of Andrea Greger filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 566 Notice of consent of Jessica Sanchez filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 565 Notice of consent of Jessica Harouff filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 564 Notice of consent of Leroy Neel filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 563 Notice of consent of Douglas Johnson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 562 Notice of consent of Eddie Ford filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 561 Notice of consent of Bradley Ellis filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 560 Notice of consent of Julius Chambers filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 559 Notice of consent of Dagne Bowles filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 558 Notice of consent of Billy Gilmore filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 557 Notice of consent of Luco Refuse filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 556 Notice of consent of Dierra Smith filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 555 Notice of consent of Tiffannie Williams filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 554 Notice of consent of Michael Myers filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 553 Notice of consent of Glenn Mcardle filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 552 Notice of consent of Patricia Franklin filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 551 Notice of consent of Tyesha Edwards filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 550 Notice of consent of Desmand Brown filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 549 Notice of consent of Angela Heeter filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 548 Notice of consent of Robert Thompson, Jr. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 547 Notice of consent of Parker Fields filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 546 Notice of consent of Jonathon Bales filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 545 Notice of consent of Beanna Swair filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 544 Notice of consent of Tarik Brooks filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 543 Notice of consent of Crystal Jones filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 542 Notice of consent of Pamela Doane-Verstat filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 541 Notice of consent of George Marcin filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 540 Notice of consent of Christopher Sanders filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 539 Notice of consent of Anthony Huff filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 538 Notice of consent of Dianne Whitman filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 537 Notice of consent of Todd Lewis-Brinkley filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 536 Notice of consent of Asfer Jafri filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 535 Notice of consent of Kirby Stanton filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 534 Notice of consent of Jessica Carter filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 533 Marginal Entry Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 12/3/13 granting, in part, the consent motion to continue trial. The jury trial is rescheduled to 9/1/14 at 8:00 a.m., on a two-week standby basis. The final pretrial is rescheduled to 8/27/14 at 12:00 noon. (Related Doc. #223 ) (M,G)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 532 Notice of consent of Anees Oureshi filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 531 Notice of consent of Alvin Void filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 530 Notice of consent of Ryan McCullough filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 529 Notice of consent of Markita Hodges filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 528 Notice of consent of Margie Cobbs filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 527 Notice of consent of Denise Roane filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 526 Notice of consent of Morgan Richard filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 525 Notice of Consent of Ricky Johnson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 524 Notice of Consent of Renee Cureton filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 523 Notice of Consent of James Copes filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 522 Notice of Consent of Christopher Brooks filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 521 Notice of Consent of Tony Wright filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 520 Notice of Consent of Tierra Lindsay filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 519 Notice of Consent of Teora Williams filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 518 Notice of Consent of Royal Haygood filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 517 Notice of Consent of Reola Morgan filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 516 Notice of Consent of Maynard Oesterle filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 515 Notice of Consent of Martinez Williams filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 514 Notice of Consent of Latashia Crawther filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 513 Notice of Consent of Larry Brihn filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 512 Notice of Consent of Junissa Burgess filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 511 Notice of Consent of Joseph Coleman filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 510 Notice of Consent of Jason Arrington filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 509 Notice of Consent of Jalisa Rodgers filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 508 Notice of Consent of Jacqueline Thurman filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 507 Notice of Consent of Hector Maldonado filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 506 Notice of Consent of Hakima Mercer filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 505 Notice of Consent of Erin Chapman filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 504 Notice of Consent of Dwayne Richardson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 503 Notice of Consent of Donna Jackson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 502 Notice of Consent of Dominique Vaughn filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 501 Notice of Consent of Deshon Lloyd filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 500 Notice of Consent of Denise Mobley filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 499 Notice of Consent of Deidra Griffin filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 498 Notice of Consent of Danielle Brown filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 497 Notice of Consent of Charles Ramsey II filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 496 Notice of Consent of Carliseana Ball filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 495 Notice of Consent of Byron Cannon filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 494 Notice of Consent of Brittany Cosby filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 493 Notice of Consent of Bert Stevens II filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 492 Notice of Consent of Alan Haines filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 491 Notice of Consent of Adiaha Leach filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 490 Notice of consent of Peggy Perry filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 489 Notice of consent of Endolyn Merritt filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 488 Notice of consent of James Gamble filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 487 Notice of consent of LT BLair filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 486 Notice of consent of Lemeul Rice Jr. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 485 Notice of consent of Deirdra Coleman filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 484 Notice of consent of Kenneth Knight filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 483 Notice of consent of Valan Wallace filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 482 Notice of consent of Romell Cochran filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 481 Notice of consent of Tamika Carrington filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 480 Notice of consent of Darryl Steed filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 479 Notice of consent of Arron Mincheski filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 478 Notice of consent of Amanda Golden filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 477 Notice of consent of Justeen Sibole filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 476 Notice of consent of Erin Owens filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 475 Notice of consent of Pamela Watts filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 474 Notice of consent of Marcus Hicks filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 473 Notice of consent of Jarrell Oneal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 472 Notice of consent of Tavaris Lockhart filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 471 Notice of consdent of Tesha Woodard filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 470 Notice of consent of Michelle Schaffer filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 469 Notice of consent of Denise Williams filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 468 Notice of consent of Fantashia Stevens filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 467 Notice of consent of Christopher Maldonado filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 466 Notice of consent of LeBron Carr filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 465 Notice of consent of Dontez Patterson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 464 Notice of consent of Hannah Leavitt filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 463 Notice of consent of Davia Davis filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 462 Notice of consent of Andre Robinson Jr. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 461 Notice of consent of Lorita Sims filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 460 Notice of consent of Andrew Rhodes filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 459 Notice of consent of Natasha Williams filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 458 Notice of consent of Jeremy Ainsworth filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 457 Notice of consent of Vincent Carothers filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 456 Notice of consent of Leslie Nance filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 455 Notice of concent of Tiffany Conrad filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 454 Notice of consent of Remilka Redd filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 453 Notice of consent of Avontae Nettles filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 452 Notice of consent of Dominic Robinson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 451 Notice of consent of Tanneka Allen filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 450 Notice of consent of Shanique Gary filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 449 Notice of consent of David Alderman filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 448 Notice of consent of Terry Thomas Jr. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 447 Notice of consent of Lyniece Carrington filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 446 Notice of consent of Wallace Johns filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 445 Notice of consent of Johnnie Byes Jr. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 444 Notice f consent of Jason Vanderbilt filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 443 Notice of consent of Daniel Paczynski filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 442 Notice of consent od Sheena Hancock filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 441 Notice of consent of Sherrod Anderson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 440 Notice of consent of Gregory James Sr. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 439 Notice of consent of Charles Moore filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 438 Notice of consent of Emily Mabins filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 437 Notice of consent of Latasha Johnson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 436 Notice of consent of Tyrone Baggett filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 435 Notice of consent of Charles Samuel filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 434 Notice of consent of Tiffany Watson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 433 Notice of consent of Stephanie Braxton filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 432 Notice of consent of Wykesha White filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 431 Notice of consent of John Cage III filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 430 Notice of consent of Derrick Peterson Jr. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 429 Notice of consent of Chilisa Cummings filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 428 Notice of consent of Michael Porche filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 427 Notice of consent of Anthony Damaska IV filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 426 Notice of consent of Brandon Bridges filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 425 Notice of consent of Candiss Crofton filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 424 Notice of consent of Stareisha Pinkton filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 423 Notice of consent of Khalil Hanif filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 422 Notice of consent of Ronald Hamilton Jr. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 421 Notice of consent of Brandon Johnson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 420 Notice of consent of Alex Santiago filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 419 Notice of consent of DaVall Mosley filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 418 Notice of consent of Marquita Vann filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 417 Notice of consent of Janice Hardin filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 416 Notice of consent of Juan Ibarra filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 415 Notice of consent of David Bowie filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 414 Notice of consent of Virgilio Jacas filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 413 Notice of consent of Tanisha Hunter filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 412 Notice of Consent of Wendell Hoskin filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 411 Notice of consent of Camesha Blackwell filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 410 Notice of consent of Devoir Moore filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 409 Notice of consent of Noah Uddin filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 408 Notice of consent of Valarie Torbert filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 407 Notice of Consent of Yoketha Brown filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 406 Notice of Consent of Wilbert Winston filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 405 Notice of Consent of Tyeisha Stots filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 404 Notice of Consent of Tosheba Smith filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 403 Notice of Consent of Stephanie Stevenson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 402 Notice of Consent of Roscoe Cook filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 401 Notice of Consent of Orr Livingston filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 400 Notice of Consent of Nazeeh Brown filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 399 Notice of Consent of Mitchell Guzman filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 398 Notice of Consent of Michael Roseboro filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 397 Notice of Consent of Michael Bailey filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 396 Notice of Consent of Kyla Sykes filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 395 Notice of Consent of Jacoryon Sorrells filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 394 Notice of Consent of Eugene Strom filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 393 Notice of Consent of Diana King filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 392 Notice of Consent of Darryl Curry II filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 391 Notice of Consent of Charles Wimes filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 390 Notice of Consent of Brian Robbins filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 389 Notice of Consent of Angelina Burns filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 388 Notice of Consent of Alexis Nazario filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 387 Notice of Consent of Sherron Webster filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 386 Notice of Consent of Michael Felton filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 385 Notice of Consent of Larissa Hearns filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 384 Notice of Consent of Lakeisha Miles filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 383 Notice of Consent of Graham Perkey filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 382 Notice of Consent of Edward Capps filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 381 Notice of Consent of Devon Douglas filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 380 Notice of Consent of Brandon Williams filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 379 Notice of Consent of Andre Ransom filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 378 Notice of Consent of Amber Friesel filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 377 Notice of Consent of Tinessa Van Gundy filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 376 Notice of Consent of Terrance Smith filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 375 Notice of Consent of Tamara Martin filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 374 Notice of Consent of Shevawn Williams filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 373 Notice of Consent of Santana Curtis filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 372 Notice of Consent of Samira Cole filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 371 Notice of Consent of Patricia Case filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 370 Notice of Consent of Nigel Price filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 369 Notice of Consent of Nia Bailey filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 368 Notice of Consent of Marshele Green filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 367 Notice of Consent of Mackiesha Hayes filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 366 Notice of Consent of Lynn Stoneburner filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 365 Notice of Consent of Latrice Hill filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 364 Notice of Consent of Kevin McQuilkin filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 363 Notice of Consent of Keven Tucholski filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 362 Notice of Consent of Kathy Edwards filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 361 Notice of Consent of Kaleiah Travis filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 360 Notice of Consent of John Selmon filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 359 Notice of Consent of Jennifer Finney filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 358 Notice of Consent of Fatema Frazier filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 357 Notice of Consent of Ebony Peek filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 356 Notice of Consent of Darian Blake filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 355 Notice of Consent of Clovis Cooper filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 354 Notice of Consent of Channelle Rollins filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 353 Notice of Consent of Cassandra Lemle filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 352 Notice of Consent of Bryonna Owens filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 351 Notice of Consent of Brian Triplett filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 350 Notice of Consent of Autumn Rudd filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 349 Notice of Consent of Ashley Talley filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 348 Notice of Consent of Anthony Thomas filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 347 Notice of Consent of Alex Schivelbein filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
December 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 346 Notice of Consent of Adam Durdel filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 345 Notice of consent of Curtis Baccus, Jr. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 344 Notice of Consent of Howard Corchado filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 343 Notice of consent of Lorraine Dorsey filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 342 Notice of consent of Jaron Hayden filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 341 Notice of consent of Danzale Eiston filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 340 Notice of consent of Kayla Chambley filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 339 Notice of consent of Shavon Lyons filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 338 Notice of consent of Arnetrius Williams filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 337 Notice of consent of Michael Chamberlain filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 336 Notice of consent of Jazzmin Santiago filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 335 Notice of consent of Angel Parker filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 334 Notice of consent of Sunday Havens Ricks filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 333 Notice of consent of Brakeem Jackson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 332 Notice of consent of Quwan Carter filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 331 Notice of consent of Dwight Mosley filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 330 Notice of consent of Darnell McCarter filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 329 Notice of consent of Dorothea Maxwell filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 328 Notice of consent of Gwendolyn Baskerville filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 327 Notice of consent of Donta Stevenson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 326 Notice of consent of Pamela Reavis filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 325 Notice of consent of Glenicesha Langley filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 324 Notice of consent of Sharron Smart filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 323 Notice of consent of Rodney Sharpe filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 322 Consent of notice of Sterling White filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 321 Notice of consent of William Windal, Jr. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 320 Notice of consent of Tommy Ellerbe filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 319 Notice of consent of James Isaac III filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 318 Notice of consent of Ashley Vazquez filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 317 Notice of consent of Antonio Davis, Jr. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 316 Notice of consent of Shanell Gorie filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 315 Notice of consent of Derrick Burns filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 314 Notice of consent of Diana Sanders filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 313 Notice of Consent of Joanne Taylor filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 312 Notice of Consent Kamilah Barner filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 311 Notice of Consent of Kihkahi Orr filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 310 Notice of Consent of Tanisha Taylor filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 309 Notice of Consent of Katina King filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 308 Notice of Consent of Reginald Evans filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 307 Notice of Consent of Diamond Williams filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 306 Notice of Consent of Felicia Ford filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 305 Notice of Consent of Letoya Payne filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 304 Notice of Consent of Jamie Rodriguez filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 303 Notice of Consent of Linka Cohen filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 302 Notice of Consent of Jyriek Proctor-Brown filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 301 Notice of Consent of Albert Barnes, Jr. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 300 Notice of Consent of Laurie Skinner filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 299 Notice of Consent of James Cofen filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 298 Notice of Consent of Brian Baylor filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 297 Notice of Consent of J.D. Nixon filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 296 Notice of Consent of Johnathan Smith filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 295 Notice of Consent of Craig Jarvis filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 294 Notice of Consent of Christian Hutchins filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 293 Notice of Consent of Jeffrey Moore filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 292 Notice of Consent of Cindy Coreus filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 291 Notice of Consent of Christine Perry filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 290 Notice of Consent of Nigel Greene filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 289 Notice of Consent of Sherry Tobin filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 288 Notice of Consent of Daisha Wallace filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 287 Notice of Consent of Allison Shells filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 286 Notice of Consent of Barbara Thomas filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Notice of Consent of Alexis Passmore filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 284 Notice of Consent of Aklem Rone filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 283 Notice of Consent of Darnell Foster filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 282 Notice of Consent of Kyle Ratney filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 281 Notice of Consent of Brandon Flanagan filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Notice of Consent of Samuel Simpson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 279 Notice of Consent of Oliver Kirk filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 278 Notice of Consent of Billy Ray filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 277 Notice of Consent of Victor Edwards filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 276 Notice of Consent of Matthew Conklin filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 275 Notice of Consent of Franklin Stewart filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 274 Notice of Consent of Shawn Harper filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Notice of Consent of Erik Pannell filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 272 Notice of Consent of Stephanie Clifton filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Notice of Consent of Nicole Holloway filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Notice of Consent of Monique Norrington filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 269 Notice of Consent of Thomas Haynes filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 268 Notice of Consent of Jamya Hildreth filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 267 Notice of Consent of James Fleming filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Notice of Consent of Nichole Blevins filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 265 Notice of Consent of Terror Mitchell filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Notice of Consent of Maurice Acoff filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 263 Notice of Consent of Felton Davenport filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 262 Notice that Robert Erney does not wish to participate in this action filed by All Plaintiffs (Fiorelli, Nicole). Modified on 11/26/2013 to correct text (H,SP).
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Notice of Consent of Donovan Boddy filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 260 Notice of Consent of Dwain Payton filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Notice of Consent of Sarah Newton filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 258 Notice of Consent of Mary Paige filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Notice of Consent of Donna Jones filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 256 Notice of Consent of Julia Bozeman filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 255 Notice of Consent of Willie Dunn filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Notice of Consent of Tamara Gamble filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Notice of Consent of Maria Ashley filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Notice of Consent of Robert Skerness filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 251 Notice of Consent of Tierra Moore filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Notice of Consent of Detania Jackson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Notice of Consent of Carolyn Williams filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Notice of Consent of Irene Owens filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 247 Notice of Consent of Ericka Jones filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 246 Notice of Consent of Dale Reese filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Notice of Consent of Bryant Huntley filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 244 Notice of Consent of Shamicka Sutton filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 243 Notice of Consent of Angelina Carter filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 242 Notice of Consent of Tia Rose filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Notice of Consent of David Humbarger filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Notice that Kiyairre Whitby does not wish to participate in this action filed by All Plaintiffs (Fiorelli, Nicole). Modified on 11/26/2013 to change text (H,SP).
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 239 Notice of Consent of Kynneth Mitchell filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Notice of Consent of Denelle Reese filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 237 Notice of Consent of Damien Johnson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 236 Notice of Consent Misty Farrell filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 235 Notice of Consent of Lesley Eland filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Notice of Consent of Korrey Lee filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Notice of Consent of Douglas Lewis filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 232 Notice of Consent of Aaron James filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 231 Notice of Consent of William Nash filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Notice of Consent of Steven Cranfield, Jr. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Notice of Consent of Anthony Merritt filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Notice of Consent of Emma King filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 227 Notice of Consent of Bruce Milam, II filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Notice of Consent of Willetta Milam filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Notice of Consent of Nicole Thompson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Notice of Consent of Matthew Shaw filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Consent Motion to continue Trial filed by Dominic Hill, Davina Hurt. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Notice of Consent of Josef Smith filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Notice of Consent of Diana Williams filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 220 Notice of Consent of LeJolith Smith filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 219 Notice of Consent of Brittini Jackson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 218 Notice of Consent of Dominique Hopkins filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Notice of Consent of Melissa A. Johnson filed by All Plaintiffs (Fiorelli, Nicole). Modified on 11/22/2013 to correct name, NEF regenerated (H,SP).
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 216 Notice of Consent of Ronika Trice filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 215 Notice of Consent of DiAngeles Hawkins filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Notice of Consent of Allen Huff, Jr. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 213 Notice of Consent of Bruce Abbott filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Notice of Consent of Deontae Codner filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 211 Notice of Consent of Richard Wheatley filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Notice of Consent of Ricardo Andrade filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Notice of Consent of Lisa Acoff filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Notice of Consent of Aric Lakes filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Notice of Consent of William Starks, Jr. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Notice of Consent of Yvonka Hardrick filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Notice of Consent of Samuel Massengale filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Notice of Consent of Lloydora McDowell filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Notice of Consent of Austin Hale filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Notice of Consent of Amanda Delaboin filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Notice of Consent of Preston Kriel filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Notice of Consent of Michael Browne filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Notice of Consent of Whitney Dodson filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fiorelli, Nicole)